District Appellate Supreme
Federal
California Northern District Court Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
  1. Case No. 17-1904
    Filed 4/13/2017
  2. Case No. 17-2130
    Filed 6/6/2017
  3. Case No. 17-2235
    Filed 6/27/2017
  4. Case No. 17-2253
    Filed 6/30/2017
United States Supreme Court

Waymo LLC v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:17-cv-00939-WHA
District Judge William Alsup, presiding

Tags
Last Updated March 12, 2021 at 1:38 PM ST (4.5 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Waymo LLC Waymo LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melissa J Baily +1 415 875 6600 +1 415 875 6700 melissabaily@quinnemanuel.com
Space Jordan R. Jaffe +1 650 801 5000 +1 650 801 5100 jordanjaffe@quinnemanuel.com
Space James Dubois Judah +1 415 875 6600 +1 415 875 6700 jamesjudah@quinnemanuel.com
Space John M. Neukom +1 650 470 4500 +1 650 470 4570 John.Neukom@skadden.com
Space David Andrew Perlson +1 415 875 6600 +1 415 875 6700 davidperlson@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Kramer Verhoeven +1 415 875 6600 +1 415 875 6700 charlesverhoeven@quinnemanuel.com
v.
No Logo Otto Trucking LLC, Defendant
No Logo Ottomotto LLC, Defendant
Uber Technologies, Inc. Uber Technologies, Inc., Defendant
Office San Francisco
Filed 2/23/2017
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338 Patent Infringement
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County San Francisco
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags ADRMOP,AO279
  Entries (2924) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2738 Filed: 3/12/2021, Entered: None Notice of Change In Counsel
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2710 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: 2/6/2020 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER of Recusal by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2020)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2737 Filed: 2/2/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank  Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Settlement
        Due to Magistrate Judge LaPorte's retirement, case is referred to Magistrate Judge Alex G Tse for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2020)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2736 Filed: 1/20/2021, Entered: None Statement of Non-Opposition
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2709 Filed: 10/4/2019, Entered: 10/4/2019 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
            ORDER ON [2708] SIXTH STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE UNDER PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2735 Filed: 1/15/2021, Entered: None Proposed Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2708 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: 10/3/2019, Terminated: 10/4/2019 stipulation
                STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to extend the deadline under Paragraph 15 of the interim model protective order filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. and Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Meredith R. Dearborn, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D, # (6) Exhibit E, # (7) Exhibit F)(Dearborn, Meredith) (Filed on 10/3/2019) Modified on 10/3/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2734 Filed: 1/15/2021, Entered: None Protective Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                    Case Reassigned to Judge William Alsup. Judge Lucy H. Koh no longer assigned to the case. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2019)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2733 Filed: 12/22/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2707 Filed: 9/3/2019, Entered: 9/3/2019 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                        *** POSTED IN ERROR *** please disregard ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lucy H. Koh and Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi for all further proceedings. Judge William Alsup, Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2019) Modified on 9/3/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2706 Filed: 9/3/2019, Entered: 9/3/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                          RELATED CASE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/3/2019. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2731 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2705 Filed: 8/29/2019, Entered: 8/29/2019 Notice - other
                              NOTICE by Anthony Levandowski re [2704] Notice (Other) Statement in Support of Notice of Related Case (Ehrlich, Miles) (Filed on 8/29/2019)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2730 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2704 Filed: 8/28/2019, Entered: 8/28/2019 Notice - other
                                  NOTICE by UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS OFFICE OF THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA Notice of Related Case (CR 19-377 LHK) (Wawrzyniak, Katherine) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2729 Filed: 11/25/2020, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document 2703 Filed: 7/12/2019, Entered: 7/12/2019 Notice of change of address
                                      NOTICE of Change of Address by Meredith Richardson Dearborn , Kathleen R. Hartnett, and Maxwell V. Pritt of Boies Schiller Flexner LLP (Dearborn, Meredith) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 2702 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: 6/10/2019 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                        ORDER ON [2701] FIFTH STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE UNDER PROTECTIVE ORDER (AS MODIFIED). Signed by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2727 Filed: 11/20/2020, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document 2701 Filed: 6/3/2019, Entered: 6/3/2019, Terminated: 6/10/2019 stipulation
                                            STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to extend the deadline under Paragraph 15 of the interim model protective order filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. and Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Meredith R. Dearborn, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D, # (6) Exhibit E)(Dearborn, Meredith) (Filed on 6/3/2019) Modified on 6/3/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2726 Filed: 11/5/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document 2700 Filed: 3/7/2019, Entered: 3/7/2019 Notice - other
                                                NOTICE by Waymo LLC re [2685] Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Waymo's Second Notice of Public Refiling (Attachments: # (1) Public refiling of [409-8], # (2) Public refiling of [1299-5], # (3) Public refiling of [2477-4], # (4) Public refiling of [1159-14], # (5) Public refiling of [1341-12], # (6) Public refiling of [1526-23], # (7) Public refiling of [2275-4], # (8) Public refiling of [2467-2], # (9) Public refiling of [1336-11], # (10) Public refiling of [2602-12])(Francis, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2725 Filed: 10/28/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document 2699 Filed: 2/28/2019, Entered: 2/28/2019 Order on Motion for reconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER GRANTING [2691] MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER ON COMPREHENSIVE ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2019)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2724 Filed: 10/28/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document 2698 Filed: 2/5/2019, Entered: 2/5/2019 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER APPROVING [2697] FOURTH STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE UNDER PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2723 Filed: 10/27/2020, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document 2697 Filed: 2/5/2019, Entered: 2/5/2019, Terminated: 2/5/2019 stipulation
                                                            STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to extend the deadline under paragraph 15 of the interim model protective order filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. and Waymo, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Meredith Dearborn, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D)(Dearborn, Meredith) (Filed on 2/5/2019) Modified on 2/5/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2722 Filed: 10/27/2020, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document 2696 Filed: 2/4/2019, Entered: 2/4/2019, Terminated: 2/5/2019 stipulation
                                                                STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to extend the deadline under paragraph 15 of the interim model protective order filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. and Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Meredith Dearborn, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D)(Dearborn, Meredith) (Filed on 2/4/2019) Modified on 2/4/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2721 Filed: 10/7/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2695 Filed: 1/29/2019, Entered: 1/29/2019 Exhibit
                                                                    EXHIBITS re [2664] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal -- Waymo's Comprehensive Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to the Court's Order Denying Administrative Motions to File Under Seal Pursuant to the Court's Order Denying Administ, [2663] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Pursuant to the Court's Order Denying Administrative Motions to File Under Seal [2653] Corrected Version of Exhibit I [2692-8] filed byWaymo LLC. (Related document(s)[2664], [2663]) (Francis, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2720 Filed: 10/7/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 2694 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: 1/28/2019 Exhibits
                                                                        EXHIBITS re [2693] Notice (Other),, Corrected Public Refiling of [2530-9] filed by Waymo LLC. (Related document(s)[2693]) (Francis, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/28/2019) Modified on 1/29/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2719 Filed: 10/6/2020, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2693 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: 1/28/2019 Notice - other
                                                                            NOTICE by Waymo LLC re [2685] Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Refiling Public Documents Pursuant to Court Order (Attachments: # (1) PUBLIC REFILING OF [846-8], # (2) PUBLIC REFILING OF [1055-4], # (3) PUBLIC REFILING OF [1834-4] and [1928-1], # (4) PUBLIC REFILING OF [1976-4], # (5) PUBLIC REFILING OF [2011-10], # (6) PUBLIC REFILING OF [2055-8], # (7) PUBLIC REFILING OF [2055-13], # (8) PUBLIC REFILING OF [2055-21], # (9) PUBLIC REFILING OF [2406-2], # (10) PUBLIC REFILING OF [2468-18], *** # (11) PUBLIC REFILING OF [2530-9] DOCUMENT LOCKED AT FILER'S REQUEST. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** )(Francis, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/28/2019) Modified on 1/28/2019 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2718 Filed: 10/6/2020, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2692 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: 1/28/2019 Exhibit
                                                                                EXHIBITS re [2663] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Pursuant to the Court's Order Denying Administrative Motions to File Under Seal [2653], [2664] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal -- Waymo's Comprehensive Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to the Court's Order Denying Administrative Motions to File Under Seal Pursuant to the Court's Order Denying Administ (Exhibits to Waymo's Motion for Reconsideration [2691] filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit B, # (2) Exhibit C, # (3) Exhibit D, # (4) Exhibit E, # (5) Exhibit F, # (6) Exhibit G, # (7) Exhibit H, # (8) Exhibit I, # (9) Exhibit J)(Related document(s)[2663], [2664]) (Francis, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/28/2019)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2717 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 2691 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: 1/28/2019, Terminated: 2/28/2019 Motion for reconsideration
                                                                                    MOTION for Reconsideration re [2685] Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Jonathan Francis iso Waymo's Motion for Reconsideration, # (2) Proposed Order)(Francis, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/28/2019)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2716 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2690 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: 1/28/2019 Exhibits
                                                                                        EXHIBITS re [2688] Redacted Document,, Public Re-Filing in Response to Court Order, Public Version of 1332-8 filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Public Version of Dkt. 1336-9, # (2) Public Version of Dkt. 1396-8, # (3) Public Version of Dkt. 1398-4, # (4) Public Version of Dkt. 1399-7, # (5) Public Version of Dkt. 1419-4, # (6) Public Version of Dkt. 1421-12, # (7) Public Version of Dkt. 1421-13, # (8) Public Version of Dkt. 1470-2, # (9) Public Version of Dkt. 1623-9, # (10) Public Version of Dkt. 1636-4, # (11) Public Version of Dkt. 1636-6, # (12) Public Version of Dkt. 1786-3, # (13) Public Version of Dkt. 1990-6, # (14) Public Version of Dkt. 2378-4)(Related document(s)[2688]) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/28/2019)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2715 Filed: 10/2/2020, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 2689 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: 1/28/2019 Exhibits
                                                                                            EXHIBITS re [2688] Redacted Document,, Public Re-Filing in Response to Court Order -- Public Version of 1770-3 filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Public Version of Dkt. 1770-7, # (2) Public Version of Dkt. 1839-7, # (3) Public Version of Dkt. 1843-1, # (4) Public Version of Dkt. 1843-3, # (5) Public Version of Dkt. 1939-2, # (6) Public Version of Dkt. 2451-12, # (7) Public Version of Dkt. 0843-7, # (8) Public Version of Dkt. 1040-3, # (9) Public Version of Dkt. 1043-2, # (10) Public Version of Dkt. 1062-3, # (11) Public Version of Dkt. 1107-19, # (12) Public Version of Dkt. 1107-20, # (13) Public Version of Dkt. 1166-8, # (14) Public Version of Dkt. 1166-10)(Related document(s)[2688]) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/28/2019) Modified on 1/28/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2714 Filed: 10/2/2020, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 2688 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: 1/28/2019 Redacted Document
                                                                                                REDACTION to [2685] Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, --Public Re-Filing in Response to Court Order by Uber Technologies, Inc., Ottomotto LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Public Version of Dkt. 0803-4, # (2) Public Version of Dkt. 0803-7, # (3) Public Version of Dkt. 0803-9, # (4) Public Version of Dkt. 0929-4, # (5) Public Version of Dkt. 1336-13, # (6) Public Version of Dkt. 1420-3, # (7) Public Version of Dkt. 1422-4, # (8) Public Version of Dkt. 1548-6, # (9) Public Version of Dkt. 1548-8, # (10) Public Version of Dkt. 1548-12, # (11) Public Version of Dkt. 1636-9)(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/28/2019)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2713 Filed: 10/1/2020, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 2687 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: 1/25/2019 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING [2686] MOTION TO SEAL DKT. NO. 2011-11. Signed by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2712 Filed: 9/30/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2686 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: 1/25/2019, Terminated: 1/25/2019 Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                        Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Clarification re [2685] Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, filed by Waymo LLC., Uber Technologies, Inc. and Ottomotto LLC Responses due by 1/29/2019. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Francis, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/25/2019) Modified on 1/25/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2711 Filed: 9/29/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 2685 Filed: 12/24/2018, Entered: 12/24/2018 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER ON [2663][2664] COMPREHENSIVE ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2018)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 2684 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER APPROVING [2683] THIRD STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE UNDER PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 2683 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018, Terminated: 10/9/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                                STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND THE DEADLINE UNDER PARAGRAPH 15 OF THE INTERIM MODEL PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C)(Dearborn, Meredith) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2682 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: 7/16/2018 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11Court Filing
                                                                                                                  Order by Judge William Alsup denying [2678] Administrative Motion to Relate Case.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2681 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: 7/13/2018 Errata
                                                                                                                    ERRATA re [2679] Reply to Opposition/Response by Nicholas Gicinto, Mathew Henley, Jacob Nocon, Edward Russo. (Umhofer, Matthew) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2680 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: 7/13/2018 Errata
                                                                                                                      ERRATA re [2679] Reply to Opposition/Response by Nicholas Gicinto, Mathew Henley, Jacob Nocon, Edward Russo. (Umhofer, Matthew) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2679 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: 7/11/2018 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                        REPLY (re [2678] ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-11 ) filed byNicholas Gicinto, Mathew Henley, Jacob Nocon, Edward Russo. (Umhofer, Matthew) (Filed on 7/11/2018)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2678 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: 7/11/2018, Terminated: 7/16/2018 Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                          ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-11 filed by Nicholas Gicinto, Mathew Henley, Jacob Nocon, Edward Russo. Responses due by 7/16/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Umhofer, Matthew) (Filed on 7/11/2018)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2677 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: 7/11/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Donald Umhofer (Umhofer, Matthew) (Filed on 7/11/2018)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2676 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: 7/10/2018 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Application to Relate Cases by Richard Jacobs. (Bostwick, Gary) (Filed on 7/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2675 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: 7/10/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Gary L Bostwick (Bostwick, Gary) (Filed on 7/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2674 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: 6/11/2018 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER APPROVING [2673] SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE UNDER PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2673 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: 6/7/2018, Terminated: 6/11/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Extension of Deadline filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Meredith Dearborn, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B)(Dearborn, Meredith) (Filed on 6/7/2018)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2672 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: 5/3/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Waymo LLC Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney John M. Neukom (Neukom, John) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2671 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: 4/9/2018 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER APPROVING [2670] STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE UNDER PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2670 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: 4/6/2018, Terminated: 4/9/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend the Deadline Under Paragraph 15 of the Interim Model Protective Order filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Declaration of Meredith R. Dearborn, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit A)(Dearborn, Meredith) (Filed on 4/6/2018)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2669 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: 3/13/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Serge A. Voronov in Support of [2664] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal -- Waymo's Comprehensive Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to the Court's Order Denying Administrative Motions to File Under Seal Pursuant to the Court's Order Denying Administ, [2663] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Pursuant to the Court's Order Denying Administrative Motions to File Under Seal [2653] --Declaration of Serge A. Voronov on behalf of non-party Kitty Hawk Corporation filed byWaymo LLC. (Related document(s)[2664], [2663]) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 3/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2668 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: 3/9/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Hayes P. Hyde in Support of [2664] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal -- Waymo's Comprehensive Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to the Court's Order Denying Administrative Motions to File Under Seal Pursuant to the Court's Order Denying Administ, [2663] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Pursuant to the Court's Order Denying Administrative Motions to File Under Seal [2653] filed byOtto Trucking LLC. (Related document(s)[2664], [2663]) (Hyde, Hayes) (Filed on 3/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2667 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: 3/9/2018 Joinder
                                                                                                                                                Joinder re [2664] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal -- Waymo's Comprehensive Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to the Court's Order Denying Administrative Motions to File Under Seal Pursuant to the Court's Order Denying Administ, [2663] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Pursuant to the Court's Order Denying Administrative Motions to File Under Seal [2653] by Otto Trucking LLC. (Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 3/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2666 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: 3/9/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Michelle Yang in Support of [2664] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal -- Waymo's Comprehensive Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to the Court's Order Denying Administrative Motions to File Under Seal Pursuant to the Court's Order Denying Administ, [2663] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Pursuant to the Court's Order Denying Administrative Motions to File Under Seal [2653] filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s)[2664], [2663]) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 3/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2665 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: 3/9/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of [2664] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal -- Waymo's Comprehensive Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to the Court's Order Denying Administrative Motions to File Under Seal Pursuant to the Court's Order Denying Administ, [2663] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Pursuant to the Court's Order Denying Administrative Motions to File Under Seal [2653] filed byWaymo LLC. (Related document(s)[2664], [2663]) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 3/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2664 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: 3/9/2018, Terminated: 12/24/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                      Administrative Motion to File Under Seal -- Waymo's Comprehensive Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to the Court's Order Denying Administrative Motions to File Under Seal Pursuant to the Court's Order Denying Administrative Motions to File Under Seal (Dkt. 2653) filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 3/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2663 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: 3/9/2018, Terminated: 12/24/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                        Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Pursuant to the Court's Order Denying Administrative Motions to File Under Seal [2653] filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 3/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2662 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 6, held on 2-9-2018, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR and Katherine Sullivan, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [2465] Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, [2513] Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/17/2018. (Related documents(s) [2465], [2513]) (pasdl50S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2661 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 5, held on 2-8-2018, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR and Katherine Sullivan, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/17/2018. (pasdl50S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2660 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 4, held on 2-7-2018, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR and Katherine Sullivan, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/17/2018. (pasdl50S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2659 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 3, held on 2-6-2018, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR and Katherine Sullivan, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/17/2018. (pasdl50S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2658 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 2, held on 2-5-2018, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR and Katherine Sullivan, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/17/2018. (pasdl50S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2657 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018 Receipt
