Michelle Trotter v. 7R Holdings LLC, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit, Case No. 16-1967

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 7, 2017 at 11:24 PM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3340 - Personal Injury: Marine
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 003012462656 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC REPLY BRIEF on behalf of Appellant Michelle Trotter, filed. Certificate of Service dated 11/14/2016 by ECF. (TFF)
    LREF
    Blank 003012444399 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF on behalf of Appellees 7R Holdings LLC, M Y Olga and Luis A. Rubi Gonzalez, filed. Certificate of Service dated 10/25/2016 by ECF. (MJD)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012429375 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      ECF FILER: Reply by Appellant Michelle Trotter to Response Motion for judicial notice, Response , filed. Certificate of Service dated 10/06/2016. SEND TO MERITS PANEL--[Edited 10/07/2016 by CLW] (TFF)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012424457 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellees 7R Holdings LLC, M Y Olga and Luis A. Rubi Gonzalez to Motion for judicial notice. Certificate of Service dated 10/03/2016. SEND TO MERITS PANEL--[Edited 10/03/2016 by CLW] (MJD)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012419313 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ORDER (Clerk) Motion for judicial notice filed by Appellant Michelle Trotter is referred to the merits panel, filed. (CLW)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012416181 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellant Michelle Trotter for Judicial Notice. Certificate of Service dated 09/21/2016. SEND TO MERITS PANEL--[Edited 09/27/2016 by CLW] (TFF)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012398113 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ECF FILER: UNOPPOSED Motion filed by Appellant Michelle Trotter to file Opening Brief for Appellant out of time. Certificate of Service dated 09/02/2016. (TFF)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012398057 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              NON COMPLIANCE Order issued to Appellant Michelle Trotter regarding the brief and/or appendix filed on 09/02/2016. Please open the attachment for the full text of the Order. Compliance due by 09/06/2016. The deadline for the next brief will be determined by Order or from the service date of the compliant brief. (MS)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 003012397362 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF on behalf of Appellant Michelle Trotter, filed. Certificate of Service dated 09/01/2016 by ECF. (TFF)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012396904 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC JOINT APPENDIX on behalf of Appellant Michelle Trotter, filed. Certificate of service dated 09/01/2016 by ECF, US mail. (TFF)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012368979 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael J. Dono on behalf of Appellee(s) 7R HOLDINGS, LLC, LUIS A. RUBI GONZALEZ, M/Y OLGA. (MJD)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012346281 Filed: 7/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    ECF FILER: UNOPPOSED Motion filed by Appellant Michelle Trotter for Extension of Time to file Appellant's Opening Brief until/for 9/1/16. Certificate of Service dated 07/06/2016. (TFF)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012333789 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant Michelle Trotter due on or before 08/01/2016. Appendix due on or before 08/01/2016. (CLW)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012305409 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Michelle Trotter advising this court that transcripts are not needed. (TFF)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012299768 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. (TNH)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012297764 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellees 7R Holdings LLC, M Y Olga and Luis A. Rubi Gonzalez, filed. (KHC)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012297760 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kelly Charles- Collins on behalf of Appellee(s) 7R HOLDINGS, LLC, LUIS A. RUBI GONZALEZ, M/Y OLGA. (KHC)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012296996 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                FOLLOW UP LETTER to Jennifer P. Brooks, Esq. for 7R Holdings LLC, Luis A. Rubi Gonzalez and M Y Olga requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 05/31/2016. Disclosure Statement on or before 05/31/2016. (CLW)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012273368 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Michelle Trotter, filed. (TFF)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012273365 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Michelle Trotter, filed. (TFF)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012273362 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Michelle Trotter, received. (TFF)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012273359 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Thomas F. Friedberg on behalf of Appellant(s) Michelle Trotter. (TFF)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012272364 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          ORDER (Clerk) This case is tentatively listed for calendaring in May of 2017. (SB)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012272322 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Michelle Trotter in District Court No. 3-14-cv-00099. (SB)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 21 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?