Elliott v. Chairman of the United States Merits Systems Protection Board (RLJ2)
Federal Civil Lawsuit Tennessee Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-00047

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 9, 2019 at 4:20 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 7703
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    MEMORANDUM AND OPINION as set forth in following order. Signed by District Judge R Leon Jordan on 12/6/17. (c/m to Roger Elliott)(ABF)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: None Response (non-motion)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to USA
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Application for Clerk's Default
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Application for Clerk's Default
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed (non-USA)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed (non-USA)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: None Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?