WILLIAMS v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-00445

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 28, 2021 at 9:51 PM DT (2.2 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MONIQUE WILLIAMS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Cochran Firm California

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen E. Evans +1 202 682 5800 +1 202 408 8852 kevans@cochranfirm.com
Individually and as Mother and Personal Representative of the Estate of H.W., Deceased Karen E. Evans +1 202 682 5800 +1 202 408 8852 kevans@cochranfirm.com
v.
No Logo Children's National Medical Center, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by JACKSON & CAMPBELL, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Crystal S. Deese +1 202 457 1600 +1 202 457 1678 cdeese@jackscamp.com
Space Diona F. Howard-Nicolas +1 202 457 1656 dhowardnicolas@jackscamp.com
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The District Of Columbia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Leeson Sroka +1 202 252 7113 +1 202 514 9155 scott.sroka@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 362 - Personal Injury: Medical Malpractice
  Entries (99) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 5/28/2021, Entered: None Stay
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: None Stay
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 3/16/2021, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 3/10/2021, Entered: None Stay
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 2/10/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 11/3/2020, Entered: None Stay
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 11/3/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/3/2020, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 9/2/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 8/28/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 5/7/2020, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 2/14/2020, Entered: None Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 2/12/2020, Entered: None Notice of Proposed Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 2/11/2020, Entered: None Order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 2/10/2020, Entered: None Notice of Proposed Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 2/10/2020, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/23/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/16/2019, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: None Strike
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/11/2019, Entered: None Rule 26a2 Statement
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None Rule 26a2 Statement
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: None Rule 26a2 Statement
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/9/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Sanctions
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/9/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/6/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/6/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/4/2019, Entered: None Sanctions
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/4/2019, Entered: None Compel
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/3/2019, Entered: None Sanctions
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/3/2019, Entered: None Compel
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/26/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective Order
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/8/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/7/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/5/2019, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/22/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/15/2019, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/11/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/12/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/14/2019, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/2/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/27/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Discovery
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/19/2019, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Memorandum
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Memorandum
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: 6/29/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER concerning the discovery matters discussed at the in-chambers telephone conference held on this date. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 6/29/2018. (lcjdb1)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018 Order on motion to modifyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 6/15/2018. (lcjdb1)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: 6/13/2018 Modify
                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Modify /Extend the Scheduling Order Deadlines by CHILDREN'S NATIONAL MEDICAL CENTER (Deese, Crystal)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: 4/17/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 23 the parties' joint motion for a protective order. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 4/17/2018. (lcjdb1)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            Consent MOTION for Order by MONIQUE WILLIAMS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00445-JDB, 1:17-cv-00448-JDB(Evans, Karen) (Entered: 03/29/2018)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: 3/16/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 3/16/2018. (lcjdb1)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: 3/15/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by CHILDREN'S NATIONAL MEDICAL CENTER (Deese, Crystal)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Diona F. Howard-Nicolas on behalf of CHILDREN'S NATIONAL MEDICAL CENTER Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00445-JDB, 1:17-cv-00448-JDB(Howard-Nicolas, Diona) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Crystal S. Deese on behalf of CHILDREN'S NATIONAL MEDICAL CENTER Substituting for attorney Marchello D. Gray Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00445-JDB, 1:17-cv-00448-JDB(Deese, Crystal) Modified on 1/8/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 01/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: 12/11/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 12/11/2017. (lcjdb1)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: 12/8/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Crystal S. Deese on behalf of CHILDREN'S NATIONAL MEDICAL CENTER (Deese, Crystal)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/7/2017, Entered: 12/7/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          Consent MOTION for Scheduling Order to Exten Deadlines by MONIQUE WILLIAMS (Evans, Karen)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT REGARDING CONSOLIDATION by MONIQUE WILLIAMS. (Evans, Karen) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: None Rule 26a1 Statement
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .RULE 26a1 STATEMENT by defendant Children's National Medical Center. (td) Modified on 7/19/2017 (td). (Entered: 07/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: 7/19/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  RULE 26a1 STATEMENT. (Deese, Crystal)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: 7/19/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    RULE 26a1 STATEMENT. (Evans, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: 7/18/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHILDREN'S NATIONAL MEDICAL CENTER. (Deese, Crystal) Modified on 7/19/2017 (td).
