United States v. Fred C. Trump, Donald Trump, and Trump Management, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 73-cv-01529

Tags
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
v.
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Donald Trump"
Unknown Role, Riviera Holdings Corp
No Logo Fred C. Trump, Defendant
No Logo Trump Management, Inc., Defendant
  Entries (92) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 79 Filed: 7/17/1979, Entered: None
Letter of July 11, 1979 recvd from Chambers from Brian Heffernan Atty, General Litigation Section . rs
    LREF
    Blank 78 Filed: 7/17/1979, Entered: None
    Letter of July 5, 1979 filed recvd from Chambers from Dept. of Justice, Brian Heffernan, Atty. General Litigation Section . (re motion for supplemental relief, etc.)
      LREF
      Blank  Filed: 5/9/1978, Entered: None
      Before Neaher, J.-Case called. Attys for both sides present. Motion conferecne held. Case adjourned w/o date.jm
        LREF
        Blank 77 Filed: 3/21/1978, Entered: None
        Letter dtd. 3-14-78 from J. Handley to J. Neaher re: motion for supplemental relief filed. fy
          LREF
          Legal Document 76 Filed: 3/7/1978, Entered: None
          Pltff's motion for supplemental relief, no ret date, filed.jm
            LREF
            Legal Document 75 Filed: 11/6/1975, Entered: None
            Stenographer's transcript of 6/10/75 filed.
              LREF
              Legal Document 74 Filed: 10/29/1975, Entered: None
              By NEAHER, J.-Supplemental order dtd 10-28-75 amending Part V(A)(2) of the Consent Order in this action filed. (mg)
                LREF
                Blank  Filed: 9/24/1975, Entered: None
                Before NEAHER, J.- Case called- Attys for both sides present- Conference held and concluded
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 73 Filed: 6/10/1975, Entered: None
                  By NEAHER, J.-Consent Order dtd 6-10-75 permanently enjoining defts from refusing to sell or rent etc to any person on account of race, color, religion, sex or natural origin etc filed. See Order. (p/c mailed)
                    LREF
                    Blank  Filed: 6/10/1975, Entered: None
                    Before NEAHER, J.- Case called- Attys for all parties present- Pltff's motion granted to the extent of agreed revisions in proposed consent degree signed by the attys in open court.
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 72 Filed: 6/10/1975, Entered: None
                      Affidavit of Roy M. Cohn filed.
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 71 Filed: 6/10/1975, Entered: None
                        By NEAHER, J. - Order to show cause dtd 6-6-75 for a permanent injunction pursuant to the memorandum of understanding submitted 1-20-75 filed.
                          LREF
                          Blank  Filed: 6/4/1975, Entered: None
                          Before NEAHER, J.-Case called. Pre trial held and adj'd without date.
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 70 Filed: 6/4/1975, Entered: None
                            Memorandum in support of pltff's request to enforce settlement agreement filed.
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 69 Filed: 5/19/1975, Entered: None
                              By NEAHER, J.- Order dated 5/19/75 filed that a conference concerning the progress of settlement of the action is scheduled for 3:00 P.M. , June 4, 1975 in Courtroom #2. Copy of Order mailed to the attys.
                                LREF
                                Blank 68 Filed: 5/19/1975, Entered: None
                                Letter dtd 5-8-75 to J. Neaher from Frank E. Schwelb filed.
                                  LREF
                                  Blank  Filed: 3/5/1975, Entered: None
                                  Before NEAHER,J.- Case called- Adjd without date.
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 67 Filed: 2/20/1975, Entered: None
                                    By NEAHER, J.-Memorandum Order dtd 2-20-75 that counsel for the parties appear in chambers, Room. 252 at 10 AM on 3-5-75 for the purposes as set forth in the Memorandum of Understanding filed. (p/c mailed.)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 66 Filed: 2/20/1975, Entered: None
                                      Copy of letter dtd 2-18-75 to J. Neaher from Frank E. Schwelb filed.
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 65 Filed: 12/19/1974, Entered: None
                                        Supplemental answer to defts' interrogatories filed.
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 64 Filed: 12/5/1974, Entered: None
                                          Notice to take deposition upon oral examination of A. Gomez filed.
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 63 Filed: 12/3/1974, Entered: None
                                            Supplemental answer to deft's interrogatories filed.
