In Re: Barnes & Nobles, Inc. Shareholders Derivative Litigation
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-06692
District Judge Richard J. Sullivan, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 18, 2017 at 12:36 AM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Intermountain Ironworkers Trust Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cauley Bowman Carney & Williams, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Allen Carney +1 501 312 8500 +1 501 312 8505

Toggle Switch Represented by Cauley Geller Bowman & Coates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gene Cauley +1 501 312 8500

Toggle Switch Represented by Federman & Sherwood

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Bernard Federman +1 405 235 1560 +1 405 239 2112 wbf@federmanlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirby McInerney LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ira Michael Press +1 212 317 2300 +1 212 751 2540 ipress@kmslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED H. Adam Prussin +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 HAPrussin@Pomlaw.Com
v.
No Logo Barnes & Noble, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Barnesandnoble.com Inc.
GameStop Corporation Officer/Director, GameStop Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey A. Conciatori +1 212 702 8130 +1 212 702 8200 jeffreyconciatori@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen R. Neuwirth +1 212 849 7000 +1 212 849 7100 stephenneuwirth@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo Christopher Grady-Troia, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey A. Conciatori +1 212 702 8130 +1 212 702 8200 jeffreyconciatori@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen R. Neuwirth +1 212 849 7000 +1 212 849 7100 stephenneuwirth@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo David S. Deason, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey A. Conciatori +1 212 702 8130 +1 212 702 8200 jeffreyconciatori@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen R. Neuwirth +1 212 849 7000 +1 212 849 7100 stephenneuwirth@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo Irene R. Miller, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey A. Conciatori +1 212 702 8130 +1 212 702 8200 jeffreyconciatori@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen R. Neuwirth +1 212 849 7000 +1 212 849 7100 stephenneuwirth@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo J. Alan Kahn, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey A. Conciatori +1 212 702 8130 +1 212 702 8200 jeffreyconciatori@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen R. Neuwirth +1 212 849 7000 +1 212 849 7100 stephenneuwirth@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo Joseph Lombardi, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey A. Conciatori +1 212 702 8130 +1 212 702 8200 jeffreyconciatori@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen R. Neuwirth +1 212 849 7000 +1 212 849 7100 stephenneuwirth@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo Lawrence S. Zilavy, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey A. Conciatori +1 212 702 8130 +1 212 702 8200 jeffreyconciatori@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen R. Neuwirth +1 212 849 7000 +1 212 849 7100 stephenneuwirth@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo Leonard Riggio, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey A. Conciatori +1 212 702 8130 +1 212 702 8200 jeffreyconciatori@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen R. Neuwirth +1 212 849 7000 +1 212 849 7100 stephenneuwirth@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo Margaret T. Monaco, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey A. Conciatori +1 212 702 8130 +1 212 702 8200 jeffreyconciatori@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen R. Neuwirth +1 212 849 7000 +1 212 849 7100 stephenneuwirth@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo Marie J. Toulantis, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey A. Conciatori +1 212 702 8130 +1 212 702 8200 jeffreyconciatori@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen R. Neuwirth +1 212 849 7000 +1 212 849 7100 stephenneuwirth@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo Mary Ellen Keating, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey A. Conciatori +1 212 702 8130 +1 212 702 8200 jeffreyconciatori@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen R. Neuwirth +1 212 849 7000 +1 212 849 7100 stephenneuwirth@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo Matthew A. Berdon, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey A. Conciatori +1 212 702 8130 +1 212 702 8200 