ME2 Productions v. Does 1-29
Federal Civil Lawsuit Utah District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-00190

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 4, 2020 at 12:25 PM EST (12 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Frank Warren, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Metzler Investment GmbH +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 bweprin@milbergweiss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry A. Weprin +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 bweprin@milberg.com
No Logo ME2 Productions, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowell Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Carl D. Crowell +1 503 581 1240 +1 503 585 0368 carl@crowell-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DUREN IP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Todd E Zenger +1 801 869 8535 tzenger@durenip.com
v.
No Logo Amber Sleight, Defendant
No Logo Angelina Midgley, Defendant
No Logo Brandi Shaver, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brandi Shaver

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brandi Shaver +1 801 680 0196
No Logo Darilyn Starr, Defendant
No Logo Dario Cobarrubias, Defendant
No Logo David Vanleeuwen, Defendant
No Logo Doe 12, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by CHAVEZ LAW OFFICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert H Chavez +1 206 789 1614 roberthchavez@chavezlawoffice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Husch Blackwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Theodore R. Bynum, III +1 314 480 1500 +1 314 480 1505 t.r.bynum@huschblackwell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mestemaker Straub

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Karl Van Gardner +1 713 626 8900 vgardner@msandz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mestemaker Straub Zumwalt

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, David Kent Mestemaker +1 713 626 8900 dkm@mestemakerstraub.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MURPHY ARMSTRONG & FELTON LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Benjamin R Justus +1 206 230 4255 +1 206 230 7791 ben@lpjustus.com

Toggle Switch Represented by RICHER & ASSOCIATES PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Arnold Richer
No Logo Does 1-29, Defendant
No Logo Dustin McClellan, Defendant
No Logo Holmes Nathan, Defendant
No Logo Jerry Dolejs, Defendant
No Logo Scott Craker, Defendant
No Logo Steve Wall, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by RAE BROUSSEAU

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steve Wall
No Logo Twyla Babcock, Defendant
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 0101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (74) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 12/4/2020, Entered: None Permanent Injunction
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 12/4/2020, Entered: None Memorandum Decision
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 12/3/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Set Aside Default
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: None Set Aside Default
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/9/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/30/2020, Entered: None Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 8/6/2020, Entered: None Default Judgment
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/31/2020, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default Certificate
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/9/2020, Entered: None Entry of Default
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/22/2020, Entered: None Order to Show Cause
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/12/2019, Entered: None Consolidate Cases
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/12/2019, Entered: None Consolidate Cases
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: None Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Order to Show Cause
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Default Judgment
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default Certificate
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to dismiss party
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Dismiss Party
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None Entry of Default
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/22/2018, Entered: None Default -Judgment
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None Discovery
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default Certificate
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Initial Scheduling Conference
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/28/2018, Entered: None Entry of Default
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss Party
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Dismiss Party
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Judgment - consent
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Judgment - consent
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Judgment - consent
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Judgment - consent
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Order to Propose Schedule
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by ME2 Productions as to Twyla Babcock served on 10/4/2017, answer due 10/25/2017; Jerry Dolejs served on 10/4/2017, answer due 10/25/2017; Dustin McClellan served on 9/27/2017, answer due 10/18/2017; Brandi Shaver served on 9/29/2017, answer due 10/20/2017; Amber Sleight served on 9/27/2017, answer due 10/18/2017; David Vanleeuwen served on 10/4/2017, answer due 10/25/2017; Steve Wall served on 10/5/2017, answer due 10/26/2017; Frank Warren served on 9/26/2017, answer due 10/17/2017. (Zenger, Todd) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: 1/9/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          CONSENT JUDGMENT in favor of ME2 Productions against Jerry Dolejs ( Doe 4 - 67.161.244.222) Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 1/8/2018. (las)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            CONSENT TO ENTRY of Stipulated Consent Judgment re Doe 4 (IP 67.161.244.222) filed by ME2 Productions. (Zenger, Todd) (Entered: 01/06/2018)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: 1/5/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              CONSENT JUDGMENT in favor of ME2 Productions against David Vanleeuwen (Doe 1 - 174.52.227.229) Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 1/5/2018. (las)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                CONSENT TO ENTRY of Stipulated Consent Judgment re Doe 1 (IP 174.52.227.229) filed by ME2 Productions. (Zenger, Todd) (Entered: 01/04/2018)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address by Todd E Zenger (Zenger, Todd) (Entered: 11/20/2017)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Brandi Shaver.(jds) (Entered: 10/20/2017)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint filed by Steve Wall (guardian) (alt) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Doe 10: Amber Sleight (IP 73.3.93.28) filed by Plaintiff ME2 Productions (Zenger, Todd) (Entered: 09/27/2017)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Twyla Babcock. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Steve Wall. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Scott Craker. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Jerry Dolejs. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Holmes Nathan. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Frank Warren. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Darilyn Starr. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Dario Cobarrubias. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Brandi Shaver. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Amber Sleight. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Angelina Midgley. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to David Vanleeuwen. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Dustin McClellan. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    DOCKET TEXT ORDER GRANTING 11 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 9/18/2017. No attached document. (lnp) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time for Service. Plaintiff shall have through October 13, 2017 for service as to all Defendant Does 1-29. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 9/14/2017. (las) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION for Extension of Time for Service pursuant to FRCP 4(m) filed by Plaintiff ME2 Productions. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zenger, Todd) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Address by Todd E Zenger (Zenger, Todd) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: 7/6/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time for Service. Plaintiff shall have ninety (90) additional days for service as to all Defendant Does 1-29. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 7/6/2017. (las)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: 7/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION for Extension of Time for Service pursuant to FRCP 4(m) filed by Plaintiff ME2 Productions. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zenger, Todd)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: 5/25/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Doe 12. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Dismissing Complaint Against Doe 12 With Prejudice)(Richer, Arnold)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: 5/10/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Arnold Richer on behalf of Doe 12 (Richer, Arnold)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: 3/22/2017 Order on Motion to ExpediteCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 7 Motion to Expedite Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 3/22/2017. (las)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: 3/21/2017 Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of Daniel Arheidt in Support re [7] MOTION to Expedite Discovery from ISPs filed by Plaintiff ME2 Productions. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Subscriber Data)(Zenger, Todd)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: 3/21/2017 Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Expedite Discovery from ISPs filed by Plaintiff ME2 Productions. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Copyright Registration, # 2 Exhibit B - Subscriber Data, # 3 Text of Proposed Order.)(Zenger, Todd)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: 3/20/2017 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse for all further proceedings. Judge David Nuffer no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 3/20/2017. (las)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: 3/17/2017 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Related Cases and Notice of Motion to Reassign by ME2 Productions (Zenger, Todd)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: 3/16/2017 Report regarding Copyright.
                                                                                                                                              Report on the Filing of an action mailed to the Register of Copyrights Office. (mms)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: 3/16/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER FOR SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 3/16/17 (alt)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: 3/15/2017 ComplaintCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against Does 1-29 (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-2714728) filed by ME2 Productions. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Copyright Registration, # (2) Exhibit B - Subscriber Data, # (3) Civil Cover Sheet.) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (Zenger, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: 3/15/2017 Remark - New CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Plaintiff ME2 Productions is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mms)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?