Uniloc USA, Inc. et al v. Ubisoft, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-00175

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 10, 2018 at 4:32 PM DT (3.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Uniloc Luxembourg SA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hayes Messina Gilman & Hayes LLC - Boston

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert R Gilman +1 617 456 8000 +1 617 443 1999 rgilman@princelobel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Prince Lobel Tye LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dean G Bostock +1 617 456 8000 +1 617 456 8100 dbostock@princelobel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael James Ercolini +1 617 456 8000 +1 617 456 8100 mercolini@princelobel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Gannon +1 617 456 8000 +1 617 456 8100 kgannon@princelobel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul J Hayes +1 617 456 8000 +1 617 456 8100 phayes@princelobel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron Seth Jacobs +1 617 456 8000 +1 617 456 8100 ajacobs@princelobel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel James McGonagle +1 617 456 8000 +1 617 456 8100 dmcgonagle@princelobel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder jfoster@princelobel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward R. Nelson, III +1 817 377 9111 ed@nelbum.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony Vecchione +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 anthony@nelbum.com
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hayes Messina Gilman & Hayes LLC - Boston

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert R Gilman +1 617 456 8000 +1 617 443 1999 rgilman@princelobel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Prince Lobel Tye LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dean G Bostock +1 617 456 8000 +1 617 456 8100 dbostock@princelobel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael James Ercolini +1 617 456 8000 +1 617 456 8100 mercolini@princelobel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Gannon +1 617 456 8000 +1 617 456 8100 kgannon@princelobel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul J Hayes +1 617 456 8000 +1 617 456 8100 phayes@princelobel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron Seth Jacobs +1 617 456 8000 +1 617 456 8100 ajacobs@princelobel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel James McGonagle +1 617 456 8000 +1 617 456 8100 dmcgonagle@princelobel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder jfoster@princelobel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward R. Nelson, III +1 817 377 9111 ed@nelbum.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony Vecchione +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 anthony@nelbum.com
v.
No Logo Ubi Soft, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric A Buresh +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 eric.buresh@eriseip.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Christopher Lang +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 mark.lang@eriseip.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Lyons Marriott +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 michelle.marriott@eriseIP.com
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Change Venue
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Status Report
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Response in Support of Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Stay
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: None Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    ORDER granting 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, filed by Ubisoft, Inc. Defendant Ubisoft, Inc.s deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Unilocs complaint is extended to May 26, 2017. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/27/2017. (slo, ) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                              Space Space

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 51 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?