Rujawitz v. ATPE, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Southern District Court, Case No. 3:17-cv-00251
District Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 11, 2018 at 8:31 AM DT (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Tayler Rujawitz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sowers & Wolf, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua M. Pierson +1 314 744 4010 +1 314 744 4026 jp@sowerswolf.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ferne P. Wolf +1 314 744 4010 +1 314 744 4026 fw@sowerswolf.com
v.
No Logo ATPE, LLC, Defendant
No Logo ATPF, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Heather Anderson, Defendant
No Logo Michael Anderson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jailer, Independence County Jail William James Luse +1 843 455 6049 lusewilliam@yahoo.com
Jailer, Independence County Jail Wendell A Odom, Jr. +1 713 223 5575 +1 713 224 2815 wendellodom@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jailer, Independence County Jail Kathleen J. Love +1 505 843 6161 +1 505 242 8227 kathy@mcginnlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by BAXTER & BAXTER LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jailer, Independence County Jail JUSTIN M. BAXTER +1 503 297 9031 justin@baxterlaw.com
Jailer, Independence County Jail Michael C. Baxter +1 503 297 9031 +1 503 291 9172 michael@baxterlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cafferty Clobes Meriwether & Sprengel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jailer, Independence County Jail Bryan L. Clobes +1 215 864 2800 +1 215 864 2810 bclobes@caffertyclobes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carey, Danisand Lowe, L.l.c.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jailer, Independence County Jail Corey D Sullivan +1 314 725 7700 +1 314 678 3401 csullivan@careydanis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Francis & Mailman PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jailer, Independence County Jail Erin Amanda Novak +1 215 735 8600 +1 215 940 8000 ENOVAK@consumerlawfirm.com
Jailer, Independence County Jail John Soumilas +1 215 735 8600 jsoumilas@consumerlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Freed Kanner London & Millen LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jailer, Independence County Jail Douglas A. Millen +1 224 632 4500 +1 224 632 4519 doug@fklmlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldberg & Osborne

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jailer, Independence County Jail David J Diamond +1 520 620 3975 ddiamond@goldbergandosborne.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hausfeld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jailer, Independence County Jail Swathi Bojedla +1 202 540 7200 +1 202 540 7201 sbojedla@hausfeld.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hawks Quindel SC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jailer, Independence County Jail Larry A. Johnson +1 414 271 8650 +1 414 271 8442 ljohnson@hq-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by HEIDEMAN NUDELMAN & KALIK, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jailer, Independence County Jail Noel Jason Nudelman +1 202 463 1818 +1 202 463 2999 njnudelman@hnklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman, Herman & Katz, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jailer, Independence County Jail Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hhkc.com
Jailer, Independence County Jail Russ M. Herman +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 rwestenfeld@hhkc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by HKM EMPLOYMENT ATTORNEYS PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jailer, Independence County Jail Rachel M. Emens +1 206 739 5098 remens@hkm.com
Jailer, Independence County Jail Donald W Heyrich +1 206 838 2504 +1 206 260 3055 dheyrich@hkm.com
Jailer, Independence County Jail Jason A Rittereiser +1 206 838 2504 jrittereiser@hkm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ilg Legal Office, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jailer, Independence County Jail Tracy Scanlan +1 415 398 8700 tscanlan@ilglegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kopelman & Paige, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jailer, Independence County Jail Janelle M. Austin +1 617 556 0007 +1 617 654 1735 jaustin@k-plaw.com
Jailer, Independence County Jail Jackie A. Cowin +1 617 654 1735 jcowin@k-plaw.com
Jailer, Independence County Jail Darren R. Klein +1 617 556 0007 +1 617 654 1735 DKLEIN@k-plaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Daniel V. Santiago P.C

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jailer, Independence County Jail Daniel V Santiago +1 866 306 9527 +1 866 306 9528 dvs@dvslawoffices.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Gabriel Del Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jailer, Independence County Jail Ira R. Abel +1 212 799 4672 iraabel@verizon.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Peter Stutheit

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jailer, Independence County Jail Peter Stutheit +1 503 493 7488 peter@peterstutheit.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Levi & Korsinsky, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jailer, Independence County Jail Rosemary M. Rivas +1 415 291 2420 +1 415 484 1294 rrivas@zlk.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LOUISIANA CAPITAL ASSISTANCE CENTER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jailer, Independence County Jail Richard Bourke +1 504 558 9867 +1 504 558 0378 rbourke@thejusticecenter.org

Toggle Switch Represented by McGinn, Carpenter, Montoya & Love, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jailer, Independence County Jail Randi McGinn +1 505 843 6161 randi@mcginnlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MEYER GLITZENSTEIN & EUBANKS LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jailer, Independence County Jail Katherine Meyer

Toggle Switch Represented by Michael Anderson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jailer, Independence County Jail Michael Anderson

