JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC. v. BALLINROBE DEVELOPMENT, INC.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-01294

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 26, 2018 at 3:13 AM DT (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Judgment - Default
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    OPINION. Signed by Judge William J. Martini on 6/20/17. (gh, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Default Judgment
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None request for default
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/27/2017, Entered: None Summons Issued
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 5 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?