Kimtylery Heng, et al v. Heavner, Beyers & Mihlar, LLC
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit, Case No. 16-1668

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 19, 2017 at 11:26 PM ST (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with internet citation. ATTACHED. [40] [16-1668, 16-2051, 16-2052] (BF)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ORDER: Final judgment filed per opinion. With costs: yes. [39] [6819784] [16-1668, 16-2051, 16-2052] (CAG)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      Filed opinion of the court by Judge Bauer. AFFIRMED. Diane P. Wood, Chief Judge; William J. Bauer, Circuit Judge and Daniel A. Manion, Circuit Judge. [38] [6819780] [16-1668, 16-2051, 16-2052] (CAG)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Filed Appellee Heavner, Beyers & Mihlar, LLC in 16-1668, Appellee Codilis & Associates, P.C. in 16-2051, Appellee Pierce and Associates in 16-2052 Citation of Additional Authority, per Circuit Rule 28(e). Argument set for: 10/27/2016. [37] [6795379] [16-1668, 16-2051, 16-2052] (Swofford, Stephen)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Filed Appellants Ol Chhen and Kimtylery Heng in 16-1668, Appellant Justin Gierke in 16-2051, Appellants Juana Apzaith-Sanchez and Laura Zuniga in 16-2052 Citation of Additional Authority, per Circuit Rule 28(e). Argument set for: 10/27/2016. [36] [6793537] [16-1668, 16-2051, 16-2052] (Edelman, Daniel)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Received argument confirmation from Daniel A. Edelman for Appellants Ol Chhen and Kimtylery Heng in 16-1668, Appellant Justin Gierke in 16-2051, Appellants Juana Apzaith-Sanchez and Laura Zuniga in 16-2052. [33] [6791476] [16-1668, 16-2051, 16-2052] (Edelman, Daniel)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Received argument confirmation from Stephen R. Swofford for Appellee Heavner, Beyers & Mihlar, LLC in 16-1668, Appellee Codilis & Associates, P.C. in 16-2051, Appellee Pierce and Associates in 16-2052. [32] [6791394] [16-1668, 16-2051, 16-2052] (Swofford, Stephen)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Original record on appeal filed electronically. Contents of record : 1 vol. of pleadings. [31] [6785240] [16-2051] (GW)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Appellant's reply brief filed by Appellants Ol Chhen and Kimtylery Heng in 16-1668, Appellant Justin Gierke in 16-2051, Appellants Juana Apzaith-Sanchez and Laura Zuniga in 16-2052. Paper copies due on 09/30/2016 Electronically Transmitted. [30] [6785041] [16-1668, 16-2051, 16-2052] (GW)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 29 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Submitted appellant reply/cross-appellee brief by Daniel A. Edelman for Appellants Ol Chhen and Kimtylery Heng in 16-1668, Appellant Justin Gierke in 16-2051, Appellants Juana Apzaith-Sanchez and Laura Zuniga in 16-2052. [29] [6785015] [16-1668, 16-2051, 16-2052] (Edelman, Daniel)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Original record on appeal filed electronically. Contents of record : 1 vol. of pleadings. [28] [6782586] [16-1668] (MT)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Original record on appeal filed electronically. Contents of record : 1 vol. of pleadings. [27] [6782343] [16-2052] (GW)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Daniel A. Edelman for Appellants Ol Chhen and Kimtylery Heng in 16-1668, Appellant Justin Gierke in 16-2051, Appellants Juana Apzaith-Sanchez and Laura Zuniga in 16-2052. [26] [6781811] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [16-1668, 16-2051, 16-2052] (Edelman, Daniel)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Argument set for Thursday, October 27, 2016, at 9:30 a.m. in the Main Courtroom, Room 2721. Each side limited to 15 minutes. [25] [6781760] [16-1668, 16-2051, 16-2052] (RS)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Notice to the District Court to transmit the record on appeal. [24] [6781577] [16-1668, 16-2051, 