Steve Chambers, et al v. Whirlpool Corporation, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 16-56688

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 18, 2017 at 2:01 AM ST (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 4385 - Property Damage-Product Liability
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Filed Mediation order: These cases are not selected for inclusion in the Mediation Program. [10321145] [16-56666, 16-56684, 16-56688] (VS) [Entered: 02/15/2017 02:47 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Filed Mediation order: This case is under consideration for inclusion in the Mediation Program. By 02/02/2017 , counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [10269728] (VS) [Entered: 01/18/2017 11:28 AM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Filed (ECF) Appellant George P. Liacopoulos Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/17/2016. [10201252] [16-56688] (Miorelli, Sam) [Entered: 11/17/2016 01:48 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 11/17/2016. Transcript ordered by 12/09/2016. Transcript due 03/09/2017. Appellant George P. Liacopoulos opening brief due 04/18/2017. Appellees Susan Bathon, W. David Beal, George Bliss, James Cashman, Steve Chambers, Joseph Cicchelli, Kurt Himler, Zila Koswener, Gary LeBlanc, Shirl Mederlet, Maureen Meneghetti, Susan Milicia, Kevin O'Donnell, Raymond Paolini Jr., Linda Sample, Sears Holdings Corporation, Sears Roebuck and Co., Inc., Jackie Steffes, Lynn Van Der Veer, Pamela Walchli, Lyndee Walker and Whirlpool Corporation answering brief due 05/18/2017. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [10193049] (JN) [Entered: 11/10/2016 10:54 AM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 83 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?