Michelle Trapp v. SunTrust Bank
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 16-2293

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 15, 2017 at 4:06 AM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER filed [1000044080] sealing appendix volume number IV. Copies to all parties. [16-2293] (ALC)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    BRIEF by Appellants David Allen Trapp and Michelle A. Trapp in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 03/17/2017. [1000043896] [16-2293] Susan Rotkis
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      CERTIFICATE OF CONFIDENTIALITY (Local Rule 25(c)) by David Allen Trapp and Michelle A. Trapp. Sealing Required: Yes. Description of document referenced by certificate: volume 4 of the Joint Appendix. [16-2293] Susan Rotkis
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellants David Allen Trapp and Michelle A. Trapp. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 03/17/2017. [1000043841] [16-2293]--[Edited 03/17/2017 by ALC to modify delivery date to Court] Susan Rotkis
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ORDER filed [1000028503] granting Motion to extend filing time [23]. Opening brief and appendix due 03/16/2017. Response brief due 04/17/2017. No further extensions will be granted for filing the opening brief and appendix absent a showing of extraordinary circumstances. Copies to all parties. [16-2293] (ALC)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            MOTION by Appellants David Allen Trapp and Michelle A. Trapp to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix. Date and method of service: 02/22/2017 ecf. [1000028203] [16-2293] Susan Rotkis
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00406284871 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              (ENTRY RESTRICTED) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellants David Allen Trapp and Michelle A. Trapp. [16-2293]--[Edited 11/18/2016 by ALC] Leonard Bennett
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ORDER filed [1000007888] granting Motion to extend filing time [21]. Opening brief and appendix due 02/23/2017. Response brief due 03/27/2017. Copies to all parties. [16-2293] (ALC)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  MOTION by Appellants David Allen Trapp and Michelle A. Trapp to extend filing time for opening/response brief. Date and method of service: 01/20/2017 ecf. [1000007792] [16-2293] Susan Rotkis
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    ORDER filed [999979794] extending briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 02/02/2017. Response brief due 03/06/2017. Copies to all parties. [16-2293] (ALC)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Stuart T Rossman for David Allen Trapp and Michelle A. Trapp.[999974533] [16-2293] Stuart Rossman
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 01/03/2017. Response Brief due 02/03/2017. [16-2293] (ALC)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Amended DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellants David Allen Trapp and Michelle A. Trapp. [16-2293]--[Docket Text Edited 11/22/2016 by ALC to add "Amended" modifier] Leonard Bennett
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Docket correction requested from Mr. Leonard Anthony Bennett for Michelle A. Trapp and David Allen Trapp Re: [7] docketing statement. Amended docketing statement or transcript order form(s) due 11/28/2016. [16-2293]--[Docket Text - Due Date - Edited 11/21/2016 by ALC] (ALC)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Initial mediation conference scheduled. [16-2293] (MRB)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Matthew W. Krueger-Andes for SunTrust Bank.[999970984] [16-2293] Matthew Krueger-Andes
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Timothy P. Lendino for SunTrust Bank.[999970971] [16-2293] Timothy Lendino
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee SunTrust Bank. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999970961] [16-2293] Robert Marcus
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Robert R. Marcus for SunTrust Bank.[999970955] [16-2293] Robert Marcus
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellants David Allen Trapp and Michelle A. Trapp. [16-2293] Leonard Bennett
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Docket correction requested from Susan M. Rotkis for Michelle A. Trapp and David Allen Trapp Re: [7] docketing statement. Correction due 11/21/2016. [16-2293] (ALC)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) for David Allen Trapp and Michelle A. Trapp.[999970429] [16-2293] Susan Rotkis
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellants David Allen Trapp and Michelle A. Trapp. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999970422] [16-2293] Leonard Bennett
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) for David Allen Trapp and Michelle A. Trapp.[999970421] [16-2293] Leonard Bennett
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed. Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 1:15-cv-00937-CCE-JLW. [16-2293] (ALC)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    FEE NOTICE issued to David Allen Trapp and Michelle A. Trapp - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 12/07/2016. Originating case number: 1:15-cv-00937-CCE-JLW. [16-2293] (ALC)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:15-cv-00937-CCE-JLW. Case manager: ACarlheim. [16-2293] (ALC)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 58 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?