E.F., et al v. Newport Mesa Unified Sch. Dist
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 15-56452

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 19, 2017 at 1:10 AM EST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 3448 - Civil Rights
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Filed order (RICHARD C. TALLMAN, N. RANDY SMITH and STEPHEN JOSEPH MURPHY, III) Oral argument in the above-entitled case scheduled for February 16, 2017, in Pasadena, California, will be limited to ten (10) minutes per side. [10308267] (OC) [Entered: 02/09/2017 08:56 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney S. Daniel Harbottle, Esquire for Appellee Newport Mesa Unified School District. [10226170] [15-56452] (Harbottle, S.) [Entered: 12/08/2016 04:41 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Kathleen Loyer, Esquire for Appellants E.F., Aneida Fulsang and Eric Fulsang. [10226064] [15-56452] (Loyer, Kathleen) [Entered: 12/08/2016 03:49 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Filed (ECF) Appellee Newport Mesa Unified School District Correspondence: Counsel's availability for oral argument hearing.. Date of service: 10/27/2016 [10177030] [15-56452] (Harbottle, S.) [Entered: 10/27/2016 04:07 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Filed clerk order: The reply brief [25] submitted by appellants is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. The Court has reviewed the further excerpts of record [26] submitted by appellants. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [10061113] --[Edited 07/25/2016 by SML to reflect the correct brief type and cover color.]--[COURT UPDATE: Removed incorrect document. 07/25/2016 by SLM] (SML) [Entered: 07/25/2016 10:04 AM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Submitted (ECF) further excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellants E.F., Aneida Fulsang and Eric Fulsang. Date of service: 07/19/2016. [10055634] [15-56452] (Loyer, Kathleen) [Entered: 07/19/2016 05:20 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Submitted (ECF) Reply Brief for review. Submitted by Appellants Eric Fulsang, Aneida Fulsang and E.F.. Date of service: 07/19/2016. [10055531] [15-56452]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief. 07/22/2016 by SLM] (Loyer, Kathleen) [Entered: 07/19/2016 04:37 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Filed clerk order: The answering brief [20] submitted by Newport Mesa Unified School District is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. The Court has reviewed the supplemental excerpts of record [21] submitted by Newport Mesa Unified School District. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [10039934] (SML) [Entered: 07/06/2016 09:59 AM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Submitted (ECF) supplemental excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellee Newport Mesa Unified School District. Date of service: 07/05/2016. [10039501] [15-56452] (Harbottle, S.) [Entered: 07/05/2016 06:56 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 20 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief for review. Submitted by Appellee Newport Mesa Unified School District. Date of service: 07/05/2016. [10039495] [15-56452] (Harbottle, S.) [Entered: 07/05/2016 06:47 PM]
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: amt): Granting unopposed (ECF Filing) motion to extend time to file answering brief. The answering brief is due 07/05/2016. The optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [9991962] (AT) [Entered: 05/26/2016 09:30 AM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Filed (ECF) Appellee Newport Mesa Unified School District Unopposed Motion to extend time to file Answering brief until 07/05/2016. Date of service: 05/25/2016. [9991068] [15-56452] (Harbottle, S.) [Entered: 05/25/2016 02:36 PM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Filed clerk order: The opening brief [9] submitted by appellants is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. The Court has reviewed the excerpts of record [10] submitted by appellants. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [9929390] (KT) [Entered: 04/06/2016 11:09 AM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellants E.F., Aneida Fulsang and Eric Fulsang. Date of service: 04/04/2016. [9926896] [15-56452] --[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected excerpts of record. 04/06/2016 by TYL] (Loyer, Kathleen) [Entered: 04/04/2016 11:19 PM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 9 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellants E.F., Aneida Fulsang and Eric Fulsang. Date of service: 04/04/2016. [9926894] [15-56452] --[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief. 04/06/2016 by TYL] (Loyer, Kathleen) [Entered: 04/04/2016 11:18 PM]
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Filed Mediation order: This case is not selected for inclusion in the Mediation Program. All further inquiries regarding this appeal, including requests for extensions of time, should be directed to the Clerk's office. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [9815079] (VS) [Entered: 01/05/2016 11:03 AM]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Filed order MEDIATION (RGA): The court will initiate a further conference by telephone on January 5, 2016, at 10:30 a.m. Pacific Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: appellants shall file an opening brief on or before April 4, 2016; appellee shall file an answering brief on or before May 4, 2016; appellants may file an optional reply brief within fourteen (14) days from the service date of the answering brief. [9788056] (ANL) [Entered: 12/10/2015 03:07 PM]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - Assessment Conference, 12/10/2015, 11:00 a.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled on 11/30/2015 ). [9772931] (VS) [Entered: 11/30/2015 10:41 AM]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - The court has scheduled a telephone Assessment Conference, 11/30/2015, 2:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The Circuit Mediator will initiate the conference call by contacting each person on the attached list. Please be available for the call at least five minutes before the scheduled time. Counsel should review the attached list and inform the Mediation Assistant by email at least 72 hours in advance of the scheduled call of any corrections to the list....The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. [9709909] (VS) [Entered: 10/07/2015 11:17 AM]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Filed (ECF) Appellants E.F., Aneida Fulsang and Eric Fulsang Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/01/2015. [9704098] [15-56452] (Loyer, Kathleen) [Entered: 10/01/2015 02:05 PM]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Filed (ECF) Appellants E.F., Aneida Fulsang and Eric Fulsang Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/30/2015. [9702586] [15-56452] (Loyer, Kathleen) [Entered: 09/30/2015 03:27 PM]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Filed representation notice of Kathleen M. Loyer for Appellant. Served on 09/22/2015. [9693228] (BG) [Entered: 09/23/2015 09:39 AM]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/30/2015. Transcript ordered by 10/22/2015. Transcript due 01/20/2016. Appellants E.F., Aneida Fulsang and Eric Fulsang opening brief due 02/29/2016. Appellee Newport Mesa Unified School District answering brief due 03/30/2016. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [9693218] (BG) [Entered: 09/23/2015 09:37 AM]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 162 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?