                                                                                                                                                                    Receipt acknowledging the return of admitted trial exhibits to plaintiff and defendant. (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                      ADMITTED EXHIBITS: PLAINTIFF & DEFENDANT'S ADMITTED EXHIBITS. 1 BOX. (SHELF 93) filed by(sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 2656 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: 2/12/2018 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        Order by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting [1348] Stipulation. (This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice.) (jsclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2655 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: 2/9/2018 Order on Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING [1799] ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2654 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: 2/9/2018 Jury Trial CompletedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Jury Trial completed on 2/9/2018. Oral Motion to Dismiss case With Prejudice - GRANTED. Total Time in Court: 4 Minutes. Court Reporter: Debra Pas. Plaintiff Attorneys: Charles Verhoeven, Melissa Baily, Duane Lyons, David Eiseman, Andrea Roberts, David Perlson, James Judah, Jordan Jaffe, Jared Newton, Patrick Schmidt. Defendant Attorneys: Arturo Gonzales, Bill Carmody, Esther Chang, Thomas Pardini, Michael Jacobs, Karen Dunn, Meredith Dearborn, Joseph Grinstein, Michael Brille, Matthew erry, Shawn Rabin.Also Present:Special Master: John CooperDemarron Berkley, Waymo Rep.; Eric Meyhofer, Uber Rep.Minute Order attached.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2653 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: 2/9/2018 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER DENYING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Alsup denying [409] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [453] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [483] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [535] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [541] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [640] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [676] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [751] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [754] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [778] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [803] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [815] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [818] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [825] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [829] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [834] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [843] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [846] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [850] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [852] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [886] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [896] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [900] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [917] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [927] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [929] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [931] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [933] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [968] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [970] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [973] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [977] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [982] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [987] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [995] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [997] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [999] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1003] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1006] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1034] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1040] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1041] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1055] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1062] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1107] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1159] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1174] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1220] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1226] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1299] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1332] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1334] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1336] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1337] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1341] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1357] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1366] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1369] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1371] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1399] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1419] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1449] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1451] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1456] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1458] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1461] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1486] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1493] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1501] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1512] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1520] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1524] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1526] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1540] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1542] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1544] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1545] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1548] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1551] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1553] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1555] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1557] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1558] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1561] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1562] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1584] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1585] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1591] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1603] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1606] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1609] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1611] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1614] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1618] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1623] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1632] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1634] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1636] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1638] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1650] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1681] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1690] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1724] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1743] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1747] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1763] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1768] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1770] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1773] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1777] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1781] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1786] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1789] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1803] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1818] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1820] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1825] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1827] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1830] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1834] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1837] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1839] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1847] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1887] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1895] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1909] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1928] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1933] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1955] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1966] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1976] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1990] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1998] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2001] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2011] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2014] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2016] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2035] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2037] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2041] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2044] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2045] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2051] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2053] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2055] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2057] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2081] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2086] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2089] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2090] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2092] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2098] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2100] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2101] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2108] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2140] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2148] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2182] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2187] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2189] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2193] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2197] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2198] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2206] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2238] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2240] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2244] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2252] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2256] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2265] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2271] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2275] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2281] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2304] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2322] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2327] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2336] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2352] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2367] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2376] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2378] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2406] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2411] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2418] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2419] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2425] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2434] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2451] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2466] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2473] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2477] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2487] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2489] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2500] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2519] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2527] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2530] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2532] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2538] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2542] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2551] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2602] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2606] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2628] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [2641] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2651 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: 2/9/2018 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER OF DISMISSAL (pursuant to [2650]) by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2650 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: 2/9/2018, Terminated: 2/9/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and Proposed Order of Dismissal filed by Waymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2652 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: 2/9/2018 Jury Trial HeldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Jury Trial held on 2/8/2018. See Trial Log for details.Total Time in Court: 4 Hrs. 53 Min.Court Reporters: Katherine Young / Debra Pas. Plaintiff Attorneys: Charles Verhoeven, Melissa Baily, Duane Lyons, David Eiseman, Andrea Roberts, David Perlson, James Judah, Jordan Jaffe, Jared Newton, Patrick Schmidt. Defendant Attorneys: Arturo Gonzales, Bill Carmody, Esther Chang, Thomas Pardini, Michael Jacobs, Karen Dunn, Meredith Dearborn, Joseph Grinstein, Michael Brille, Matthew Berry, Shawn Rabin. Attachment: Minute Order. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/8/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2649 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: 2/8/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Michelle Yang in Support of [2606] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Notice of Submission of Deposition Designation Packets filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s)[2606]) (Yang, Michelle) (Filed on 2/8/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2648 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: 2/8/2018 Witness List *
                                                                                                                                                                                        Witness List by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. February 8, 2018 Rolling Witness List. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 2/8/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2647 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: 2/8/2018 Witness List *
                                                                                                                                                                                          Witness List by Waymo LLC Waymo's February 8, 2018 List of Next Seven Witnesses. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/8/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2645 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: 2/8/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER PERMITTING USE OF PHYSICAL EXHIBITS AT TRIAL (re [2640]). Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/8/2018. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2644 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: 2/7/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. of Submission of Responses to Requests for Admission Packets (Attachments: # (1) Appendix A, # (2) Appendix B)(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 2/7/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2643 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: 2/7/2018 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re [2641] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Notice of Submission of Interrogatory Responses (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/7/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2642 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: 2/7/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Waymo LLC Waymo's Notice of Submission of Interrogatory Responses (Attachments: # (1) Appendix A PLACEHOLDER, # (2) Appendix B)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/7/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2641 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: 2/7/2018, Terminated: 2/9/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Notice of Submission of Interrogatory Responses filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Felipe Corredor ISO Waymos Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Appendix A SEALED)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/7/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2640 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: 2/7/2018 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Order and Request Permitting Use of Physical Exhibits In the Courtroom for Trial by Waymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/7/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2639 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: 2/7/2018 Witness List *
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Witness List by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. --DEFENDANTS' FEBRUARY 7, 2018 ROLLING WITNESS LIST. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 2/7/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2638 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: 2/7/2018 Witness List *
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Witness List by Waymo LLC Waymo's February 7, 2018 List of Next Seven Witnesses. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/7/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2637 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: 2/7/2018 Jury Trial HeldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Jury Trial held on 2/7/2018. Witnesses: Travis Kalanick, Nina Qi, Lior Ron, Eric Friedberg. See log for details.Total Time in Court: 4 Hrs. 57 Min.Court Reporters: Katherine Sullivan / Debra Pas. Plaintiff Attorneys: Charles Verhoeven, Melissa Baily, David Eiseman, Andrea Roberts, David Perlson, James Judah, Jordan Jaffe, Jared Newton, Patrick Schmidt. Defendant Attorneys: Arturo Gonzales, Bill Carmody, Esther Chang, Michael Jacobs, Karen Dunn, Thomas Pardini, Wendy Ray, Martha Goodman, Meredity Dearborh, Joseph Grinstein, Michael Brille, Matthew Berry, Shawn Rabin.Also Present:Special Master: John CooperWaymo Representative: Demarron BerkeleyUber Representative: Eric MeyhoferAttachment: Minute Order. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/7/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2634 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: 2/7/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER PERMITTING USE OF PHYSICAL EXHIBITS AT TRIAL (re [2632]). Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/7/2018. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2646 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/8/2018 Amended document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED MINUTES to [2636] Jury Trial - Held. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2636 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/7/2018 Jury Trial HeldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Jury Trial held on 2/6/2018. Witnesses: Dmitri Dolgov, Gary Thomas Brown, William Grossman, and Travis Kalanick. See trial log for details.Total Time in Court: 5 Hrs. 17 Min.Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan / Debra Pas. Plaintiff Attorneys: Charles Verhoeven, Melissa Baily, Duane Lyons, David Eiseman, Andrea Roberts, David Perlson, James Judah, Jordan Jaffe, Jared Newton. Defendant Attorneys: Arturo Gonzales, Bill Carmody, Esther Chang, Michael Jacobs, Karen Dunn, Thomas Pardini, Wendy Ray, Martha Goodman, Meredith Dearborn, Joseph Grinstein,Michael Brille, Matthew Berry, Shawn Rabin.Also Present: Special Master: John CooperWaymo Representative: Demarron Berkeley;Uber Representative: Eric Meyhofer Attachment: Minute Order. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/6/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2635 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/7/2018 Jury Trial HeldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Jury Trial held on 2/6/2018.Total Time in Court: 21 Minutes. Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan/Debra PasPlaintiff Attorney: Charles Verhoeven, Melissa Baily, Duane Lyons, David Eiseman, Andrea Roberts, David Perlson, James Judah, Jordan Jaffe, Jared Newton. Defendant Attorney: Arturo Gonzales, Bill Carmody, Esther Chang, Michael Jacobs, Karen Dunn, Thomas Pardini, Wendy Ray, Martha Goodman, Meredith Dearborn, Joseph Grinstein, Michael Brille, Matthew Berry, Shawn Rabin. Attachment: Sealed Civil Trial Minutes. (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/6/2018) (sxbS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2633 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018 Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRIAL BRIEF Waymo's Response to Defendants' Brief on Bill Gurley's Trial Testimony by Waymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2632 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Order and Request Permitting Use of Physical Exhibits in the Courtroom for Trial by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Chang, Esther) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2631 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018 Witness List *
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Witness List by Waymo LLC Waymo's February 6, 2018 List of Next Seven Witnesses. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2630 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re [2628] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Submission in Response to Defendants' Brief on the Penultimate Jury Instructions (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2629 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to re [2549] Response ( Non Motion ), Waymo's Submission in Response to Defendants' Brief on the Penultimate Jury Instructions by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 PLACEHOLDER)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2628 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018, Terminated: 2/9/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Submission in Response to Defendants' Brief on the Penultimate Jury Instructions filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Lindsay Cooper ISO Waymo's Adminstrative Motion to File Under Seal, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) SEALED Waymo's Submission in Response to Defendants' Brief on the Penultimate Jury Instructions, # (4) REDACTED Waymo's Submission in Response to Defendants' Brief on the Penultimate Jury Instructions, # (5) Exhibit 1 SEALED)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2627 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to re [2550] Response ( Non Motion ), WAYMO'S OBJECTIONS AND PROPOSED MODIFICATIONS TO THE PENULTIMATE JURY INSTRUCTIONS ON TRADE SECRET MISAPPROPRIATION AND SPECIAL VERDICT FORM by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2626 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018 Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRIAL BRIEF Waymo's Response to Defendants' Brief on the Admissibility and Use of Stroz Friedberg's Due Diligence Materials by Waymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2625 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: 2/5/2018 Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRIAL BRIEF DEFENDANTS' BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PRECLUDING WAYMO FROM SOLICITING SPECULATIVE, IRRELEVANT, AND PREJUDICIAL OPINION TESTIMONY FROM FORMER UBER BOARD MEMBER BILL GURLEY by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Kaitlyn Murphy, # (2) Exhibit 1)(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2624 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: 2/5/2018 Witness List *
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Witness List by Waymo LLC Waymo's Second Amended February 5, 2018 List of Next Seven Witnesses. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2623 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: 2/5/2018 Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRIAL BRIEF Uber's and Ottomotto's Brief on The Admissibility and Use of Stroz Friedberg's Due Diligence Materials by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix A, # (2) Trial Exhibit 5101, # (3) Trial Exhibit 5102, # (4) Trial Exhibit 5215, # (5) Trial Exhibit 7111, # (6) Trial Exhibit 7114, # (7) Trial Exhibit 7418, # (8) Trial Exhibit 7912, # (9) Trial Exhibit 8854, # (10) Trial Exhibit 8855, # (11) Trial Exhibit 8857, part 1, # (12) Trial Exhibit 8857, part 2, # (13) Trial Exhibit 8858)(Dunn, Karen) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2622 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: 2/5/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION Regarding Documentary Evidence filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2621 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: 2/5/2018 Witness List *
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Witness List by Waymo LLC Waymo's Amended February 5, 2018 List of Next Seven Witnesses. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2620 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: 2/5/2018 Witness List *
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Witness List by Waymo LLC Waymo's February 5, 2018 List of Next Seven Witnesses. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2619 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: 2/5/2018 Jury Trial HeldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Jury Trial held on 2/5/2018. Opening statements began and concluded from the parties. Sworn witnesses: John Krafcik, Dmitri Dolgoe; Admitted Exhibits: 1249, 1898, 1362, 1907, 1131, 1648, 1255. The Court ruled [2603] Stipulation as stated on the record. Further Jury Trial set before Judge William Alsup in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco, CA. for 2/6/2018 at 7:30 a.m.Total Time in Court: 4 Hours. Court Reporters: Katherine Sullivan / Debra Pas. Plaintiff Attorneys: Charles Verhoeven, Melissa Bailey, Duane Lyons, David Eiseman, Andrea Roberts, David Perlson, James Judah, Jordan Jaffe. Defendant Attorneys: Bill Carmody, Arturo Gonzales, Karen Dunn, Esther Chang, Joseph Grinstein, Michael Brille, Matthew Berry, Shawn Rabin. Also Present: John Cooper, Special Master; Demarren Berkeley, Waymo Corporate Representative; Eric Meyhofer, Uber Representative; Tony West, Uber Corporate Counsel; Nicole Barto, Uber Representative.Attachment: Minute Order. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/5/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2618 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: 2/5/2018 Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Decision
