Michael Klein v. Ryan Kavanaugh, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:01-cv-10395
District Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 2, 2017 at 11:14 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Michael Klein, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philip D Weiss +1 323 993 0198 racpdw@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Agajanian Mcfall Weiss Tetreault & Crist LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William D Anthony +1 323 993 0198 +1 323 993 9509

Toggle Switch Represented by Kinsella Weitzman Iser Kump & Aldisert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dale F Kinsella +1 310 556 9800 +1 310 566 9850 dkinsella@kwikalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of James Spertus

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Robert Fields +1 310 826 4700 +1 310 826 4711
No Logo Ryan Kavanaugh, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks & Lincenberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas V Reichert +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 tvr@birdmarella.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ekwan E Rhow +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 erhow@birdmarella.com
v.
No Logo Brian Sullivan, -, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks & Lincenberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas V Reichert +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 tvr@birdmarella.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ekwan E Rhow +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 erhow@birdmarella.com
No Logo DAVID RESNICK, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Douglas L Thorpe Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas L Thorpe +1 310 230 9556 dthorpe@thorpelink.com
No Logo Kavanaugh Consulting Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks & Lincenberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas V Reichert +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 tvr@birdmarella.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ekwan E Rhow +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 erhow@birdmarella.com
No Logo Prenet Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Shelley Draper +1 213 430 6000 bdraper@omm.com
No Logo Ryan Kavanaugh, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks & Lincenberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas V Reichert +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 tvr@birdmarella.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ekwan E Rhow +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 erhow@birdmarella.com
No Logo Michael Klein, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Agajanian Mcfall Weiss Tetreault & Crist LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William D Anthony +1 323 993 0198 +1 323 993 9509

Toggle Switch Represented by Kinsella Weitzman Iser Kump & Aldisert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dale F Kinsella +1 310 556 9800 +1 310 566 9850 dkinsella@kwikalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of James Spertus

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Robert Fields +1 310 826 4700 +1 310 826 4711
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STIPULATION dism actn w/o prej purs to FRCP 41 (a)(1) (ii) filed terminating case (MD JS-6) (lc) (Entered: 11/04/2002)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/11/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    PLF NOTICE OF ASSOCATION OF Agaganian, McFall, Weiss & ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter associating the law firm of Agajanian McFall Weiss Tetreault & Crist for Michael Klein (lc) (Entered: 06/12/2002)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/16/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      JOINT RULE 26 DISCOVERY PLAN filed; est length of trial 7-8 days (lc) (Entered: 05/16/2002)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/10/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter referring all discovery matters to Discovery Victor B. Kenton for consideration; Final Pretrial Conference set for 10:00 11/25/02 in Courtroom 17 ; IT IS FUR ORD that any appl or stip for the cont of the Final PTC shall be lodged w/Crt NLT 1 wk prior to the Conf date & shall state reason for seeking the cont (ir) (Entered: 05/10/2002)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/15/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ANSWER filed by defendant David Resnick to complaint [1-1] (ir) (Entered: 04/16/2002)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/12/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM [16-1] by counter-defendant Michael Klein (lc) (Entered: 04/15/2002)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/8/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter ordering Resnick ans to cmp submitted by defendant David Resnick received on 4/4/02 is not to be fld but instead rejected; Denial based on: local rule 83-1.5, no certif of interested pty (lc) (Entered: 04/10/2002)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/5/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by defendant David Resnick (lc) (Entered: 04/08/2002)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/20/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  COUNTERCLAIM by defendant Ryan Kavanaugh against plaintiff Michael Klein; jury demand; summons not issued (lc) (Entered: 03/21/2002)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/20/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    ANSWER filed by defendant Brian Sullivan to complaint [1-1]; jury demand (lc) (Entered: 03/21/2002)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/20/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      ANSWER filed by Kavanaugh Consulting Inc, Ryan Kavanaugh to complaint [1-1]; jury demand (lc) Modified on 03/21/2002 (Entered: 03/21/2002)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        AMENDED ORDER of 2/27/02: Crt considered dfts' mot to dism ,together w/moving & opp papers; mot denied by Judge Terry J. Hatter (lc) (Entered: 03/06/2002)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter denying plf motion to dismiss 1st thru 3rd clms in cmp [7-1] (lc) (Entered: 02/28/2002)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/4/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            REPLY by Ryan Kavanaugh, Kavanaugh Consulting, Brian Sullivan to response to motion to dismiss 1st thru 3rd clms in cmp [7-1] (lc) (Entered: 02/05/2002)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/25/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              OPPOSITION by plaintiff Michael Klein - to motion to dismiss 1st thru 3rd clms in cmp [7-1]; PA (lc) (Entered: 01/28/2002)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/22/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                NOTICE & JOINDER by defendant David Resnick joining Kavanaugh & Sullivan motion to dismiss 1st thru 3rd clms in cmp [7-1] (lc) (Entered: 01/23/2002)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/15/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  REQUEST by Ryan Kavanaugh, Kavanaugh Consulting, Brian Sullivan for Judicial Notice re motion to dismiss 1st thru 3rd clms in cmp [7-1] (lc) (Entered: 01/17/2002)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/15/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by Ryan Kavanaugh, Kavanaugh Consulting, Brian Sullivan to dismiss 1st thru 3rd clms in cmp ; motion hearing set for 2/11/02 taken und subm (lc) (Entered: 01/17/2002)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/15/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      STMT OF CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Ryan Kavanaugh, Kavanaugh Consulting, Brian Sullivan - (lc) (Entered: 01/16/2002)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/9/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by defendant Prenet Inc (lc) (Entered: 01/11/2002)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/9/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          ANSWER filed by defendant Prenet Inc to complaint [1-1] (lc) (Entered: 01/11/2002)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/19/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            STIPULATION filed to extend time to answer complaint [1-1] to 1/14/02 as to defendant David Resnick (lc) (Entered: 12/20/2001)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/4/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by plaintiff Michael Klein - (pc) (Entered: 12/06/2001)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/4/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                COMPLAINT filed Summons(es) Issued referred to Discovery Victor B. Kenton; Jury Demand (pc) (Entered: 12/06/2001)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 17 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?