Steve Chambers v. Whirlpool Corporation
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 16-56686

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 2:58 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 4385 - Property Damage-Product Liability
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Filed order (Deputy Clerk: LK) Appellant’s motion (Docket Entry No. [3]) for voluntary dismissal of this case is granted. This case is dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b). A copy of this order sent to the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court. Appellant is informed that this court does not address the issue of cost unless it is so stipulated by both parties in writing. [10217876] (IV) [Entered: 12/01/2016 04:09 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Filed (ECF) Appellant Kelly Kress Unopposed Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 11/30/2016. [10215850] [16-56686] (Miller, Steve) [Entered: 11/30/2016 02:27 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Filed (ECF) Appellant Kelly Kress Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/17/2016. [10201097] [16-56686] (Miller, Steve) [Entered: 11/17/2016 12:49 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 11/17/2016. Transcript ordered by 12/09/2016. Transcript due 03/09/2017. Appellant Kelly Kress opening brief due 04/18/2017. Appellees Susan Bathon, W. David Beal, George Bliss, James Cashman, Steve Chambers, Joseph Cicchelli, Kurt Himler, Zila Koswener, Gary LeBlanc, Shirl Mederlet, Maureen Meneghetti, Susan Milicia, Kevin O'Donnell, Raymond Paolini Jr., Linda Sample, Sears Holdings Corporation, Sears Roebuck and Co., Inc., Jackie Steffes, Lynn Van Der Veer, Pamela Walchli, Lyndee Walker and Whirlpool Corporation answering brief due 05/18/2017. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [10192952] (JN) [Entered: 11/10/2016 10:04 AM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 80 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?