16-2052] (RS)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellants' reply brief. [22] Appellants' single, consolidated reply brief, if any, is due on or before 09/23/2016 for Appellants Ol Chhen, Kimtylery Heng, Justin Gierke, Juana Apzaith-Sanchez and Laura Zuniga. CMD [23] [6780012] [16-1668, 16-2051, 16-2052] (MM)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Motion filed by Appellants Ol Chhen and Kimtylery Heng in 16-1668, Appellant Justin Gierke in 16-2051, Appellants Juana Apzaith-Sanchez and Laura Zuniga in 16-2052 to extend time to file Reply Brief. [22] [6779929] [16-1668, 16-2051, 16-2052] (Edelman, Daniel)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Appellee's brief filed by Appellee Heavner, Beyers & Mihlar, LLC in 16-1668, Appellee Codilis & Associates, P.C. in 16-2051, Appellee Pierce and Associates in 16-2052. Paper copies due on 09/06/2016 Electronically Transmitted. [21] [6778522] [16-1668, 16-2051, 16-2052] (SP)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Submitted appellee brief by Stephen R. Swofford for Appellee Heavner, Beyers & Mihlar, LLC in 16-1668, Appellee Codilis & Associates, P.C. in 16-2051, Appellee Pierce and Associates in 16-2052. [20] [6778427] [16-1668, 16-2051, 16-2052] (Swofford, Stephen)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellees' brief. [18] Appellees' consolidated brief due on or before 08/26/2016 for Heavner, Beyers & Mihlar, LLC, Codilis & Associates, P.C. and Pierce and Associates. Appellants' consolidated reply brief, if any, is due on or before 09/09/2016 for Appellants Ol Chhen, Kimtylery Heng, Justin Gierke, Juana Apzaith-Sanchez and Laura Zuniga. JKL [19] [6776791] [16-1668, 16-2051, 16-2052] (VG)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Motion filed by Appellee Heavner, Beyers & Mihlar, LLC in 16-1668, Appellee Codilis & Associates, P.C. in 16-2051, Appellee Pierce and Associates in 16-2052 to extend time to file appellee brief. [18] [6776748] [16-1668, 16-2051, 16-2052] (Swofford, Stephen)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Stephen R. Swofford for Appellee Heavner, Beyers & Mihlar, LLC in 16-1668, Appellee Codilis & Associates, P.C. in 16-2051, Appellee Pierce and Associates in 16-2052. [17] [6776655] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [16-1668, 16-2051, 16-2052]--[Edited 08/19/2016 by MM to reflect termination and addition of counsel.] (Swofford, Stephen)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellees' brief. [15] The defendants-appellees shall file a single, consolidated brief on or before August 22, 2016. The plaintiffs-appellants shall file a single, consolidated reply brief, if any, on or before September 6, 2016. CMD [16] [6766788] [16-1668, 16-2051, 16-2052] (CAG)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Motion filed by Appellee Heavner, Beyers & Mihlar, LLC in 16-1668, Appellee Codilis & Associates, P.C. in 16-2051, Appellee Pierce and Associates in 16-2052 to extend time to file appellee brief. [15] [6766671] [16-1668, 16-2051, 16-2052] (Bertocchi, Joel)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney David M. Schultz for Appellee Heavner, Beyers & Mihlar, LLC in 16-1668, Appellee Codilis & Associates, P.C. in 16-2051, Appellee Pierce and Associates in 16-2052. [14] [6759775] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [16-1668, 16-2051, 16-2052]--[Edited 06/20/2016 by MM to reflect addition of counsel.] (Schultz, David)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Filed Appendix by Appellants Ol Chhen and Kimtylery Heng in 16-1668, Appellant Justin Gierke in 16-2051, Appellants Juana Apzaith-Sanchez and Laura Zuniga in 16-2052. [13] [6758946] Paper copies due on 06/23/2016 [16-1668, 16-2051, 16-2052] (SP)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Appellant's brief filed by Appellants Ol Chhen and Kimtylery Heng in 16-1668, Appellant Justin Gierke in 16-2051, Appellants Juana Apzaith-Sanchez and Laura Zuniga in 16-2052. Paper copies due on 06/23/2016 Electronically Transmitted. [12] [6758942] [16-1668, 16-2051, 