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Clerk's Notice re: [2617] Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Request. Request denied. (Related documents(s) [2617])(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2617 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: 2/5/2018 Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Request. Video Camera hearing set for 2/26/2018 07:30 AM. Objections to Video Recording due 2/12/2018. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2616 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: 2/5/2018 statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statement Parties' Joint Submission of Timeline and List of Key Individuals by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2615 Filed: 2/4/2018, Entered: 2/4/2018 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OBJECTIONS to Use of Videos by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 2/4/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2614 Filed: 2/4/2018, Entered: 2/4/2018 statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statement Parties' Joint Summary of Top 20 Evidentiary Rulings by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 2/4/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2613 Filed: 2/4/2018, Entered: 2/4/2018 Witness List *
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Witness List by Waymo LLC Waymo's February 4, 2018 List of Next Seven Witnesses. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/4/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2612 Filed: 2/4/2018, Entered: 2/4/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 1, held on 1-31-2018, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/7/2018. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 2/4/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2611 Filed: 2/4/2018, Entered: 2/4/2018 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to re [2597] Order Joint Proposal Regarding Reasonable Royalty Damages by Waymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/4/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2610 Filed: 2/4/2018, Entered: 2/4/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transcript of Proceedings held on 1-30-2018, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [2546] Transcript Order, [2547] Transcript Order, [2556] Transcript Order, [2548] Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/7/2018. (Related documents(s) [2546], [2547], [2556], [2548]) (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 2/4/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2609 Filed: 2/4/2018, Entered: 2/4/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/4/2018. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2608 Filed: 2/4/2018, Entered: 2/4/2018 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re [2606] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Notice of Submission of Deposition Designation Packets (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/4/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2607 Filed: 2/4/2018, Entered: 2/4/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Waymo LLC re [2606] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Notice of Submission of Deposition Designation Packets (Attachments: # (1) Appendix 1-12 PLACEHOLDERS)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/4/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2606 Filed: 2/4/2018, Entered: 2/4/2018, Terminated: 2/9/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Notice of Submission of Deposition Designation Packets filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Felipe Corredor ISO Waymos Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Appendix 1 SEALED, # (4) Appendix 2 SEALED, # (5) Appendix 3A SEALED, # (6) Appendix 3B SEALED, # (7) Appendix 4 SEALED, # (8) Appendix 5 SEALED, # (9) Appendix 6 SEALED, # (10) Appendix 7 SEALED, # (11) Appendix 8 SEALED, # (12) Appendix 9 SEALED, # (13) Appendix 10 SEALED, # (14) Appendix 11 SEALED, # (15) Appendix 12 SEALED)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/4/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2605 Filed: 2/3/2018, Entered: 2/3/2018 Witness List *
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Witness List by Waymo LLC Waymo's February 3, 2018 List of Next Seven Witnesses. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/3/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2604 Filed: 2/3/2018, Entered: 2/3/2018 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re [2602] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Parties' Joint Submission Regarding Short Descriptions for Alleged Trade Secrets (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/3/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2603 Filed: 2/3/2018, Entered: 2/3/2018, Terminated: 2/5/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Parties' Joint Submission Regarding Short Descriptions for Alleged Trade Secrets filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A PLACEHOLDER)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/3/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2602 Filed: 2/3/2018, Entered: 2/3/2018, Terminated: 2/9/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Parties' Joint Submission Regarding Short Descriptions for Alleged Trade Secrets filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Jonathan Francis ISO AMtFUS Parties' Joint Submission Regarding Short Descriptions for Alleged Trade Secrets, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) SEALED Parties' Joint Submission Regarding Short Descriptions for Alleged Trade Secrets, # (4) REDACTED Parties' Joint Submission Regarding Short Descriptions for Alleged Trade Secrets, # (5) Exhibit A SEALED)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/3/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2601 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: 2/2/2018 Witness List *
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Witness List by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. --DEFENDANTS' FEBRUARY 2, 2018 ROLLING WITNESS LIST. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 2/2/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2600 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: 2/2/2018 Witness List *
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Witness List by Waymo LLC Waymo's February 2, 2018 List of Next Seven Witnesses. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/2/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2599 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: 2/2/2018 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS re [2551] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Response to Waymo's Trial Brief -- Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2551-4], # (2) Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2551-4])(Related document(s)[2551]) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/2/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2598 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: 2/2/2018 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts by Otto Trucking LLC. (Schuman, Brett) (Filed on 2/2/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2597 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: 2/2/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER RE BIFURCATION OF REASONABLE ROYALTY. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/2/2018. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2596 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: 2/1/2018 Witness List *
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Witness List by Waymo LLC Waymo's February 1, 2018 List of Next Seven Witnesses. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2595 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: 2/1/2018 Witness List *
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Witness List by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. February 1, 2018 Rolling Witness List. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2594 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: 2/1/2018 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBITS re [2542] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Response to Waymo's Offer of Proof re Development Expenses -- Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2542-4], # (2) Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2542-4], # (3) Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2543-1], # (4) Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2543-1], # (5) Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2543-4], # (6) Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2543-4])(Related document(s)[2542]) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2593 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: 2/1/2018 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts by Otto Trucking LLC. (Schuman, Brett) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2592 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: 1/31/2018 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts by Stroz Friedberg, LLC. (Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 1/31/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2591 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: 1/31/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER FOR JURY REFRESHMENTS. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/31/2018. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2590 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: 1/31/2018 Jury SelectionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Jury Selection held on 1/31/2018. See Trial Log for further details.Total Time in Court: 4 Hours; 25 Minutes. Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan / Debra Pas. Plaintiff Attorneys: Charles Verhoeven, Melissa Bailey, Duane Lyons, David Eiseman, Andrea Roberts, David Perlson, James Judah, Jordan Jaffe.Also Present: Demarren Berkeley, Corporate Representative; Tara Trask, Jury Consultant. Defendant Attorneys: Arturo Gonzales, Bill Carmody, Esther Chang, Karen Dunn, Joseph Grinstein, Michael Brille, Matthew Berry, Shawn Rabin.Also Present: Eric Meyhofer, Uber Representative; Tony West, Uber Corporate Counsel. Special Master: John Cooper. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/31/2018) Modified on 1/31/2018 (afmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2589 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: 1/31/2018 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts by John Lee Cooper. (Cooper, John) (Filed on 1/31/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2588 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: 1/31/2018 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on January 30, 2018 before Judge William Alsup by John Lee Cooper, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Cooper, John) (Filed on 1/31/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2587 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: 1/31/2018 Order on Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting [1281] Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2586 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: 1/31/2018 Order on Motion for reconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting [963] Motion for Reconsideration. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2585 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: 1/30/2018 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      (PUBLIC REFILING OF [2557] pursuant to [2558]) OMNIBUS ORDER ON [677][1552][2199] EXTENT TO WHICH ACCUSATIONS RE UBER'S LITIGATION MISCONDUCT MAY FEATURE AT TRIAL. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2584 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: 1/30/2018 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBITS re [2532] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [2527], [2527-1], [2527-2], [2527-3], and [2527-4] --DECLARATION OF THOMAS J. PARDINI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF WAYMO LLCS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Revised Unredacted Version of [2527-8], # (2) Revised Unredacted Version of [2527-11], # (3) Revised Unredacted Version of [2527-12], # (4) Revised Unredacted Version of [2527-17], # (5) Revised Unredacted Version of [2527-19])(Related document(s)[2532]) (Pardini, Thomas) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2583 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: 1/30/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING [2160] ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENT by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2581 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: 1/30/2018 Order on Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING [1709] ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2580 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: 1/30/2018 Order on Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING [1703] ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2579 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: 1/30/2018 Order on Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING [1669] ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2578 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: 1/30/2018 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING [1668] ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2577 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: 1/30/2018 Order on Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING [1649] ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENT by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2576 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: 1/30/2018 Order on Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING [1597] ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2575 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: 1/30/2018 Order on Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING [1453] ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2574 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: 1/30/2018 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING [1324] ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENT by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2573 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: 1/30/2018 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING [1058] ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO REMOVE DOCUMENT WITH PERSONAL INFORMATION by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2572 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: 1/30/2018 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING [993] ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2571 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: 1/30/2018 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING [863] ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2570 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: 1/30/2018 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING [830] ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENT by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2569 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: 1/30/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Thomas J. Pardini in Support of [2530] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Offer of Proof With Respect To Waymo's Development Expenses filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s)[2530]) (Pardini, Thomas) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 2568 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: 1/30/2018 Pretrial ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Final Pretrial Conference held on 1/30/2018; denying [2511] Motion to Intervene; denying [2512] Motion for advance disclosure of trial examination questions; [2305] Motion for Leave to Add Trial Witnesses: the Court ruled as stated on the record. Opening statements will be split into two sessions: public and sealed. Total Time in Court: 3 Hours; 16 Minutes. Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan / Debra Pas. Plaintiff Attorneys: Charles Verhoeven, Melissa Bailey, David Eiseman IV, Andrea Roberts, David Perlson, James Judah, Jordan Jaffe, Jared Newton.Defendant Attorneys: Arturo Gonzales, Bill Carmody, Michael Jacobs, Esther Chang, Matthew Berry, Joseph Grinstein, Karen Dunn, Michael Brille, Meredity Dearborn, Shawn Rabin.Special Master: John Cooper. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2567 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: 1/30/2018 Witness List *
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Witness List by Waymo LLC Parties' Amended Joint List of All Potential Trial Witnesses. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2566 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: 1/30/2018 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS Corrected version of [677-2] filed byWaymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2565 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: 1/30/2018 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBITS re [676] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Corrected version of [676-6] filed byWaymo LLC. (Related document(s)[676]) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2564 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: 1/30/2018 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER APPROVING [2560] STIPULATION RE JURY INSTRUCTIONS by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2563 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: 1/30/2018 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to re [2562] Statement, Waymo's Response to Uber's Submission of Proposed Dates for Timeline by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2562 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: 1/29/2018 statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statement re [2250] Order Defendants Uber Technologies, Inc. and Ottomotto LLC's Submission of Proposed Dates for Timeline by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2561 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: 1/29/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Thomas J. Pardini in Support of [2519] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Second Amended Joint Proposed Pre-Trial Order filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s)[2519]) (Pardini, Thomas) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2560 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: 1/29/2018, Terminated: 1/30/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation Regarding Trade Secret Jury Instructions and [Proposed] Order filed by Waymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2559 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: 1/29/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER REQUIRING SUMMARY OF RULINGS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/29/2018. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2558 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: 1/29/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER RE SEALING OF [2557] OMNIBUS ORDER ON ACCUSATIONS RE UBER'S LITIGATION MISCONDUCT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/29/2018. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2557 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: 1/29/2018 Order on Motion for Order to Show CauseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OMNIBUS ORDER ON [677][1552][2199] EXTENT TO WHICH ACCUSATIONS RE UBER'S LITIGATION MISCONDUCT MAY FEATURE AT TRIAL by Judge Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2018) (whalc2S, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2556 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: 1/29/2018 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01-30-2018 before Judge William Alsup by Waymo LLC, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Perlson, David) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2555 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: 1/29/2018 statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statement --DEFENDANTS UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. AND OTTOMOTTO LLC'S AMENDED CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2554 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: 1/29/2018 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. re [2551] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Response to Waymo's Trial Brief (Yang, Michelle) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2553 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: 1/29/2018 statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statement Joint Submission Regarding the Joint Statement of the Case by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Defendants' Statement of the Case), # (2) Exhibit B (Waymo's Statement of the Case))(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2552 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: 1/29/2018 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to re [2539] Response ( Non Motion ) --DEFENDANTS UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. AND OTTOMOTTO LLCS RESPONSE TO WAYMOS TRIAL BRIEF by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Esther Kim Chang, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5 (Redacted))(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2551 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: 1/29/2018, Terminated: 2/9/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Response to Waymo's Trial Brief filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michelle Yang, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Redacted Version of Defendants' Response to Waymo's Trial Brief, # (4) Unredacted Version of Defendants' Response to Waymo's Trial Brief, # (5) Unredacted Version of Ex. 5 to Chang Declaration)(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2550 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: 1/29/2018 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to re [2449] Order, Waymo's Response to Court's Penultimate Jury Instructions and Special Verdict Form by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Proposed Edits to Penultimate Jury Instructions and Special Verdict Form, # (2) Exhibit B - Proposed Special Verdict Form, # (3) Exhibit C - Redlined Edits to Special Verdict Form)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2549 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: 1/29/2018 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to re [2449] Order, Defendants Uber Technologies, Inc. and Ottomotto LLC's Response to Court's Penultimate Jury Instructions On Trade Secret Misappropriation (Dkt. 2449) by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Dunn, Karen) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2548 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: 1/29/2018 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on January 30, 2018 before Judge William Alsup by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2547 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: 1/29/2018 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on January 30, 2018 before Judge William Alsup by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2546 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: 1/29/2018 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on January 30, 2018 before Judge William Alsup by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2545 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: 1/29/2018 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. re [2542] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Response to Waymo's Offer of Proof re Development Expenses, [2543] Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, (Pardini, Thomas) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2544 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: 1/29/2018 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to re [2531] Statement, --DEFENDANTS UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. AND OTTOMOTTO LLCS RESPONSE TO WAYMOS OFFER OF PROOF RE DEVELOPMENT EXPENSES by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Halley Josephs, # (2) Exhibit 1 (REDACTED), # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3 (REDACTED), # (5) Exhibit 4 (REDACTED))(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2543 Filed: 1/28/2018, Entered: 1/29/2018 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBITS re [2542] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Response to Waymo's Offer of Proof re Development Expenses --Redacted Version of Ex. 1 to Josephs Decl. filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Unredacted Version of Ex. 1 to Josephs Decl., # (2) Unredacted Version of Ex. 3 to Josephs Decl., # (3) Redacted Version of Ex. 4 to Josephs Decl., # (4) Unredacted Version of Ex. 4 to Josephs Decl.)(Related document(s)[2542]) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 1/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2542 Filed: 1/28/2018, Entered: 1/28/2018, Terminated: 2/9/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Response to Waymo's Offer of Proof re Development Expenses filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Thomas J. Pardini, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Redacted Version of Defendants' Response to Waymo's Offer of Proof re Development Expenses, # (4) Unredacted Version of Defendants' Response to Waymo's Offer of Proof re Development Expenses)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 1/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2541 Filed: 1/28/2018, Entered: 1/28/2018 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to re [2532] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [2527], [2527-1], [2527-2], [2527-3], and [2527-4], [2529] Statement, --DEFENDANTS UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. AND OTTOMOTTO LLCS RESPONSE TO WAYMOS OFFER OF PROOF REGARDING ADMISSIBILITY OF CERTAIN MARKET AND FINANCIAL INFORMATION by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 1/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2540 Filed: 1/27/2018, Entered: 1/27/2018 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re [2538] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Response to Uber's Amended Trial Brief (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2539 Filed: 1/27/2018, Entered: 1/27/2018 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to re [2517] Trial Brief REDACTED Waymo's Response to Uber's Amended Trial Brief by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2538 Filed: 1/27/2018, Entered: 1/27/2018, Terminated: 2/9/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Response to Uber's Amended Trial Brief filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Lindsay Cooper ISO Waymo's AMTFUS, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) PUBLIC REDACTED Version of Waymo's Response to Uber's Amended Trial Brief, # (4) SEALED Version of Waymo's Response to Uber's Amended Trial Brief)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2537 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: 1/26/2018 Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Decision
