W Austine Sallade v. Orbital Sciences Corp
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:05-cv-00604
District Judge Neil V. Wake, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 11, 2019 at 3:36 AM ST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo W Austin Sallade, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon & Rees LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leon Benjamin Silver +1 602 650 2066 +1 602 264 7033 lsilver@gordonrees.com

Toggle Switch Represented by THE MARTIN LAW FIRM, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Allen Martin +1 703 918 0350 +1 703 918 0386 Ken@martin-lawfirm.com
v.
No Logo Orbital Sciences Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel G. Jarcho +1 202 496 7382 +1 202 496 7756 djarcho@mckennalong.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel L. Russell, Jr. +1 202 496 7426 drussell@mckennalong.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael G Scheininger +1 202 496 7500 +1 202 496 7756 mscheininger@mckennalong.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Steptoe & Johnson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence Allen Katz +1 602 257 5200 +1 602 257 5299 lkatz@steptoe.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Shawn Kozinets +1 602 257 5200 +1 602 257 5299 pkozinets@steptoe.com
United States of America United States of America, In Re

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/14/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen S McDonald +1 602 514 7500 +1 602 514 7760 karen.mcdonald@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark James Wenker +1 602 514 7500 +1 602 514 7760 mark.wenker@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arnold M. Auerhan +1 202 307 0278 +1 202 616 3085 arnold.auerhan@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 31 U.S.C. § 3729
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (77) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered dismissing this action with prejudice as to relator W. Austin Sallade and without prejudice as to the United States of America. (DMT, ) (Entered: 08/06/2008)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER granting 75 Motion for Reconsideration. That this Courts order dismissing this case with prejudice 73 and the Clerks judgment dismissing this case with prejudice 74 are vacated. That relators motion to voluntarily dismiss 66 , 67 , 68 is granted; and that the Clerk enter judgment dismissing this action with prejudice as to relator W. Austin Sallade and without prejudice as to the United States of America.. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 8/5/08.(DMT, ) (Entered: 08/06/2008)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      MOTION for Reconsideration re order dismissing case by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wenker, Mark) (Entered: 07/16/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 74 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        CLERK'S JUDGMENT-IT IS HEREBY ORDERED pursuant to the Courts order filed this date,this action is hereby dismissed with prejudice. (TLJ) (Entered: 06/27/2008)
          LREF
          Blank 73 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER granting 66 Relator's Motion to Dismiss Case; granting 67 Motion to Dismiss Case; granting 68 Motion to Dismiss Case. ORDER that the Clerk enter judgment dismissing this action with prejudice. The Clerk shall terminate this action. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 6/27/08.(TLJ) (Entered: 06/27/2008)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            RESPONSE to Motion re 66 MOTION to Dismiss Case Voluntarily, 68 MOTION to Dismiss Case Voluntarily filed by Orbital Sciences Corporation. (Russell, Daniel) (Entered: 06/27/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Notice re consent to motion to dismiss by United States of America re 66 MOTION to Dismiss Case Voluntarily, 70 Order, 68 MOTION to Dismiss Case Voluntarily (Wenker, Mark) (Entered: 06/26/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER that the Defendant and the United States file any response to Relator's Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss the Case 66 and 68 by 6/30/08. ORDER that the Clerk assure that a copy of this Order is electronically served upon counsel of record for the United States. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 6/16/08. (TLJ) (Entered: 06/16/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Notice re Electronic Filing Error by W Austin Sallade (Martin, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/13/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    MOTION to Dismiss Case Voluntarily by W Austin Sallade. (Martin, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/13/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      MOTION to Dismiss Case Memorandum In Support of Motion by W Austin Sallade. (Martin, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/13/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 66 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        MOTION to Dismiss Case Voluntarily by W Austin Sallade. (Martin, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/13/2008)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          ORDER issued: Scheduling Conference set for 8/8/2008 at 11:00 AM before Judge Neil V Wake. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 5/23/08. (SJF) (Entered: 05/23/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            ANSWER to 56 Amended Complaint (Second) by Orbital Sciences Corporation.