Castellotti, Sr. v. Estate of Madeline Castellotti
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-01512

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 9, 2019 at 5:26 PM DT (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Peter C. Castellotti, Sr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Moulinos & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Levinas +1 212 832 5981 +1 212 832 5982 dlevinas@moulinos.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Moulinos & Associates, Llc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Moulinos peter@moulinos.com
v.
No Logo Estate of Madeline Castellotti, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Raquel Amalia Gutierrez +1 212 878 7900 +1 212 692 0940 rgutierrez@foxrothschild.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James M. Lemonedes +1 212 788 0881 +1 212 788 0940 jlemonedes@foxrothschild.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carolyn Diane Richmond +1 212 878 7983 +1 212 692 0940 crichmond@foxrothschild.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP (IL-NA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tsedey A. Bogale +1 212 549 4192 +1 212 521 5450 tbogale@reedsmith.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Steven I. Cooper +1 212 205 6027 +1 212 521 5450 scooper@reedsmith.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shmuel Kadosh +1 212 549 0451 +1 212 521 5450 skadosh@reedsmith.com
No Logo Lisa Free, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Raquel Amalia Gutierrez +1 212 878 7900 +1 212 692 0940 rgutierrez@foxrothschild.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James M. Lemonedes +1 212 788 0881 +1 212 788 0940 jlemonedes@foxrothschild.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carolyn Diane Richmond +1 212 878 7983 +1 212 692 0940 crichmond@foxrothschild.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP (IL-NA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tsedey A. Bogale +1 212 549 4192 +1 212 521 5450 tbogale@reedsmith.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Steven I. Cooper +1 212 205 6027 +1 212 521 5450 scooper@reedsmith.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shmuel Kadosh +1 212 549 0451 +1 212 521 5450 skadosh@reedsmith.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 140 - Contract - Injunction (Post Award)
  Entries (56) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/9/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for More Definite Statement
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      RESPONSE in Opposition re 37 MOTION for pre motion conference for Summary Judgment pursuant to FRCP 56 filed by Estate of Madeline Castellotti, Lisa Free. (Cooper, Steven) (Entered: 12/18/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Levinas on behalf of Peter C. Castellotti, Sr. (aty to be noticed) (Levinas, Daniel) (Entered: 12/11/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          MOTION for pre motion conference for Summary Judgment pursuant to FRCP 56 by Peter C. Castellotti, Sr.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Promissory Note, # 2 Exhibit B - Outstanding Balance Owed) (Moulinos, Peter) (Entered: 12/11/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Estate of Madeline Castellotti, Lisa Free. (Cooper, Steven) (Entered: 11/28/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Kadosh on behalf of Estate of Madeline Castellotti, Lisa Free (aty to be noticed) (Kadosh, Samuel) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                NOTICE of Appearance by Tsedey A. Bogale on behalf of Estate of Madeline Castellotti, Lisa Free (aty to be noticed) (Bogale, Tsedey) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Cooper on behalf of Estate of Madeline Castellotti, Lisa Free (aty to be noticed) (Cooper, Steven) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    REPLY in Support re 29 MOTION for Discovery to Quash Subpoena and Sanctions filed by Peter C. Castellotti, Sr.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Emails with Defendants' Counsel, # 2 Exhibit B - Pages of Lisa Free Deposition Transcript) (Moulinos, Peter) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      REPLY in Opposition re 29 MOTION for Discovery to Quash Subpoena and Sanctions filed by Estate of Madeline Castellotti, Lisa Free. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Lemonedes, James) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Letter /Joint Letter re status of discovery by Estate of Madeline Castellotti, Lisa Free (Lemonedes, James) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          MOTION for Discovery to Quash Subpoena and Sanctions by Peter C. Castellotti, Sr.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Notice from JP Morgan Chase Bank, # 2 Exhibit B - Letter to JP Morgan Chase Bank, # 3 Exhibit C - Relevant pages of transcript of Lisa Free deposition, # 4 Exhibit D - Email to Defendants' Attorney) (Moulinos, Peter) (Entered: 10/16/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            REPLY in Opposition re 27 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Peter C. Castellotti, Sr.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Lisa Free, # 2 Exhibit B - Email correspondence with counsel) (Moulinos, Peter) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Estate of Madeline Castellotti, Lisa Free. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C) (Lemonedes, James) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 25 Letter MOTION to Compel Issuance of Revised Subpoenas filed by Peter C. Castellotti, Sr.. (Moulinos, Peter) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Letter MOTION to Compel Issuance of Revised Subpoenas by Estate of Madeline Castellotti, Lisa Free. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Lemonedes, James) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Letter pursuant to the Court's Order dated August 2, 2017 by Estate of Madeline Castellotti, Lisa Free (Lemonedes, James) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: 8/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                      MOTION for Leave to File a reply to Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions pursuant to F.R.C.P. 37 by Peter C. Castellotti, Sr.. (Moulinos, Peter)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        RESPONSE to Motion re 20 MOTION for Sanctions, 21 MOTION to Quash Subpoena upon Bank of New York filed by Estate of Madeline Castellotti, Lisa Free. