Bildstein v. Mastercard International
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-09826
District Judge William H. Pauley, III, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 23, 2017 at 1:25 AM DT (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Bernard Bildstein, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cahow Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Irving Bizar +1 212 575 7900 +1 212 764 5060 Ibizar@Ballonstoll.com
v.
MasterCard International, Inc. MasterCard International, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Mastercard International"

Toggle Switch Represented by Ballard Spahr LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Denise Lynne Plunkett +1 646 346 8053 plunkettd@ballardspahr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Dickstein Shapiro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Jay N. Fastow +1 212 277 6500 +1 212 277 6501 fastowj@ballardspahr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Bruce A Colbath +1 212 310 8590 bruce.colbath@weil.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1
Nature of Suit 410 - Anti-Trust
  Entries (73) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER APPROVING THE FINAL DISTRIBUTION PLAN AND AWARDING FEES AND EXPENSES in case 1:01-cv-03342-WHP; granting (369) Motion to Approve the Final Distribution of the Residual Net Settlement Fund and for an Award of Fees and Expenses in case 1:04-cv-05723-WHP; granting (982) Motion to Approve the Final Distribution of the Residual Net Settlement Fund and for an Award of Fees and Expenses in case 1:01-md-01409-WHP.1. The Court finds that the proposed plan of allocation (the "Final Distribution Plan"), as set forth in the May 2014 Affidavit of Edward J. Radetich, Jr., C.P.A. ("May 2014 Radetich Affidavit"), is fair and reasonable. The Court approves the Final Distribution Plan and orders that it be effected, and retains jurisdiction to supervise the implementation and effectuation of the Final Distribution Plan and this Order. 2. The Residual Net Settlement Fund (approximately $15,031,553.53) consists of $11,986,189.35 from uncashed checks from the distribution of the Aggregate Net Settlement Fund (the "Second Distribution"); plus $4,673,066.01, representing the unused portion of the reserve funds established in connection with the Second Distribution; minus $259,301.20 set aside for administrative costs for the Final Distribution Plan (i.e., printing, postage, bank clearing services and other administrative services), $327,106.36 for a final batch of reissued checks, a $500,000 reserve fund and $541,294.27, representing Lead Counsel's request i n Ross v. American Express Co. ("AMEX"), No. 04-CV-5723 (S.D.N.Y.), for a supplemental award of attorneys' fees and unreimbursed expenses as further set forth in this order. 4. The Court awards to AMEX Lead Counsel reasonable and appropriate attorneys' fees in the amount of $451,432.50 for post-fee petition work on appeals and settlement administration in the AMEX case. 5. The Court also approves the reimbursement of $89,861.77 of post-fee petition AMEX costs as further set forth in this order. 10. This Court reserves jurisdiction over any matters related to or ancillary to this Order, including any additional applications for attorneys' fees and costs. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 10/20/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:01-md-01409-WHP et al. Copies Sent By Chambers. (lmb) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER DIRECTING CLASS MEMBER KEVIN POLLINS TO CEASE AND DESIST FROM FURTHER COMMUNICATIONS WITH PLAINTIFFS' LEAD COUNSEL granting (989) Motion for an Order Directing Class Member Kevin Pollins to Cease and Desist from Further Communications with Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel in case 1:01-md-01409-WHP. It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. This Court has jurisdiction over the subject matter of Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel's motion and over all the parties before the Court, including, without limitation, class member Kevin Pollins as further set forth in this order. 8. The Court finds that good cause exists for entry of an Order, pursuant to Rules 23(d) and 83(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, directing Mr. Pollins to cease and desist from further communications with Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel. Mr. Pollins shall cease and desist from: (i) demanding the Additional Payment from the FX fee settlements; and (ii) contacting Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel concerning the FX fee settlements, his improper payment demand, or any other reason. This Order is necessary to preserve the orderly and efficient administration of the FX fee settlements. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 10/21/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:01-md-01409-WHP et al. Copies Sent By Chambers. (lmb) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER: Accordingly, this Court directs the Clerk of the Court to terminate all pending motions in this case. So Ordered (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 11/17/09) (js) (Entered: 11/18/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Jay N. Fastow on behalf of Mastercard International. New Address: Dickstein Shapiro LLP, 1633 Broadway, New York, NY, 10019-6708, 212-277-6500. (djc) (Entered: 08/12/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING IN NON-ECF CASE - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Irving Bizar on behalf of Bernd Bildstein. New Address: Ballon Stoll Bader & Nadler, P.C., 729 Seventh Avenue, 17th Floor, New York, New York, USA 10019, 212-575-7900. (Bizar, Irving) Modified on 4/29/2008 (db). (Entered: 04/29/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM AND CONTACT INFORMATION: by Denise Plunkett, Jay N. Fastow on behalf of Mastercard International. New Address: Dickstein Shapiro LLP, 1177 Avenue of the Americas, New York, NY, USA 10036. (jpo) (Entered: 03/12/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Objection of Bernd Bildstein to the final approval of the settlement. Also request that my counsel be permitted to file an application for attorneys' fees should my objections be overruled. Document filed by Bernd Bildstein. (jco) (Entered: 02/27/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Bernd Bildstein's Objection to final approval of the settlement without prejudice to pending appeal from this court's preliminary approval of the settlement herein. Document filed by Bernd Bildstein. (djc) (Entered: 09/25/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley from Irving Bizar dated 9/27/06 re: Counsel for plaintiff writes pursuant to your direction at the motion hearing held on 9/11/06. Document filed by Bernd Bildstein.