jeffreyconciatori@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen R. Neuwirth +1 212 849 7000 +1 212 849 7100 stephenneuwirth@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo Michael J. Giudice, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey A. Conciatori +1 212 702 8130 +1 212 702 8200 jeffreyconciatori@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen R. Neuwirth +1 212 849 7000 +1 212 849 7100 stephenneuwirth@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo Michael N. Rosen, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey A. Conciatori +1 212 702 8130 +1 212 702 8200 jeffreyconciatori@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen R. Neuwirth +1 212 849 7000 +1 212 849 7100 stephenneuwirth@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo Michelle Smith, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey A. Conciatori +1 212 702 8130 +1 212 702 8200 jeffreyconciatori@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen R. Neuwirth +1 212 849 7000 +1 212 849 7100 stephenneuwirth@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo Mitchell S. Klipper, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey A. Conciatori +1 212 702 8130 +1 212 702 8200 jeffreyconciatori@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen R. Neuwirth +1 212 849 7000 +1 212 849 7100 stephenneuwirth@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo Stephen Riggio, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey A. Conciatori +1 212 702 8130 +1 212 702 8200 jeffreyconciatori@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen R. Neuwirth +1 212 849 7000 +1 212 849 7100 stephenneuwirth@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo William F. Duffy, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey A. Conciatori +1 212 702 8130 +1 212 702 8200 jeffreyconciatori@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen R. Neuwirth +1 212 849 7000 +1 212 849 7100 stephenneuwirth@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo William F. Reilly, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey A. Conciatori +1 212 702 8130 +1 212 702 8200 jeffreyconciatori@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen R. Neuwirth +1 212 849 7000 +1 212 849 7100 stephenneuwirth@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo William Sheluck, Jr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey A. Conciatori +1 212 702 8130 +1 212 702 8200 jeffreyconciatori@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen R. Neuwirth +1 212 849 7000 +1 212 849 7100 stephenneuwirth@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo William T. Dillard, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey A. Conciatori +1 212 702 8130 +1 212 702 8200 jeffreyconciatori@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen R. Neuwirth +1 212 849 7000 +1 212 849 7100 stephenneuwirth@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo Arnold Wandel, Lead Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Federman & Sherwood

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sara E. Collier +1 405 235 1560 +1 405 239 2112 sec@federmanlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Bernard Federman +1 405 235 1560 +1 405 239 2112 wbf@federmanlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED H. Adam Prussin +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 HAPrussin@Pomlaw.Com
No Logo Intermountain Ironworkers Trust Fund, Lead Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cauley Geller Bowman & Coates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gene Cauley +1 501 312 8500

Toggle Switch Represented by Federman & Sherwood

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Bernard Federman +1 405 235 1560 +1 405 239 2112 wbf@federmanlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED H. Adam Prussin +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 HAPrussin@Pomlaw.Com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (57) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 57 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: This consolidated action is dismissed with prejudice, with each side to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees, except to the extent that the Stipulation provides for the payment of attorneys' fees and expenses. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/15/08) (tro) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    DECLARATION of Jeffrey A. Conciatori in Support re: 54 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Margaret T. Monaco, Michael N. Rosen, William Sheluck, Jr, William F. Reilly, Mitchell S. Klipper, Marie J. Toulantis, J. Alan Kahn, William F. Duffy, Joseph Lombardi, Christopher Grady-Troia, Mary Ellen Keating, David S. Deason, Michelle Smith, Lawrence S. Zilavy, Barnes & Noble, Inc., Leonard Riggio, Stephen Riggio, Matthew A. Berdon, Michael J. Giudice, William T. Dillard, Irene R. Miller. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Neuwirth, Stephen) (Entered: 05/14/2008)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 54 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Margaret T. Monaco, Michael N. Rosen, William Sheluck, Jr, William F. Reilly, Mitchell S. Klipper, Marie J. Toulantis, J. Alan Kahn, William F. Duffy, Joseph Lombardi, Christopher Grady-Troia, Mary Ellen Keating, David S. Deason, Michelle Smith, Lawrence S. Zilavy, Barnes & Noble, Inc., Leonard Riggio, Stephen Riggio, Matthew A. Berdon, Michael J. Giudice, William T. Dillard, Irene R. Miller. (Neuwirth, Stephen) (Entered: 05/14/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        JOINT MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Margaret T. Monaco, Michael N. Rosen, William Sheluck, Jr, William F. Reilly, Mitchell S. Klipper, Marie J. Toulantis, J. Alan Kahn, William F. Duffy, Joseph Lombardi, Christopher Grady-Troia, Mary Ellen Keating, David S. Deason, Michelle Smith, Lawrence S. Zilavy, Barnes & Noble, Inc., Leonard Riggio, Stephen Riggio, Matthew A. Berdon, Michael J. Giudice, William T. Dillard, Irene R. Miller.(Neuwirth, Stephen) (Entered: 05/14/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of Jeffrey A. Conciatori in Support re: 40 MOTION to Dismiss., 52 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Margaret T. Monaco, Michael N. Rosen, William Sheluck, Jr, William F. Reilly, Mitchell S. Klipper, Marie J. Toulantis, J. Alan Kahn, William F. Duffy, Joseph Lombardi, Christopher Grady-Troia, Mary Ellen Keating, David S. Deason, Michelle Smith, Lawrence S. Zilavy, Barnes & Noble, Inc., Leonard Riggio, Stephen Riggio, Matthew A. Berdon, Michael J. Giudice, William T. Dillard, Irene R. Miller. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Conciatori Declaration, # 2 Exhibit B to Conciatori Declaration, # 3 Exhibit C to Conciatori Declaration, # 4 Exhibit D to Conciatori Declaration, # 5 Exhibit E to Conciatori Declaration, # 6 Exhibit F to Conciatori Declaration, # 7 Exhibit G to Conciatori Declaration, # 8 Exhibit H to Conciatori Declaration)(Neuwirth, Stephen) Modified on 5/14/2008 (KA). (Entered: 05/13/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            FILING ERROR - WRONG DOCUMENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - JOINT MOTION to Dismiss(MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION). Document filed by Margaret T. Monaco, Michael N. Rosen, William Sheluck, Jr, William F. Reilly, Mitchell S. Klipper, Marie J. Toulantis, J. Alan Kahn, William F. Duffy, Joseph Lombardi, Christopher Grady-Troia, Mary Ellen Keating, David S. Deason, Michelle Smith, Lawrence S. Zilavy, Barnes & Noble, Inc., Leonard Riggio, Stephen Riggio, Matthew A. Berdon, Michael J. Giudice, William T. Dillard, Irene R. Miller.(Neuwirth, Stephen) Modified on 5/14/2008 (KA). (Entered: 05/13/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              FILING ERROR - WRONG DOCUMENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - NOTICE of Joint Motion to Dismiss(MOTION TO DISMISS). Document filed by Margaret T. Monaco, Michael N. Rosen, William Sheluck, Jr, William F. Reilly, Mitchell S. Klipper, Marie J. Toulantis, J. Alan Kahn, William F. Duffy, Joseph Lombardi, Christopher Grady-Troia, Mary Ellen Keating, David S. Deason, Michelle Smith, Lawrence S. Zilavy, Barnes & Noble, Inc., Leonard Riggio, Stephen Riggio, Matthew A. Berdon, Michael J. Giudice, William T. Dillard, Irene R. Miller. (Neuwirth, Stephen) Modified on 5/14/2008 (KA). (Entered: 05/13/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER: It is hereby ordered that the parties shall jointly submit a letter regarding the status of this case within 30 days of the date of this Order, in the event that the parties fail to submit a stipulation of dismissal by that date. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 1/29/08) (js) (Entered: 01/30/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Stephen R. Neuwirth dated 11/26/2007 re: Counsel for defendants in the above-reference consolidated derivative action. By letter to the Court dated August 30, 2007, we notified the Court that the defendants substantially completed a global written settlement agreement, with both the State and federal derivative action plaintiffs, that would resolve both the State Court Derivative Actions and the consolidated derivative action before Your Honor. ENDORSEMENT: The parties are directed to submit a joint status letter, apprising the court of developments in this matter, by January 28, 2008. SO ORDERED. ( Status Report due by 1/28/2008.