USA v. Wright et al
Federal Court Proceeding Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:15-mj-01085
Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 2, 2017 at 11:57 PM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo David Wright, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 600

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Jessica Diane Hedges +1 617 722 8220 hedges@htlawyers.com
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING (LOCATION / COURTROOM ONLY) as to David Wright, Nicholas Rovinski: Detention, Probable Cause, and Initial Appearance Hearings set for 6/19/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ORDER entered granting 10 Motion for Protective Order as to David Wright (1), Nicholas Rovinski (2) (Garvin, Brendan) (Entered: 06/17/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Assented to MOTION for Protective Order as to David Wright, Nicholas Rovinski by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulated Protective Order)(Siegmann, B.) (Entered: 06/16/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE (FISA) by USA as to David Wright, Nicholas Rovinski (Siegmann, B.) (Entered: 06/12/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING for Initial Appearance as to David Wright. Initial Appearance set for 6/19/2015 @ 02:00 PM in Courtroom 22 before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 06/12/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            COMPLAINT as to David Wright (1), Nicholas Rovinski (2). (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of FBI Special Agent Joseph Galietta, # 2 JS45 Wright, # 3 JS45 Rovinski)(Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 06/12/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment as to David Wright, Nicholas Rovinski; Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/12/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 29 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?