(jco, ) (Entered: 10/26/2006)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Irving Bizar dated 9/28/06 re: Counsel writes to request that you consider as part of the Bildstein submission this latter which is occasioned by co-lead counsel's misstatements as to the New York law contained in their written submission. Document filed by Bernd Bildstein.(jco, ) (Entered: 10/26/2006)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      AFFIDAVIT of Irving Bizar. Document filed by Bernd Bildstein. (djc, ) (Entered: 09/21/2006)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition to Preliminary Approval of the Settlement Agreement; Document filed by Bernd Bildstein. (djc, ) (Entered: 09/21/2006)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition to Preliminary Approval of the Settlement Agreement. Document filed by Bernd Bildstein. (djc, ) (Entered: 09/13/2006)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            DECLARATION of Irving Bizar in Opposition to preliminary approval of the proposed settlement in the In Re Currency conversion Fee Litigtion. Document filed by Bernd Bildstein. (djc, ) (Entered: 09/13/2006)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/18/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 3/24/2006 before Judge William H. Pauley III. (jar, ) (Entered: 04/18/2006)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/12/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION of Irving Bizar in response to the reply declaration of Ms. Donna Barrett, dated April 4, 2006. Document filed by Bernd Bildstein. (djc, ) (Entered: 04/13/2006)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/12/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY Declaration in reply to the declaration of Donna Barrett, dated April 4, 2006. Document filed by Bernd Bildstein. (djc, ) (Entered: 04/13/2006)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/12/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    SUPPLEMANTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Response to the Declaration of Donna Barrett. Document filed by Bernd Bildstein. (djc, ) (Entered: 04/13/2006)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      DECLARATION of Donna Barrett. Document filed by Mastercard International. (djc, ) (Entered: 04/11/2006)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/16/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        DECLARATION of Theodore Allegaert in Support re: 36 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. MOTION to Stay.. Document filed by Mastercard International. (jmi, ) (Entered: 03/30/2006)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/16/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 36 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. MOTION to Stay.. Document filed by Mastercard International. (jmi, ) (Entered: 03/30/2006)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            DECLARATION of Bernd Bildstein in Opposition re: 36 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. MOTION to Stay. Document filed by Bernd Bildstein. (db, ) (Entered: 03/21/2006)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 36 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. MOTION to Stay. Document filed by Bernd Bildstein. (db, ) (Entered: 03/21/2006)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                DECLARATION of Bernd Bildstein Correcting Transcript of Deposition taken on 1/27/06. Document filed by Bernd Bildstein. (db, ) (Entered: 03/21/2006)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  DECLARATION of Irving Bizar in Opposition re: 36 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. MOTION to Stay. Document filed by Bernd Bildstein. (db, ) (Entered: 03/21/2006)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    DECLARATION of Donna Barrett re: based on personal knowledge. Document filed by Mastercard International. (sac, ) (Entered: 03/20/2006)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/16/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      REPLY Declaration in reply to the opposing declarations and in further support of motion to declare plaintiff's action a class action. Document filed by Bernd Bildstein. (dle, ) (Entered: 03/17/2006)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/16/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        REPLY Declaration of Irving Bizar in Support re: 37 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Bernd Bildstein. (dle, ) (Entered: 03/17/2006)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/16/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 37 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Bernd Bildstein. (dle, ) (Entered: 03/17/2006)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/15/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE re Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification. Document filed by Bernd Bildstein. (cd, ) (Entered: 03/17/2006)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/9/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              DECLARATION of Roger Griffith. Document filed by Mastercard International. (db, ) (Entered: 03/10/2006)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/9/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                DECLARATION of Sharon E. Selby in Opposition re: 37 MOTION to Certify Class. Document filed by Mastercard International. (db, ) (Entered: 03/10/2006)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/9/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 37 MOTION to Certify Class. Document filed by Mastercard International. (db, ) (Entered: 03/10/2006)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/7/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley III from Irving Bizar dated 2/22/06 re: Counsel writes to request that Ms. Selby's application be denied. Document filed by Bernd Bildstein.