Banks v. Trump
Federal Court Proceeding North Carolina Eastern District Court, Case No. 5:17-ct-03060

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 11:25 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo FREDERICK BANKS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frederick Banks +1 979 775 5681
v.
No Logo Adrian Roe, Defendant
No Logo Cathy Bissoon, Defendant
United States Central Intelligence Agency United States Central Intelligence Agency, Defendant
Officially listed as "Central Intelligence Agency"
No Logo Charles Shumer, Defendant
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Donald J. Trump"
Unknown Role, Riviera Holdings Corp
No Logo Dr. Allissa Marquez, Defendant
No Logo Dr. Heather Ross, Defendant
No Logo Dr. Logan Graddy, Defendant
No Logo Dr. Robert Wettstein, Defendant
No Logo Dr. Cahill, Defendant
No Logo Felicia Langford, Defendant
No Logo Governor of North Carolina, Defendant
No Logo Governor of Pennsylvania, Defendant
No Logo Trump, Ivanka, Defendant
Officially listed as "Ivanka Trump"
No Logo Comey, James B., Defendant
Officially listed as "James Comey "
Federal Bureau of Investigation Director, Federal Bureau of Investigation, September 4, 2013 - May 9, 2017
Unknown Role, Lockheed Martin Corp
Sessions, Jefferson Beauregard, III Sessions, Jefferson Beauregard, III, Defendant
Officially listed as "Jeff Sessions"
United States Department of Justice Attorney General, United States Department of Justice, February 9, 2017 - November 7, 2018
United States of America Attorney General, United States of America, February 9, 2017 - November 7, 2018
No Logo John Roberts, Defendant
No Logo Joy Flowers Conti, Defendant
No Logo Judge Mark Hornak, Defendant
Pence, Michael Richard Pence, Michael Richard, Defendant
Officially listed as "Mike Pence"
Pompeo, Michael Richard Pompeo, Michael Richard, Defendant
Officially listed as "Mike Pompeo"
McConnell, Jr., Addison Mitch McConnell, Jr., Addison Mitch, Defendant
Officially listed as "Mitch McConnell"
Pelosi, Nancy Pelosi, Nancy, Defendant
Officially listed as "Nancy Pelosi"
United States House of Representatives Speaker of the House, United States House of Representatives, January 4, 2007 - January 3, 2011
United States House of Representatives Speaker of the House, United States House of Representatives, January 3, 2019 - Present
No Logo Nora Fischer, Defendant
No Logo Paul, Ryan, Defendant
No Logo Robert Cessari, Defendant
No Logo Robert Werner, Defendant
No Logo SCOTT SMITH, Defendant
No Logo Sean Langford, Defendant
Bannon, Stephen Kevin Bannon, Stephen Kevin, Defendant
Officially listed as "Steve Bannon"
No Logo Supreme Court of the United States, Defendant
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
No Logo U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None USCA Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Stay of Mandate
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: None USCA Judgment
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: None Opinion from USCA
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None USCA Case Number
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: None Judgment - Clerk
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Compel
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: 3/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
                          Letter regarding case opening sent via US Mail to Frederick Banks at Butner - F.M.C. (Indig, A.)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: 3/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
                            MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees filed by Frederick Banks. (Indig, A.)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: 3/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
                              COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Frederick Banks. (Attachment: # 1 Envelope) (Indig, A.)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 74 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?