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2) (Lemonedes, James) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: 7/27/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                          MOTION to Quash Subpoena upon Bank of New York by Peter C. Castellotti, Sr.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Subpoena upon Bank of New York, # 2 Exhibit Emails between counsel for the parties) (Moulinos, Peter)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: 7/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                            MOTION for Sanctions by Peter C. Castellotti, Sr.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Interrogatories, # 2 Exhibit Defendants' Response to Interrogatories, # 3 Exhibit Email to Defendants' Counsel, # 4 Exhibit Certification of Peter Moulinos, # 5 Exhibit Affidavit of Lisa Free in non-related action) (Moulinos, Peter)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Initial Conference Hearing
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Initial Conference held on 5/31/2017. Attorney Peter Moulinos appeared on behalf of plaintiff. Attorney James Lemonedes appeared on behalf of defendants. The attached Scheduling Order was entered setting deadlines for discovery and other pretrial proceedings. The parties were directed to file on ECF a joint letter confirming that all discovery is closed by October 6, 2017. (Tape #11:59-12:16.) (Riquelme, Claudia) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: 5/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                  Proposed Scheduling Order by Peter C. Castellotti, Sr. (Moulinos, Peter)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: 5/9/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                    ANSWER to 12 Amended Complaint by Estate of Madeline Castellotti, Lisa Free. (Lemonedes, James)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: 5/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                      NOTICE of Change of Firm Address by Raquel Amalia Gutierrez (Gutierrez, Raquel)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: 5/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                        NOTICE of Change of Firm Address by James Lemonedes (Lemonedes, James)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: 5/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                          NOTICE of Change of Firm Address by Carolyn D Richmond (Richmond, Carolyn)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: 4/25/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference will be held in this case on May 31, 2017 at 12:00 p.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate Judge in Courtroom 11C South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. All counsel are required to attend. Counsel are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions. Counsel are required to bring to the conference a completed copy of the attached Rule 26(f) Conference Checklist, and to file before the conference a completed copy of the attached proposed Initial Scheduling Order, a pdf-fillable version of which may be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/pub/PK-schedo.pdf. Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 4/25/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Initial Scheduling Order Form, # 2 Conference Checklist) (Riquelme, Claudia)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: 4/25/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT against Estate of Madeline Castellotti, Lisa Free, filed by Peter C Casetellotti, Sr.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Affidavit of Lisa Free with Exhibits) (Moulinos, Peter)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: 4/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Estate of Madeline Castellotti, Lisa Free. (Lemonedes, James)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: 4/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Raquel Amalia Gutierrez on behalf of Estate of Madeline Castellotti, Lisa Free (aty to be noticed) (Gutierrez, Raquel)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: 4/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Estate of Madeline Castellotti, Lisa Free. (Lemonedes, James)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: 4/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by James Lemonedes on behalf of Estate of Madeline Castellotti, Lisa Free (aty to be noticed) (Lemonedes, James)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: 4/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Carolyn D Richmond on behalf of Estate of Madeline Castellotti, Lisa Free (aty to be noticed) (Richmond, Carolyn)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: 3/23/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peter C Casetellotti, Sr.. Lisa Free served on 3/18/2017, answer due 4/10/2017. (Moulinos, Peter)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: 3/23/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peter C Casetellotti, Sr.. Estate of Madeline Castellotti served on 3/18/2017, answer due 4/10/2017. (Moulinos, Peter)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: 3/17/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                              This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: 3/17/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: 3/17/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Summons Issued as to Lisa Free. (Bowens, Priscilla)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: 3/17/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9372858 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Peter C Casetellotti, Sr.. (Moulinos, Peter) (Main Document 1 replaced on 3/17/2017) (Bowens, Priscilla). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/17/2017: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons) (Bowens, Priscilla).
