Karmue v. Remington
Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-00107

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 30, 2021 at 3:08 PM DT (1.8 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit Federal Employer's Liability
  Entries (156) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 7/30/2021, Entered: None Stipulation
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 6/15/2021, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: None extension of time
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 3/5/2021, Entered: None Status Report
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 12/28/2020, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 12/15/2020, Entered: None Stipulation
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 12/3/2020, Entered: None Scheduling Order (form attached)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 11/6/2020, Entered: None Stipulation
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Stipulation
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 10/2/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 9/22/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: None Reply Memorandum
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 7/14/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 6/25/2020, Entered: None Statement of Undisputed Facts
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 6/25/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Support
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 6/25/2020, Entered: None Partial Summary Judgment
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 5/19/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 4/16/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 4/10/2020, Entered: None Appoint Counsel
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 4/1/2020, Entered: None Answer
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 3/30/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 3/18/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: None Notice of Hearing (Form Attached)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: None Compel
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 8/28/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 8/28/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 8/23/2019, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 8/23/2019, Entered: None Stay
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 8/23/2019, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 8/21/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 8/8/2019, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 6/20/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 6/13/2019, Entered: None Strike
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 6/13/2019, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 6/5/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 6/5/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: None Statement of Disputed Facts
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 5/7/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 5/7/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 3/29/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: None Statement of Undisputed Facts
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 3/21/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 3/11/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: None Order on Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: None Order on Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: None Order on Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 2/27/2019, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 2/27/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/14/2019, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/6/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 2/4/2019, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 2/4/2019, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 2/4/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/30/2019, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/30/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Indigent Filer Reimbursement Request - USM
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None Process Return and Receipt
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/14/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None PLRA Filing Fee Received
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: None Objection to Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to USA
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None PLRA Filing Fee Received
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Public Docket Note
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None PLRA Filing Fee Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None PLRA Filing Fee Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: None PLRA Filing Fee Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER adopting 41 Report and Recommendations; denying 17 Motion for TRO; denying 17 Motion for Order to Show Cause; denying 18 Motion for TRO; denying 18 Motion for Order to Show Cause; denying 19 Motion for TRO; denying 19 Motio n for Order to Show Cause; denying 20 Motion for TRO; denying 20 Motion for Order to Show Cause; denying 21 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 22 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 23 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 24 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. So Ordered by District Judge Landya B. McCafferty, District of NH on 1/26/2018. (Jackson, Ryan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: None PLRA Filing Fee Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: None PLRA Filing Fee Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Objection to Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None PLRA Filing Fee Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Produce
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Produce
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Produce
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Produce
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Summons Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 7 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?