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Clerk's Notice DECLINING Video Recording re: [2535] Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Request. (Related documents(s) [2535])(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2536 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: 1/26/2018 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to re [1468] Order --JOINT SUBMISSION OF PROPOSED AMENDED REVISION TO JUROR QUESTIONNAIRE QUESTION NO. 9 by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2535 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: 1/26/2018 Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Request. Video Camera hearing set for 2/5/2018 07:30 AM. Objections to Video Recording due 2/2/2018. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2534 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: 1/26/2018 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY (re [2512] MOTION advance disclosure of trial examination ) filed byJohn Gardner. (Baldwin, Merri) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2533 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: 1/26/2018 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re [2528] Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, [2532] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [2527], [2527-1], [2527-2], [2527-3], and [2527-4], [2527] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymos Offer of Proof Regarding Admissibility of Certain Market and Financial Information, [2530] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Offer of Proof With Respect To Waymo's Development Expenses (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2532 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: 1/26/2018, Terminated: 2/9/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [2527], [2527-1], [2527-2], [2527-3], and [2527-4] filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order CORRECTED Proposed Order, # (2) Declaration CORRECTED Declaration of Lindsay Cooper ISO Waymo's AMTFUS, # (3) CORRECTED SEALED Version of Offer of Proof Regarding Admissibility of Certain Market and Financial Information, # (4) CORRECTED PUBLIC REDACTED Version of Offer of Proof Regarding Admissibility of Certain Market and Financial Information)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/26/2018) Modified on 1/26/2018 (sxbS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2531 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: 1/26/2018 statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statement Waymo's Offer of Proof With Respect To Waymo's Development Expenses by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration ISO Waymo's Offer of Proof With Respect To Waymo's Development Expenses, # (2) Exhibit PUBLIC 1-7 PLACEHOLDERS)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2530 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: 1/26/2018, Terminated: 2/9/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Offer of Proof With Respect To Waymo's Development Expenses filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Lindsay Cooper ISO Waymo's AMTFU', # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) PUBLIC REDACTED Version of Waymo's Offer of Proof With Respect To Waymo's Development Expenses, # (4) SEALED Version of Waymo's Offer of Proof With Respect To Waymo's Development Expenses, # (5) Exhibit 1 SEALED, # (6) Exhibit 2 SEALED, # (7) Exhibit 3 SEALED, # (8) Exhibit 4 SEALED, # (9) Exhibit 5 SEALED, # (10) Exhibit 6 SEALED, # (11) Exhibit 7 SEALED)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2529 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: 1/26/2018 statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statement Waymo's Offer of Proof Regarding Admissibility of Certain Market and Financial Information by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration ISO Waymos Offer of Proof Regarding Admissibility of Certain Market and Financial Information, # (2) Exhibit PUBLIC 1-19 PLACEHOLDERS)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2528 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: 1/26/2018 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBITS re [2527] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymos Offer of Proof Regarding Admissibility of Certain Market and Financial Information -- SEALED Exhibit 19 filed byWaymo LLC. (Related document(s)[2527]) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2527 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: 1/26/2018, Terminated: 2/9/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymos Offer of Proof Regarding Admissibility of Certain Market and Financial Information filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Lindsay Cooper ISO Waymo's AMTFUS, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) PUBLIC REDACTED Version of Waymos Offer of Proof Regarding Admissibility of Certain Market and Financial Information, # (4) SEALED Version of Waymos Offer of Proof Regarding Admissibility of Certain Market and Financial Information, # (5) Exhibit 1 SEALED, # (6) Exhibit 2 SEALED, # (7) Exhibit 3 SEALED, # (8) Exhibit 4 SEALED, # (9) Exhibit 5 SEALED, # (10) Exhibit 6 SEALED, # (11) Exhibit 7 SEALED, # (12) Exhibit 8 SEALED, # (13) Exhibit 9 SEALED, # (14) Exhibit 10 SEALED, # (15) Exhibit 11 SEALED, # (16) Exhibit 12 SEALED, # (17) Exhibit 13 SEALED, # (18) Exhibit 14 SEALED, # (19) Exhibit 15 SEALED, # (20) Exhibit 16 SEALED, # (21) Exhibit 17 SEALED, # (22) Exhibit 18 SEALED)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/26/2018) Modified on 1/26/2018 (sxbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/26/2018 (sxbS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2526 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: 1/25/2018 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING [2524] JOINT REQUEST RE COURTROOM EQUIPMENT by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2525 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: 1/25/2018 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/16/2017 before Judge William Alsup by Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Jordan, William) (Filed on 1/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2524 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: 1/25/2018, Terminated: 1/25/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Request and [Proposed] Order Regarding Courtroom Equipment filed by Waymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2523 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: 1/24/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [2512] MOTION advance disclosure of trial examination ) Waymo's Response to Non-Party Witness John Gardner's Motion Pursuant to FRE 611 filed byWaymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2522 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: 1/24/2018 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to re [2515] Order,, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings, Defendants Uber Technologies, Inc. and Ottomotto LLC's Response to Order Shortening Time to Brief and Hear Motions to Intervene and for Advance Disclosure of Questions (Dkt. 2515) by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Dunn, Karen) (Filed on 1/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2521 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/23/2018 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re [2519] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Second Amended Joint Proposed Pre-Trial Order (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2520 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/23/2018 Proposed Pretrial Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Pretrial Order Second Amended Joint Proposed Pre-Trial Order by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix A PLACEHOLDER, # (2) Appendix B, # (3) Appendix C, # (4) Appendix D REDACTED, # (5) Appendix E)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2519 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/23/2018, Terminated: 2/9/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Second Amended Joint Proposed Pre-Trial Order filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Jonathan Francis ISO AMtFUS Second Amended Joint Proposed Pre-Trial Order, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) SEALED Second Amended Joint Proposed Pre-Trial Order, # (4) REDACTED Second Amended Joint Proposed Pre-Trial Order, # (5) Appendix A SEALED, # (6) Appendix D SEALED, # (7) Appendix D REDACTED)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2518 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/23/2018 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS re [2500] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Response to Waymo's Offer of Proof Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit REVISED SEALED version of [2500-4], # (2) Exhibit REVISED REDACTED version of [2500-4], # (3) Exhibit REVISED SEALED version of [2501-13], # (4) Exhibit REVISED REDACTED version of [2501-13], # (5) Exhibit REVISED SEALED version of [2501-20], # (6) Exhibit REVISED REDACTED version of [2501-20], # (7) Exhibit REVISED SEALED version of [2502-7], # (8) Exhibit REVISED REDACTED version of [2502-7], # (9) Exhibit REVISED SEALED version of [2502-8], # (10) Exhibit REVISED REDACTED version of [2502-8], # (11) Exhibit REVISED SEALED version of [2502-9], # (12) Exhibit REVISED REDACTED version of [2502-9], # (13) Exhibit REVISED SEALED version of [2502-10], # (14) Exhibit REVISED REDACTED version of [2502-10], # (15) Exhibit REVISED SEALED version of [2502-11], # (16) Exhibit REVISED REDACTED version of [2502-11], # (17) Exhibit REVISED SEALED version of [2502-24], # (18) Exhibit REVISED REDACTED version of [2502-24])(Related document(s)[2500]) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2517 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/23/2018 Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRIAL BRIEF --Amended Trial Brief by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2516 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/23/2018 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              (PUBLIC REFILING OF [2497] pursuant to [2498]) ORDER ON [2202] DAUBERT MOTION RE LAMBERTUS HESSELINK. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2515 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO BRIEF AND HEAR [2511][2512] MOTIONS TO INTERVENE AND FOR ADVANCE DISCLOSURE OF QUESTIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/22/2018. Responses due by 1/24/2018. Replies due by 1/26/2018. Motion Hearing set for 1/30/2018 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2514 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: 1/19/2018 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. re [2502] Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, [2500] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Response to Waymo's Offer of Proof, [2501] Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,, (Pardini, Thomas) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2513 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: 1/19/2018 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts by Waymo LLC. (Perlson, David) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2512 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: 1/19/2018, Terminated: 1/30/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION advance disclosure of trial examination filed by John Gardner. Responses due by 2/2/2018. Replies due by 2/9/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Merri Baldwin)(Baldwin, Merri) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2511 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: 1/19/2018, Terminated: 1/30/2018 Motion to intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Intervene filed by John Gardner. Responses due by 2/2/2018. Replies due by 2/9/2018. (Baldwin, Merri) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2510 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: 1/19/2018 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS re [2509] Declaration in Support,,, --Exhibit 28 (REDACTED) to Declaration of Esther Kim Chang ISO Defendants' Response to Waymo's Offer of Proof filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 29 (REDACTED), # (2) Exhibit 30, # (3) Exhibit 31 (REDACTED), # (4) Exhibit 32, # (5) Exhibit 33 (REDACTED), # (6) Exhibit 34, # (7) Exhibit 35, # (8) Exhibit 36, # (9) Exhibit 37 (REDACTED), # (10) Exhibit 38 (REDACTED), # (11) Exhibit 39 (REDACTED), # (12) Exhibit 40 (REDACTED), # (13) Exhibit 41 (REDACTED), # (14) Exhibit 42 (REDACTED), # (15) Exhibit 43 (REDACTED), # (16) Exhibit 44 (REDACTED), # (17) Exhibit 45 (REDACTED), # (18) Exhibit 46 (REDACTED), # (19) Exhibit 47 (REDACTED), # (20) Exhibit 48 (REDACTED), # (21) Exhibit 49 (REDACTED), # (22) Exhibit 50 (REDACTED), # (23) Exhibit 51, # (24) Exhibit 52, # (25) Exhibit 53, # (26) Exhibit 54, # (27) Exhibit 55 (REDACTED), # (28) Exhibit 56 (REDACTED), # (29) Exhibit 57 (REDACTED), # (30) Exhibit 58, # (31) Exhibit 59 (REDACTED), # (32) Exhibit 60, # (33) Exhibit 61, # (34) Exhibit 62, # (35) Exhibit 63, # (36) Exhibit 64, # (37) Exhibit 65 (REDACTED), # (38) Exhibit 66 (REDACTED), # (39) Exhibit 67, # (40) Exhibit 68 (REDACTED), # (41) Exhibit 69 (REDACTED), # (42) Exhibit 70, # (43) Exhibit 71 (REDACTED), # (44) Exhibit 72 (REDACTED), # (45) Exhibit 73, # (46) Exhibit 74, # (47) Exhibit 75)(Related document(s)[2509]) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2509 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: 1/19/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Esther Kim Chang in Support of [2503] Response ( Non Motion ), re Waymo's Offer of Proof filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2 (REDACTED), # (3) Exhibit 3 (REDACTED), # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5 (REDACTED), # (6) Exhibit 6 (REDACTED), # (7) Exhibit 7 (REDACTED), # (8) Exhibit 8 (REDACTED), # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10 (REDACTED), # (11) Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit 13, # (14) Exhibit 14, # (15) Exhibit 15, # (16) Exhibit 16, # (17) Exhibit 17 (REDACTED), # (18) Exhibit 18 (REDACTED), # (19) Exhibit 19, # (20) Exhibit 20, # (21) Exhibit 21, # (22) Exhibit 22 (REDACTED), # (23) Exhibit 23, # (24) Exhibit 24 (REDACTED), # (25) Exhibit 25 (REDACTED), # (26) Exhibit 26, # (27) Exhibit 27 (REDACTED))(Related document(s)[2503]) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2508 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: 1/19/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Kevin Faulkner in Support of [2503] Response ( Non Motion ), re Waymo's Offer of Proof filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s)[2503]) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2507 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: 1/19/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Arturo J. Gonzalez in Support of [2503] Response ( Non Motion ), re Waymo's Offer of Proof filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Related document(s)[2503]) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2506 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: 1/19/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Wendy Ray in Support of [2503] Response ( Non Motion ), re Waymo's Offer of Proof filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s)[2503]) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2505 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: 1/19/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Sylvia Rivera in Support of [2503] Response ( Non Motion ), re Waymo's Offer of Proof filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Related document(s)[2503]) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2504 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: 1/19/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Eric A. Tate in Support of [2503] Response ( Non Motion ), re Waymo's Offer of Proof filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s)[2503]) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2503 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: 1/19/2018 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to re [2470] Response ( Non Motion ),,,,, --Defendants' Response to Waymo's Offer of Proof (REDACTED) by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Defendants' Response to Appendix A of Waymo's Offer of Proof (REDACTED), # (2) Defendants' Response to Appendix B of Waymo's Offer of Proof)(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2502 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: 1/19/2018 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS re [2500] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Response to Waymo's Offer of Proof --Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 28 filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 29, # (2) Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 31, # (3) Redacted Version of Chang Ex. 33, # (4) Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 33, # (5) Redacted Version of Chang Ex. 37, # (6) Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 37, # (7) Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 38, # (8) Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 39, # (9) Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 40, # (10) Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 41, # (11) Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 42, # (12) Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 43, # (13) Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 44, # (14) Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 45, # (15) Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 46, # (16) Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 47, # (17) Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 48, # (18) Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 49, # (19) Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 50, # (20) Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 55, # (21) Redacted Version of Chang Ex. 56, # (22) Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 56, # (23) Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 57, # (24) Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 59, # (25) Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 65, # (26) Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 66, # (27) Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 68, # (28) Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 69, # (29) Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 71, # (30) Redacted Version of Chang Ex. 72, # (31) Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 72, # (32) Redacted Version of Response to Appendix A, # (33) Urnedacted Version of Response to Appendix A)(Related document(s)[2500]) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2501 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: 1/19/2018 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBITS re [2500] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Response to Waymo's Offer of Proof --Declaration of Esther Kim Chang ISO Defendants' Response to Waymo's Offer of Proof filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Redacted Version of Chang Ex. 2, # (2) Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 2, # (3) Redacted Version of Chang Ex. 3, # (4) Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 3, # (5) Redacted Version of Chang Ex. 5, # (6) Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 5, # (7) Redacted Version of Chang Ex. 6, # (8) Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 6, # (9) Redacted Version of Chang Ex. 7, # (10) Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 7, # (11) Redacted Version of Chang Ex. 8, # (12) Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 8, # (13) Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 10, # (14) Redacted Version of Chang Ex. 17, # (15) Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 17, # (16) Redacted Version of Chang Ex. 18, # (17) Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 18, # (18) Redacted Version of Chang Ex. 22, # (19) Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 22, # (20) Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 24, # (21) Redacted Version of Chang Ex. 25, # (22) Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 25, # (23) Redacted Version of Chang Ex. 27, # (24) Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 27)(Related document(s)[2500]) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2500 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: 1/19/2018, Terminated: 2/9/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Response to Waymo's Offer of Proof filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michelle Yang, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Redacted Version of Defendants' Response to Waymo's Offer of Proof, # (4) Unredacted Version of Defendants' Response to Waymo's Offer of Proof)(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2499 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: 1/19/2018 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGE CORLEY'S NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER by Judge William Alsup [denying [2474] Motion]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2498 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: 1/18/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER RE SEALING OF [2497] ORDER ON DAUBERT MOTION RE LAMBERTUS HESSELINK. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/18/2018. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/18/2018: # (1) Exhibit A) (whalc2S, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2497 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: 1/18/2018 order on motion in limineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    (UNDER SEAL) ORDER ON [2202] DAUBERT MOTION RE LAMBERTUS HESSELINK by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2018) (whalc2S, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2496 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: 1/18/2018 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBITS re [2477] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Uber's Response to Waymo's Precis ISO Request to File Motion for Relief -- Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2477-5], # (2) Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2477-5], # (3) Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2477-7], # (4) Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2477-7])(Related document(s)[2477]) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2495 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: 1/18/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER RE [2404][2405][2407] JURY INSTRUCTION ON DAMAGES BASED ONLY ON ACQUISITION. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/18/2018. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2494 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: 1/18/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER DENYING [2472][2488][2490] REQUESTS TO FILE NEW MOTION FOR RELIEF AND ADDITIONAL MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/18/2018. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2493 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: 1/18/2018 order on motion in limineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER ON [1612] DAUBERT MOTION RE JIM TIMMINS AND [2194] MOTION IN LIMINE RE DUE DILIGENCE by Judge Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2492 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: 1/18/2018 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER RE [1822][1919][2004] MOTION TO CLOSE COURTROOM by Judge Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2491 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: 1/17/2018 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re [2487] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Prcis in Support of its Request to File a Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence or Argument Regarding Ubers Use of Ephemeral Communications, Non-attributable Devices or Improper Privilege Design, [2489] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Precis in Support of its Request to File a Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence or Argument Characterizing Mr. Jacobs' Allegations (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2490 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: 1/17/2018 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Brief Waymo's Precis in Support of its Request to File a Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence or Argument Characterizing Mr. Jacobs' Allegations filed byWaymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2489 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: 1/17/2018, Terminated: 2/9/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Precis in Support of its Request to File a Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence or Argument Characterizing Mr. Jacobs' Allegations filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Jonathan Francis ISO AMTFUS, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) PUBLIC Version of Waymo's Precis in Support of its Request to File a Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence or Argument Characterizing Mr. Jacobs' Allegations, # (4) SEALED Version of Waymo's Precis in Support of its Request to File a Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence or Argument Characterizing Mr. Jacobs' Allegations)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2488 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: 1/17/2018 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Brief Waymo's Precis in Support of its Request to File a Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence or Argument Regarding Uber's Use of Ephemeral Communications, Non-attributable Devices or Improper Privilege Designations filed byWaymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2487 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: 1/17/2018, Terminated: 2/9/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Prcis in Support of its Request to File a Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence or Argument Regarding Ubers Use of Ephemeral Communications, Non-attributable Devices or Improper Privilege Designations filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Jonathan Francis ISO AMTFUS, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) REDACTED Version of Waymo's Prcis in Support of its Request to File a Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence or Argument Regarding Ubers Use of Ephemeral Communications, Non-attributable Devices or Improper Privilege Designations, # (4) SEALED Version of Waymo's Prcis in Support of its Request to File a Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence or Argument Regarding Ubers Use of Ephemeral Communications, Non-attributable Devices or Improper Privilege Designations)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2486 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: 1/16/2018 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS re [2466] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Offer of Proof Regarding Defendants' Discovery Misconduct --Declaration of Michelle Yang ISO Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byOttomotto LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Revised Unredacted Version of [2466-3], # (2) Revised Unredacted Version of [2466-5], # (3) Revised Unredacted Version of [2466-10], # (4) Revised Unredacted Version of [2466-20], # (5) Revised Unredacted Version of [2467-14], # (6) Revised Unredacted Version of [2467-21], # (7) Revised Unredacted Version of [2467-22], # (8) Revised Unredacted Version of [2468], # (9) Revised Unredacted Version of [2468-5], # (10) Revised Unredacted Version of [2469-11], # (11) Revised Unredacted Version of [2469-13], # (12) Revised Unredacted Version of [2469-16], # (13) Revised Unredacted Version of [2469-18], # (14) Revised Unredacted Version of [2469-19], # (15) Revised Unredacted Version of [2469-20], # (16) Revised Unredacted Version of [2469-21], # (17) Revised Unredacted Version of [2469-22], # (18) Revised Unredacted Version of [2469-25], # (19) Revised Unredacted Version of [2469-27], # (20) Revised Unredacted Version of [2469-31], # (21) Revised Unredacted Version of [2469-35])(Related document(s)[2466]) (Yang, Michelle) (Filed on 1/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2485 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: 1/16/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Adrian J. Sawyer in Support of [2466] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Offer of Proof Regarding Defendants' Discovery Misconduct filed bySandstone Group, LLC, Ognen Stojanovski, Tyto LiDAR, LLC. (Related document(s)[2466]) (Sawyer, Adrian) (Filed on 1/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2484 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: 1/16/2018 ExhibitCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXHIBITS re [2473] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Motion for Relief from Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge --DECLARATION OF THOMAS J. PARDINI IN SUPPORT OF WAYMO'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Revised Unredacted Version of [2473-6], # (2) Revised Unredacted Version of [2473-7], # (3) Revised Unredacted Version of [2473-8])(Related document(s)[2473]) (Pardini, Thomas) (Filed on 1/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2483 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: 1/16/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Ismail Ramsey in Support of [2466] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Offer of Proof Regarding Defendants' Discovery Misconduct filed byAnthony Levandowski. (Related document(s)[2466]) (Ramsey, Ismail) (Filed on 1/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2482 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: 1/16/2018 Order on Motion for reconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting [2428] Motion for Reconsideration. (ahmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2481 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: 1/16/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SECOND NOTICE OF NON-RECUSAL AND ORDER RE DEADLINE FOR MOTIONS TO DISQUALIFY. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/16/2018. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2018) (whalc2S, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2480 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: 1/16/2018 Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTION to [2464] Order -- Public Re-Filing in Response to Court Order Re: Waymo's Administrative Motion to Seal by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) PUBLIC REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2446-1], # (2) PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [2441-6], # (3) PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [2441-7], # (4) PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [2441-8], # (5) PUBLIC REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2446-2], # (6) PUBLIC REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2446-3], # (7) PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [2441-12], # (8) PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [2441-13], # (9) PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [2441-14], # (10) PUBLIC REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2446-4])(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2479 Filed: 1/14/2018, Entered: 1/14/2018 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. re [2477] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Uber's Response to Waymo's Precis ISO Request to File Motion for Relief (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2478 Filed: 1/14/2018, Entered: 1/14/2018 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to re [2472] Brief Waymo's Precis ISO Request to File Motion for Relief by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Camila Tapernoux, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D, # (6) Exhibit E, # (7) Exhibit F (REDACTED), # (8) Exhibit G (REDACTED), # (9) Exhibit H (REDACTED), # (10) Exhibit I, # (11) Exhibit J (REDACTED), # (12) Exhibit K, # (13) Exhibit L, # (14) Exhibit M (REDACTED))(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2477 Filed: 1/14/2018, Entered: 1/14/2018, Terminated: 2/9/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Uber's Response to Waymo's Precis ISO Request to File Motion for Relief filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michelle Yang, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Redacted version of Uber's Response to Waymo's Precis ISO Request to File Motion for Relief, # (4) Unredacted version of Uber's Response to Waymo's Precis ISO Request to File Motion for Relief, # (5) Unredacted version of Ex. F to Tapernoux Decl., # (6) Unredacted version of Ex. G to Tapernoux Decl., # (7) Unredacted version of Ex. H to Tapernoux Decl., # (8) Redacted version of Ex. J to Tapernoux Decl., # (9) Unredacted version of Ex. J to Tapernoux Decl., # (10) Redacted version of Ex. M to Tapernoux Decl., # (11) Unredacted version of Ex. M to Tapernoux Decl.)(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2476 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: 1/12/2018 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re [2469] Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,, [2467] Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, [2468] Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, [2466] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Offer of Proof Regarding Defendants' Discovery Misconduct (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2475 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: 1/12/2018 Certificate of serviceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re [2473] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Motion for Relief from Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2474 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: 1/12/2018, Terminated: 1/19/2018 motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION Relief from Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge re [2454] Order, [2458] Order re In Camera Review filed by Waymo LLC. Responses due by 1/26/2018. Replies due by 2/2/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration ISO Waymo's Motion for Relief from Non-Depositive Pretrial Order, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2-5 PLACEHOLDER)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2473 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: 1/12/2018, Terminated: 2/9/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Motion for Relief from Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Lindsay Cooper ISO Waymo's AMTFUS, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) PUBLIC REDACTED Waymo's Motion for Relief from Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge, # (4) SEALED Waymo's Motion for Relief from Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge, # (5) Exhibit 2 SEALED, # (6) Exhibit 3 SEALED, # (7) Exhibit 4 SEALED, # (8) Exhibit 5 SEALED)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2472 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: 1/12/2018 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Brief Waymo's Precis in Support of its Request to File a Motion for Relief Based on Defendants' Litigation Misconduct filed byWaymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2471 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: 1/12/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Waymo LLC re [2466] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Offer of Proof Regarding Defendants' Discovery Misconduct -- Notice of Lodging of Exhibits 25 and 26 in Support of Offer of Proof (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2470 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: 1/12/2018 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to re [2447] Order Waymo's Offer of Proof Regarding Defendants' Discovery Misconduct by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Jeff Nardinelli in Support of Waymo's Submission, # (2) Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 1-10, # (3) Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 1-11, # (4) Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 12-24, # (5) Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 25-26, # (6) Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 27, # (7) Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 28, # (8) Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 29, # (9) Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 30, # (10) Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 31, # (11) Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 32-38, # (12) Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 39, # (13) Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 40-45, # (14) Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 46, # (15) Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 47, # (16) Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 48-54, # (17) Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 55, # (18) Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 56-58, # (19) Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 59, # (20) Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 60-73, # (21) Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 74, # (22) Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 75-78, # (23) Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 79, # (24) Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 80, # (25) Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 81, # (26) Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 82, # (27) Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 83-88, # (28) Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 89, # (29) Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 90, # (30) Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 91, # (31) Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 92, # (32) Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 93-97, # (33) Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 98, # (34) Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 99-104, # (35) Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. A-Z & AA, # (36) Appendix A, # (37) Appendix B)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2469 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: 1/12/2018 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBITS re [2466] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Offer of Proof Regarding Defendants' Discovery Misconduct filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 94, # (2) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 95, # (3) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 96, # (4) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 97, # (5) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 99, # (6) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 100, # (7) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 101, # (8) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 102, # (9) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 103, # (10) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 104, # (11) Exhibit SEALED Ex. A, # (12) Exhibit SEALED Ex. AA, # (13) Exhibit SEALED Ex. B, # (14) Exhibit SEALED Ex. C, # (15) Exhibit SEALED Ex. D, # (16) Exhibit SEALED Ex. E, # (17) Exhibit SEALED Ex. F, # (18) Exhibit SEALED Ex. G, # (19) Exhibit SEALED Ex. H, # (20) Exhibit SEALED Ex. I, # (21) Exhibit SEALED Ex. J, # (22) Exhibit SEALED Ex. K, # (23) Exhibit SEALED Ex. L, # (24) Exhibit SEALED Ex. M, # (25) Exhibit SEALED Ex. N, # (26) Exhibit SEALED Ex. P, # (27) Exhibit SEALED Ex. Q, # (28) Exhibit SEALED Ex. R, # (29) Exhibit SEALED Ex. S, # (30) Exhibit SEALED Ex. T, # (31) Exhibit SEALED Ex. U, # (32) Exhibit SEALED Ex. V, # (33) Exhibit SEALED Ex. W, # (34) Exhibit SEALED Ex. Y, # (35) Exhibit SEALED Ex. Z)(Related document(s)[2466]) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2468 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: 1/12/2018 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXHIBITS re [2466] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Offer of Proof Regarding Defendants' Discovery Misconduct filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 61, # (2) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 62, # (3) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 63, # (4) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 64, # (5) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 65, # (6) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 66, # (7) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 67, # (8) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 68, # (9) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 69, # (10) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 70, # (11) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 71, # (12) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 72, # (13) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 73, # (14) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 75, # (15) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 76, # (16) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 77, # (17) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 78, # (18) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 83, # (19) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 84, # (20) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 85, # (21) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 86, # (22) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 87, # (23) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 88, # (24) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 90)(Related document(s)[2466]) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2467 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: 1/12/2018 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EXHIBITS re [2466] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Offer of Proof Regarding Defendants' Discovery Misconduct filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 32, # (2) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 33, # (3) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 34, # (4) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 35, # (5) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 36, # (6) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 37, # (7) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 38, # (8) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 40, # (9) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 41, # (10) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 42, # (11) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 43, # (12) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 44, # (13) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 45, # (14) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 48, # (15) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 49, # (16) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 50, # (17) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 51, # (18) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 52, # (19) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 53, # (20) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 54, # (21) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 56, # (22) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 57, # (23) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 58)(Related document(s)[2466]) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2466 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: 1/12/2018, Terminated: 2/9/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Offer of Proof Regarding Defendants' Discovery Misconduct filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Lindsay Cooper in Support of Waymo's Motion to Seal, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) SEALED Waymo's Offer of Proof, # (4) PUBLIC Waymo's Offer of Proof, # (5) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 1, # (6) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 2, # (7) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 3, # (8) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 4, # (9) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 5, # (10) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 6, # (11) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 7, # (12) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 8, # (13) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 9, # (14) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 10, # (15) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 12, # (16) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 13, # (17) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 14, # (18) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 15, # (19) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 16, # (20) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 17, # (21) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 18, # (22) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 19, # (23) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 20, # (24) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 21, # (25) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 22, # (26) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 23, # (27) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 24)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2465 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: 1/11/2018 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2464 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: 1/11/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER AMENDING DKT. NO. 2460 ORDER RE: WAYMO'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 1/11/2018. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2463 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: 1/11/2018 Order on Motion for reconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting [2433] Motion for Reconsideration. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2462 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: 1/9/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE AND ORDER RE SEATING IN GALLERY. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/9/2018. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2461 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: 1/9/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER RE: IN CAMERA REVIEW. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 1/9/2018. (ahmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2460 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: 1/9/2018 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying [2441] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2459 Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: 1/8/2018 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EXHIBITS re [2451] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal -- Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2451-5], # (2) Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2451-5], # (3) Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2451-6], # (4) Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2451-6])(Related document(s)[2451]) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/8/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2458 Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: 1/8/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER REGARDING WAYMOS IDENTIFICATION OF DOCUMENTS FOR THE COURTS IN CAMERA REVIEW. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on January 8, 2018. (jsclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2457 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: 1/5/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Waymo LLC re [2454] Order Waymo's Notice of Redacted Pages for In Camera Review (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/5/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 2456 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: 1/5/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Clarifying Docket No.[2454]. Uber shall provide the Court with unredacted copies of those Waymo-identified 50 pages that identify the redacted portions by 5:00 p.m. on Monday, January 8, 2018. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on January 5, 2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jsclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2455 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: 1/4/2018 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBITS re [2451] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) [UNREDACTED] Exhibit J to the Declaration of Esther Kim Chang (corrected highlighted version of 2451-8), # (2) [UNREDACTED] Exhibit K to the Declaration of Esther Kim Chang (corrected highlighted version of 2451-9), # (3) [UNREDACTED] Exhibit O to the Declaration of Esther Kim Chang (corrected highlighted version of 2451-13))(Related document(s)[2451]) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/4/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2454 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: 1/4/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 1/4/2018. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2453 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: 1/4/2018 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. re [2451] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Yang, Michelle) (Filed on 1/4/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2452 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: 1/4/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Esther Kim Chang in Support of [2450] Discovery Letter Brief Responding to Waymo's Motion to Compel Ric Jacobs-related discovery (Dkt. 2442) filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L, # (13) Exhibit M, # (14) Exhibit N, # (15) Exhibit O)(Related document(s)[2450]) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/4/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2451 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: 1/4/2018, Terminated: 2/9/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michelle Yang, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) [UNREDACTED] Exhibit B to the Declaration of Esther Kim Chang, # (4) [UNREDACTED] Exhibit E to the Declaration of Esther Kim Chang, # (5) [UNREDACTED] Exhibit G to the Declaration of Esther Kim Chang, # (6) [UNREDACTED] Exhibit H to the Declaration of Esther Kim Chang, # (7) [UNREDACTED] Exhibit I to the Declaration of Esther Kim Chang, # (8) [UNREDACTED] Exhibit J to the Declaration of Esther Kim Chang, # (9) [UNREDACTED] Exhibit K to the Declaration of Esther Kim Chang, # (10) [UNREDACTED] Exhibit L to the Declaration of Esther Kim Chang, # (11) [UNREDACTED] Exhibit M to the Declaration of Esther Kim Chang, # (12) [UNREDACTED] Exhibit N to the Declaration of Esther Kim Chang, # (13) [UNREDACTED] Exhibit O to the Declaration of Esther Kim Chang)(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/4/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2450 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: 1/4/2018, Terminated: 1/4/2018 Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Discovery Letter Brief Responding to Waymo's Motion to Compel Ric Jacobs-related discovery (Dkt. 2442) filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/4/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2449 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: 1/3/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PENULTIMATE JURY INSTRUCTIONS ON TRADE SECRET MISAPPROPRIATION and [PROPOSED] SPECIAL VERDICT FORM. Deadline: NOON on 1/29/2018. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/3/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Special Verdict Form)(whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2448 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: 1/3/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER RE: RESPONSE TO WAYMO'S LETTER BRIEF RE: OUTSTANDING DISCOVERY ISSUES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 1/3/2018. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2447 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: 1/3/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER RE FORTHCOMING OFFER OF PROOF AND RESPONSE THERETO. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/3/2018. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2446 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: 1/2/2018 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS re [2441] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff Waymo LLC's Letter Brief Regarding Outstanding Discovery Issues filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Revised Unredacted Version of [2441-5], # (2) Revised Unredacted Version of [2441-9], # (3) Revised Unredacted Version of [2441-11], # (4) Revised Unredacted Version of [2441-15])(Related document(s)[2441]) (Pardini, Thomas) (Filed on 1/2/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2445 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: 1/2/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER CLARIFYING [2402] PRIOR ORDER DATED DECEMBER 15, 2017. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/2/2018. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2444 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: 12/29/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE AND ORDER RE [2396] SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/29/2017. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2443 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: 12/29/2017 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re [2441] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff Waymo LLC's Letter Brief Regarding Outstanding Discovery Issues (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2442 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: 12/29/2017, Terminated: 1/4/2018 Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Discovery Letter BriefPlaintiff Waymo LLC's Letter Brief Regarding Outstanding Discovery Issues filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L, # (13) Exhibit M, # (14) Exhibit N, # (15) Exhibit O)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2441 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: 12/29/2017, Terminated: 1/9/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff Waymo LLC's Letter Brief Regarding Outstanding Discovery Issues filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Lindsay Cooper in support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) REDACTED Version of Plaintiff Waymo LLC's Letter Brief Regarding Outstanding Discovery Issues, # (4) SEALED Version of Plaintiff Waymo LLC's Letter Brief Regarding Outstanding Discovery Issues, # (5) SEALED Ex. B, # (6) SEALED Ex. C, # (7) SEALED Ex. D, # (8) SEALED Ex. E, # (9) SEALED Ex. F, # (10) SEALED Ex. G, # (11) SEALED Ex. H, # (12) SEALED Ex. I, # (13) SEALED Ex. L, # (14) SEALED Ex. N, # (15) SEALED Ex. O)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2440 Filed: 12/26/2017, Entered: 12/26/2017 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBITS re [2425] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Reply Submission to Special Master Cooper Regarding Uber's Obligation to Produce Jacobs Letter and Related Documents --Declaration of Michelle Yang ISO Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Revised Unredacted Version of [2425-4], # (2) Revised Unredacted Version of [2425-6], # (3) Revised Unredacted Version of [2425-10])(Related document(s)[2425]) (Yang, Michelle) (Filed on 12/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2439 Filed: 12/26/2017, Entered: 12/26/2017 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBITS re [2419] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Letter Brief Regarding Outstanding Discovery Items --Declaration of Michelle Yang ISO Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Revised Unredacted Version of [2419-8], # (2) Revised Unredacted Version of [2419-9], # (3) Revised Unredacted Version of [2419-11], # (4) Revised Unredacted Version of [2419-12])(Related document(s)[2419]) (Yang, Michelle) (Filed on 12/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2438 Filed: 12/26/2017, Entered: 12/26/2017 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Thomas J. Pardini in Support of [2411] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Response to Defendants' Brief Re Unjust Enrichment Per the Court's Order (Dkt. 2409) filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s)[2411]) (Pardini, Thomas) (Filed on 12/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2437 Filed: 12/26/2017, Entered: 12/26/2017 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBITS re [2434] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Uber's Response to Special Master's Recommendation -- Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) REVISED REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2434-4], # (2) REVISED SEALED Version of Dkt. [2434-4], # (3) REVISED REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2434-7], # (4) REVISED SEALED Version of Dkt. [2434-7], # (5) REVISED REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2434-8], # (6) REVISED SEALED Version of Dkt. [2434-8])(Related document(s)[2434]) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2436 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: 12/22/2017 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. re [2434] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Uber's Response to Special Master's Recommendation (Yang, Michelle) (Filed on 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2435 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: 12/22/2017 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to re [2396] Special Masters Order by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Esther Kim Chang, # (2) Exhibit A (REDACTED), # (3) Exhibit B (REDACTED), # (4) Exhibit C (REDACTED), # (5) Exhibit D (REDACTED))(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2434 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: 12/22/2017, Terminated: 2/9/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Uber's Response to Special Master's Recommendation filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michelle Yang, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Redacted Version of Uber's Response to Special Master's Recommendation, # (4) Unredacted Version of Uber's Response to Special Master's Recommendation, # (5) Unredacted Version of Ex. A to Chang Decl., # (6) Unredacted Version of Ex. B to Chang Decl., # (7) Unredacted Version of Ex. C to Chang Decl., # (8) Unredacted Version of Ex. D to Chang Decl.)