United States v. Abdullahi
Criminal Case Washington Western District Court, Case No. 2:17-cr-00071
District Judge Ricardo S. Martinez, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 15, 2019 at 7:33 AM ST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jessica Murphy Manca +1 206 553 7970 Jessica.Manca@usdoj.gov
No Logo Hamead Ibrahim Abdullahi, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by CALFO EAKES & OSTROVSKY, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Angelo J Calfo +1 206 294 7440 +1 206 623 8717 angeloc@calfoeakes.com
Space Andrea Delgadillo Ostrovsky +1 206 407 2200 +1 206 407 2224 andreao@calfoeakes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Public Defender or Community Defender Appointment Vanessa Pai-Thompson +1 206 553 1100 vanessa_pai-thompson@fd.org

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (46) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting Defendant's 46 Motion to Seal 48 Declaration of Andrea D. Ostrovsky in support of Defendant's 47 Sentencing Memorandum as to Hamead Ibrahim Abdullahi. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by USA as to Hamead Ibrahim Abdullahi (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Manca, Jessica) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Sealed Legal Document 48 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration of Andrea D. Ostrovsky in Support of Defendant Hamead Abdullahi's Sentencing Memorandum by Hamead Ibrahim Abdullahi, re 46 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Declaration of Andrea D. Ostrovsky in Support of Defendant Hamead Abdullahi's Sentencing Memorandum. (Ostrovsky, Andrea) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Hamead Ibrahim Abdullahi (Ostrovsky, Andrea) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Declaration of Andrea D. Ostrovsky in Support of Defendant Hamead Abdullahi's Sentencing Memorandum by Hamead Ibrahim Abdullahi. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/27/2018, (Ostrovsky, Andrea) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER OF ACCEPTANCE OF PLEA OF GUILTY, ADJUDICATION OF GUILT, AND NOTICE OF SENTENCING as to Hamead Ibrahim Abdullahi by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (cc: USPO) (LW) (Entered: 02/09/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re Plea of Guilty as to Hamead Ibrahim Abdullahi by Hon. James P. Donohue. Noting Date 2/7/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Acceptance of Plea)(TF) (cc: USPO) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                PLEA AGREEMENT as to Hamead Ibrahim Abdullahi (cc: USPO, FLU, AFU) (TF) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  CONSENT TO RULE 11 PLEA in a felony case as to Hamead Ibrahim Abdullahi (TF) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. James P. Donohue- CRD: tfarrell; AUSA: Jessica Manca; Def Cnsl: Andrea Ostrovsky; Court Reporter: Digital Recording; Time of Hearing: 10:00am; Courtroom: 12B; CHANGE OF PLEA HEARING as to Hamead Ibrahim Abdullahi held on 1/23/2018. Defendant present in custody. Defendant placed under oath and advised of rights/charges/penalties; Defendant executes Consent to Rule 11 Plea in a felony case before a U.S. Magistrate Judge; Defendant age = 25 years old; Education = GED; Court reviews the plea agreement; Hamead Ibrahim Abdullahi (1) pleads GUILTY to Count 3. Remaining Counts to be dismissed at sentencing. Court finds the Defendant is competent to enter a guilty plea; Court signs the Report and Recommendation and Counsel have fourteen days to file objections; Court orders the preparation of a Presentence Report. Defendant remanded to custody. Sentencing set for 5/4/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TF) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ORDER signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez 35 Stipulated MOTION to Continue Trial and Pretrial Motions Dates filed by Hamead Ibrahim Abdullahi. Jury Trial is set for 2/20/2018 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S Martinez. Motions due by 1/22/2018.(LC) (Entered: 11/20/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ricardo S Martinez- CRD: Laurie Cuaresma; AUSA: Jessica Manca; Def Cnsl: Andrea Ostrovsky; Time of Hearing: 10:00 AM; STATUS HEARING as to Hamead Ibrahim Abdullahi held on Friday 11/17/2017. Defendant remanded to custody. (LC) Modified on 11/20/2017 to correct date of hearing (LC). (Entered: 11/20/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          WAIVER of Speedy Trial by Hamead Ibrahim Abdullahi (Ostrovsky, Andrea) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Stipulated MOTION to Continue Trial and Pretrial Motions Dates by Hamead Ibrahim Abdullahi. