United States v. Toppin
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 4:17-cv-40011
Magistrate Judge Timothy S. Hillman, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 25, 2021 at 10:16 AM ST (2.7 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael P. Lobie +1 202 514 0600 Michael.P.Lobie@usdoj.gov
Space Jeffrey N. Nunez +1 202 616 5218 +1 202 514 5238 jeffrey.n.nunez@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Massachusetts Department of Revenue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eileen Ryan McAuliffe +1 617 626 3217 +1 617 626 3245 mcauliffe@dor.state.ma.us
No Logo David L Toppin, Defendant
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee for Residential Asset Securitization Trust Series 2003-A14, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2003-N"
No Logo Jennifer Toppin, Defendant
No Logo Town Of Amherst, Defendant
No Logo Town of Gardner, Defendant
No Logo Town of Holden, Defendant
No Logo UPS Capital Business Credit f/k/a First International Bank, Defendant
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7403
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (63) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 2/25/2021, Entered: None Continue
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 2/8/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 12/28/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 12/9/2020, Entered: None Notice - Other
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: None Objection - not related to a motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 11/30/2020, Entered: None Abstract of Judgment Lien
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: None Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 9/4/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 8/29/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order of Sale
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 52 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        NOTICE of Appearance by Steven S. Tennyson on behalf of United States of America (Tennyson, Steven) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
                          LREF
                          Blank 51 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Krystle S. Guillory Tadesse on Behalf of Defendant Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee for Residential Asset Securitization Trust Series 2003-A14, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2003-N (Guillory Tadesse, Krystle) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
                            LREF
                            Blank 50 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            NOTICE issued to Attorney Justin M. Pierce regarding mandatory use of ECF in compliance with Local Rule 5.4. Failure to comply may result in the imposition of sanctions. (Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
                              LREF
                              Blank 49 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              NOTICE of Appearance by Justin M. Pierce on behalf of Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee for Residential Asset Securitization Trust Series 2003-A14, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2003-N.(Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
                                LREF
                                Blank 48 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                STIPULATION Between the United States and the Town of Amherst Regarding Priorities by United States of America. (Nunez, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 47 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  STIPULATION Between the United States and the City of Gardner Regarding Priorities by United States of America. (Nunez, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 14 Motion for Lis Pendens. Lis Pendens issued 5/18/17. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Opposition re 42 MOTION to Dismiss filed by United States of America. (Nunez, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank 44 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Town of Holden's ANSWER to 5 Amended Complaint and Stipulation with the United States by United States of America.(Nunez, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 43 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia L. Davidson on behalf of Town of Holden (Davidson, Patricia) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 42 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            MOTION to Dismiss by David L Toppin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            ANSWER to 5 Amended Complaint by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee for Residential Asset Securitization Trust Series 2003-A14, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2003-N.(Guillory Tadesse, Krystle) (Entered: 05/23/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ORDER entered. Lis Pendens as to the Holden Property by United States of America.(Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ORDER entered. Lis Pendens as to the Amherst Property by United States of America.(Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ORDER entered. Lis Pendens as to the Gardner Property by United States of America.(Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 36 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Town of Holden answer due 6/30/2017. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 6/30/2017 to File Answer re 5 Amended Complaint by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Answer Extension Agreement)(Nunez, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Joel B. Bard on behalf of Town of Amherst (Bard, Joel) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah I. Ecker on behalf of Town of Amherst (Ecker, Deborah) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          ANSWER to 5 Amended Complaint by Jennifer Toppin.(Rietveld, Eric) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            ANSWER to 5 Amended Complaint by Town of Amherst.(Bard, Joel) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot 25 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 28 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee for Residential Asset Securitization Trust Series 2003-A14, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2003-N answer due 5/23/2017. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. David L Toppin answer due 6/12/2017. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank 28 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to May 23, 2017 to File Answer re 5 Amended Complaint or otherwise respond to Amended Complaint by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee for Residential Asset Securitization Trust Series 2003-A14, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2003-N.(Guillory Tadesse, Krystle) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      City of Gardner's ANSWER to 5 Amended Complaint by Town of Gardner. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Flick, John) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by John Martin Flick on behalf of Town of Gardner (Flick, John) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to May 23, 2017 to File Answer re 5 Amended Complaint or otherwise repond to Amended Complaint by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee for Residential Asset Securitization Trust Series 2003-A14, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2003-N.(Guillory Tadesse, Krystle) (Entered: 05/09/2017)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Krystle S. Guillory Tadesse on behalf of Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee for Residential Asset Securitization Trust Series 2003-A14, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2003-N (Guillory Tadesse, Krystle) (Entered: 05/09/2017)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to May 11, 2017 to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by David L Toppin.(Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 05/09/2017)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Summons Returned Unexecuted by United States of America as to Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee for Residential Asset Securitization Trust Series 2003-A14, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2003-N. (Nunez, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/04/2017)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed UPS Capital Business Credit f/k/a First International Bank served on 4/21/2017, answer due 5/12/2017. (Nunez, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/04/2017)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Summons Returned Unexecuted by United States of America as to UPS Capital Business Credit f/k/a First International Bank. (Nunez, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/04/2017)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed Jennifer Toppin served on 4/24/2017, answer due 5/15/2017. (Nunez, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/04/2017)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        ANSWER to 5 Amended Complaint by UPS Capital Business Credit f/k/a First International Bank.(Solar, Lauren) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed (Nunez, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            ANSWER to 5 Amended Complaint by Commonwealth of Massachusetts. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(McAuliffe, Eileen) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Commonwealth of Massachusetts waiver sent on 4/24/2017, answer due 6/23/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Waiver of Service, Massachusetts Department of Revenue)(Nunez, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                MOTION for Lis Pendens by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jeffrey Nunez, # 2 Exhibit B - Memorandum of Lis Pendens, # 3 Exhibit C - Memorandum of Lis Pendens, # 4 Exhibit D - Memorandum of Lis Pendens)(Nunez, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed Town of Holden served on 4/20/2017, answer due 5/11/2017. (Nunez, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed Town of Gardner served on 4/20/2017, answer due 5/11/2017. (Nunez, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed Town of Amherst served on 4/20/2017, answer due 5/11/2017. (Nunez, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed David L Toppin served on 4/20/2017, answer due 5/11/2017. (Nunez, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Eileen Ryan McAuliffe on behalf of Commonwealth of Massachusetts (McAuliffe, Eileen) (Entered: 04/20/2017)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Eileen Ryan McAuliffe on behalf of Commonwealth of Massachusetts (McAuliffe, Eileen) (Entered: 04/20/2017)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee for Residential Asset Securitization Trust Series 2003-A14, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2003-N served on 4/18/2017, answer due 5/9/2017. (Nunez, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/19/2017)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              Summons Returned Unexecuted by United States of America as to Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee for Residential Asset Securitization Trust Series 2003-A14, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2003-N. (Nunez, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/19/2017)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America.(Nunez, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/14/2017)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Nunez on behalf of United States of America (Nunez, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    Summons Issued as to Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee for Residential Asset Securitization Trust Series 2003-A14, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2003-N, David L Toppin, Jennifer Toppin, Town of Amherst, Town of Gardner, Town of Holden, UPS Capital Business Credit f/k/a First International Bank. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: US Government), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Category Form, # 3 Summons - David L. Toppin, # 4 Summons - Jennifer Toppin, # 5 Summons - Deutsche Bank, # 6 Summons - UPS, # 7 Summons - Mass 1, # 8 Summons - Mass 2, # 9 Summons - Holden, # 10 Summons - Amherst, # 11 Summons - Gardner)(Lobie, Michael) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/6/2017) (Jones, Sherry). (Entered: 02/03/2017)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 44 times.

                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?