Steve Chambers v. Whirlpool Corporation
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 16-56666

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 5:16 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 4385 - Property Damage-Product Liability
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Terminated Stephen Shapiro for Whirlpool Corporation, Sears Roebuck and Co., Inc. and Sears Holdings Corporation [10979686] [16-56666, 16-56684, 16-56688, 16-56694] (JFF) [Entered: 08/16/2018 03:16 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Filed (ECF) Appellees Sears Holdings Corporation, Sears Roebuck and Co., Inc. and Whirlpool Corporation in 16-56666, Appellants Sears Holdings Corporation, Sears Roebuck and Co., Inc. and Whirlpool Corporation in 16-56684, 16-56688, 16-56694 Correspondence: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY. Date of service: 08/16/2018 [10979618] [16-56666, 16-56684, 16-56688, 16-56694] (Yount, Joshua) [Entered: 08/16/2018 02:54 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: OC): In light of the possible effect of In re Hyundai and Kia Fuel Economy Litigation, 881 F.3d 679 (9th Cir. 2018), on this appeal, it is removed from the May 2018 argument calendar. The motions to file a sur-reply and sur-sur-reply are denied without prejudice. The parties may request leave to file additional briefs after Hyundai has mandated. The Clerk shall hold this case in abeyance until Hyundai mandates and then calendar this case on the next available calendar. [10804087] [16-56666, 16-56684, 16-56688, 16-56694] (OC) [Entered: 03/19/2018 03:15 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Filed (ECF) Appellees Sears Holdings Corporation, Sears Roebuck and Co., Inc. and Whirlpool Corporation in 16-56666, Appellants Sears Holdings Corporation, Sears Roebuck and Co., Inc. and Whirlpool Corporation in 16-56684, 16-56688, 16-56694 reply to response (). Date of service: 03/19/2018. [10802627] [16-56666, 16-56684, 16-56688, 16-56694] (Shapiro, Stephen) [Entered: 03/19/2018 07:37 AM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Filed (ECF) Appellant George P. Liacopoulos in 16-56688 response opposing motion ([110] Motion (ECF Filing), [110] Motion (ECF Filing) motion to file supplemental brief). Date of service: 03/15/2018. [10800075] [16-56666, 16-56684, 16-56688, 16-56694] (Miorelli, Sam) [Entered: 03/15/2018 02:37 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Filed (ECF) Appellees Susan Bathon, W. David Beal, George Bliss, James Cashman, Steve Chambers, Joseph Cicchelli, Kurt Himler, Zila Koswener, Gary LeBlanc, Shirl Mederlet, Maureen Meneghetti, Susan Milicia, Kevin O'Donnell, Raymond Paolini, Jr., Linda Sample, Jackie Steffes, Lynn Van Der Veer, Pamela Walchli and Lyndee Walker in 16-56666, 16-56684, 16-56688, 16-56694 reply to response (motion to file supplemental brief). Date of service: 03/13/2018. [10796444] [16-56666, 16-56684, 16-56688, 16-56694] (Schwartz, Steven) [Entered: 03/13/2018 12:56 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Filed (ECF) Appellant W. Allen McDonald in 16-56694 response opposing motion ([110] Motion (ECF Filing), [110] Motion (ECF Filing) motion to file supplemental brief). Date of service: 03/09/2018. [10792033] [16-56694, 16-56666, 16-56684, 16-56688] (Cain, Christopher) [Entered: 03/09/2018 08:02 AM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Filed (ECF) Appellees Sears Holdings Corporation, Sears Roebuck and Co., Inc. and Whirlpool Corporation in 16-56666, Appellants Sears Holdings Corporation, Sears Roebuck and Co., Inc. and Whirlpool Corporation in 16-56684, 16-56688, 16-56694 response opposing motion ([110] Motion (ECF Filing), [110] Motion (ECF Filing) motion to file supplemental brief). Date of service: 03/08/2018. [10790612] [16-56666, 16-56684, 16-56688, 16-56694] (Shapiro, Stephen) [Entered: 03/08/2018 08:44 AM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Notice of Oral Argument on Thursday, May 17, 2018 - 09:30 A.M. - Courtroom 1 - San Francisco CA.View the Oral Argument Calendar for your case here.Be sure to review the GUIDELINES for important information about your hearing, including when to arrive (30 minutes before the hearing time) and when and how to submit additional citations (filing electronically as far in advance of the hearing as possible).When you have reviewed the calendar, download the ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form, complete the form, and file it via Appellate ECF or return the completed form to: SAN FRANCISCO Office.