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan & Morgan, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jailer, Independence County Jail Cecilia Maria Barber +1 954 318 0268 +1 954 333 3515 cbarber@forthepeople.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Orleans Public Defender's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jailer, Independence County Jail Anna K. VanCleave +1 504 821 8101 avancleave@opdla.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Rainwater, Holt & Sexton PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jailer, Independence County Jail James Stephen Holt +1 501 868 2500 holt@rainfirm.com
Jailer, Independence County Jail Michael R. Rainwater +1 501 868 2500 rainwater@rainfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Richard Celler Legal, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jailer, Independence County Jail Richard Bernard Celler +1 954 243 4295 +1 954 337 2771 richard@floridaovertimelawyer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jailer, Independence County Jail Steven Wayne Pepich +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 stevep@csgrr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schlesinger Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jailer, Independence County Jail Jeffrey L. Haberman +1 954 320 9507 +95320950 953 320 9509 JHaberman@schlesingerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shatzkin & Mayer, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jailer, Independence County Jail Debra Anne Mayer +1 212 684 3000 +1 212 684 5333 dmayer@shatzkinmayer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sheldon J Schlesinger PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jailer, Independence County Jail Jonathan Robert Gdanski +1 954 320 9507 +1 954 320 9509 jonathan@schlesingerlawoffices.com
Jailer, Independence County Jail Scott P. Schlesinger +1 954 467 8800 scott@schlesingerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Spivak Lipton Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jailer, Independence County Jail Lauren B. McGlothlin +1 410 206 2432 +1 212 765 8954 lmcglothlin@spivaklipton.com
Jailer, Independence County Jail Hope Allison Pordy +1 212 765 2100 +1 212 541 5429 hpordy@spivaklipton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jailer, Independence County Jail Christopher William Espy +1 601 718 2087 +1 601 718 2102 cespy@forthepeople.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 201

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jailer, Independence County Jail Marybeth E Mullaney +1 800 385 8160 +1 800 385 8160 marybeth@mullaneylaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jailer, Independence County Jail Luis A. Cabassa +1 813 224 0431 +1 813 229 8712 lcabassa@wfclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 4

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jailer, Independence County Jail Russell A. Wood +1 479 967 9663 +1 479 967 9664 woodlaw@suddenlinkmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Buzbee Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jailer, Independence County Jail Anthony G. Buzbee +1 713 223 5393 +1 713 223 5909 tbuzbee@txattorneys.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Traber & Voorhees

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jailer, Independence County Jail Theresa M Traber +1 626 585 9611 +1 626 577 7079 tmt@tvlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Tran Law Firm LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jailer, Independence County Jail Andrew Hideki Iwata +1 713 223 8855 +1 713 623 6399 ahi@tranlawllp.com
Jailer, Independence County Jail Trang Q Tran +1 713 223 8855 +1 713 623 6399 ttran@tranlawllp.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 2(a)
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING 19 First Motion for Attorney Fees. Default judgment was entered in this case on October 20, 2017 (Doc. 14 ). Plaintiff now requests costs in the amount of $650, attorney's fees in the amount of $7,525, and statutory interest in the amount of $1,265.88. After reviewing counsel's billing statement itemizing the hours worked on the matter, along with the supporting affidavits and receipts, the Court finds the costs and fees requested to be reasonable. Accordingly, the Court GRANTS 19 Motion for Attorney Fees and awards Plaintiff $650 in costs, $7,525 in attorney's fees, and $1,265.88 in interest. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 11/14/2017. (mlp) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 11/14/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    EXHIBIT by Tayler Rujawitz. Exhibit to 19 Motion for Attorney Fees Corrected Exhibit 1 with Attachment. (Wolf, Ferne) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      First MOTION for Attorney Fees by Tayler Rujawitz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1- FPW Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2- JP Affidavit, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3- Berns Affidavit, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4- Costs)(Wolf, Ferne) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Tayler Rujawitz against Defendants ATPE, LLC, Heather Anderson, and Michael Anderson. Approved by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 10/27/2017. (mlp) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Defendant ATPF, Inc., is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 10/27/2017. (mlp) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 10/27/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Tayler Rujawitz. (Wolf, Ferne) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff is ORDERED to show cause by October 27, 2017, why Defendant ATPF, Inc. should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to effect service pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m). Show Cause Response due by 10/27/2017. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 10/20/2017. (mlp) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 10/20/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER GRANTING 13 Motion for Default Judgment as to Defendants ATPE, LLC, Heather Anderson, and Michael Anderson. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to enter judgment in favor of Plaintiff Tayler Rujawitz and against Defendants Heather Anderson, Michael Anderson, and ATPE, LLC. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 10/20/2017. (mlp) (Entered: 10/20/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants ATPE, LLC, Heather Anderson, and Michael Anderson by Tayler Rujawitz. (Wolf, Ferne) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to ATPE, LLC, Heather Anderson and Michael Anderson (trb) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      First MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendants ATPE, LLC, Michael Anderson, and Heather Anderson and Hearing on Damages by Tayler Rujawitz. (Wolf, Ferne) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Summons Issued as to ATPE, LLC, ATPF, Inc., Heather Anderson and Michael Anderson. (trb) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Summons Returned Unexecuted by Tayler Rujawitz as to ATPF, Inc.. (Wolf, Ferne) (Entered: 04/05/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel and Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams assigned. All future documents must bear case number 17-251-NJR-SCW. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (trb) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tayler Rujawitz. ATPE, LLC served on 3/18/2017, answer due 4/10/2017. (Wolf, Ferne) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tayler Rujawitz. Heather Anderson served on 3/18/2017, answer due 4/10/2017. (Wolf, Ferne) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tayler Rujawitz. Michael Anderson served on 3/17/2017, answer due 4/7/2017. (Wolf, Ferne) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua M. Pierson on behalf of Tayler Rujawitz (Pierson, Joshua) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Ferne P. Wolf on behalf of Tayler Rujawitz (Wolf, Ferne) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES Notice of Appearance- See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Ferne Wolf does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. Notice of Errors filed. A Notice of Appearance must be filed to comply with Local Rule 83.1(f). (trb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 03/15/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank 1 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3185009.), filed by Tayler Rujawitz. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1 Paystub, # 3 Exhibit 2 Paystub, # 4 Exhibit 3 Spreadsheet, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons)(Wolf, Ferne) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
                                          LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 117 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?