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 62 Filed: 11/20/1974, Entered: None
                                              Pltff's Supplemental Answers to Deft's Interrogatories filed.
                                                LREF
                                                Blank  Filed: 11/20/1974, Entered: None
                                                Before NEAHER,J. - Case called. Hearing held and concluded. Case set for trial 1-27-75 at 10 A.M.
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 61 Filed: 11/19/1974, Entered: None
                                                  Letter dated 11/16/74 filed fromR. Cohn to J. Neaher
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 60 Filed: 11/14/1974, Entered: None
                                                    Supplemental answers to defts' interrogatories filed.
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 59 Filed: 11/7/1974, Entered: None
                                                      Transcript dated 10-24474 filed.
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 58 Filed: 11/6/1974, Entered: None
                                                        Letter dated Sept. 3, 1974 filed from J. Pottinger to J. Catoggio
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 57 Filed: 11/6/1974, Entered: None
                                                          Letter dated Sept. 5, 1974 filed from R. Cohn to J. Cattoggio
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 56 Filed: 11/6/1974, Entered: None
                                                            Letter dated Sept. 13, 1974 filed from S. Pottinger to J. Catoggio.
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 55 Filed: 11/6/1974, Entered: None
                                                              Copy of Letter of Sept. 13, 1974 filed from J. Pottinger to J. Catoggio.
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 54 Filed: 11/6/1974, Entered: None
                                                                Letter dated Sept. 17, 1974 filed from J. S. Pottinger to J. Neaher.
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 53 Filed: 11/6/1974, Entered: None
                                                                  Supplemental Answers to Deft's Interrogatories filed.
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank  Filed: 10/24/1974, Entered: None
                                                                    Before NEAHER, J.-Case called. Hearing held & concluded.Court ruled in favor of pltff(gov't). Date set for trial on 11-25-74 at 10:00 AM
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank  Filed: 10/21/1974, Entered: None
                                                                      Before NEAHER, J.-Case called and adjourned to 10-24-74 at 10:00 AM.
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 52 Filed: 9/24/1974, Entered: None
                                                                        Memorandum of law in support of above motion filed
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 51 Filed: 9/24/1974, Entered: None
                                                                          Notifce of motionf ro an order denying defts motion for sanctions, etc. ret. 10-21-74 at 10:00 A.M.
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 50 Filed: 9/11/1974, Entered: None
                                                                            Pltff's Supplemental Answers to Deft's Interrogatories filed.
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 49 Filed: 9/5/1974, Entered: None
                                                                              Copy of letter from Scott E. Manley dtd 5-16-74 filed.
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 48 Filed: 9/5/1974, Entered: None
                                                                                Letter from Donna F. Goldstein dtd 8-20-74 filed.
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 47 Filed: 9/5/1974, Entered: None
                                                                                  Letter from Roy M. Cohn dtd 8-20-74 filed.
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 46 Filed: 8/20/1974, Entered: None
                                                                                    Pltff's request to produce filed.
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 45 Filed: 8/20/1974, Entered: None
                                                                                      Pltff's request for production of documents filed
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 44 Filed: 8/19/1974, Entered: None
                                                                                        Notice to take deposition of Trump Management Inc filed
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 8/16/1974, Entered: None
                                                                                          Before NEAHER,.- Case called- Adjd without date
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 8/8/1974, Entered: None
                                                                                            Before NEAHER, J. - Case called. Matter referred to Mag. Catoggio by consent of parties. See Order
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 43 Filed: 8/7/1974, Entered: None
                                                                                              Affidavit of personal service of order of 8/6/74 filed
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 42 Filed: 8/6/1974, Entered: None
                                                                                                By NEAHER, J. - Order to shpw cause why defts should not be required to answer pltff's interrogatories etc. ret. 8-8-74 @ 2 P.M. without proof of service filed
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 41 Filed: 8/5/1974, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Response of U.S. to defts' motion of 7-26-74 filed
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 40 Filed: 8/2/1974, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Notice to take deposition of Paul Ziselman filed.
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 39 Filed: 8/2/1974, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Notice to take deposition of Donald Trump filed.
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 38 Filed: 8/2/1974, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Notice to take deposition of Thomas Miranda filed.