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 11/27/2007) (jmi) (Entered: 11/28/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Judge Kenneth M. Karas is no longer assigned to the case. (tro) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint served on Defendants on May 21, 2007. Service was made by Electronic Mail/Overnight Delivery. Document filed by Arnold Wandel. (Federman, William) (Entered: 06/08/2007)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 40 MOTION to Dismiss. The Consolidated Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint. Document filed by Arnold Wandel. (Federman, William) (Entered: 06/08/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 40 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Margaret T. Monaco, Michael N. Rosen, William Sheluck, Jr, William F. Reilly, Mitchell S. Klipper, Marie J. Toulantis, J. Alan Kahn, William F. Duffy, Joseph Lombardi, Christopher Grady-Troia, Mary Ellen Keating, David S. Deason, Michelle Smith, Lawrence S. Zilavy, Barnes & Noble, Inc., Leonard Riggio, Stephen Riggio, Matthew A. Berdon, Michael J. Giudice, William T. Dillard, Irene R. Miller. (Neuwirth, Stephen) (Entered: 06/08/2007)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion to Dismiss, Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, Barrett Declaration in Support of Motion to Dismiss, Affidavit of Peter Herpich served on Plaintiffs on 04/16/2007. Service was made by Overnight mail. Document filed by Margaret T. Monaco, Michael N. Rosen, William Sheluck, Jr, William F. Reilly, Mitchell S. Klipper, Marie J. Toulantis, J. Alan Kahn, William F. Duffy, Joseph Lombardi, Christopher Grady-Troia, Mary Ellen Keating, David S. Deason, Michelle Smith, Lawrence S. Zilavy, Barnes & Noble, Inc., Leonard Riggio, Stephen Riggio, Matthew A. Berdon, Michael J. Giudice, William T. Dillard, Irene R. Miller. (Neuwirth, Stephen) (Entered: 06/08/2007)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              AFFIDAVIT of Peter Herpich re: 40 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Margaret T. Monaco, Michael N. Rosen, William Sheluck, Jr, William F. Reilly, Mitchell S. Klipper, Marie J. Toulantis, J. Alan Kahn, William F. Duffy, Joseph Lombardi, Christopher Grady-Troia, Mary Ellen Keating, David S. Deason, Michelle Smith, Lawrence S. Zilavy, Barnes & Noble, Inc., Leonard Riggio, Stephen Riggio, Matthew A. Berdon, Michael J. Giudice, William T. Dillard, Irene R. Miller. (Neuwirth, Stephen) (Entered: 06/08/2007)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                DECLARATION of Jennifer J. Barrett in Support re: 40 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Margaret T. Monaco, Michael N. Rosen, William Sheluck, Jr, William F. Reilly, Mitchell S. Klipper, Marie J. Toulantis, J. Alan Kahn, William F. Duffy, Joseph Lombardi, Christopher Grady-Troia, Mary Ellen Keating, David S. Deason, Michelle Smith, Lawrence S. Zilavy, Barnes & Noble, Inc., Leonard Riggio, Stephen Riggio, Matthew A. Berdon, Michael J. Giudice, William T. Dillard, Irene R. Miller. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Barrett Declaration# 2 Exhibit B to Barrett Declaration# 3 Exhibit C to Barrett Declaration# 4 Exhibit D to Barrett Declaration# 5 Exhibit E to Barrett Declaration)(Neuwirth, Stephen) (Entered: 06/08/2007)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 40 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Margaret T. Monaco, Michael N. Rosen, William Sheluck, Jr, William F. Reilly, Mitchell S. Klipper, Marie J. Toulantis, J. Alan Kahn, William F. Duffy, Joseph Lombardi, Christopher Grady-Troia, Mary Ellen Keating, David S. Deason, Michelle Smith, Lawrence S. Zilavy, Barnes & Noble, Inc., Leonard Riggio, Stephen Riggio, Matthew A. Berdon, Michael J. Giudice, William T. Dillard, Irene R. Miller. (Neuwirth, Stephen) (Entered: 06/08/2007)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Margaret T. Monaco, Michael N. Rosen, William Sheluck, Jr, William F. Reilly, Mitchell S. Klipper, Marie J. Toulantis, J. Alan Kahn, William F. Duffy, Joseph Lombardi, Christopher Grady-Troia, Mary Ellen Keating, David S. Deason, Michelle Smith, Lawrence S. Zilavy, Barnes & Noble, Inc., Leonard Riggio, Stephen Riggio, Matthew A. Berdon, Michael J. Giudice, William T. Dillard, Irene R. Miller.(Neuwirth, Stephen) (Entered: 06/08/2007)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      NOTICE of Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Margaret T. Monaco, Michael N. Rosen, William Sheluck, Jr, William F. Reilly, Mitchell S. Klipper, Marie J. Toulantis, J. Alan Kahn, William F. Duffy, Joseph Lombardi, Christopher Grady-Troia, Mary Ellen Keating, David S. Deason, Michelle Smith, Lawrence S. Zilavy, Barnes & Noble, Inc., Leonard Riggio, Stephen Riggio, Matthew A. Berdon, Michael J. Giudice, William T. Dillard, Irene R. Miller. (Neuwirth, Stephen) (Entered: 06/08/2007)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        STIPULATION TO MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE: Plaintiff shall file his opposition on or before May 21, 2007. Defendants shall file their reply to plaintiff's opposition on or before June 8, 2007. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 5/18/2007) (kkc) (Entered: 05/25/2007)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          STIPULATION TO MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE: Plaintiff shall file his opposition on or before June 17, 2007. Defendants shall file their reply to plaintiff's opposition on or before June 5, 2007. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 5/19/07) (js) (Entered: 05/23/2007)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            MOTION SCHEDULING ORDER:Defendants' Motion to Dismiss due by 4/15/2007. Plaintiff's Responses due by 5/15/2007, Replies due by 6/1/2007. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 3/16/2007) (jar) (Entered: 03/20/2007)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              CONSOLIDATED VERIFIED DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT against Margaret T. Monaco, Michael N. Rosen, William Sheluck, Jr, William F. Reilly, Mitchell S. Klipper, Marie J. Toulantis, J. Alan Kahn, William F. Duffy, Joseph Lombardi, Christopher Grady-Troia, Mary Ellen Keating, David S. Deason, Michelle Smith, Lawrence S. Zilavy, Barnes & Noble, Inc., Leonard Riggio, Stephen Riggio, Matthew A. Berdon, Michael J. Giudice, William T. Dillard, Irene R. Miller. Document filed by Intermountain Ironworkers Trust Fund, Intermountain Ironworkers Trust Fund, Arnold Wandel.(db) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/19/2007 (Correa, Julie). (Entered: 02/27/2007)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by H. Adam Prussin on behalf of Arnold Wandel (Prussin, H.) (Entered: 02/15/2007)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER granting 31 MOTION for Reconsideration /Reargue the Appointment of Lead Counsel, Lead Plaintiff and Liaison Counsel. filed by Arnold Wandel. Plaintiff Arnold Wandel shll serve as lead plaintiff, his counsel, Federman & Sherwood, shall serve as lead counsel and the law offices of Marc Hanzel shall serve as liason counsel. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 1/18/07) (cd) (Entered: 01/23/2007)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/17/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER/NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFF, that plaintiff Ironworkers Trust Fund withdraws for this consolidated action. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 1/16/07) (cd) (Entered: 01/18/2007)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      MOTION for Reconsideration /Reargue the Appointment of Lead Counsel, Lead Plaintiff and Liaison Counsel. Document filed by Arnold Wandel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Order dated 1/4/07# 2 Exhibit B - Notice of Withdrawal of Plaintiff# 3 Exhibit C - [Proposed] Order)(Federman, William) (Entered: 01/16/2007)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sara Elizabeth Collier on behalf of Arnold Wandel (Collier, Sara) (Entered: 01/16/2007)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER that the caption to use in all following filings in this action is: IN RE BARNES & NOBLE, INC. SHAREHOLDERS DERIVATIVE LITIGATION. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 1/3/07) (cd, ) (Entered: 01/08/2007)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER that on or before 1/12/07, plntf Intermountain will sumbit to the Court an affidavit tothe Court an affidavit affirming that it will hold shares of Barnes & Noble thoughout the duration of this action. On or before 2/16/07, plntfs shall file a Consolidated Amended Complaint, and as further set forth in this document. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 1/4/07) (cd, ) (Entered: 01/08/2007)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER granting 14 MOTION to Appoint Intermountain Ironworkers Trust Fund to serve as lead plaintiff(s). filed by Intermountain Ironworkers Trust Fund; granting 13 MOTION to Appoint Arnold Wandel to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and Federman & Sherwood as Lead Counsel. filed by Arnold Wandel. Cauley Bowman Carney & Willimas shall serve as lead counsel and Kirby McInerney & Squire LLP shall serve as liason counsel. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 1/4/07) (cd, ) (Entered: 01/08/2007)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re: 13 MOTION to Appoint Arnold Wandel to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and Federman & Sherwood as Lead Counsel.. Document filed by Arnold Wandel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Order dated 6/13/06)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-06692-KMK,1:06-cv-06883-KMK,1:06-cv-06902-KMK(Federman, William) (Entered: 12/22/2006)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 13 MOTION to Appoint Arnold Wandel to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and Federman & Sherwood as Lead Counsel.. Document filed by Intermountain Ironworkers Trust Fund. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-06692-KMK,1:06-cv-06883-KMK,1:06-cv-06902-KMK(Press, Ira) (Entered: 12/22/2006)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re: 14 MOTION to Appoint Intermountain Ironworkers Trust Fund to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., 13 MOTION to Appoint Arnold Wandel to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and Federman & Sherwood as Lead Counsel.. Document filed by Margaret T. Monaco, Michael N. Rosen, William Sheluck, Jr, William F. Reilly, Mitchell S. Klipper, Marie J. Toulantis, J. Alan Kahn, William F. Duffy, Joseph Lombardi, Christopher Grady-Troia, Mary Ellen Keating, David S. Deason, Michelle Smith, Lawrence S. Zilavy, Barnes & Noble, Inc., Leonard Riggio, Stephen Riggio, Matthew A. Berdon, Michael J. Giudice, William T. Dillard, Irene R. Miller. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-06692-KMK,1:06-cv-06883-KMK,1:06-cv-06902-KMK(Neuwirth, Stephen) (Entered: 12/11/2006)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 13 MOTION to Appoint Arnold Wandel to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and Federman & Sherwood as Lead Counsel.. Document filed by Intermountain Ironworkers Trust Fund. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-06692-KMK,1:06-cv-06883-KMK,1:06-cv-06902-KMK(Press, Ira) (Entered: 12/11/2006)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re: 14 MOTION to Appoint Intermountain Ironworkers Trust Fund to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Arnold Wandel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-06692-KMK,1:06-cv-06883-KMK,1:06-cv-06902-KMK(Federman, William) (Entered: 12/11/2006)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey A. Conciatori on behalf of Margaret T. Monaco, Michael N. Rosen, William Sheluck, Jr, William F. Reilly, Mitchell S. Klipper, Marie J. Toulantis, J. Alan Kahn, William F. Duffy, Joseph Lombardi, Christopher Grady-Troia, Mary Ellen Keating, David S. Deason, Michelle Smith, Lawrence S. Zilavy, Barnes & Noble, Inc., Leonard Riggio, Stephen Riggio, Matthew A. Berdon, Michael J. Giudice, William T. Dillard, Irene R. Miller (Conciatori, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/08/2006)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Randall Neuwirth on behalf of Margaret T. Monaco, Michael N. Rosen, William Sheluck, Jr, William F. Reilly, Mitchell S. Klipper, Marie J. Toulantis, J. Alan Kahn, William F. Duffy, Joseph Lombardi, Christopher Grady-Troia, Mary Ellen Keating, David S. Deason, Michelle Smith, Lawrence S. Zilavy, Leonard Riggio, Stephen Riggio, Matthew A. Berdon, Michael J. Giudice, William T. Dillard, Irene R. Miller (Neuwirth, Stephen) (Entered: 12/08/2006)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Randall Neuwirth on behalf of Barnes & Noble, Inc. (Neuwirth, Stephen) (Entered: 12/08/2006)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/5/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 11/9/2006, Receipt Number 596550. J. ALLEN CARNEY (gm, ) (Entered: 12/05/2006)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Intermountain Ironworkers Trust Fund's Notice of Motion for Appointment of Lead PLaintiff, Memorandum of Law, and Affidavit of Ira M. Press on 11/27/06. Service was made by Mail and ECF. Document filed by Intermountain Ironworkers Trust Fund. (Press, Ira) (Entered: 11/27/2006)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 14 MOTION to Appoint Intermountain Ironworkers Trust Fund to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Intermountain Ironworkers Trust Fund. (Press, Ira) (Entered: 11/27/2006)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Ira M. Press in Support re: 14 MOTION to Appoint Intermountain Ironworkers Trust Fund to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Intermountain Ironworkers Trust Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Press, Ira) (Entered: 11/27/2006)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        MOTION to Appoint Intermountain Ironworkers Trust Fund to serve as lead plaintiff(s). Document filed by Intermountain Ironworkers Trust Fund. (Press, Ira) (Entered: 11/27/2006)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          MOTION to Appoint Arnold Wandel to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and Federman & Sherwood as Lead Counsel. Document filed by Arnold Wandel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - F & S Case List# 2 Exhibit 2 - Firm Resume# 3 Exhibit 3 - Transcript)(Federman, William) (Entered: 11/27/2006)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting 6 Motion for S. Gene Cauley to Appear Pro Hac Vice for plaintiffs. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/20/06) (cd, ) (Entered: 11/21/2006)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting 5 Motion for J. Allen Carney to Appear Pro Hac Vice for plaintiffs. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/20/06) (cd, ) (Entered: 11/21/2006)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER granting 4 Motion for Darrin L. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice for plaintiffs.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/20/06) (cd, ) (Entered: 11/21/2006)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER; the Clerk is directed to consolidate the three actions numbered 06cv6692, 06cv6902, 06cv6883 for all purposes. All filings shall be maintained in the lower case number, 06cv6692. The Clerk is directed to close the referenced higher case number 06cv6902 and 06cv6883 as separate actions. The parties shall use the following case caption: In Re: Barnes & Nobles, Inc. Shareholders Class Action Litigation. Motions to appoint lead counsel must be filed by 11/27/2006. Responses must be filed by 12/11/2006. Replies, if any, must be filed by 12/22/2006. Defendant's motion regarding disqualification of counsel must be filed by 12/11/2006. Responses due by 12/22/2006. Oral Argument on the motions is scheduled for 1/4/2007 at 2:15 p.m. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/17/06) (kco, ) Modified on 11/30/2006 (kco, ). (Entered: 11/20/2006)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/8/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Ira Press dated 10/30/06 re: counsel for Intermountain Ironworkers requests a premotion conference. The court will hold a premotion conference on 11/17/06 at 2:15 p.m. unless the court hears anything to the contrary, it intends to consolidate the cases and set a briefing schedule on the question of lead plaintiff counsel. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/2/06) (dle, ) (Entered: 11/15/2006)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Karas from Sara Collier dated 11/9/06: Ms. Collier will be permitted to appear at the conference by telephone. She shall call chambers at 212 805-0274 to participate. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/14/06) (cd, ) (Entered: 11/15/2006)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        MOTION for S. Gene Cauley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Intermountain Ironworkers Trust Fund. (jco, ) (Entered: 11/14/2006)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          MOTION for J. Allen Carney to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Intermountain Ironworkers Trust Fund. Proposed Order attached. (jco, ) (Entered: 11/14/2006)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            MOTION for Darrin Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Intermountain Ironworkers Trust Fund. (dle, ) (Entered: 11/13/2006)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Karas from Ira Press dated 10/30/06: re request for a premotion conference: the Court will hold a pre motion conference on 11/17/06, at 2:15 pm. Unless the court hears anything to the contrary, it intedns to consolidate the cases and set a briefing schedule on the question of lead plaintiff/consel. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/2/06) (cd, ) (Entered: 11/06/2006)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Document filed by Intermountain Ironworkers Trust Fund.(laq, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/7/2006 (laq, ). (Entered: 09/06/2006)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against Margaret T. Monaco, Michael N. Rosen, William Sheluck, Jr, William F. Reilly, Mitchell S. Klipper, Marie J. Toulantis, J. Alan Kahn, William F. Duffy, Joseph Lombardi, Christopher Grady-Troia, Mary Ellen Keating, David S. Deason, Michelle Smith, Lawrence S. Zilavy, Barnes & Noble, Inc., Leonard Riggio, Stephen Riggio, Matthew A. Berdon, Michael J. Giudice, William T. Dillard, Irene R. Miller. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 589322)Document filed by Intermountain Ironworkers Trust Fund.(laq, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/7/2006 (laq, ). (Entered: 09/06/2006)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 109 times.

                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?