Aroch v. Yohai
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-08954-LLS
District Judge Louis L. Stanton, presiding

Tags
Last Updated June 30, 2017 at 12:42 AM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Guy Aroch, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Joshua E. Abraham

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua Eli Abraham +1 646 245 6710 +1 646 201 4454 josh@joshabrahamlaw.com
v.
No Logo Jeffrey Yohai, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by THE LAW OFFICE OF BRUCE E. BALDINGER, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce Baldinger +1 908 218 0060 +1 973 270 0934 bbaldinger@baldingerlaw.com
Office Foley Square
Filed 11/17/2016
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity Action
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition
Fee Date 11/17/2016
Fee Status pd
Arbitration Code
Class Action n
Citizenship Plaintiff 1
Citizenship Defendant 2
Date Transferred
County NewYork
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag ECF
  Entries (36) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 29 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Bruce E. Baldinger dated June 8, 2017 re: Response to Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority. Document filed by Jeffrey Yohai.(Baldinger, Bruce) (Entered: 06/08/2017)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re: 20 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion. Document filed by Guy Aroch. (Abraham, Joshua) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Joshua E. Abraham dated April 29, 2017 re: 25 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Surreply addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Joshua E. Abraham dated April 14, 2017. . Document filed by Guy Aroch. (Abraham, Joshua) (Entered: 04/29/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 25 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Surreply addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Joshua E. Abraham dated April 14, 2017. . Document filed by Jeffrey Yohai. (Baldinger, Bruce) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Surreply addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Joshua E. Abraham dated April 14, 2017. Document filed by Guy Aroch.(Abraham, Joshua) (Entered: 04/14/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . . Document filed by Jeffrey Yohai. (Baldinger, Bruce) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: 1/5/2017 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
              ORDER: granting [8] PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION FOR JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERYAND TO HOLD IN ABEYANCE BRIEFING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS BASED ON SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. Granted, limited to determination of defendant's domicile when this action was commenced. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 1/05/2017) (ama)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                REPLY AFFIDAVIT of Jeffrey Yohai in Support re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction .. Document filed by Jeffrey Yohai. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A - F, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits G - L)(Baldinger, Bruce) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: 1/5/2017 Declaration in Support of Motion
                  DECLARATION of Jeffrey Yohai in Support re: [7] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction .. Document filed by Jeffrey Yohai. (Baldinger, Bruce)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 21 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to submit reply papers addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Bruce E. Baldinger, Esq. dated April 6, 2017. filed by Jeffrey Yohai: extending the time to file Defendant's reply papers in connection with the pending Motion to Dismiss for 7 days to April 13, 2017. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 4/6/17) (ml) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: 1/5/2017 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [7] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . . Document filed by Jeffrey Yohai. (Baldinger, Bruce)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to submit reply papers addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Bruce E. Baldinger, Esq. dated April 6, 2017. Document filed by Jeffrey Yohai.(Baldinger, Bruce) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Deficient Docket Entry Error
                          ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Bruce E. Baldinger to RE-FILE Document [7] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . ERROR(S): Supporting Documents are filed separately, each receiving their own document #'s. (db)
                            LREF
                            Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Deficient Docket Entry Error
                            ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Bruce E. Baldinger to RE-FILE Document [7] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . ERROR(S): Supporting Documents are filed separately, each receiving their own document #'s. (db)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . . Document filed by Guy Aroch. (Abraham, Joshua) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: 1/4/2017 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [8] MOTION Jurisdictional Discovery re: [7] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . . . Document filed by Guy Aroch. (Abraham, Joshua)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  DECLARATION of Joshua E. Abraham in Opposition re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction .. Document filed by Guy Aroch. (Abraham, Joshua) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/2/2017, Entered: 1/2/2017 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [8] MOTION Jurisdictional Discovery re: [7] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . . . Document filed by Jeffrey Yohai. (Baldinger, Bruce)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      NOTICE Supboena Duces Tecum Document filed by Guy Aroch.(Abraham, Joshua) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: 12/29/2016 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                        ORDER granting [11] Letter Motion for Extension of Time. (Plaintiff hereby requests that the response date to the Motion to Dismiss be adjourned pending the outcome of the Cross-Motion). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 12/29/2016) (ama)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: 12/20/2016, Terminated: 12/29/2016 Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                          FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Joshua E. Abraham dated December 20, 2016. Document filed by Guy Aroch.(Abraham, Joshua)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: 12/19/2016 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [8] MOTION Jurisdictional Discovery re: [7] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . . . Document filed by Guy Aroch. (Abraham, Joshua)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document 9 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: 12/19/2016 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                              DECLARATION of Joshua E. Abraham in Support re: [8] MOTION Jurisdictional Discovery re: [7] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . .. Document filed by Guy Aroch. (Abraham, Joshua)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: 12/19/2016, Terminated: 1/5/2017 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                MOTION Jurisdictional Discovery re: [7] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . . Document filed by Guy Aroch.(Abraham, Joshua)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: 12/12/2016, Terminated: 12/12/2016 Motion to Dismiss
                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Document filed by Jeffrey Yohai. Responses due by 12/27/2016 (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Jeffrey Yohai, # (2) Memorandum of Law)(Baldinger, Bruce) Modified on 1/5/2017 (db).
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: 11/23/2016 Civil Cover Sheet
                                                    CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Abraham, Joshua)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document 5 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: 11/23/2016 Amended Complaint
                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT amending [1] Complaint against Jeffrey Yohai with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Guy Aroch. Related document: [1] Complaint filed by Guy Aroch.(Abraham, Joshua)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: 11/22/2016 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                        MEMORANDUM & ORDER: On or before December 8, 2016, plaintiff shall file an affidavit or an amended complaint establishing the citizenship of the parties, or the complaint may be dismissed without further notice for lack of jurisdiction. Amended Pleadings due by 12/8/2016. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 11/21/2016) (kgo)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: 11/18/2016 Summons Issued
                                                          ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jeffrey Yohai. (pc)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank  Case Designated ECF
                                                            Case Designated ECF. (pc)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank  Case Designation
                                                              Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. (pc)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank  Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
                                                                CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Louis L. Stanton. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank  Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
                                                                  ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Joshua Eli Abraham. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1345df; Arbitration code e (Exempt); Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332; the Arbitration code has been deleted; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (pc)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank  Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Civil Cover Sheet
                                                                    ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Joshua Eli Abraham. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: 11/17/2016 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                      REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jeffrey Yohai, re: [1] Complaint. Document filed by Guy Aroch. (Abraham, Joshua)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: 11/17/2016 Complaint
                                                                        COMPLAINT against Jeffrey Yochai. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-13000022)Document filed by Guy Aroch.(Abraham, Joshua)
                                                                          LREF

                                                                          Statistics

                                                                          This case has been viewed 485 times.

                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                          Space
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                           
                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                          Need Password Help?