Aldaya v. Encore Capital Group, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-00284
District Judge SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 4, 2017 at 9:12 PM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Marivic Aldaya, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Coale Cooley Lietz McInerny & Broadus

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Lietz +1 352 753 8600 +1 352 504 3301 dlietz@varnellandwarwick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rhode Island Legal Services, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin A. Brackett debtdisputetn@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Varnell & Warwick, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Janet R. Varnell +1 352 753 8600 +1 352 753 8606 jvarnell@varnellandwarwick.com
v.
No Logo Brad Gains, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McCorriston Miller Mukai MacKinnon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/12/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Troy J.H. Andrade andrade@m4law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Minkin minkin@m4law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Page C. Ogata ogata@m4law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jessica M. Wan +1 808 529 7300 +1 808 524 8293 jwan@m4law.com
No Logo Christi Weber, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McCorriston Miller Mukai MacKinnon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/12/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Troy J.H. Andrade andrade@m4law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Minkin minkin@m4law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Page C. Ogata ogata@m4law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jessica M. Wan +1 808 529 7300 +1 808 524 8293 jwan@m4law.com
No Logo Clint Weber, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McCorriston Miller Mukai MacKinnon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/12/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Troy J.H. Andrade andrade@m4law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Minkin minkin@m4law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jessica M. Wan +1 808 529 7300 +1 808 524 8293 jwan@m4law.com
No Logo Encore Capital Group, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McCorriston Miller Mukai MacKinnon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/12/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Troy J.H. Andrade andrade@m4law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jordan K. Inafuku +1 808 529 7355 +1 808 535 8072 jinafuku@m4law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Minkin minkin@m4law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Page C. Ogata ogata@m4law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jessica M. Wan +1 808 529 7300 +1 808 524 8293 jwan@m4law.com
No Logo Hector Torres, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McCorriston Miller Mukai MacKinnon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/12/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Troy J.H. Andrade andrade@m4law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Minkin minkin@m4law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Page C. Ogata ogata@m4law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jessica M. Wan +1 808 529 7300 +1 808 524 8293 jwan@m4law.com
No Logo Midland Credit Management, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McCorriston Miller Mukai MacKinnon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/12/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Troy J.H. Andrade andrade@m4law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jordan K. Inafuku +1 808 529 7355 +1 808 535 8072 jinafuku@m4law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Minkin minkin@m4law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Page C. Ogata ogata@m4law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jessica M. Wan +1 808 529 7300 +1 808 524 8293 jwan@m4law.com
Midland Funding LLC Midland Funding LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McCorriston Miller Mukai MacKinnon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/12/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Troy J.H. Andrade andrade@m4law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jordan K. Inafuku +1 808 529 7355 +1 808 535 8072 jinafuku@m4law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Minkin minkin@m4law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Page C. Ogata ogata@m4law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jessica M. Wan +1 808 529 7300 +1 808 524 8293 jwan@m4law.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1692
Nature of Suit 371 - Personal Property: Truth in Lending
  Entries (95) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF PLAINTIFF'S INDIVIDUAL CLAIMS AND STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF CLASS ACTION CLAIMS. Signed by JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 5/2/2017. (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 05/02/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    EO: Based on 92 Notice of Settlement, the parties shall submit the appropriate dismissal documents no later than 5/1/2017. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(agh)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 03/30/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      EO:. EO: Pursuant to the Notice of Settlement, the Final Pretrial Conference and Jury Selection and Trial are vacated. Plaintiff's Objection to Magistrate Judge's Order is terminated.(JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY)(tbf, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 03/29/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE by Marivic Aldaya of Settlement of Case Marivic Aldaya. (Brackett, Justin) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          NOTICE by Marivic Aldaya re 90 Objection of Error in Objection Marivic Aldaya. (Lietz, David) (Entered: 03/22/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ***APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION TO DISTRICT COURT***OBJECTION re 84 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND TO CONFORM TO THE EVIDENCE Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Motion for Leave to File, filed by Marivic Aldaya. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Lietz Declaration)(Lietz, David) Docket text entry modified on 3/22/2017 to delete extraneous punctuation; ADD title of order. (afc). Entry modified on 3/23/2017:Event converted from "OBJECTION" to "Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court. NEF REGENERATED. (afc). (Entered: 03/21/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS re: 52 . Signed by JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 3/20/2017. (afc)WRITTEN ORDER follows hearing held 2/27/2017. Minutes of hearing: doc. no. 78 . CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 03/20/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Encore Capital Group, Inc., Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC Re: Notice of Taking Deposition Upon Oral Examination, dated March 17, 2017 (Minkin, David) (Entered: 03/17/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 80 MOTION to Compel and for Sanctions for Failure to Appear at Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions filed by Encore Capital Group, Inc., Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David J. Minkin, # 2 Exhibit "A" - Email, # 3 Exhibit "B" - Email, # 4 Exhibit "C" - Draft Depo Notice, # 5 Exhibit "D" - Email, # 6 Exhibit "E" - Depo Notice, # 7 Exhibit "F" - Email, # 8 Certificate of Service)(Minkin, David) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEFS - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 3/10/2017. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 03/10/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Encore Capital Group, Inc., Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC [Re: Defendants' First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff] (Minkin, David) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND TO CONFORM TO THE EVIDENCE re 59 , 60 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 3/7/2017. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 03/07/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          ORDER GRANTING THOMAS F. LANDERS'S APPLICATION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE re 82 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 3/6/2017. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 03/06/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            MOTION for Pro Hac Vice ; Declaration of Counsel; [Proposed] Order Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1838346.David J. Minkin appearing for Defendants Encore Capital Group, Inc., Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC (Minkin, David) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              EO: Pursuant to Local Rule 7.2(d), the Court elects to decide 80 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel without a hearing. Briefing shall be in accordance with Local Rule 7.4. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(bs)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 03/03/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                MOTION to Compel and for Sanctions for Failure to Appear at Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions David Lietz appearing for Plaintiff Marivic Aldaya (Lietz, David) (Entered: 03/02/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  EP: Settlement Conference -Discussion held.No settlement.Settlement Conference held on 2/28/2017. (Court Reporter No Record.) (JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY)(tbf, )No COS issued for this docket entry (Entered: 02/28/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 2/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    EP: Defendants Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings 52 -Arguments.Plaintiff requests to withdraw the unregistered debt collector claim and the general excise tax claim - discussion held.Defendants Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings 52 - taken under advisement.Court to prepare a written order.Discussion held re: the settlement conference set for tomorrow 2/28/17 @ 2:15 p.m.The settlement conference will remain on calendar.Motion Hearing held on 2/27/2017 re 52 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Midland Funding, LLC, Midland Credit Management, Inc., Encore Capital Group, Inc., Motions Taken Under Advisement: 52 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . (Court Reporter Gloria Bediamol.) (JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY)(tbf, )No COS issued for this docket entry (Entered: 02/27/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      INCLINATIONS - by JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY. (emt, ) (Entered: 02/24/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        REPLY re 60 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint to Conform to the Evidence, 70 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Marivic Aldaya. (Lietz, David) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          REPLY re 71 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 59 MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order filed by Marivic Aldaya. