National Labor Relations Board Region 8 v. Precision Steel Services, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 3:17-cv-00493

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 7, 2019 at 6:26 PM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Allen Binstock, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by National Labor Relations Board

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Allen Binstock +1 216 522 3716 +1 216 522 2418 allen.binstock@nlrb.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melanie R. Bordelois +1 216 522 3713 +1 216 522 2418 melanie.bordelois@nlrb.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Iva Young Choe +1 216 522 7961 +1 216 522 2418 iva.choe@nlrb.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Rudra Choudhury +1 216 522 8182 +1 216 522 2418 rudra.choudhury@nlrb.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kyle A. Vuchak +1 216 303 7390 kyle.vuchak@nlrb.gov
v.
No Logo Precision Steel Services, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Eastman & Smith

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah Pawlicki +1 419 247 1701 +1 419 247 1777 sepawlicki@eastmansmith.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James B. Yates +1 419 241 6000 +1 419 247 1777 jbyates@eastmansmith.com
No Logo Michael Mohney, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Widman & Franklin, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marilyn L. Widman +1 419 243 9005 +1 419 243 9404 marilyn@wflawfirm.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 160(1)
Nature of Suit 720 - Labor: Labor/Management Relations
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: 5/9/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Order (marginal) of Case Dismissal without prejudice (re 10 )pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Judge James G. Carr on 5/9/17. (C,D)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by Allen Binstock. (Vuchak, Kyle) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Allen Binstock. Precision Steel Services, Inc. waiver sent on 3/10/2017, answer due 5/9/2017. filed on behalf of Allen Binstock (Bordelois, Melanie) (Entered: 03/22/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: 3/20/2017 Unknown Document Type
        Motion for Order to try the Petition on the basis of the Affidavits and Documentary Evidence filed by Plaintiff Allen Binstock. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Protective Order)(Vuchak, Kyle) Modified on 3/22/2017 to correct motion event and text (D,TM).
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Brief Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Allen Binstock. (Vuchak, Kyle) Modified on 3/22/2017 to edit text (D,TM). (Entered: 03/20/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Precision Steel Services, Inc.. (Yates, James) (Entered: 03/14/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Attorney Appearance by James B. Yates filed by on behalf of Precision Steel Services, Inc.. (Yates, James) (Entered: 03/14/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Attorney Appearance by Sarah E. Pawlicki filed by on behalf of Precision Steel Services, Inc.. (Pawlicki, Sarah) (Entered: 03/14/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Attorney Appearance by Marilyn L. Widman filed by on behalf of Michael Mohney. (Widman, Marilyn) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons issued, no summons provided. (H,JD) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: 3/9/2017 Unknown Document Type
                      Complaint seeking injunctive relief against Precision Steel Services, Inc... Filing fee exempt. Filed by National Labor Relations Board Region 8. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Order to Show Cause, # 3 Exhibit A-charge dated 8-16-2016, # 4 Exhibit B-1st amended charge dated 9-19-16, # 5 Exhibit C-2nd amended charge dated 11-2-16, # 6 Exhibit D--3rd amended charge dated 3-2-17, # 7 Exhibit E-charge dated 11-10-16, # 8 Exhibit F-Consolidated complaint, # 9 Exhibit G-Amendment to Consolidated complaint, # 10 Exhibit H-Order changing situs, # 11 Exhibit I-2nd Amendment to Consolidated complaint, # 12 Exhibit J-Order rescheduling hearing, # 13 Exhibit K-Answer to Consolidated complaint, # 14 Exhibit L-Answer to Amendment to Consolidated complaint, # 15 Exhibit M-Answer to 2nd Amended Consolidated complaint) (Bordelois, Melanie)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Judge James G. Carr assigned to case. (H,JD)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (H,JD)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (H,JD)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 15 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?