(jco, ) (Entered: 03/09/2006)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/7/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      LETTER addressed to Jduge William H. Pauley from Irving Bizar dated 2/22/06 re: Counsel writes to request a premotion conference. Document filed by Bernd Bildstein.(jco, ) (Entered: 03/09/2006)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/7/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER this Court will consider only those matters appropriately included in the Declaration of Irving Bizar in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification, dated February 10,2006. PLaintiff shall file a certificate of service for his Motion for Class Certification by March 10,2006. Motions due by 3/10/2006.So Ordered. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley III on 3/2/2006) (jmi, ) (Entered: 03/08/2006)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/7/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley from Sharon E. Selby dated 2/21/06. ENDORSEMENT: Teleconference is is scheduled for March 2, 2006 at 3:00 p.m. counsel are directed to call (212)805-6387 together at that time. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley III on 2/23/06) (js, ) (Entered: 03/07/2006)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 37 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Bernd Bildstein. (dle, ) (Entered: 03/03/2006)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              DECLARATION of Irving Bizar in Support re: 37 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Bernd Bildstein. (dle, ) (Entered: 03/03/2006)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                MOTION for an order certifying this action as a class action for all those MasterCard holders who used said card for foreign purchases or currency transacions from 3/1/97 to 5/2/03 and designating the proposed class representative as the representative of the class. Document filed by Bernd Bildstein. (dle, ) (Entered: 03/03/2006)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/16/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  MOTION of Defednant Mastercard International Incorporated in Support of its Motion to compel Arbitration and stay proceedings. Document filed by Mastercard International. (jmi, ) (Entered: 02/22/2006)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/16/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    DECLARATION of Theodore Allegaert. Document filed by Mastercard International. (jmi, ) (Entered: 02/22/2006)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/16/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW of Defednant Mastercard International Incorporated in Support of its Motion to compel Arbitration and stay proceedings. Document filed by Mastercard International. (jmi, ) (Entered: 02/22/2006)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/16/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Pauley from Irving Bizar dated 2/8/06: granting plntf request to file Motion for Class Certification under seal, and simultaneously to file a redacted version of the same motion. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley III on 2/13/06) (cd, ) (Entered: 02/16/2006)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/16/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING IN NON-ECF CASE - MOTION to Certify Class (Certificate of Service). Document filed by Bernd Bildstein. Responses due by 3/9/2006 Return Date set for 3/24/2006 11:00 AM. (Bizar, Irving) Modified on 2/16/2006 (kg). (Entered: 02/16/2006)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/16/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING IN NON-ECF CASE - MOTION to Certify Class (Affirmation of Irving Bizar). Document filed by Bernd Bildstein. Responses due by 3/9/2006 Return Date set for 3/24/2006 11:00 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3)(Bizar, Irving) Modified on 2/16/2006 (kg). (Entered: 02/16/2006)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/16/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING IN NON-ECF CASE - MOTION to Certify Class (Memorandum of Law). Document filed by Bernd Bildstein. Responses due by 3/9/2006 Return Date set for 3/24/2006 11:00 AM. (Bizar, Irving) Modified on 2/16/2006 (kg). (Entered: 02/16/2006)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/16/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING IN NON-ECF CASE - MOTION to Certify Class. Document filed by Bernd Bildstein. Responses due by 3/9/2006 Return Date set for 3/24/2006 11:00 AM. (Bizar, Irving) Modified on 2/16/2006 (kg). (Entered: 02/16/2006)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff will serve and file his motion for class certification and Defendant will serve and file its motion for a stay of claims subject to arbitration by 02/16/06; the parties will serve and file their opposition papers by 3/9/06; parties will serve and file their reply papes by 3/16/06; Oral Argument set for 3/24/2006 11:00 AM before Judge William H. Pauley III. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley III on 11/22/05) (djc, ) (Entered: 11/28/2005)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/27/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions due by 12/16/2005. Responses due by 1/9/2006 Replies due by 1/16/2006. All class discovery due by 11/30/2005. Oral Argument set for 1/27/2006 11:00 AM before Judge William H. Pauley III. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley III on 9/19/05) (jco, ) (Entered: 09/28/2005)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 9/8/05 before Judge William H. Pauley III. (jbe, ) (Entered: 09/21/2005)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley from Irving Bizar dated 8/16/05 re: a request for a pre-motion conference in connection with pltf proposed motion for class determination. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. Conference scheduled for 8/26/05 at 11:15am. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley III on 8/19/05) (kco, ) (Entered: 08/31/2005)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/21/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          ANSWER to Amended Complaint. Document filed by Mastercard International. Related document: 10 Amended Complaint filed by Bernd Bildstein.(kw, ) (Entered: 06/30/2005)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: MasterCard's motion to dismiss the Second Amended Complaint is denied. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley III on 6/6/05) Copies Mailed By Chambers.(kw, ) (Entered: 06/09/2005)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER denying 5 Motion to Dismiss, denying 14 Motion to Dismiss . MasterCard's motion to dismiss the Second Amended Complaint is denied. So Ordered.(Signed by Judge William H. Pauley III on 6/6/05) (jco, ) (Entered: 06/07/2005)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/10/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 14 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Mastercard International. (jp, ) (Entered: 12/14/2004)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 5 MOTION to Dismiss; Document filed by Bernd Bildstein. (djc, ) (Entered: 12/07/2004)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Theodore Allegaert. Document filed by Mastercard International. (jmi, ) (Entered: 11/17/2004)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW Of Defendant Mastercard International Incorporated in Support Of It's re: 14 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Mastercard International. (jmi, ) (Entered: 11/17/2004)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION OF DEFENDANT MASTERCARD INTERNATIONAL INCORPORATED to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Pursuant To FED.R.CIV.P. 12(b)(6). Document filed by Mastercard International. (jmi, ) (Entered: 11/17/2004)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER NO. 2: Dfts Motion to dismiss due by 11/12/2004. Responses due by 12/3/2004 Replies due by 12/10/2004. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley III on 10/28/04) Copies Mailed By Chambers.(pl, ) (Entered: 11/04/2004)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley III from Theodore Allegaert dated 9/15/04 re: Defendant writes to inform the Court that they intend to move to dismiss, the SAC and so submit this letter purs. to Section 2.A of Your Honor's individual practices requirements and request a pre-motion conference at the Court's earlier convenience; Application Granted. A pre-motion conference is scheduled for 10/6/04 at 3:00 p.m.. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley III on 9/24/04) (ae, ) (Entered: 10/08/2004)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/14/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER; that dft. MasterCard Intl. Incorp. shall move, answer or otherwise respond to the Second Amended Complaint on or before 11/1/04; plaintiff shall file his response within 30 days after service fo MasterCard's anticipated motion to dismiss; MasterCard shall file its reply in support of same within 21 days after service of plaintiffs' response. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley III on 9/13/04) (pl, ) Modified on 9/20/2004 (pl, ). (This document relates to MDL #1409) (Entered: 09/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/25/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mastercard International.Document filed by Bernd Bildstein.(cd, ) (Entered: 08/25/2004)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/29/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER re: 5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mastercard International. MasterCard's motion to dismiss is granted without prejudice and with leave to replead within thirty (30) days. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley III on 7/28/04) "Copies Mailed By Chambers"(jco, ) (Entered: 07/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on June 17, 2004 before Judge William H. Pauley III.(ps, ) (Entered: 07/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 5 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Mastercard International. (jco, ) (Entered: 05/14/2004)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 5 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Bernd Bildstein. (jco, ) (Entered: 05/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/5/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          MOTION for an order pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. Document filed by Mastercard International. (pl, ) (Entered: 04/07/2004)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/25/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Theodore Allegaert in Support of Mastercard International. Inc.'s motion to dismiss plaintiff's amended complaint. Document filed by Mastercard International. (db, ) (Entered: 03/31/2004)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/25/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW of defendant Mastercard International in Support of their motion to dismiss plaintiff's amended complaint. Document filed by Mastercard International. (db, ) (Entered: 03/31/2004)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant shall file its motion to dismiss by 3/26/04; Plaintiff shall file his opposition to Defendant's motion to dismiss by 4/30/04; Defendant shall file its reply by 5/14/04; The parties shall appear for oral argument on Defendant's motion to dismiss on 6/11/04 at 11:30 A.M. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley III on 2/27/04) Copies Mailed By Chambers.(sac, ) (Entered: 03/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/11/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL... transferring this action from the United States District Court - Eastern District of New York, Case Number: 1:03-cv-3273, MDL Number: MDL 1409, (Signed by Judge MDL Panel on 12/04/03) (laq, ) (Entered: 12/21/2003)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 25 times.

                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?