J & J Sports Productions, Incorporated v. B O B Lounge, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Michigan Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-10775

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 2, 2019 at 7:13 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: None Judgment - Default
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    OPINION AND ORDER granting 10 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: None Hearing on Motion*
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None Hearing on Motion*
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Default Judgment
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default*
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Request for Clerks Entry of Default
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Civil Case - Complaint, Amended
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Civil Case - Complaint
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 3 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?