[10787671] [16-56666, 16-56684, 16-56688, 16-56694] (AW) [Entered: 03/06/2018 11:38 AM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Filed (ECF) Appellees Susan Bathon, W. David Beal, George Bliss, James Cashman, Steve Chambers, Joseph Cicchelli, Kurt Himler, Zila Koswener, Gary LeBlanc, Shirl Mederlet, Maureen Meneghetti, Susan Milicia, Kevin O'Donnell, Raymond Paolini, Jr., Linda Sample, Jackie Steffes, Lynn Van Der Veer, Pamela Walchli and Lyndee Walker in 16-56666, 16-56684, 16-56688, 16-56694 Corrected Motion to file supplemental brief. Date of service: 03/06/2018. [10787074] [16-56666, 16-56684, 16-56688, 16-56694] (Schwartz, Steven) [Entered: 03/06/2018 08:48 AM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Filed (ECF) Appellees Susan Bathon, W. David Beal, George Bliss, James Cashman, Steve Chambers, Joseph Cicchelli, Kurt Himler, Zila Koswener, Gary LeBlanc, Shirl Mederlet, Maureen Meneghetti, Susan Milicia, Kevin O'Donnell, Raymond Paolini, Jr., Linda Sample, Jackie Steffes, Lynn Van Der Veer, Pamela Walchli and Lyndee Walker in 16-56666, 16-56684, 16-56688, 16-56694 Motion to file supplemental brief. Date of service: 03/06/2018. [10787021] [16-56666, 16-56684, 16-56688, 16-56694] (Schwartz, Steven) [Entered: 03/06/2018 08:14 AM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Received 7 paper copies of Reply Brief [97] filed by George P. Liacopoulos. [10764938] [16-56666, 16-56684, 16-56688, 16-56694] (DB) [Entered: 02/15/2018 08:23 AM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Received 7 paper copies of Reply Brief [96] filed by W. Allen McDonald. [10762754] [16-56666, 16-56684, 16-56688, 16-56694] (DB) [Entered: 02/13/2018 03:07 PM]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Filed 4 paper copies of further excerpts of record [103] in 1 volume(s) filed by Appellant Christine Knott. (Sent to Panel) [10757840] [16-56666, 16-56684, 16-56688, 16-56694] (KWG) [Entered: 02/09/2018 11:36 AM]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Received 7 paper copies of Reply Brief [98] filed by Christine Knott. [10756436] [16-56666, 16-56684, 16-56688, 16-56694] (DB) [Entered: 02/08/2018 12:06 PM]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Filed clerk order: The Court has reviewed the further excerpts of record [103] submitted by Christine Knott. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [10755603] [16-56666, 16-56684, 16-56688, 16-56694] (KWG) [Entered: 02/07/2018 03:59 PM]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Submitted (ECF) further excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellant Christine Knott in 16-56666. Date of service: 02/07/2018. [10755376] [16-56666, 16-56684, 16-56688, 16-56694] (Clore, Robert) [Entered: 02/07/2018 02:32 PM]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Received 7 paper copies of Cross-Appeal Reply Brief [94] filed by Whirlpool Corporation, et al. [10755097] [16-56666, 16-56684, 16-56688, 16-56694] (DB) [Entered: 02/07/2018 12:08 PM]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Filed Mediation order: These cases are not selected for inclusion in the Mediation Program. [10321145] [16-56666, 16-56684, 16-56688] (VS) [Entered: 02/15/2017 02:47 PM]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Filed Mediation order: This case is under consideration for inclusion in the Mediation Program. By 02/02/2017 , counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [10269708] (VS) [Entered: 01/18/2017 11:23 AM]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Filed (ECF) Appellant Christine Knott reply to response (motion for summary reversal). Date of service: 12/14/2016. [10232693] [16-56666] (Clore, Robert) [Entered: 12/14/2016 10:53 AM]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Filed (ECF) Appellees Susan Bathon, W. David Beal, George Bliss, James Cashman, Steve Chambers, Joseph Cicchelli, Kurt Himler, Zila Koswener, Gary LeBlanc, Shirl Mederlet, Maureen Meneghetti, Susan Milicia, Kevin O'Donnell, Raymond Paolini, Jr., Linda Sample, Jackie Steffes, Lynn Van Der Veer and Lyndee Walker response opposing motion ([7] Motion (ECF Filing), [7] Motion (ECF Filing) motion for summary reversal). Date of service: 12/13/2016. [10230331] [16-56666] (Mathews, Timothy) [Entered: 12/13/2016 08:47 AM]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Filed (ECF) Appellees Sears Holdings Corporation, Sears Roebuck and Co., Inc. and Whirlpool Corporation response to motion ([7] Motion (ECF Filing), [7] Motion (ECF Filing) motion for summary reversal). Date of service: 12/12/2016. [10230024] [16-56666] (Williams, Michael) [Entered: 12/12/2016 05:19 PM]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Filed (ECF) Appellant Christine Knott Motion for summary reversal. Date of service: 12/02/2016. [10219415] [16-56666] (Clore, Robert) [Entered: 12/02/2016 04:10 PM]
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Filed (ECF) Appellant Kimberly Smith Motion to dismiss party from case. Date of service: 11/23/2016. [10208495] [16-56666] (Clore, Robert) [Entered: 11/23/2016 09:46 AM]
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Filed (ECF) Appellants Christine Knott and Kimberly Smith Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/16/2016. [10198611] [16-56666] (Clore, Robert) [Entered: 11/16/2016 09:17 AM]
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Robert W. Clore for Appellants Christine Knott and Kimberly Smith. Date of service: 11/14/2016. [10194428] [16-56666] (Clore, Robert) [Entered: 11/14/2016 06:50 AM]
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 164 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?