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Set/Reset Hearings: At the requested of the parties, the pre motion conference set for 3/1/2018 is adjourned to 3/26/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6D South before Judge Nina Gershon. (Joe, Victor)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      ORDER granting 37 Motion for Pre Motion Conference Pre Motion Conference set for 3/1/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6D South before Judge Nina Gershon. Ordered by Judge Nina Gershon on 12/19/2017. (Joe, Victor)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        ORDER denying 36 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Local Civil Rule 1.4 permits substitution of counsel by stipulation so long as the stipulation has been signed by counsel, the counsel's client, and all other parties. The proposed Stipulation 36 has been signed by Defendants' withdrawing and incoming counsel, as well as Defendants themselves, but not Plaintiff's counsel. Defendants are granted leave to refile the Motion in compliance with Rule 1.4. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 12/5/2017. (Syed, Sofie)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Telephone Conference held on 11/3/2017. Attorney Peter Moulinos for Plaintiff. Attorney James Lemonedes for Defendants. Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery 29 is granted. Defendants shall withdraw and revise the third-party subpoena as discussed in the hearing. The discovery deadline is extended to December 8, 2017 with regard to the third-party subpoena. Defendants are directed to pay $800.00 in attorney's fees to Plaintiff's counsel. The deadline to request a pre-motion conference before Judge Gershon is December 21, 2017. (FTR Log #11:02-11:21.) (Syed, Sofie)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            ORDER: A telephone conference on the Motion for Discovery 29 is set for November 3, 2017 at 11:00 a.m. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call, with Defendants' counsel on the line, by calling Chambers at 718-613-2400. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 10/31/2017. (Syed, Sofie)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to file a reply letter by November 2, 2017 addressing (1) any steps taken to meet and confer with Defendants' counsel prior to filing the Motion for Discovery 29, as required under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 37, Local Civil Rule 37.3, and Judge Kuo's Individual Practice Rules, and (2) whether Plaintiff still seeks to contest the third-party subpoena in light of Defendants' assertion at 31 that the subpoena requests Defendant Free's bank records, not Plaintiff's records. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 10/27/2017. (Syed, Sofie)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                ORDER granting in part and denying in part 27 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The deadline to complete fact discovery is extended nunc pro tunc to October 16, 2017, and the deadline to jointly certify the completion of discovery is extended to October 18, 2017. The parties are reminded that requests to extend deadlines must be made in advance, and to confer sufficiently in advance in order to comply with the Court's Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 10/3/2017. (Syed, Sofie)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Telephone Motion Hearing held on 9/15/2017. Attorney Peter Moulinos for Plaintiff. Attorney James Lemonedes for Defendants. The Court heard argument on Defendants' Motion to Compel Issuance of Revised Subpoenas 25 and denied the Motion without prejudice to renew. Defendants are directed to subpoena their own bank records first. If the records discussed in the hearing do not exist, Defendants can renew the request to issue the subpoenas. (FTR Log #2:33-2:45.) (Syed, Sofie)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    ORDER: A telephone hearing on Defendants' Motion to Compel 25 is set for September 15, 2017 at 2:30 p.m. Defendants' counsel shall initiate the call, with Plaintiff's counsel on the line, by calling Chambers at 718-613-2400. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 9/13/2017. (Syed, Sofie)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      ORDER: Plaintiff shall file any response to Defendants' Letter at 25 by September 6, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 8/31/2017. (Syed, Sofie)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        ORDER: Plaintiff's motions for sanctions 20 and to quash subpoena 21 are denied as premature. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a reply 23 is also denied. The parties are directed to meet and confer in order to resolve any discovery disputes, and submit a joint status report by August 23, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 8/2/2017. (Syed, Sofie)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          ORDER: Any response to plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions shall be filed by July 31, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 7/25/2017. (Riquelme, Claudia)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall file their response to the Complaint by April 24, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 4/18/2017. (Syed, Sofie)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              Case assigned to Judge Nina Gershon and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                Need Password Help?