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/14/2017, (Ostrovsky, Andrea) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Andrea Delgadillo Ostrovsky appearing for Hamead Ibrahim Abdullahi (Ostrovsky, Andrea) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                ORDER by Judge Ricardo S Martinez granting 32 Unopposed MOTION Protective Order. Motion terminated.(LC) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Unopposed MOTION Protective Order by USA as to Hamead Ibrahim Abdullahi (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Stipulated Protective Order) Noting Date 7/27/2017, (Manca, Jessica) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    ORDER by Judge Ricardo S Martinez granting 29 Motion to Continue Trial as to Hamead Ibrahim Abdullahi (1). Jury Trial is set for 12/18/2017 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S Martinez. Motions due by 11/13/2017.(LC) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      WAIVER of Speedy Trial by Hamead Ibrahim Abdullahi (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Unopposed MOTION to Continue Trial and Pretrial Motions Dates by Hamead Ibrahim Abdullahi. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/13/2017, (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 07/13/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          CJA 20 Appointment as to Hamead Ibrahim Abdullahi: Appointment of Attorney Angelo J Calfo for Hamead Ibrahim Abdullahi Approved by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (TF) (Entered: 06/14/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            ORDER Granting 23 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel and for Appointment of New Counsel by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. Vanessa Pai-Thompson withdrawn from case as to Hamead Ibrahim Abdullahi (1). CJA Counsel shall be appointed. (KMP) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Sealed Legal Document 26 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Mary Alice Theiler- CRD: K. Peter; Def Cnsl: Vanessa Pai-Thompson; Court Reporter: (SEALED) Digital Recording; Time of Hearing: 11:00am; Courtroom: 12B; EX PARTE MOTION HEARING as to Hamead Ibrahim Abdullahi held on 6/12/2017 re 23 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and for Appointment of New Counsel submitted by attorney Vanessa Pai-Thompson filed by Hamead Ibrahim Abdullahi. Defendant present in custody. Court reviews motion. Court hears from defendant and defense counsel regarding motion. Court GRANTS Motion to Withdraw. CJA counsel to be appointed. Defendant remanded to custody. (KMP) Modified on 6/13/2017 (KMP) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION as to Hamead Ibrahim Abdullahi re 23 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and for Appointment of New Counsel submitted by attorney Vanessa Pai-Thompson : Ex Parte Motion Hearing set for 6/12/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 12B before Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (KMP) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and for Appointment of New Counsel submitted by attorney Vanessa Pai-Thompson by Hamead Ibrahim Abdullahi. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/16/2017, (Pai-Thompson, Vanessa) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER by Judge Ricardo S Martinez granting 20 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Trial Date and Extend the Due Date for Pretrial Motions, filed by Hamead Ibrahim Abdullahi. Jury Trial is set for 8/21/2017 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S Martinez. Motions due by 7/14/2017.(LC) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      WAIVER of Speedy Trial by Hamead Ibrahim Abdullahi (Pai-Thompson, Vanessa) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Continue Trial Date and Extend the Due Date for Pretrial Motions, by Hamead Ibrahim Abdullahi. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/24/2017, (Pai-Thompson, Vanessa) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER by Judge Ricardo S Martinez granting 18 Unopposed MOTION to Continue PTMs DUE DATE filed by Hamead Ibrahim Abdullahi. Motions due by 4/20/2017.(LC) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Continue PTMs DUE DATE by Hamead Ibrahim Abdullahi. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/6/2017, (Pai-Thompson, Vanessa) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John L Weinberg- CRD: K. Peter; AUSA: Jessica Manca; Def Cnsl: Sara Brin for Vanessa Pai-Thompson; Court Reporter: Digital Recording; Time of Hearing: 9:00am; Courtroom: 12B; ARRAIGNMENT as to Hamead Ibrahim Abdullahi (1) Count 1,2,3,4 held on 3/16/2017. Defendant present in custody. Defendant advised of charges and penalties. Defendant pleads NOT GUILTY to all charges. Defense Counsel requests discovery pursuant to Local Rule. Defendant remanded to custody. Motions due by 4/6/2017, Jury Trial is set for 5/15/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 13206 before Judge Ricardo S Martinez. Proposed Trial Exhibits Due By:5/15/2017. (KMP) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Letter scheduling arraignment for defendant Hamead Ibrahim Abdullahi. Arraignment set for 3/16/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12B before John L Weinberg. (Manca, Jessica) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  ORDER CONTINUING DETENTION as to Hamead Ibrahim Abdullahi by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. cc: USMO; (SB) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 14 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    SEALED Signature Page to 13 Indictment as to Hamead Ibrahim Abdullahi. (SB) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      INDICTMENT as to Hamead Ibrahim Abdullahi (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3-4. (Attachments: # 1 Def Status Sheet) (SB) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        DETENTION ORDER PENDING TRIAL as to Hamead Ibrahim Abdullahi by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (cc: PTS, USMO) (KMP) [2:17-mj-00069-BAT] (Entered: 03/06/2017)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Mary Alice Theiler- CRD: K. Peter; AUSA: Jessica Manca; Def Cnsl: Vanessa Pai-Thompson; PTS: Lorraine Bolle; Court Reporter: Digital Recording; Time of Hearing: 1:30pm; Courtroom: 12B; DETENTION HEARING as to Hamead Ibrahim Abdullahi held on 3/6/2017. Defendant present in custody. Court reviews record and PTS reports. Government maintains motion for detention. Defense argues release on conditions. Government argues for detention. For reasons stated on the record, Defendant is ORDERED detained and remanded to custody pending trial. (KMP) [2:17-mj-00069-BAT] (Entered: 03/06/2017)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 03/01/2017 in case as to Hamead Ibrahim Abdullahi. (ENJ) [2:17-mj-00069-BAT] (Entered: 03/06/2017)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              NOTICE OF INVOCATION OF RIGHTS AT INITIAL APPEARANCE by Hamead Ibrahim Abdullahi (ENJ) [2:17-mj-00069-BAT] (Entered: 03/01/2017)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                MOTION for Detention by USA as to Hamead Ibrahim Abdullahi (ENJ) [2:17-mj-00069-BAT] (Entered: 03/01/2017)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Mary Alice Theiler- CRD: E. Jensen; AUSA: Jessica Manca; Def Cnsl: Vanessa Pai-Thompson; PTS: Lorraine Bolle; Court Reporter: Digital Recording; Time of Hearing: 2:00pm; Courtroom: 12B; INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Hamead Ibrahim Abdullahi held on 3/1/2017. Defendant present in custody. Defendant advised of rights. Financial affidavit reviewed, Counsel appointed. Defendant advised of charges and penalties. Government moves for detention. Counsel requests a detention hearing. Hearing scheduled. Defendant remanded to custody. Detention Hearing set for 3/6/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12B before Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. Preliminary Examination set for 3/15/2017 at 01:00 PM before Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (ENJ) [2:17-mj-00069-BAT] (Entered: 03/01/2017)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER appointing Vanessa Pai-Thompson for Hamead Ibrahim Abdullahi. On the basis of the defendant's sworn financial statement, the court finds that he/she is financially unable to retain counsel. It is hereby ORDERED that the Federal Public Defender for the Western District of Washington be and hereby is appointed to represent the defendant pursuant to Title 18 United States Code 3006A. Approved by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (No.pdf image attached) (ENJ) [2:17-mj-00069-BAT] (Entered: 03/01/2017)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      COMPLAINT as to Hamead Ibrahim Abdullahi (1). (ENJ) [2:17-mj-00069-BAT] (Entered: 02/28/2017)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        MOTIONS REFERRED: At the direction of Judge Ricardo S Martinez, 23 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and for Appointment of New Counsel submitted by attorney Vanessa Pai-Thompson as to Hamead Ibrahim Abdullahi is referred to Judge Mary Alice Theiler (LC)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Arrest of Hamead Ibrahim Abdullahi on 3/1/2017. (ENJ) [2:17-mj-00069-BAT]
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Case unsealed as to Hamead Ibrahim Abdullahi (ENJ) [2:17-mj-00069-BAT]
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                              This case has been viewed 52 times.

                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                              Space
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                               
                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                              Need Password Help?