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Lietz Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M)(Lietz, David) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Encore Capital Group, Inc., Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC [Re: Defendant Midland Funding, LLC's Objection to Plaintiff's Notice of Deposition of Midland Funding, LLC Through Its Designated Witnesses Pursuant to Fed. Rule Civ. P. 30(b)(6) & Rule 34 Request for Production of Documents, dated February 8, 2017] (Minkin, David) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Encore Capital Group, Inc., Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC [Re: Defendant Midland Credit Management, Inc.'s Objection to Plaintiff's Notice of Deposition of Midland Credit Management, Inc. Through Its Designated Witnesses Pursuant to Fed. Rule Civ. P. 30(b)(6) & Rule 34 Request for Production of Documents, dated February 8, 2017] (Minkin, David) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                ORDER REGARDING AWARD OF REASONABLE EXPENSES TO PLAINTIFF re 64 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 2/15/2017. "Based on the foregoing, the Court ORDERS Defendants to pay $6,906.45 to Plaintiff no later than February 28, 2017." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 02/15/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 59 MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order filed by Encore Capital Group, Inc., Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David J. Minkin, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Certificate of Service)(Minkin, David) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 60 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint to Conform to the Evidence filed by Encore Capital Group, Inc., Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David J. Minkin, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Minkin, David) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      REPLY re 52 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Encore Capital Group, Inc., Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Compliance, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Minkin, David) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        RESPONSE re 64 Response to Plaintiff's Submission and Declarations in Support of Attorneys' Fee Award, Filed on February 3, 2017 filed by Encore Capital Group, Inc., Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David J. Minkin, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Minkin, David) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 52 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Corrected Caption) filed by Marivic Aldaya. (Lietz, David) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 52 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Marivic Aldaya. (Varnell, Janet) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Encore Capital Group, Inc., Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC [Re: Defendants' Second Supplemental Response to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests] (Minkin, David) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                RESPONSE re 58 Order on Motion to Compel,, filed by Marivic Aldaya. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Varnell, Janet) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  EO: Pursuant to Local Rules 7.2(d) and 7.2(b), the Court elects to decide 60 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend to Conform to the Evidence without a hearing and directs briefing as follows: any opposition shall be filed by 2/14/17; reply shall be filed by 2/23/17. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(agh)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 02/01/2017)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    EO: Pursuant to Local Rules 7.2(d) and 7.2(b), the Court elects to decide 59 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Scheduling Order without a hearing and directs briefing as follows: any opposition shall be filed by 2/14/17; reply shall be filed by 2/23/17. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(agh)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 02/01/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      NOTICE by Marivic Aldaya of Intent to Serve Subpoena on Non-Party Christi Weber Marivic Aldaya. (Varnell, Janet) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint to Conform to the Evidence David Lietz appearing for Plaintiff Marivic Aldaya (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Ex. 1 (Lietz Declaration), # 2 Proposed Second Amended Complaint)(Lietz, David) (Entered: 01/31/2017)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order David Lietz appearing for Plaintiff Marivic Aldaya (Lietz, David) (Entered: 01/31/2017)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES re 48 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 1/19/2017. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 01/20/2017)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              EO: Settlement Conference set for 2/9/17 @ 2:15 p.m. is continued to 2/28/2017 02:15 PM in Chambers of Judge Susan Oki Mollway before JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY. Parties notified by Mr. Minkin. (JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY)(tbf, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 01/17/2017)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                REPLY re 48 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses, 51 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Marivic Aldaya. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Lietz, David) (Entered: 01/13/2017)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  SUPPLEMENT by Encore Capital Group, Inc., Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC (First Supplemental Initial Disclosures). (Minkin, David) (Entered: 01/13/2017)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 1/10/2017. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 01/10/2017)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 52 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings :. Motion Hearing set for 2/27/2017 09:45 AM before JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY. (tbf, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry. (Entered: 01/05/2017)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings David J. Minkin appearing for Defendants Encore Capital Group, Inc., Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Minkin, David) (Entered: 01/04/2017)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 48 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David J. Minkin, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Certificate of Service)(Minkin, David) (Entered: 12/30/2016)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Encore Capital Group, Inc., Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC Re: Defendants' First Supplemental Response to Plaintiff's First Discovery Requests: Interrogatories, Requests for Admission, Request for Production of Documents, and Request for Production of Statements to Defendants, dated October 14, 2015 (dated 12/30/2016) (Minkin, David) (Entered: 12/30/2016)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              EO: Pursuant to Local Rule 7.2(d), the Court elects to decide 48 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses without a hearing. Briefing shall be in accordance with Local Rule 7.4.(MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(bs) (Entered: 12/20/2016)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses Justin A. Brackett appearing for Plaintiff Marivic Aldaya (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Certificate of Service)(Brackett, Justin) (Entered: 12/19/2016)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING DAVID LIETZ'S APPLICATION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE re 46 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 12/19/2016. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 12/19/2016)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    MOTION for Pro Hac Vice With Proposed Order Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1804254.Justin A. Brackett appearing for Plaintiff Marivic Aldaya (Brackett, Justin) (Entered: 12/16/2016)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Midland Credit Management, Inc. Re: First Supplemental Response to Plaintiff's Second Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Midland Credit Management, Inc., dated September 8, 2016 (dated 12/02/2016) (Ogata, Page) (Entered: 12/02/2016)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        EO: Settlement Conference set for 2/2/17 @ 2:15 p.m. is continued to 2/9/2017 02:15 PM before JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY. Parties notified. (JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY)(tbf, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 10/31/2016)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Midland Funding, LLC [Re: Defendant Midland Funding, LLC's Response to Plaintiff's Second Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Midland Funding, LLC, Dated September 8, 2016] (Inafuku, Jordan) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Midland Credit Management, Inc. [Defendant Midland Credit Management, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiff's Second Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Midland Credit Management, Inc., Dated September 8, 2016] (Inafuku, Jordan) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING THE APPLICATION OF JANET R. VARNELL TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE (filed in CV 15-00280 SOM-RLP) - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 6/15/2016. Attorney Janet R. Varnell for Marivic Aldaya added. Pursuant to the Minute Order filed in CV 15-00280 SOM-RLP; Aldaya v. Encore Capital Group, Inc., see ECF No. 56, Janet R. Varnell, Esq. is added to this case. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 09/23/2016)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Midland Funding, LLC Re: Response to Plaintiff's Second Request for Admissions, dated July 29, 2016 (Minkin, David) (Entered: 09/06/2016)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Midland Funding, LLC Re: Response to Plaintiff's Second Request for Production of Documents, dated July 29, 2016 (Minkin, David) (Entered: 09/06/2016)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Midland Credit Management, Inc. Re: Response to Plaintiff's Second Request for Admissions, dated July 29, 2016 (Minkin, David) (Entered: 09/06/2016)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Midland Credit Management, Inc. Re: Response to Plaintiff's Second Request for Production of Documents, dated July 29, 2016 (Minkin, David) (Entered: 09/06/2016)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        EO: In accordance with the Court's August 24, 2016 Order Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Severance of Case No. 1:15-cv-284 SOM-RLP from Case No. 1:15-cv-280 SOM-RLP, Request for Extension of Deadlines in Case No. 1:15-cv-284 SOM-RLP, and Request for Additional Twenty-five Interrogatories and Defendants' Countermotion to Modify Rule 16 Scheduling Order and to Allow Plaintiff Fifteen Additional Interrogatories, the Court enters this Rule 16 Scheduling Order. Jury Selection/Trial is set for 09:00 AM on 6/6/2017 in Aha Kanawai before JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 4/24/2017 at 09:30 AM in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Richard L. Puglisi before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Settlement Conference is set for 2/2/2017 at 02:15 PM in Chambers of Susan Oki Mollway before JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY. Settlement Conference statements by 1/26/2017. Dispositive Motions due by 1/4/2017. Discovery due by 4/7/2017. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(mrf)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 08/25/2016)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 8/24/2016. Jury Selection/Trial set for 09:00 AM on 6/6/2017 in Aha Kanawai before JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/24/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Settlement Conference set for 2/2/2017 02:15 PM in Aha Kanawai before JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY. Dispositive Motions due by 1/4/2017. Discovery due by 4/7/2017. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 08/25/2016)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            Defendants Encore Capital Group, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC, and Midland Credit Management, Inc.'s ANSWER to 33 First Amended Class Action Complaint filed July 22, 2016; Certificate of Service - by Encore Capital Group, Inc., Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC. Pursuant to the Minute Order entered in CV 15-00280 SOM-RLP (see ECF No. 53), the Clerk's Office re-enters the Answer filed on August 5, 2016, in CV 15-00280 SOM-RLP, into CV 15-00284 SOM-RLP. (emt, ) Modified on 8/24/2016 (emt, ). (Entered: 08/24/2016)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Encore Capital Group, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC, Midland Credit Management, Inc. - filed by Marivic Aldaya. Pursuant to the Minute Order entered in CV 15-00280 SOM-RLP (see ECF No. 53), the Clerk's Office re-enters the First Amended Complaint filed on July 22, 2016, in CV 15-00280 SOM-RLP, into CV 15-00284 SOM-RLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Verification) (emt, ) (Entered: 08/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SEVERANCE OF CASE NO. 1:15-CV-284 SOM-RLP FROM CASE NO. 1:15-CV-280 SOM-RLP, REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINES IN CASE NO. 1:15-CV-284 SOM-RLP, AND REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL TWENTY-FIVE INTERROGATORIES AND DEFENDANTS' COUNTERMOTION TO MODIFY RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER AND TO ALLOW PLAINTIFF FIFTEEN ADDITIONAL INTERROGATORIES re 47 , 49 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 8/24/2016. The Court SEVERS Civil No. 15-00284 SOM-RLP from this consolidated action. "The Court DIRECTS the Clerk's Office to docket a copy of this Order in Civil No. 15-00284 SOM-RLP. All future filings for Civil No. 15-00284 SOM-RLP shall be filed in that action only. " granting (47) Motion to Sever; granting (49) Motion to Continue; granting (49) Motion in case 1:15-cv-00280-SOM-RLP Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-00280-SOM-RLP, 1:15-cv-00284-SOM-RLP (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 08/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Withdrawal of Document 30 by Marivic Aldaya . (Brackett, Justin) Modified on 6/13/2016 to add linkage to ECF No. 30 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint (emt, ). (Entered: 06/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Class Action Complaint Justin A. Brackett appearing for Plaintiff Marivic Aldaya (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amended Complaint, Exhibits, and Verification, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Brackett, Justin) Modified on 6/13/2016 (emt, ). (Entered: 06/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION TO AMEND CAPTION TO CORRECTLY IDENTIFY CHRISTI WEBER AND ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 1/21/2016. Christi Weber added. (Defendant in member cases: CV 15-00282 SOM-RLP, CV 15-00283 SOM-RLP, CV 15-00284 SOM-RLP ) and Clint Weber terminated. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-00280-SOM-RLP, 1:15-cv-00282-SOM-RLP, 1:15-cv-00283-SOM-RLP, 1:15-cv-00284-SOM-RLP (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 01/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE TO PARTIES: Pursuant to the "Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Consolidate Civil Nos. 15-00280 SOM-RLP, 15-00282 SOM-RLP, 15-00283 SOM-RLP, and 15-00284 SOM-RLP" filed on December 7, 2015, all filings relevant to CV 15-00282 SOM-RLP, CV 15-00283 SOM-RLP, and CV 15-00284 SOM-RLP shall be filed and docketed in CV 15-00280 SOM-RLP. re (27 in 1:15-cv-00284-SOM-RLP, 27 in 1:15-cv-00282-SOM-RLP, 32 in 1:15-cv-00283-SOM-RLP, 26 in 1:15-cv-00280-SOM-RLP). Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-00280-SOM-RLP, 1:15-cv-00282-SOM-RLP, 1:15-cv-00283-SOM-RLP, 1:15-cv-00284-SOM-RLP (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry. (Entered: 12/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CIVIL NOS. 15-00280 SOM-RLP, 15-00282 SOM-RLP, 15-00283 SOM-RLP, AND 15-00284 SOM-RLP re 19 Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 1:15-cv-00280-SOM-RLP - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 12/4/2015. "In accordance with the foregoing, the Court GRANTS Defendants' Motion to Consolidate Civil Nos. 15-00280 SOM-RLP, 15-00282 SOM-RLP, 15-00283 SOM-RLP, and 15-00284 SOM-RLP. As such, Civil Nos. 15-00282 SOM-RLP, 15-00283 SOM-RLP, and 15-00284 SOM-RLP are consolidated with Civil No. 15-00280 SOM-RLP for all purposes. All filings in Civil Nos. 15-00282 SOM-RLP, 15-00283 SOM-RLP, and 15-00284 SOM-RLP shall be filed and docketed in Civil No. 15-00280 SOM-RLP." Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-00280-SOM-RLP, 1:15-cv-00282-SOM-RLP, 1:15-cv-00283-SOM-RLP, 1:15-cv-00284-SOM-RLP (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 12/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Encore Capital Group, Inc., Brad Gains, Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC, Hector Torres, Clint Weber Re: Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's First Discovery Requests: Interrogatories, Requests for Admission, Requests for Production of Documents, and Request for Production of Statements to Defendants, Dated 10/14/15 (Minkin, David) (Entered: 11/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              EO: In the interest of judicial economy, the Court CONTINUES the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 11/4/15 to allow sufficient time for the Court to resolve the pending motion to consolidate in Civil No. 15-00280 SOM-RLP. The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED to 12/15/15 at 9:00 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(mrf)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 11/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                Scheduling Conference Statement of Plaintiff. (Brackett, Justin) (Entered: 10/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  Scheduling Conference Statement of Defendants Encore Capital Group, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC, Midland Credit Management, Inc., Hector Torres, Clint Weber, and Brad Gain; Certificate of Service. (Minkin, David) (Entered: 10/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marivic Aldaya of Initial Discovery Requests on October 14, 2015 (Brackett, Justin) (Entered: 10/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      INITIAL DISCLOSURE by Marivic Aldaya. (Brackett, Justin) (Entered: 10/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Encore Capital Group, Inc., Brad Gains, Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC, Hector Torres, Clint Weber [Initial Disclosures, dated October 5, 2015] (Minkin, David) (Entered: 10/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          REPORT of Planning Meeting . (Brackett, Justin) (Entered: 09/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica M. Wan on behalf of Encore Capital Group, Inc., Brad Gains, Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC, Hector Torres, Clint Weber on behalf of Encore Capital Group, Inc., Brad Gains, Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC, Hector Torres, Clint Weber. (Wan, Jessica) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Troy J.H. Andrade on behalf of Encore Capital Group, Inc., Brad Gains, Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC, Hector Torres, Clint Weber on behalf of Encore Capital Group, Inc., Brad Gains, Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC, Hector Torres, Clint Weber. (Andrade, Troy) (Entered: 08/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                Corporate Disclosure Statement by Midland Funding, LLC, Midland Credit Management, Inc., Encore Capital Group, Inc.. (Minkin, David) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Encore Capital Group, Inc., Brad Gains, Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC, Hector Torres, Clint Weber.(Minkin, David) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED from 10/26/2015 to 11/04/2015 at 09:30AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Counsel for Plaintiff shall notify Defendants of the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set by the Court. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(mrf)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 08/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Case Reassignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 15-00284 SOM-RLP on all further pleadings. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry. (Entered: 08/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI for all further pretrial proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 8/4/2015. Please reflect new case number CV 15-00284 SOM-RLP on all further pleadings. The court reassigns CV 15-00282 JMS-RLP to Chief Judge Susan Oki Mollway. Magistrate Judge Richard L. Puglisi remains as magistrate judge. The court further reassigns the magistrate judge assignments for cases CV 15-00283 SOM-KSC and CV 15-00284 SOM-BMK. Magistrate Judge Richard L. Puglisi is now assigned to these cases. CV 15-00280 SOM-RLP; CV 15-00282 JMS-RLP; CV 15-00283 SOM-KSC; CV 15-00284 SOM-BMK (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry Modified on 8/4/2015 (emt, ). (Entered: 08/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          Summons Issued as to Encore Capital Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Summons (issued)as to Midland Credit Management, Inc., # 2 Summons (issued) as to Midland Funding, LLC, # 3 Summons (issued)as to Hector Torres, # 4 Summons (issued) as to Clint Weber, # 5 Summons (issued) as to Brad Gains)(eps) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            Summons (Proposed) (Brackett, Justin) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              Summons (Proposed) (Brackett, Justin) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CIV 15-00284 SOM-BMK on all further filings. (eps )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (Entered: 07/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet (Attachments: # 1 A0 398 Notice of a Lawsuit, # 2 A0 399 Waiver of Service of Summons)(eps) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:30AM on 10/26/2015 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. Signed by JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 07/28/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Memo re: Corporate Disclosures) (eps)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). ATTACH THIS SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THIS SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO: Re CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THIS DOCUMENT. (Entered: 07/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      Summons (Proposed) (Brackett, Justin) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        Summons (Proposed) (Brackett, Justin) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          Summons (Proposed) (Brackett, Justin) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            Summons (Proposed) (Brackett, Justin) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-1584327.), filed by Marivic Aldaya. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit One, # 2 Exhibit Two, # 3 Exhibit Three, # 4 Exhibit Four, # 5 Exhibit Five, # 6 Exhibit Six, # 7 Declaration, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brackett, Justin) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 45 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?