(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2433 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: 12/21/2017, Terminated: 1/11/2018 Motion for reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Reconsideration re [2393] Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Declaration of Michelle Yang, # (3) Exhibit 1 (REDACTED), # (4) Exhibit 2 (REDACTED))(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2432 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: 12/21/2017 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBITS re [1096] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Letter Brief in support of Motion to Compel Depositions --Motion for Reconsideration of Order Docket No. [2393] filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Declaration of Michelle Yang, # (3) Redacted Version of Ex. 1, # (4) Unredacted Version of Ex. 1, # (5) Redacted Version of Ex. 2, # (6) Unredacted Version of Ex. 2)(Related document(s)[1096]) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2431 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: 12/21/2017 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBITS re [2406] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Submission in Response to the Court's Order Requiring Further Response re: Unjust Enrichment (Dkt. 2404) --Declaration of Michelle Yang ISO Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Revised Unredacted Version of [2406-4], # (2) Revised Unredacted Version of [2406-5])(Related document(s)[2406]) (Yang, Michelle) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2430 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: 12/21/2017 Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REDACTION to [2393] Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Public Refilings Pursuant to LR 79-5(f) -- PUBLIC REDACTED Version of Dkt. [1048-4] by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) PUBLIC REDACTED Version of Dkt. [1048-7], # (2) PUBLIC REDACTED Version of Dkt. [1048-9], # (3) PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [1059-4], # (4) PUBLIC REDACTED Version of Dkt. [1088-2], # (5) PUBLIC REDACTED Version of Dkt. [1106-2], # (6) PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [1085-7], # (7) PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [1085-9], # (8) PUBLIC REDACTED Version of Dkt. [1085-15], # (9) PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [1085-19], # (10) PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [1085-21], # (11) PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [1089-4], # (12) PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [1089-10], # (13) PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [1096-6], # (14) PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [1096-8], # (15) PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [1096-13], # (16) PUBLIC REDACTED Version of Dkt. [1098-4], # (17) PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [1098-18], # (18) PUBLIC REDACTED Version of Dkt. [1169-2], # (19) PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [1117-14])(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2429 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: 12/21/2017 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBITS re [1080] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants Uber Technologies Inc.'s and Ottomotto LLC's Motion to Compel Production of Documents, [1098] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits in Support of Waymo's Opposition to Otto Trucking's Motion to Compel a Second Deposition of Larry Page, [1068] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of its Motion to Compel Deposition of Larry Page, [1048] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Brief in Opposition to [1032] Uber Motion to Compel -- Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Waymo's Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A SEALED - Revised sealed version of Dkt. [1048-4], # (2) Exhibit B SEALED - Revised sealed version of Dkt. [1048-9], # (3) Exhibit C SEALED - Revised sealed version of Dkt. [1114-2], # (4) Exhibit D SEALED - Revised sealed version of Dkt. [1114-5], # (5) Exhibit E SEALED - Revised sealed version of Dkt. [1068-11], # (6) Exhibit F SEALED - Revised sealed version of Dkt. [1105-4], # (7) Exhibit G SEALED - Revised sealed version of Dkt. [1105-8], # (8) Exhibit H SEALED - Revised sealed version of Dkt. [1098-4])(Related document(s)[1080], [1098], [1068], [1048]) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2428 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: 12/21/2017, Terminated: 1/16/2018 Motion for reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Reconsideration re [2393] Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Felipe Corredor, # (2) Declaration of Serge A. Voronov, # (3) Proposed Order)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2427 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: 12/21/2017 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re [2425] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Reply Submission to Special Master Cooper Regarding Uber's Obligation to Produce Jacobs Letter and Related Documents (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2426 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: 12/21/2017 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY (re [2368] Discovery Letter BriefREDACTED Version of Waymo's Submission to Special Master Cooper re Uber's Obligation to Produce Jacobs Letter and Related Documents ) -- REDACTED filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 17 PLACEHOLDER, # (2) Exhibit 18, # (3) Exhibit 19-24 PLACEHOLDERS)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2425 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: 12/21/2017, Terminated: 2/9/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Reply Submission to Special Master Cooper Regarding Uber's Obligation to Produce Jacobs Letter and Related Documents filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Lindsay Cooper ISO Waymo's AMTFUS, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) REDACTED Version of Waymo's Reply Submission to Special Master Cooper Regarding Uber's Obligation to Produce Jacobs Letter and Related Documents, # (4) SEALED Version of Waymo's Reply Submission to Special Master Cooper Regarding Uber's Obligation to Produce Jacobs Letter and Related Documents, # (5) Exhibit 17 SEALED, # (6) Exhibit 19 SEALED, # (7) Exhibit 20 SEALED, # (8) Exhibit 21 SEALED, # (9) Exhibit 22 SEALED, # (10) Exhibit 23 SEALED, # (11) Exhibit 24 SEALED)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2424 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: 12/21/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER ON ATTORNEY-CLIENT COMMUNICATION PURSUANT TO RULE 502. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 12/21/2017. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2423 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: 12/20/2017 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. re [2418] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Uber's Discovery Letter Brief filed pursuant to [2415] (Yang, Michelle) (Filed on 12/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2422 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: 12/20/2017, Terminated: 12/21/2017 Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Discovery Letter Brief filed pursuant to Order [2415] (REDACTED) filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2421 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: 12/20/2017 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re [2419] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Letter Brief Regarding Outstanding Discovery Items (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2420 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: 12/20/2017, Terminated: 12/21/2017 Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Discovery Letter BriefRegarding Outstanding Discovery Items (Redacted Version) filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3 PLACEHOLDER, # (4) Exhibit 4 PLACEHOLDER, # (5) Exhibit 5 PLACEHOLDER, # (6) Exhibit 6 PLACEHOLDER, # (7) Exhibit 7 PLACEHOLDER, # (8) Exhibit 8 PLACEHOLDER, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11 PLACEHOLDER, # (12) Exhibit 12 PLACEHOLDER, # (13) Exhibit 13 PLACEHOLDER)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2419 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: 12/20/2017, Terminated: 2/9/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Letter Brief Regarding Outstanding Discovery Items filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Lindsay Cooper ISO Waymo's AMTFUS, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) SEALED Waymo's Letter Brief re Outstanding Discovery Issues, # (4) PUBLIC Redacted Waymo's Letter Brief re Outstanding Discovery Issues, # (5) Exhibit 1 SEALED, # (6) Exhibit 3 SEALED, # (7) Exhibit 4 SEALED, # (8) Exhibit 5 SEALED, # (9) Exhibit 6 SEALED, # (10) Exhibit 7 SEALED, # (11) Exhibit 8 SEALED, # (12) Exhibit 11 SEALED, # (13) Exhibit 12 SEALED, # (14) Exhibit 13 SEALED)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2418 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: 12/20/2017, Terminated: 2/9/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Uber's Discovery Letter Brief filed pursuant to [2415] filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michelle Yang, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Redacted Version of Uber's Discovery Letter Brief, # (4) Unredacted Version of Uber's Discovery Letter Brief)(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2417 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: 12/20/2017 Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTION to [2387] Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,,,,, Public Refilings Pursuant to LR 79-5(f) -- PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [1784-4] by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [1784-5], # (2) PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [1784-6], # (3) PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [1784-7], # (4) PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [2022-1])(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2416 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: 12/20/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Waymo LLC Notice of Withdrawal of Joshua Sohn as Cousnel for Plaintiff Waymo LLC (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2415 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: 12/20/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 12/20/2017. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2414 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: 12/19/2017 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re [2411] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Response to Defendants' Brief Re Unjust Enrichment Per the Court's Order (Dkt. 2409) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2413 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: 12/19/2017 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to re [2409] Order DEFENDANTS UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. AND OTTOMOTTO LLC'S FURTHER RESPONSE REGARDING PRESERVATION OF UNJUST ENRICHMENT BASED ON ACQUISITION by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2412 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: 12/19/2017 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to re [2409] Order Waymo's Response to Defendants' Brief Re Unjust Enrichment Per the Court's Order (Dkt. 2409) by Waymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2411 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: 12/19/2017, Terminated: 2/9/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Response to Defendants' Brief Re Unjust Enrichment Per the Court's Order (Dkt. 2409) filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Lindsay Cooper in Support of Waymo's Motion to Seal, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) SEALED Waymo's Response, # (4) PUBLIC Waymo's Response)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2410 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: 12/18/2017 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EXHIBITS re [2378] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Letter Brief for Telephonic Hearing -- Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2378-6], # (2) Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2378-6])(Related document(s)[2378]) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2409 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: 12/18/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REQUEST FOR RESPONSE: DEADLINE: NOON ON 12/19/2017. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 12/18/2017. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2408 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: 12/18/2017 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re [2406] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Submission in Response to the Court's Order Requiring Further Response re: Unjust Enrichment (Dkt. 2404) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2407 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: 12/18/2017 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to re [2404] Order Waymo's Submission in Response to the Court's Order Requiring Further Response re: Unjust Enrichment (Dkt. 2404) by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Jeff Nardinelli in Support of Waymo's Submission, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2406 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: 12/18/2017, Terminated: 2/9/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Submission in Response to the Court's Order Requiring Further Response re: Unjust Enrichment (Dkt. 2404) filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Lindsay Cooper in Support of Waymo's Motion to Seal, # (2) SEALED Version of Waymo's Submission, # (3) PUBLIC REDACTED Version of Waymo's Submission, # (4) SEALED Ex. 1, # (5) SEALED Ex. 2, # (6) SEALED Ex. 3, # (7) Proposed Order)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2405 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: 12/18/2017 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to re [2404] Order by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2404 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: 12/15/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER REQUIRING FURTHER RESPONSE RE UNJUST ENRICHMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/15/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2403 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: 12/15/2017 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXHIBITS re [2367] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Submission to Special Master Cooper re Uber's Obligation to Produce Jacobs Letter and Related Documents --DECLARATION OF MICHELLE YANG IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Revised Unredacted Version of [2367-6], # (2) Revised Unredacted Version of [2367-18], # (3) Revised Unredacted Version of [2367-23])(Related document(s)[2367]) (Yang, Michelle) (Filed on 12/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2402 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: 12/15/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER RE DEADLINE TO FILE OBJECTIONS TO OR MOTIONS REGARDING [2396] SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/15/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2401 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: 12/15/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER AND PUBLIC REFILING OF DKT. NO. 2307-2 PURSUANT TO ORDERS DATED [2307] NOVEMBER 29 AND [2382] DECEMBER 13. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/15/2017. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A) (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2400 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: 12/15/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION [2399]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 12/15/2017. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2399 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: 12/15/2017 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter from Non-party Richard Jacobs to Magistrate Judge Corley. (Boersch, Martha) (Filed on 12/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2398 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: 12/15/2017 proposed jury instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Jury Instructions by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. DEFENDANTS UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. AND OTTOMOTTO LLC'S SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF ON JURY INSTRUCTIONS. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2397 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: 12/15/2017 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to re [2362] Order -- Waymo's Submission In Response To Order Requiring Further Responses on Jury Instructions Re: Damages by Waymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2396 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: 12/15/2017 Special Masters Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Special Masters Order Report of the Special Master Regarding the Jacobs Materials. (Cooper, John) (Filed on 12/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2395 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: 12/14/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Transcript of Digital Audio Recording of Proceedings held on 12/13/2017, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [2392] Transcript Order, [2390] Transcript Order, [2391] Transcript Order ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/16/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/14/2018. (Related documents(s) [2392], [2390], [2391]) (zinnlr62S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2394 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: 12/14/2017 Order on Motion for reconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting [2364] Motion for Reconsideration OF ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL (DKT. 2326). (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2393 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: 12/14/2017 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting [1031] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1048] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part [1059] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1068] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1080] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part [1085] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part [1089] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1096] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part [1098] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1117] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2392 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: 12/13/2017 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/13/2017 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Waymo LLC, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Perlson, David) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2391 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: 12/13/2017 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on December 13, 2017 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by John Lee Cooper, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Cooper, John) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2390 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: 12/13/2017 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on December 13, 2017 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2389 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: 12/13/2017 Order on Motion for reconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting [2317] MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL (DKT. 2237). (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 2388 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: 12/13/2017 discovery hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 12/13/2017. (FTR Time: 2:02-3:00.)Attorneys for Plaintiff: James Baker; Melissa Baily; David Perlson; Andrea Roberts; Patrick Schmidt.Attorneys for Defendant: Karen Dunn; Arturo Gonzalez; Martha Goodman; Shawn Rabin; Sylvia Rivera. Special Master: John Cooper.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/13/2017) Modified on 12/14/2017 (ahm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/14/2017: Matter transcribed by Lydia Zinn (Zinn Reporting). (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2387 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: 12/13/2017 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting [1670] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1784] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting [1893] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part [1994] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting [2017] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2386 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: 12/13/2017 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [2378] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Letter Brief for Telephonic Hearing ) Waymo's Response to Uber Letter Brief Regarding Jacobs-Related Discovery filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Andrea Roberts ISO Waymo's Letter Brief re Jacobs-Related Discovery, # (2) Exhibit 11)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2385 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: 12/13/2017 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                (PUBLIC REFILING OF [2283] pursuant to [2307]) LETTER OBJECTION FROM RICHARD JACOBS DATED NOVEMBER 27, 2017. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2384 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: 12/13/2017 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  (PUBLIC REFILING OF [2307] pursuant to [2307]) LETTER FROM OFFICE OF UNITED STATES ATTORNEY DATED NOVEMBER 28, 2017. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2383 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: 12/13/2017 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    (PUBLIC REFILING OF [2260] pursuant to [2307]) LETTER FROM OFFICE OF UNITED STATES ATTORNEY DATED NOVEMBER 22, 2017. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2382 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: 12/13/2017 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER RE [2373][2374][2381] REQUESTS FOR ADDITIONAL REDACTIONS TO JACOBS LETTER by Judge Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2381 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: 12/12/2017, Terminated: 12/13/2017 Motion for reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Reconsideration re [2307] Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, Request for Additional Redaction of Dkt. 2307-2 filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2380 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: 12/12/2017 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. re [2378] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Letter Brief for Telephonic Hearing (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2379 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: 12/12/2017, Terminated: 12/13/2017 Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Discovery Letter Brief for Telephonic Hearing filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 (slipsheet), # (2) Exhibit 2 (slipsheet))(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2378 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: 12/12/2017, Terminated: 2/9/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Letter Brief for Telephonic Hearing filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michelle Yang, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Redacted Version of Defendants' Letter Brief for Telephonic Hearing, # (4) Unredacted Version of Defendants' Letter Brief for Telephonic Hearing, # (5) Unredacted Version of Ex. 1, # (6) Unredacted Version of Ex. 2)(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2377 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: 12/12/2017 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re [2376] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Letter Brief Regarding Jacobs-Related Discovery (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 2376 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: 12/12/2017, Terminated: 2/9/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Letter Brief Regarding Jacobs-Related Discovery filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Lindsay Cooper In Support of Sealing, # (2) Proposed Order Granting Sealing Motion, # (3) Letter Brief, # (4) Declaration In Support Of Letter Brief, # (5) Exhibit 1, # (6) Exhibit 2, # (7) Exhibit 3, # (8) Exhibit 4, # (9) Exhibit 5, # (10) Exhibit 6, # (11) Exhibit 7, # (12) Exhibit 8, # (13) Exhibit 9 (SEALED), # (14) Exhibit 10)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2375 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: 12/12/2017 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBITS re [2352] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Uber's Response to Waymo's Submission to Special Master Cooper Re the Jacobs Documents -- Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2352-6], # (2) Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2352-6], # (3) Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2352-7], # (4) Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2352-7], # (5) Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2352-8], # (6) Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2352-8], # (7) Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2352-15], # (8) Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2352-15], # (9) Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2352-16], # (10) Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2352-16], # (11) Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2352-17], # (12) Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2352-17], # (13) Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2353], # (14) Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2353])(Related document(s)[2352]) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2374 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: 12/12/2017, Terminated: 12/13/2017 Motion for reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Reconsideration re [2307] Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, filed by Richard Jacobs. