Moore v. University Hospitals
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-00432

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 11, 2018 at 12:00 PM EDT (3.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo DeVona Moore, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DeVona Moore

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DeVona Moore
No Logo Diego Tunstal, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Diego Tunstal

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Diego Tunstal
v.
No Logo Cleveland Police Department, Defendant
University Hospitals University Hospitals, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 5/15/17. The Court grants plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis and dismisses this action under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e). The dismissal is without prejudice to any valid state law claim plaintiff may have under the facts alleged. The Court further certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an appeal from this decision could not be taken in good faith. (Related Doc. 2 ) (D,MA)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff DeVona Moore. (S,SR) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Complaint
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Complaint against Cleveland Police Department, University Hospitals. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by DeVona Moore, Diego Tunstal. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 U.S. Marshal Form) (S,SR) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 4 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?