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT Regarding the Issue of Consolidation of Cases Pursuant to the Court's Order Dated June 16, 2017 by MONIQUE WILLIAMS. (Evans, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: 6/16/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 06/16/17. (lcjdb1)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: 6/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Evans, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: 5/12/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER setting Initial Scheduling Conference. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 05/12/17. (lcjdb1)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/10/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .AFFIDAVIT of Service by MONIQUE WILLIAMS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Evans, Karen) Modified on 4/10/2017 (td).
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/10/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .AFFIDAVIT of Service by MONIQUE WILLIAMS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Evans, Karen) Modified on 4/10/2017 (td).
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: 3/20/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    Receipt on 3-20-2017 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 16-CA-007219. (zrdj)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: 3/17/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Consolidate Cases by MONIQUE WILLIAMS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Evans, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: 3/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE to Counsel re 1 Notice of Removal. (md)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: 3/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2016 CA 007219 M filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Certification)(Sroka, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Amended Pleadings due by 9/10/2018. Fact discovery due by 10/9/2018. Summary Judgment motion due by 2/27/2019. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/27/2019. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 4/11/2019. Status Conference set for 10/26/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 30A before Judge John D. Bates. (tb)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Amended Pleadings due by 6/9/2018. Discovery due by 6/29/2018. Joinder of Parties due by 6/9/2018. Summary Judgment motion due by 12/27/2018. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/27/2019. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/6/2019. Status Conference set for 7/9/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 30A before Judge John D. Bates. (tb)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ERROR re 19 Substitution of Counsel; emailed to cdeese@jackscamp.com, cc'd 4 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Attorney Diona Howard-Nicolas cannot be added to the case; Not a member of the bar of this Court. (znmw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John D. Bates: Status Conference held on 12/14/2017. New Status Conference set for 4/13/2018 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 30A before Judge John D. Bates. (Court Reporter: Barbara DeVico) (gdf)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/11/2018. Summary Judgment motion due by 9/28/2018. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/29/2018. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/8/2018. (tb)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 3 plaintiff's motion to consolidate cases, defendants' consent thereto as stated in 15 plaintiff's status report, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that Civil Action No. 17-445 and Civil Action No. 17-448 are CONSOLIDATED; it is further ordered that civil actin 17-448 be closed; and it is further ORDERED that all filings shall henceforth be made only in Civil Action No. 17-445. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 10/19/2017. (lcjdb1) Modified on 10/20/2017 (ztb).
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ERROR re 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement; emailed to cdeese@jackscamp.com, cc'd 3 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect event used, 2. Please refile document, 3. ENTERED IN ERROR; Refile using the event Rule 26a1 Statement (under Other Documents on the Civil docketing menu). (znmw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 14 Rule 26a1 Statement was entered in error and counsel refiled said pleading as docket entry no. 13 . (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Amended Pleadings due by 12/11/2017. Discovery due by 5/31/2018. Parties shall submit joint stipulation regarding the issue of consolidation by 6/30/2017. Plaintiff Rule 26(a)(1) due by 7/17/2017. Defendant Rule 26(a)(1) due by 7/17/2017. Summary Judgment motions due by 6/30/2018. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/31/2018. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/10/2018. Status Conference set for 12/14/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 30A before Judge John D. Bates. (tb)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry: Scheduling Conference held on 6/16/2017 before Judge John D. Bates: See Scheduling order previously entered. (Court Reporter Bryan Wayne) (tb) Modified on 7/14/2017 (tb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/16/2017 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 30A before Judge John D. Bates. (tb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ERROR re 5 Affidavit; emailed to kevans@cochranfirm.com, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect event used, 2. Please refile document, 3. Use the events located under Service of Process, the select Summons Returned Executed as to... (ztd, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ERROR re 6 Affidavit; emailed to kevans@cochranfirm.com, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect event used, 2. Please refile document, 3. Use the events located under Service of Process, the select Summons Returned Executed as to... (ztd, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (md)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 18 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?