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Martha Boersch, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Proposed Order)(Boersch, Martha) (Filed on 12/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2373 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: 12/12/2017, Terminated: 12/13/2017 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Richard Jacobs. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Martha Boersch, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D, # (6) Proposed Order)(Boersch, Martha) (Filed on 12/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2372 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: 12/12/2017 Order on Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting [1810] Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 2371 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: 12/12/2017 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDUING TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY HEARING. Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 12/13/2017 at 02:00 PM in Chambers-SF before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2017) Modified on 12/12/2017 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2370 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: 12/12/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER ON ATTORNEY-CLIENT COMMUNICATION PURSUANT TO RULE 502. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 12/12/2017. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2369 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: 12/11/2017 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re [2367] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Submission to Special Master Cooper re Uber's Obligation to Produce Jacobs Letter and Related Documents (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2368 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: 12/11/2017, Terminated: 2/1/2018 Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Discovery Letter BriefREDACTED Version of Waymo's Submission to Special Master Cooper re Uber's Obligation to Produce Jacobs Letter and Related Documents filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 PLACEHOLDER, # (2) Exhibit 2 PLACEHOLDER, # (3) Exhibit 3 REDACTED, # (4) Exhibit 4 REDACTED, # (5) Exhibit 5 REDACTED, # (6) Exhibit 6 REDACTED, # (7) Exhibit 7 REDACTED, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10 REDACTED, # (11) Exhibit 11 REDACTED, # (12) Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit 13 REDACTED, # (14) Exhibit 14 PLACEHOLDER, # (15) Exhibit 15, # (16) Exhibit 16)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2367 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: 12/11/2017, Terminated: 2/9/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Submission to Special Master Cooper re Uber's Obligation to Produce Jacobs Letter and Related Documents filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Lindsay Cooper ISO Waymo's AMTFUS, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) REDACTED Version of Waymo's Submission to Special Master Cooper re Uber's Obligation to Produce Jacobs Letter and Related Documents, # (4) SEALED Version of Waymo's Submission to Special Master Cooper re Uber's Obligation to Produce Jacobs Letter and Related Documents, # (5) Exhibit 1 SEALED, # (6) Exhibit 2 SEALED, # (7) Exhibit 3 REDACTED, # (8) Exhibit 3 SEALED, # (9) Exhibit 4 REDACTED, # (10) Exhibit 4 SEALED, # (11) Exhibit 5 REDACTED, # (12) Exhibit 5 SEALED, # (13) Exhibit 6 REDACTED, # (14) Exhibit 6 SEALED, # (15) Exhibit 7 REDACTED, # (16) Exhibit 7 SEALED, # (17) Exhibit 10 REDACTED, # (18) Exhibit 10 SEALED, # (19) Exhibit 11 REDACTED, # (20) Exhibit 11 SEALED, # (21) Exhibit 13 REDACTED, # (22) Exhibit 13 SEALED, # (23) Exhibit 14 SEALED)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2366 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: 12/11/2017 Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTION to [2326] Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, --PUBLIC Version Dkt. [1143-4] by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [1143-7], # (2) PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [1143-8], # (3) Revised Redacted Version of Dkt. [1143-10], # (4) PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [1145-6])(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2365 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: 12/11/2017 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBITS re [1214] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Uber's and Ottomotto's Mot. to Compel Responses to Document Requests and Interrogatories, Enforce Court Order, and Compel 30(b)(6) Testimony -- Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Waymo's Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A SEALED - Revised sealed version of Dkt. [1294-4], # (2) Exhibit B SEALED - Revised sealed version of Dkt. [1294-14])(Related document(s)[1214]) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2364 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: 12/11/2017, Terminated: 12/14/2017 Motion for reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Reconsideration re [2326] Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Felipe Corredor ISO Waymo's Motion for Reconsideration, # (2) Proposed Order)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2363 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: 12/11/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 502, FED. R. EV. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 12/11/2017. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2362 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: 12/11/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER REQUIRING FURTHER RESPONSES ON JURY INSTRUCTIONS RE DAMAGES (re [2350][2351]). Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/11/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2361 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: 12/11/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER RE COMMUNICATION FROM ATTORNEY ESTHER CHANG. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/11/2017. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2360 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: 12/8/2017 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBITS re [2327] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Response to Court Inquiry Regarding Uber's Failure to Produce Jacobs Letter and Email filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Revised Unredacted Version of [2327-10], # (2) Revised Unredacted Version of [2327-11])(Related document(s)[2327]) (Pardini, Thomas) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2359 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: 12/8/2017 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. re [2352] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Uber's Response to Waymo's Submission to Special Master Cooper Re the Jacobs Documents, [2353] Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, (Pardini, Thomas) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2358 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: 12/8/2017 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Marcie Brimer in Support of [2354] Response ( Non Motion ) Waymo's Submission to Special Master Cooper Regarding the Jacobs Documents (REDACTED) filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (REDACTED), # (2) Exhibit B (REDACTED), # (3) Exhibit C (REDACTED), # (4) Exhibit D (REDACTED), # (5) Exhibit E (REDACTED))(Related document(s)[2354]) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2357 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: 12/8/2017 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Samuel Cortina in Support of [2354] Response ( Non Motion ) Waymo's Submission to Special Master Cooper Regarding the Jacobs Documents (REDACTED) filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (REDACTED), # (2) Exhibit B (REDACTED), # (3) Exhibit C (REDACTED), # (4) Exhibit D (REDACTED))(Related document(s)[2354]) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2356 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: 12/8/2017 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Maxwell Pritt in Support of [2354] Response ( Non Motion ) to Waymo's Submission to Special Master Cooper Regarding the Jacobs Documents filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (REDACTED), # (2) Exhibit B)(Related document(s)[2354]) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2355 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: 12/8/2017 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Sylvia Rivera in Support of [2354] Response ( Non Motion ) to Waymo's Submission to Special Master Cooper Regarding the Jacobs Documents filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (REDACTED), # (2) Exhibit B (REDACTED), # (3) Exhibit C (REDACTED), # (4) Exhibit D (REDACTED), # (5) Exhibit E (REDACTED), # (6) Exhibit F (REDACTED), # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I (REDACTED), # (10) Exhibit J (REDACTED), # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L (REDACTED), # (13) Exhibit M (REDACTED), # (14) Exhibit N (REDACTED), # (15) Exhibit O (REDACTED), # (16) Exhibit P (REDACTED), # (17) Exhibit Q, # (18) Exhibit R)(Related document(s)[2354]) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2354 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: 12/8/2017 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Waymo's Submission to Special Master Cooper Regarding the Jacobs Documents (REDACTED) by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2353 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: 12/8/2017 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EXHIBITS re [2352] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Uber's Response to Waymo's Submission to Special Master Cooper Re the Jacobs Documents --Unredacted Version of Ex. A to Pritt Decl. filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Unredacted Version of Ex. A to Cortina Decl., # (2) Unredacted Version of Ex. B to Cortina Decl., # (3) Unredacted Version of Ex. C to Cortina Decl., # (4) Unredacted Version of Ex. D to Cortina Decl., # (5) Unredacted Version of Ex. A to Brimer Decl., # (6) Unredacted Version of Ex. B to Brimer Decl., # (7) Unredacted Version of Ex. C to Brimer Decl., # (8) Unredacted Version of Ex. D to Brimer Decl., # (9) Unredacted Version of Ex. E to Brimer Decl.)(Related document(s)[2352]) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2352 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: 12/8/2017, Terminated: 2/9/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Uber's Response to Waymo's Submission to Special Master Cooper Re the Jacobs Documents filed by Ottomotto LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Thomas Pardini, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Redacted Version of Uber's Response to Waymo's Submission to Special Master Cooper Re the Jacobs Documents, # (4) Unredacted Version of Uber's Response to Waymo's Submission to Special Master Cooper Re the Jacobs Documents, # (5) Unredacted Version of Ex. A to Rivera Decl., # (6) Unredacted Version of Ex. B to Rivera Decl., # (7) Unredacted Version of Ex. C to Rivera Decl., # (8) Unredacted Version of Ex. D to Rivera Decl., # (9) Unredacted Version of Ex. E to Rivera Decl., # (10) Unredacted Version of Ex. F to Rivera Decl., # (11) Unredacted Version of Ex. I to Rivera Decl., # (12) Redacted Version of Ex. J to Rivera Decl., # (13) Unredacted Version of Ex. J to Rivera Decl., # (14) Unredacted Version of Ex. L to Rivera Decl., # (15) Unredacted Version of Ex. M to Rivera Decl., # (16) Unredacted Version of Ex. N to Rivera Decl., # (17) Unredacted Version of Ex. O to Rivera Decl., # (18) Unredacted Version of Ex. P to Rivera Decl.)(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2351 Filed: 12/7/2017, Entered: 12/7/2017 Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Supplemental Brief on Jury Instructions Regarding Unjust Enrichment and Reasonable Royalty Damages filed byWaymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/7/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2350 Filed: 12/7/2017, Entered: 12/7/2017 Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Supplemental Brief on Jury Instructions Regarding Reasonable Royalty filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 12/7/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2349 Filed: 12/7/2017, Entered: 12/7/2017 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBITS re [2322] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal -- Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2322-4], # (2) Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2322-4], # (3) Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2325], # (4) Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2325])(Related document(s)[2322]) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/7/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2348 Filed: 12/7/2017, Entered: 12/7/2017 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to re [2341] Order --Defendants' Response to Court's Inquiry Re Special Master's Report and Recommendation by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/7/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2347 Filed: 12/7/2017, Entered: 12/7/2017 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to re [2341] Order -- Waymo's Declination to Stipulate to the Special Master's Findings re the Jacobs Letter and Related Documents by Waymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/7/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2346 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: 12/6/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF INFORMATION PROVIDED TO DISTRICT COURT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/6/2017. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A) (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2345 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: 12/5/2017 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/04/2017 before Judge William Alsup by Travis Kalanick, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Haag, Melinda) (Filed on 12/5/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2344 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: 12/4/2017 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Thomas J. Pardini in Support of [2304] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Motion for Leave to Add Trial Witnesses filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s)[2304]) (Pardini, Thomas) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2343 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: 12/4/2017 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Thomas J. Pardini IN SUPPORT OF NON-PARTY RICHARD JACOBS' MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO FILE CORRESPONDENCE UNDER SEAL (DKT. 2299) filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Pardini, Thomas) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2342 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: 12/4/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript of Proceedings held on 12-4-2017, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [2330] Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/5/2018. (Related documents(s) [2330]) (pasdl50S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2341 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: 12/4/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED [2334] ORDER REFERRING ISSUE TO SPECIAL MASTER. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/4/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2340 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: 12/4/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER RE ROLLING, WRITTEN LIST OF NEXT SEVEN WITNESSES. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/4/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2339 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: 12/4/2017 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/4/2017 before Judge William Alsup by Otto Trucking LLC, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2338 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: 12/4/2017 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re [2327] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Response to Court Inquiry Regarding Uber's Failure to Produce Jacobs Letter and Email, [2336] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Response to Court Inquiry re: Any Use by Waymo of Ephemeral Communications and Non-Attributable Devices (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2337 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: 12/4/2017 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to re [2315] Order Waymo's Response to Court Inquiry re: Any Use by Waymo of Ephemeral Communications and Non-Attributable Devices by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Andrea Roberts in Support of Waymo's Response, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6, # (8) Exhibit 7, # (9) Exhibit 8, # (10) Exhibit 9, # (11) Exhibit 10, # (12) Exhibit 11)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2336 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: 12/4/2017, Terminated: 2/9/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Response to Court Inquiry re: Any Use by Waymo of Ephemeral Communications and Non-Attributable Devices filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Lindsay Cooper in Support of Waymo's Motion to Seal, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) SEALED Waymo's Response, # (4) PUBLIC Waymo's Response, # (5) SEALED Ex. 3, # (6) SEALED Ex. 4, # (7) SEALED Ex. 5, # (8) SEALED Ex. 6, # (9) SEALED Ex. 7, # (10) SEALED Ex. 8, # (11) SEALED Ex. 11)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2335 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: 12/4/2017 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/4/2017 before Judge William Alsup by Stroz Friedberg, LLC, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2334 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: 12/4/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER REFERRING ISSUE TO SPECIAL MASTER. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/4/2017. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2333 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: 12/4/2017 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on December 4, 2017 before Judge William Alsup by John Lee Cooper, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Cooper, John) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2332 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: 12/4/2017 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. re [2325] Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, [2322] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Yang, Michelle) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 2331 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: 12/4/2017 terminate deadlines and hearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Further Proceedings held on 12/4/2017. Special Master to decide whether documents stated on the record were required to be produced by Uber. Waymo must file its complete offer of proof by 1/12/2018; Response by Uber due 1/19/2018. Written Order to issue. Total Time in Court: 1 Hour; 20 Minutes. Court Reporter: Debra Pas. Plaintiff Attorneys: Charles Verhoeven, David Perlson, Melissa Baily, Andrea Roberts, Jim Baker, Jordan Jaffe. Defendant Attorneys: Arturo Gonzales, Bill Carmody, Michael Jacobs, Ester Chang, Meredith Dearborn.Special Master: John Cooper. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/4/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2330 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: 12/4/2017 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/04/2017 before Judge William Alsup by Waymo LLC, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Perlson, David) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2329 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: 12/4/2017 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on December 4, 2017 before Judge William Alsup by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2328 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: 12/4/2017 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to re [2315] Order Waymo's Response to Court Inquiry Regarding Uber's Failure to Produce Jacobs Letter and Email by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Andrea Roberts in Support of Waymo's Response, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6, # (8) Exhibit 7, # (9) Exhibit 8)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2327 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: 12/4/2017, Terminated: 2/9/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Response to Court Inquiry Regarding Uber's Failure to Produce Jacobs Letter and Email filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Andrea Roberts in Support of Waymo's Motion to Seal, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) SEALED Version of Waymo's Response, # (4) REDACTED Version of Waymo's Response, # (5) SEALED Exhibit 1, # (6) REDACTED Exhibit 1, # (7) SEALED Exhibit 2, # (8) REDACTED Exhibit 2, # (9) SEALED Exhibit 5, # (10) SEALED Exhibit 7, # (11) SEALED Exhibit 8)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2326 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: 12/4/2017 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part and denying in part [1120] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting [1126] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1143] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1145] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1147] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part [1150] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [1153] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part [1155] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part [1161] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting [1214] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ahmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2325 Filed: 12/3/2017, Entered: 12/3/2017 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBITS re [2322] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [Unredacted] Exhibit 5 to the Declaration of Matthew R. Berry filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s)[2322]) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/3/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2324 Filed: 12/3/2017, Entered: 12/3/2017 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Matthew R. Berry in Support of [2323] Opposition/Response to Motion filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6)(Related document(s)[2323]) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/3/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2323 Filed: 12/3/2017, Entered: 12/3/2017 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [2305] MOTION for Leave to Add ) filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/3/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2322 Filed: 12/3/2017, Entered: 12/3/2017, Terminated: 2/9/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michelle Yang, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) [Redacted] Opposition to Waymo's Motion to Supplement Its Trial Witness List, # (4) [Unredacted] Opposition to Waymo's Motion to Supplement Its Trial Witness List, # (5) [Redacted] Exhibit 6 to the Declaration of Matthew R. Berry, # (6) [Unredacted] Exhibit 6 to the Declaration of Matthew R. Berry)(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/3/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2321 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: 12/1/2017 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Michelle Yang in Support of [2281] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Response to Order re Letter from United States Attorney filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s)[2281]) (Yang, Michelle) (Filed on 12/1/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2320 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: 12/1/2017 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Thomas J. Pardini in Support of [2275] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal -- Exhibits in Support of Waymo's Motion to Exclude Defendants' Damages Expert Walter Bratic filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s)[2275]) (Pardini, Thomas) (Filed on 12/1/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2319 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: 12/1/2017 Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTION to [2237] Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Public Refilings Pursuant to LR 79-5(f) -- PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [1237-4] by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [1291-4], # (2) Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [1291-6], # (3) PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [1328-6], # (4) PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [1354-4], # (5) PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [1354-6], # (6) Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [1367-10], # (7) PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [1367-15], # (8) Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [1404-4]])(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/1/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2318 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: 12/1/2017 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBITS re [1278] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Discovery Letter Brief re Motion to Compel 30(b)(6) Topics, [1374] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc. And Ottomotto LLC's Opposition To Waymo's Motion To Compel Further 30(B)(6) Testimony, [1291] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Uber's Motion to Compel 30(b)(6) deposition, [1434] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Uber Technologies, Inc.'s and Ottomotto, LLC's Motiont to Compel Waymo to Supplement RFA & Interrogatory Responses and to Produce an Unredacted Document -- Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Waymo's Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) SEALED Exhibit A - Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [1434-6], # (2) SEALED Exhibit B - Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [1374-6], # (3) SEALED Exhibit C - Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [1374-8], # (4) SEALED Exhibit D - Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [1291-6], # (5) SEALED Exhibit E - Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [1278-17], # (6) SEALED Exhibit F - Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [1278-12])(Related document(s)[1278], [1374], [1291], [1434]) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/1/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2317 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: 12/1/2017, Terminated: 12/13/2017 Motion for reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Reconsideration re [2237] Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Waymo's Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # (2) Proposed Order)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/1/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2316 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: 12/1/2017 order on motion to strikeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER DENYING AS MOOT [2276] MOTION TO EXCLUDE WALTER BRATIC by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2315 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: 12/1/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AFTER EVIDENTIARY HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/1/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 2314 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: 12/1/2017 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING HEARING: Motion Hearing re [2276] MOTION TO STRIKE set for hearing on 12/4/2017 at 7:30 a.m. is vacated. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2313 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: 12/1/2017 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [2276] MOTION to Strike Waymo's Motion to Exclude Defendants' Damages Expert Walter Bratic ) filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 12/1/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2312 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: 12/1/2017 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on November 29, 2017 before Judge William Alsup by John Lee Cooper, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Cooper, John) (Filed on 12/1/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Hearing Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/30/2018 08:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Hearing Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/30/2018 08:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2311 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: 11/30/2017 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Thomas J. Pardini in Support of [2271] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Responsive Trial Brief filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s)[2271]) (Pardini, Thomas) (Filed on 11/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2310 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: 11/30/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transcript of Proceedings held on 11-29-2017, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporters Debra L. Pas, CRR and Katherine Sullivan, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2018. (pasdl50S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2309 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: 11/30/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Transcript of Proceedings held on 11-28-2017, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporters Debra L. Pas, CRR and Katherine Sullivan, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [2289] Transcript Order, [2288] Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2018. (Related documents(s) [2289], [2288]) (pasdl50S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 2308 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: 11/30/2017 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING BRIEFING RE: [2305] MOTION FOR LEAVE TO ADD TRIAL WITNESSES: Response is due by 12/3/2017, 12:00 noon. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2307 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: 11/29/2017 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE AND ORDER RE [2281][2283][2298][2299] SEALING OF LETTERS FROM OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY AND RICHARD JACOBS by Judge Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/29/2017: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B) (whalc2S, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2306 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: 11/29/2017 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re [2304] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Motion for Leave to Add Trial Witnesses (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2305 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: 11/29/2017, Terminated: 2/9/2018 Motion for Leave to File PSP