(Russell, Daniel) (Entered: 05/23/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 61 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 62 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS, )(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 05/12/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Daniel G Jarcho on behalf of Orbital Sciences Corporation. (BAS, ) (Entered: 05/12/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Daniel L Russell Jr on behalf of Orbital Sciences Corporation. (BAS, ) (Entered: 05/12/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Orbital Sciences Corporation's 57 Motion to Dismiss Count VI of the Second Amended Complaint for Failure to Plead Fraud with Particularity (Rule 9(b)) is granted and Count VI is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 5/9/08. (SAT) (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      REPLY in Support re 57 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : Count VI of the Second Amended Complaint for Failure to Plead Fraud with Particularity (Rule 9(b)) filed by Orbital Sciences Corporation. (Kozinets, Peter) (Entered: 04/28/2008)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        RESPONSE TO 57 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : VI OPPOSITION by W Austin Sallade. (Martin, Kenneth) Modified on 4/21/2008 (TLJ). INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED. THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN MODIFIED FROM MOTION TO RESPONSE. (Entered: 04/16/2008)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : Count VI of the Second Amended Complaint for Failure to Plead Fraud with Particularity (Rule 9(b)) by Orbital Sciences Corporation. (Scheininger, Michael) (Entered: 04/07/2008)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT Second against Orbital Sciences Corporation;Jury Demand, filed by W Austin Sallade.(Martin, Kenneth) (Entered: 03/24/2008)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              ORDERED that Defendant Orbital Sciences Corporation's Motion to Dismiss 45 is granted with respect to Counts VI and VII and denied with respect to Count V. Count VI is dismissed with leave to amend, and Count VII is dismissed with prejudice. ORDERED that the court's order of 1/4/08 is vacated with respect to Count IV, which is dismissed with prejudice, except that the allegations in paragraphs 139 through 146 of the original complaint can be re-alleged as part of Count III. ORDERED that Count VI will be dismissed with prejudice if an amended complaint is not filed by 3/24/08. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 3/14/08.(TLJ) (Entered: 03/17/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (BAS, ) (Entered: 03/14/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Motion Hearing held on 3/13/08 before Judge Neil V Wake. Court Reporter: Laurie A Adams. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/4/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/14/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/12/2008. (BAS, ) (Entered: 03/14/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDER FORM ARGUMENT ON MOTION TO DISMISS by Orbital Sciences Corporation for proceedings held on 03/13/2008 before Judge Wake. (Scheininger, Michael) (Entered: 03/13/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      TEXT-ONLY Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Motion Hearing held on 3/13/2008 re MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims: V, VI and VII of the First Amended Complaint for Failure to Plead Fraud with Particularity (Rule 9(b)) filed by Orbital Sciences Corporation. Kenneth Martin is present telephonically for Relator Sallade. Michael Scheininger is present telephonically for Defendant Orbital Sciences Corporation. Mark Wenker is present for the United States. Counsel present argument. The Court takes the Motion to Dismiss [doc. 45] under advisement. (Court Reporter Laurie Adams.) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SJF) (Entered: 03/13/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Pursuant to LRCiv 7.2(f) of the Rules of Practice of the United States District Court for the District of Arizona, IT IS ORDERED setting oral argument for 45 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : V, VI and VII of the First Amended Complaint for Failure to Plead Fraud with Particularity (Rule 9(b))and 48 Second MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : V, VI, and VII on 3/13/2008 at 10:00AM before Judge Neil V Wake. Out-of-state counsel may appear telephonically for the hearing and should contact the Court at 602-322-7640 to make the appropriate arrangements. (SJF)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 03/10/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Reply in Support of 45 Motion to Dismiss Counts V, VI, and VII of the First Amended Complaint for Failure to Plead Fraud with Particularity (Rule 9(b)) by Defendant Orbital Sciences Corporation. (Kozinets, Peter) Modified on 3/3/2008 (TLJ). DOCKET MODIFIED TO REFLECT DOCUMENT LINKAGE. (Entered: 02/29/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS V, VI, AND VII of Orbital Sciences Corporation re: 45 by W Austin Sallade. (Martin, Kenneth) Modified on 3/13/2008 (TLJ). INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED. THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN MODIFIED FROM MOTION TO DISMISS TO RESPONSE TO MOTION. DOCKET TEXT MODIFIED TO REFLECT DOCUMENT LINKAGE. (Entered: 02/19/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER granting 46 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. That Defendant shall file an answer to the Firs Amended Complaint within 10 days after notice of the Courts ruling on Defendants pending motion to dismiss, or at such time as is later fixed by the Court.. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 2/5/08.(DMT, ) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (First Request) by Orbital Sciences Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kozinets, Peter) (Entered: 02/04/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : V, VI and VII of the First Amended Complaint for Failure to Plead Fraud with Particularity (Rule 9(b)) by Orbital Sciences Corporation. (Kozinets, Peter) (Entered: 02/04/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT against Orbital Sciences Corporation, filed by W Austin Sallade.(Martin, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/17/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting in part and denying in part 38 Motion to Dismiss Case. The motion is denied with respect to Counts I, II, III, and IV. That Counts V, VI, and VII are dismissed for failure to plead fraud with specificity, with leave to amend by January 18, 2008. Counts V, VI, and VII will be dismissed with prejudice if an amended complaint is not filed by January18, 2008.. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 1/4/08.(DMT, ) (Entered: 01/07/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        REPLY in Support re 38 MOTION to Dismiss Case For Failure to Plead Fraud With Particularity (Rule 9(b)) (Oral Argument Requested) filed by Orbital Sciences Corporation. (Kozinets, Peter) (Entered: 11/13/2007)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 38 MOTION to Dismiss Case For Failure to Plead Fraud With Particularity (Rule 9(b)) (Oral Argument Requested) filed by W Austin Sallade. (Martin, Kenneth) (Entered: 11/01/2007)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            IT IS ORDERED granting 39 Relator's Motion for Additional Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss. Relator shall have until 11/1/2007 to file its response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. No further extensions will be granted. Entered by Judge Neil V. Wake on 10/18/2007.(NVW, )(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 10/18/2007)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by W Austin Sallade. (Martin, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/17/2007)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Case For Failure to Plead Fraud With Particularity (Rule 9(b)) (Oral Argument Requested) by Orbital Sciences Corporation. (Kozinets, Peter) (Entered: 09/28/2007)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Notice re Service of Process by W Austin Sallade (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Martin, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/01/2007)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER that Relator W. Austin Sallade may conduct this action and shall serve process upon the Defendant by 7/30/07, if Defendant has not been served alreadyFURTHER ORDERED that all parties shall serve copies of all filings in thisaction upon the United States, and the Clerk shall serve copies of all court orders upon the United States, through its attorneys of record FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk unseal this file. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 7/9/07. (MAP) (Entered: 07/10/2007)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 35 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Sealed Notice filed by United States of America. (MAP) (Entered: 07/02/2007)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER granting in part/denying in part 33 Ex Parte Motion. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 5/31/07. (cc: All Cnsl)(MAP) Modified on 7/10/2007 to Unseal per Order #36 (MAP). (Entered: 06/01/2007)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 33 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          SEALED EX PARTE MOTION by United States of America. (MAP) (Entered: 05/30/2007)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 32 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Sealed Notice filed by United States of America. (MAP) (Entered: 05/24/2007)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 31 Filed: 5/17/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              SEALED MINUTE ORDER granting 30 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (REW, ) Modified on 5/17/2007 to add (cc: A Martin/Michael Scheininger by BAS)(REW, ). (Entered: 05/17/2007)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 30 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                SEALED MOTION by Orbital Sciences Corporation. (MAP) (Entered: 05/16/2007)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 29 Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  SEALED RESPONSE re 25 Sealed Order filed by W Austin Sallade. (MAP) (Entered: 04/23/2007)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 28 Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    SEALED RESPONSE re 25 Sealed Order filed by United States of America. (MAP) (Entered: 04/23/2007)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 27 Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      Sealed Supplement re 23 filed by Orbital Sciences Corporation. (MAP) (Entered: 04/23/2007)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 26 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER granting 23 Motion. