US v. Kuyrkendall
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit, Case No. 17-1713

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 14, 2017 at 12:29 AM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 11 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER filed. The stay of proceedings is lifted. The motion to transfer [7] is granted. This case and all filings [8] are transferred pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1631 to the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit. ISSUED AS A MANDATE: April 28, 2017. (Per Curiam). Service: 04/28/2017 by clerk. [427760]
    LREF
    Blank 10 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    RESPONSE of Appellant Wiley R. Kuyrkendall to the motion to terminate appeal [7] filed by Appellee US in 17-1713. Service: 03/29/2017 by US mail. [420369]
      LREF
      Blank 9 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      ORDER filed. The briefing schedule is stayed pending disposition of the motions. See Fed. Cir. R. 31(c). Service: 03/17/2017 by clerk. [416554]
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        MOTION of Appellant Wiley R. Kuyrkendall requesting 'formal briefing schedule'. Any response is due within 10 days of service [Consent: not addressed]. Service: 03/17/2017 by clerk. [416516]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 7 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          CORRECTED ENTRY: MOTION of Appellee US to terminate appeal through transfer to USCA 5th Circuit. [Consent: opposed]. Service: 03/16/2017 by US mail, email. [416384]--[Edited 03/17/2017 by SJ - Reason: to add additional reliefs]
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Entry of appearance for Jonathan S. Cohen as of counsel for Appellee US. Service: 03/16/2017 by US mail, email. [416375]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Docketing Statement for the Appellant Wiley R. Kuyrkendall [no action taken by clerk - form not required]. Service: 03/13/2017 by US mail. [416328]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Wiley R. Kuyrkendall [form is incomplete - no action taken by clerk as form is not required]. Service: 03/13/2017 by US mail. [416325]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Entry of appearance for Wiley Randolph Kuyrkendall as pro se appellant. Service: 03/13/2017 by US mail. [416321]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Entry of appearance for Norah E. Bringer as principal counsel for Appellee US. Service: 03/08/2017 by US mail, email. [413532]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Appeal docketed. Received: 02/21/2017. [411721]Entry of Appearance due 03/15/2017. Appellant/Petitioner's Informal brief is due 03/22/2017.
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 23 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?