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Waymo's Motion for Leave to Add Trial Witnesses filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Jeff Nardinelli in Support of Waymo's Motion, # (2) Exhibit 1)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/29/2017) Modified on 11/30/2017 (afmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2304 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: 11/29/2017, Terminated: 2/9/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Motion for Leave to Add Trial Witnesses filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Lindsay Cooper in Support of Waymo's Motion to Seal, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) UNREDACTED Version of Waymo's Motion for Leave to Add Trial Witnesses, # (4) REDACTED Version of Waymo's Motion for Leave to Add Trial Witnesses)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2303 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: 11/29/2017 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/28/2017 before Judge William Alsup by Lyft, Inc., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 11/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2302 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: 11/29/2017 Evidentiary HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Evidentiary Hearing held on 11/29/2017. See log for details. Further proceedings set for 12/4/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. Jury Selection reset for 1/31/2018 07:30 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. Jury Trial reset for 2/5/2018 07:30 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. Total Time in Court: 3 Hours, 44 Minutes. Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan / Debra Pas. Plaintiff Attorneys: Charles Verhoeven, David Eiseman, Melissa Baily, David Perlson, Andrea Roberts, Jordan Jaffe. Defendant Attorneys: Arturo Gonzales, Bill Carmody, Meredith Dearborn, Michael Jacobs, Shawn Rabin, Joseph Grinstein, Matthew Berry, Karen Dunn, Michael Brille. Non Party Witnesses Attorney: Matthew UmhoferSpecial Master: John Cooper (Attachments: # (1) Trial Log)(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2301 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: 11/29/2017 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/29/2017 before Judge William Alsup by Stroz Friedberg, LLC, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 11/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2300 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: 11/28/2017 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Thomas J. Pardini in Support of [2265] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Reply In Support of its Motion for Jury Instruction Based on Spoliation filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s)[2265]) (Pardini, Thomas) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2299 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: 11/28/2017, Terminated: 11/29/2017 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Richard Jacobs. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Martha Boersch, # (2) Exhibit A to the Declaration of Martha Boersch, # (3) Exhibit B to the Declaration of Martha Boersch, # (4) Proposed Order)(Boersch, Martha) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2298 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: 11/28/2017, Terminated: 11/29/2017 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION TO DESIGNATE LETTER AS CONFIDENTIAL filed by Richard Jacobs. Responses due by 12/12/2017. Replies due by 12/19/2017. (Boersch, Martha) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2297 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: 11/28/2017 Evidentiary HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Evidentiary Hearing held on 11/28/2017. Motion Hearing held on 11/28/2017. Witnesses: Richard Jacobs and Edward Russo. Further Evidentiary Hearing set for 11/29/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. Motion taken under submission. Total Time in Court: 3 Hours; 53 Minutes. Court Reporters: Katherine Sullivan / Debra Pas. Plaintiff Attorneys: Charles Verhoeven, David Eiseman, Melissa Baily, David Perlson, Andrea Roberts, Jordan Jaffe.Intervenors Attorneys: Steven Zansberg (Associated Press); Carolyn Luedtke (Lyft)Non-Party Witness Attorney: Martha Boersch Defendant Attorneys: Arturo Gonzales, Bill Carmody, Sylvia Rivera, Meredith Dearborn, Michael Jacobs, Shawn Rabin, Joseph Grinstein, Matthew Berry, Karen Dunn, Michael Brille.Special Master: John Cooper (Attachments: # (1) Evidentiary Trial Log)(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2296 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: 11/28/2017 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on November 28-29, 2017 before Judge William Alsup by Gunderson Dettmer Stough Villeneuve Franklin & Hachigian, LLP, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Lemmer, Gregory) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2295 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: 11/28/2017 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/29/17 before Judge William Alsup by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2294 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: 11/28/2017 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/28/2017 and 11/29/2017 before Judge William Alsup by Waymo LLC, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Perlson, David) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2293 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: 11/28/2017 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/28/2017 before Judge William Alsup by Travis Kalanick, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Haag, Melinda) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2292 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: 11/28/2017 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/28/17 before Judge William Alsup by Otto Trucking LLC, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2291 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: 11/28/2017 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on November 28, 2017 before Judge William Alsup by John Lee Cooper, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Cooper, John) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2290 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: 11/28/2017 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/28/2017 before Judge William Alsup by Stroz Friedberg, LLC, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2289 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: 11/28/2017 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/28/2017 before Judge William Alsup by Waymo LLC, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Perlson, David) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2288 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: 11/28/2017 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/28/17 before Judge William Alsup by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2287 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: 11/28/2017 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting [2262] Stipulation REGARDING PUBLIC REFILING OF DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79.5 AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2286 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: 11/27/2017 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS re [2252] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal -- Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2252-3], # (2) Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2252-5], # (3) Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2252-5])(Related document(s)[2252]) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2285 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: 11/27/2017 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Thomas J. Pardini in Support of [2256] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Amended Joint Proposed Pre-Trial Order filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s)[2256]) (Pardini, Thomas) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2284 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: 11/27/2017 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re [2281] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Response to Order re Letter from United States Attorney (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2283 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: 11/27/2017, Terminated: 11/29/2017 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Richard Jacobs. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Martha Boersch, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Proposed Order)(Boersch, Martha) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2282 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: 11/27/2017 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to re [2269] Order, [2261] Order REDACTED Waymo's Response to Order re Letter from United States Attorney by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of John McCauley in support of Waymo's Response to Order re Letter from United States Attorney, # (2) Exhibit 1 Placeholder, # (3) Exhibit 2 Placeholder, # (4) Exhibit 3 Placeholder, # (5) Exhibit 4 Placeholder, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6 Placeholder, # (8) Exhibit 7, # (9) Exhibit 8 Placeholder)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2281 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: 11/27/2017, Terminated: 2/9/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Response to Order re Letter from United States Attorney filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Lindsay Cooper in support of Waymo's Motion to Seal, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) REDACTED Waymo's Response to Order re Letter from United States Attorney, # (4) SEALED Waymo's Response to Order re Letter from United States Attorney, # (5) Exhibit 1 SEALED, # (6) Exhibit 2 SEALED, # (7) Exhibit 3 SEALED, # (8) Exhibit 4 SEALED, # (9) Exhibit 5 REDACTED, # (10) Exhibit 5 SEALED, # (11) Exhibit 6 SEALED, # (12) Exhibit 8 SEALED)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2280 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: 11/27/2017 Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Supplemental Brief re [1822] MOTION Close Courtroom filed byWaymo LLC. (Related document(s)[1822]) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2279 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: 11/27/2017 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to re [2251] Order --Defendants' Critique of Revised Tentative Jury Instructions on Trade Secret Misappropriation by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2278 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: 11/27/2017 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to re [2251] Order -- Waymo's Critique of Revised Tentative Jury Instructions on Trade Secret Misappropriation and Revised Special Verdict Form by Waymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2277 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: 11/27/2017 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re [2275] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal -- Exhibits in Support of Waymo's Motion to Exclude Defendants' Damages Expert Walter Bratic (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2276 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: 11/27/2017, Terminated: 12/1/2017 Motion to strikeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Strike Waymo's Motion to Exclude Defendants' Damages Expert Walter Bratic filed by Waymo LLC. Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2017 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 12/1/2017. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Jeff Nardinelli in Support of Waymo's Motion to Exclude Defendants' Damages Expert Walter Bratic, # (2) Exhibit 1 Placeholder, # (3) Exhibit 2 Placeholder, # (4) Exhibit 3)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2275 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: 11/27/2017, Terminated: 2/9/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Administrative Motion to File Under Seal -- Exhibits in Support of Waymo's Motion to Exclude Defendants' Damages Expert Walter Bratic filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Lindsay Cooper in support of Waymo's Motion to Seal, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Exhibit 1 SEALED, # (4) Exhibit 2 SEALED)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2274 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: 11/27/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER ALLOWING [2270] MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT TRIAL WITNESS LIST AND REQUIRING DETAILED OFFER OF PROOF. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/27/2017. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2273 Filed: 11/26/2017, Entered: 11/26/2017 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re [2271] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Responsive Trial Brief (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2272 Filed: 11/26/2017, Entered: 11/26/2017 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to re [2253] Trial Brief REDACTED Waymo's Responsive Trial Brief by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D Placeholder)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2271 Filed: 11/26/2017, Entered: 11/26/2017, Terminated: 2/9/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Responsive Trial Brief filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Waymo's Administrative Motion to Seal, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) REDACTED Waymo's Responsive Trial Brief, # (4) SEALED Waymo's Responsive Trial Brief, # (5) Exhibit A REDACTED, # (6) Exhibit A SEALED, # (7) Exhibit B REDACTED, # (8) Exhibit B SEALED, # (9) Exhibit D SEALED)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2270 Filed: 11/26/2017, Entered: 11/26/2017 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Brief Waymo's Precis for Leave to Supplement its Trial Witness List filed byWaymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2269 Filed: 11/25/2017, Entered: 11/25/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER RE LETTER FROM UNITED STATES ATTORNEY. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/25/2017. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2268 Filed: 11/24/2017, Entered: 11/24/2017 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBITS re [2238] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Opposition to Uber's MIL No. 27 filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Revised Unredacted Version of [2238-5])(Related document(s)[2238]) (Pardini, Thomas) (Filed on 11/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2267 Filed: 11/24/2017, Entered: 11/24/2017 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re [2265] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Reply In Support of its Motion for Jury Instruction Based on Spoliation (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2266 Filed: 11/24/2017, Entered: 11/24/2017 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY (re [2199] MOTION Jury Instruction Waymo's Motion for Jury Instruction Based on Spoliation ) filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 (placeholder))(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2265 Filed: 11/24/2017, Entered: 11/24/2017, Terminated: 2/9/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Reply In Support of its Motion for Jury Instruction Based on Spoliation filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Lindsay Cooper in support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Redacted version of Waymo's Reply In Support of its Motion for Jury Instruction Based on Spoliation, # (4) Sealed version of Waymo's Reply In Support of its Motion for Jury Instruction Based on Spoliation, # (5) Sealed Ex. 1)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2264 Filed: 11/24/2017, Entered: 11/24/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER RE [2248] REQUEST TO FILE A MOTION TO EXCLUDE WALTER BRATIC. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/24/2017. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2263 Filed: 11/24/2017, Entered: 11/24/2017 Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Decision
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Clerk's Notice DECLINING Video Recording re: [2227] Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Request. (Related documents(s) [2227])(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2262 Filed: 11/24/2017, Entered: 11/24/2017, Terminated: 11/28/2017 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re [2237] Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Waymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2261 Filed: 11/23/2017, Entered: 11/23/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER RE LETTER FROM UNITED STATES ATTORNEY. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/23/2017. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2260 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: 11/22/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE RE LETTER FROM UNITED STATES ATTORNEY. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/22/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/22/2017: # (1) Exhibit A) (whalc2S, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2259 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: 11/22/2017 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to re [2248] Brief DEFENDANTS UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. AND OTTOMOTTO LLC'S OPPOSITION TO WAYMO'S PRECIS FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION TO EXCLUDE DEFENDANTS' DAMAGES EXPERT WALTER BRATIC by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2258 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: 11/22/2017 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re [2256] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Amended Joint Proposed Pre-Trial Order (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2257 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: 11/22/2017 Proposed Pretrial Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Pretrial Order Amended Joint Proposed Pre-Trial Order by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix A Placeholder, # (2) Appendix B, # (3) Appendix C, # (4) Appendix D REDACTED, # (5) Appendix E)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Hearing Jury Trial set for 12/21/2017 07:30 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. Jury Trial set for 12/22/2017 07:30 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Hearing Further Jury Trial set for 12/5/2017, 12/6/2017, 12/7/2017, 12/8/2017, 12/11/2017, 12/12/2017, 12/13/2017, 12/14/2017, 12/15/2017, 12/18/2017, 12/19/2017, 12/20/2017 07:30 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2256 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: 11/22/2017 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Amended Joint Proposed Pre-Trial Order filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Waymo's Administrative Motion to Seal, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) REDACTED Amended Joint Proposed Pre-Trial Order, # (4) SEALED Amended Joint Proposed Pre-Trial Order, # (5) Exhibit SEALED Appendix A, # (6) Exhibit REDACTED Appendix D, # (7) Exhibit SEALED Appendix D)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2255 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: 11/21/2017 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. re [2252] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Pardini, Thomas) (Filed on 11/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2254 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: 11/21/2017 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Camila Tapernoux in Support of [2253] Trial Brief filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8)(Related document(s)[2253]) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 11/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2253 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: 11/21/2017 Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRIAL BRIEF by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 11/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2252 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: 11/21/2017, Terminated: 2/9/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Thomas J. Pardini, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) [UNREDACTED] Exhibit 6 to the Declaration of Camila Tapernoux, # (4) [UNREDACTED] Exhibit 7 to the Declaration of Camila Tapernoux, # (5) [UNREDACTED] Exhibit 8 to the Declaration of Camila Tapernoux)(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 11/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2251 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: 11/21/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REVISED TENTATIVE JURY INSTRUCTIONS ON TRADE SECRET MISAPPROPRIATION and SPECIAL VERDICT FORM. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/21/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2250 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: 11/21/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER RE TIMELINE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/21/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2249 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: 11/21/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER RE FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND NOTICE RE ANY SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/21/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2248 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: 11/20/2017 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Brief Waymo's Precis for Leave to File a Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Uber's Damages Expert Walter Bratic filed byWaymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2247 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: 11/20/2017 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. re [2240] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Pardini, Thomas) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2246 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: 11/20/2017 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. re [2244] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Motion in Limine No. 18 (Dunn, Karen) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2245 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: 11/20/2017 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [2194] MOTION in Limine Waymo's MiL. No. 18 to Preclude Reliance on the Stroz Friedberg Due Diligence Investigation ) filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Maxwell V. Pritt, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6, # (8) Exhibit 7, # (9) Exhibit 8)(Dunn, Karen) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2244 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: 11/20/2017, Terminated: 2/9/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Motion in Limine No. 18 filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Maxwell V. Pritt, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Exhibit 1 - Redacted, # (4) Exhibit 1 - Sealed, # (5) Exhibit 2 - Redacted, # (6) Exhibit 2 - Sealed, # (7) Exhibit 3 - Redacted, # (8) Exhibit 3 - Sealed, # (9) Exhibit 4 - Redacted, # (10) Exhibit 4 - Sealed, # (11) Exhibit 5 - Redacted, # (12) Exhibit 5 - Sealed, # (13) Exhibit 6 - Redacted, # (14) Exhibit 6 - Sealed, # (15) Exhibit 7 - Redacted, # (16) Exhibit 7 - Sealed, # (17) Exhibit 8 - Redacted, # (18) Exhibit 8 - Sealed)(Dunn, Karen) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2243 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: 11/20/2017 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Camila Tapernoux in Support of [2241] Opposition/Response to Motion filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3)(Related document(s)[2241]) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 2,736 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?