16-2052] (SP)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Submitted appellant brief by Daneil A. Edelman for Appellants Ol Chhen, Kimtylery Heng and Appellee Heavner, Beyers & Mihlar, LLC in 16-1668, Appellant Justin Gierke in 16-2051, Appellants Juana Apzaith-Sanchez and Laura Zuniga in 16-2052. [11] [6758560] [16-1668, 16-2051, 16-2052] (Edelman, Daniel)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 06/15/2016 for Ol Chhen, Kimtylery Heng, Justin Gierke, Juana Apzaith-Sanchez and Laura Zuniga. Appellee's brief due on or before 07/22/2016 for Heavner, Beyers & Mihlar, LLC, Codilis & Associates, P.C. and Pierce and Associates. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 08/05/2016 for Appellants Ol Chhen, Kimtylery Heng, Justin Gierke, Juana Apzaith-Sanchez and Laura Zuniga. JB [6753881] [16-1668, 16-2051, 16-2052] (FP)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Joel D. Bertocchi for Appellee Heavner, Beyers & Mihlar, LLC in 16-1668, Appellee Codilis & Associates, P.C. in 16-2051, Appellee Pierce and Associates in 16-2052. [9] [6751439] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [16-1668, 16-2051, 16-2052]--[Edited 05/18/2016 by VG - to reflect termination and addition of counsel] (Bertocchi, Joel)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellants' brief due on or before 07/21/2016 for Ol Chhen, Kimtylery Heng, Justin Gierke, Juana Apzaith-Sanchez and Laura Zuniga. Appellees' brief due on or before 08/22/2016 for Heavner, Beyers & Mihlar, LLC, Codilis & Associates, P.C. and Pierce and Associates. Appellants' reply brief, if any, is due on or before 09/06/2016 for Appellants Ol Chhen, Kimtylery Heng, Justin Gierke, Juana Apzaith-Sanchez and Laura Zuniga. JB [6751401] [16-1668, 16-2051, 16-2052] (CR)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Notice of Circuit Rule 33 settlement conference issued. The conference will be conducted in Room 1120, Tuesday, June 21, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JB. [7] [6751400] [16-1668, 16-2051, 16-2052] (CR)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  ORDER: re: Plaintiffs-appellants' motion to consolidate related appeals, filed on May 10, 2016, in Appeal No. 16-1668. [5] The motion is GRANTED, and these appeals are CONSOLIDATED for purposes of briefing and disposition. The briefing schedule is as follows: The plaintiffs-appellants shall file a single, consolidated brief and required short appendix on or before June 15, 2016. The defendants-appellees shall file a single, consolidated brief on or before July 15, 2016. The plaintiffs-appellants shall file a single, consolidated reply brief, if any, on or before July 29, 2016. DW [6] [6749583] [16-1668, 16-2051, 16-2052] (CAG)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Motion filed by Appellants Ol Chhen and Kimtylery Heng Motion to Consolidate Related Appeals. [5] [6749352] [16-1668] (Edelman, Daniel)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Docketing Statement filed by Appellants Ol Chhen and Kimtylery Heng. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [4] [6741468] [16-1668] (JO)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellants' brief due on or before 05/19/2016 for Ol Chhen and Kimtylery Heng. Appellee's brief due on or before 06/20/2016 for Heavner, Beyers & Mihlar, LLC. Appellants' reply brief, if any, is due on or before 07/05/2016 for Appellants Ol Chhen and Kimtylery Heng. JB [6740509] [16-1668] (VG)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Notice of Circuit Rule 33 settlement conference issued. The conference will be conducted in Room 1120, Monday, April 18, 2016 at 2:00 p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JB [2] [6740506] [16-1668] (VG)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellants Ol Chhen and Kimtylery Heng by 04/01/2016. Transcript information sheet due by 04/11/2016. Appellant's brief due on or before 05/09/2016 for Ol Chhen and Kimtylery Heng. [1] [6738735] [16-1668] (MM)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 96 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?