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 4/20/07. (cc: All Cnsl)(MAP) (Entered: 04/23/2007)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 25 Filed: 4/19/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 4/18/07. (cc: all cnsl)(MAP) (Entered: 04/19/2007)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 24 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            Sealed Declaration re 23 filed by Orbital Sciences Corporation. (MAP) (Entered: 04/18/2007)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 23 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              SEALED MOTION by Orbital Sciences Corporation. (MAP) (Entered: 04/18/2007)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 22 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                Sealed Disclosure Statement filed by Orbital Sciences Corporation. (MAP) (Entered: 04/18/2007)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 21 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  Sealed Notice filed by Orbital Sciences Corporation. (MAP) (Entered: 04/18/2007)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 20 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    SEALED EX PARTE ORDER granting 19 Ex Parte Motion. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 3/16/07. (cc: AUSA)(MAP) (Entered: 03/19/2007)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 19 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      SEALED EX PARTE MOTION by United States of America. (MAP) (Entered: 03/19/2007)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 18 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 12/21/06. (REW, ) Modified on 12/22/2006 to add (cc: all counsel) (REW, ). (Entered: 12/22/2006)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 17 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          Sealed Substition of Counsel filed by United States of America. (MAP) (Entered: 11/15/2006)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 16 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            SEALED EX PARTE ORDER granting 15 Ex Parte Motion . Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 8/30/06. (cc: McDonald, Martin, Silver) (LSP) (Entered: 09/05/2006)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 15 Filed: 8/29/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              SEALED EX PARTE MOTION by United States of America. (LSP) (Entered: 08/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 14 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                Sealed Notice of Change of Firm filed by W Austin Sallade. (MAP) (Entered: 06/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 13 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER as to Admission. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 1/11/06. [cc: all cnsl](KMG) (Entered: 01/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 12 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document: filed as to W Austin Sallade. (DMT, ) (Entered: 12/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 10 Motion . Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 11/23/05.[cc:usa] (DMT, ) (Entered: 11/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 10 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        SEALED EX PARTE MOTION (2nd req) and Memorandum by United States of America. (KMG) (Entered: 11/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Firm by Leon Benjamin Silver (LAD) (Entered: 08/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/3/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER EXTENDING SEAL PERIOD by Judge Neil V. Wake that upon consideration of the United States' Motion to extend time of the seal period (to and including 11/29/05) by pla W Austin Sallade [7-1], IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the United States shall have until 11/29/05, to notify the Court of its decision to intervene in this action; FURTHER ORDERED that the Complaint and all other filings (including the filing in connection with the request for an extension) shall remain under seal until the United States notices its election, or until further notice of this Court; FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk serve a copy of this order upon the United States` (cc: all counsel) (SAT) (Entered: 06/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/1/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              MOTION AND MEMO IN SUPPORT to extend time of the seal period (to and including 11/29/05) by pla W Austin Sallade [7-1] (LAD) (Entered: 06/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Neil V. Wake that the Complaint and any further filings shall remain under seal until further order of the court; the United States shall notify the Court of its intention to intervene or not by 5/31/05 or seek an extension of the seal for good cause (cc: all counsel) re: order filed [6-1] (SRB) (Entered: 04/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT (ex parte and under seal) by pla W Austin Sallade (KCS) (Entered: 04/26/2005)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    WAIVER of Service of summons and complaint ; waiver sent on 3/28/05 (DMT) (Entered: 04/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/2/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE personally EXECUTED complaint on 2/23/05 on Karen McDonald, U.S. Attorney's Office by leaving with Victoria Barruto, Legal Assistant. (KCS) (Entered: 03/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by pla of serving AZ Attorney General with this notice, sealed complaint and relator's disclosure statement (DMT) (Entered: 02/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT FILED (JIR) (Entered: 02/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 34 times.

                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?