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 37 Filed: 8/2/1974, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Notice to take deposition of Carol R. Falcone filed.
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 36 Filed: 7/30/1974, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Notice of motion for an order finding Donna F. Goldstein guilty of contempt, ret 8-16-74 at 10 A.M. filed.
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 35 Filed: 7/12/1974, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Notice to take deposition of Trump Management filed
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 34 Filed: 6/25/1974, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Stenographer's transcript of 5-3-74 filed.
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 33 Filed: 6/14/1974, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Copy of letter from Donna F. Goldstein dtd 6-13-74 filed.
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 32 Filed: 6/5/1974, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Defts' first answer to interrogatories filed.
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 31 Filed: 5/30/1974, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Notice to take deposition of Trump Management Inc filed.
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 30 Filed: 5/8/1974, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Pltff's request to produce filed.
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 5/6/1974, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Before CATOGGIO, MAG.- Case called- Delayed 2 hrs. due to defts attys lateness- Govt attorneys present as scheduled-Respective parties heard-Prceedings recorded-
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 29 Filed: 4/23/1974, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Support of pltff's motion for sanctions filed.
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 28 Filed: 4/23/1974, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Notice of Motion, ret. 5/3/74 filed re: motion for sanctions
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 27 Filed: 4/2/1974, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                By NEAHER, J.- Order dated 4/1/74 filed that the depositions of defts are adjd to another date.
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 3/19/1974, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Notice to take deposition upon oral examination filed.
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 3/19/1974, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Notice to take deposition upon oral examination filed.
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 3/19/1974, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Notice to take deposition upon oral examination filed.
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 3/6/1974, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Pltff's Answers and Objections to deft's first interrogatories filed.
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 22 Filed: 2/28/1974, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Stenographer's transcript dtd 1-25-74 filed.
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 2/8/1974, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Defts' first demand for interrogatories to pltff filed.
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 1/25/1974, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Before NEAHER, J. - Case called for hearing on motions to dismiss complaint & counterclaim. Motions argued. - Defts' motion to dismiss denied as indcated. Deft has 2 weeks to prepare interrogatories. Order to be submitted. Pltff's motion to dismiss defts' counterclaim granted. Order to be submitted.
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 20 Filed: 2/8/1974, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Deft's answer to complaint for injunction filed.
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 19 Filed: 2/6/1974, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  By NEAHER, J.- Order dated 2/5/74 filed that the deft's motion for an order dismiss the complaint is denied, etc.(see order)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 1/24/1974, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum of law filed.
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 1/24/1974, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Notice of motion to compel defts to answer pltff's interrogatories ret. 1-25-74 @ 10:00 A.M.
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 16 Filed: 1/22/1974, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Defts' reply memorandum of law in support of motion to dismiss counterclaim filed.
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 1/16/1974, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          By NEAHER, J. - Order dated 1/15/74 filed that the deft's motion to dismiss is adjd to 1/25/74
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 1/11/1974, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Before NEAHER, J. Case called Adjd to 1/25/74
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 1/8/1974, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum of U.S. in response to affidavits of Donald Trump & Roy Cohn filed.
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 13 Filed: 1/8/1974, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Unreported orders cited in memo of U.S. in opposition to motion to dismiss filed.
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 12 Filed: 1/8/1974, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum of law to dismiss defts' counterclaim, ret 1-11-74 at 10 A.M. filed.
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 11 Filed: 1/8/1974, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 10 Filed: 12/12/1973, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Counterclaim filed.
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 12/12/1973, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum of law in support of motion filed.
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 8 Filed: 12/12/1973, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of motion ret 1-11-74 for an order dismissing the complaint
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 12/4/1973, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            By NEAHER, J.- Order dated 11/30/73 filed extending time for ;the defts to answer to 12/10/73
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 11/26/1973, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              By NEAHER, J. - Order dtd 11-23-73 extending time to answer the complaint to 12-3-73 filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 11/15/1973, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Pltff's first interrogatories to defts filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 11/7/1973, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  By NEAHER, J.- Order dated 11/5/73 filed extending time for the defts to answer to 11/26/73.
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 11/2/1973, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of appearance for defts .
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 10/29/1973, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Summons returned & filed/executed.
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/15/1973, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Complaint filed. Summons issued.
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 574 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?