Coach, Inc. et al v. Accento, Inc.

Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-02196
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 20, 2017 at 1:32 PM EDT (7.8 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Coach Services, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lauren Jennifer Caisman +1 312 602 5000 lauren.caisman@bryancave.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald Alexander Cole +1 312 602 5028 donald.cole@bryancave.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick McKey +1 312 602 5000 +1 312 602 5050 patrick.mckey@bryancave.com
No Logo Coach, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lauren Jennifer Caisman +1 312 602 5000 lauren.caisman@bryancave.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald Alexander Cole +1 312 602 5028 donald.cole@bryancave.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick McKey +1 312 602 5000 +1 312 602 5050 patrick.mckey@bryancave.com
v.
No Logo Accento, Inc., Defendant
Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Service by Publication
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Service by Publication
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Status hearing set for 5/23/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 2201.Mailed notice (mad, ) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc. by Donald Alexander Cole (Cole, Donald) (Entered: 03/22/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (mc, ) (Entered: 03/22/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc. by Lauren Jennifer Caisman (Caisman, Lauren) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc. by Steven Patrick McKey (McKey, Steven) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc. (McKey, Steven) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CIVIL Cover Sheet (McKey, Steven) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: None Complaint
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 31 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?