HUERTAS v. FOULKE MANAGMENT, CORP.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-01891-RMB-AMD
District Judge Renee Marie Bumb, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2021 at 1:14 PM ST (4 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo HECTOR L HUERTAS, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo ANTHONY TRAPANI, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Capehart Scatchard, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space LAURA D. RUCCOLO +1 856 234 6800 lruccolo@capehart.com
No Logo CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORP., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuireWoods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Philip A. Goldstein +1 212 552 1038 +1 212 552 5766 pagoldstein@mcguirewoods.com
Capital One, NA Capital One, NA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuireWoods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Philip A. Goldstein +1 212 552 1038 +1 212 552 5766 pagoldstein@mcguirewoods.com
No Logo CHERRY HILL MITSUBISHI, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Capehart Scatchard, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space LAURA D. RUCCOLO +1 856 234 6800 lruccolo@capehart.com
No Logo CHERRY HILL TRIPLEX, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Capehart Scatchard, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space LAURA D. RUCCOLO +1 856 234 6800 lruccolo@capehart.com
No Logo DAVID MICHAEL SCIOLLA INSURANCE, Defendant
No Logo FOULKE MANAGMENT, CORP., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Capehart Scatchard, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space LAURA D. RUCCOLO +1 856 234 6800 lruccolo@capehart.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1601
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
Office Camden
Filed 3/23/2017
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Camden
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags RULE16,SCHEDO
  Entries (169) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: 12/5/2019 letter
Letter from Laura Ruccolo re [113] Statement. (RUCCOLO, LAURA)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: 12/4/2019 statement
    STATEMENT PRE-HEARING STATEMENT by FOULKE MANAGMENT, CORP.. (RUCCOLO, LAURA)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: 12/2/2019 letter
      Letter from Non-Party New Jersey Motor Vehicle Commission re [111] Letter. (REITER, BRAD)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 1/6/2021, Entered: None Brief
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: 11/26/2019 letter
          Letter from HECTOR L HUERTAS; re: Request to file Motion. (tf, )
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 12/10/2020, Entered: None USCA Notice of Docketing (Case No & Mgr Assigned)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 11/15/2019, Entered: 11/15/2019 letter
              Letter from Non-Party New Jersey Motor Vehicle Commission. (REITER, BRAD)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 12/3/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appeal (USCA Philadelphia)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: 11/12/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER that Non-Party New Jersey Motor Vehicle Commission ("NJMVC") shall submit a letter to the Court by November 15, 2019 advising whether it will provide Plaintiff with the documents requested by way of Plaintiff's subpoena or whether NJMVC will dispute its subpoena obligation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 11/12/2019. (tf, )
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 11/24/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Reconsideration
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: 11/8/2019 discovery hearingCourt Filing
                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Telephonic Discovery Conference held on 11/7/2019. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (tf, )
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 11/24/2020, Entered: None Opinion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 107 Filed: 10/28/2019, Entered: 10/28/2019 Order on motion to compelCourt Filing
                          ORDER DENYING Motion to Compel; denying [106] Motion for Sanctions. This matter comes before the Court upon two motions filed by Plaintiff. It is clear from the record that the New Jersey Motor Vehicle Commission is attempting to work with Plaintiff, and indeed, Magistrate Judge Donio has set a conference for November 7, 2019 in an attempt to resolve these motions without further undue burden on already stretched judicial resources. Moreover, the NJMVC set forth in its letter [Docket No. 103] that it believes there is a "miscommunication" and it is attempting to resolve the matter with Plaintiff without the Court`s intervention. Why Plaintiff chose to file a Motion for Sanctions in light of Judge Donio's order is inexcusable. Plaintiff is forewarned that further unnecessary litigation conduct will not be tolerated by this Court. It is hereby ORDERED that both motions are denied without prejudice pending Judge Donio's attempt to resolve the matters. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 10/28/2019. (Bumb, Renee)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 5/12/2020, Entered: None Letter
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: 10/25/2019, Terminated: 10/28/2019 Motion for sanctions
                              MOTION for Sanctions Against NJDMV and its Officer, Alternatively, to Hold Them in Contempt of Subpoena by HECTOR L HUERTAS. (dmr)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 5/11/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings
                                  Set/Reset Deadlines as to [106] MOTION for Sanctions. Motion set for 11/18/2019 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 5/4/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition of Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank 105 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: 10/24/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                      TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of non-party NJ Motor Vehicle Commission's (NJMVC) letter [D.I. 103] concerning the pending motion to compel filed by Plaintiff. The Court will conduct a telephone conference on 11/7/2019 at 3:30 P.M., at which time the Court will address the motion unless resolved. Non-party NJMVC shall respond to the motion by 4:00 P.M. on 11/5/2019. The parties may contact the Court immediately prior to the conference to obtain a dial-in number for the conference call. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 10/24/2019. (slc)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 4/29/2020, Entered: None Exhibit
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 10/22/2019, Entered: 10/22/2019 Notice of appearance
                                          NOTICE of Appearance by BRAD MICHAEL REITER on behalf of New Jersey Motor Vehicle Commission (REITER, BRAD)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 4/23/2020, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/22/2019, Entered: 10/22/2019 letter
                                              Letter from Non-Party New Jersey Motor Vehicle Commission re [100] MOTION to Compel. (REITER, BRAD)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 4/15/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: 10/18/2019 Exhibit
                                                  Exhibit to [100] Motion to Compel by HECTOR L HUERTAS. (rtm, )
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 4/15/2020, Entered: None Opinion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: 10/16/2019 Certification in Support of Motion
                                                      CERTIFICATION in Support filed by HECTOR L HUERTAS re [100] MOTION to Compel (tf, )
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: 10/7/2019, Terminated: 10/28/2019 Motion to compel
                                                        MOTION to Compel by HECTOR L HUERTAS. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits A, B & D) (Clerk's Note: Exhibit C (Disc) received and filed in Clerk's Office)(tf, )
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 4/8/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                            Set Deadlines as to [100] MOTION to Compel. Motion set for 11/4/2019 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 4/6/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: 9/23/2019 statement
                                                                CLARIFICATION regarding issuance of subpoena by HECTOR L HUERTAS. (Clerk's Note: One disc received, filed in Clerk's Office. Page 3 and flash drives were not submitted) (tf, )
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 4/6/2020, Entered: None Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: 9/17/2019 letter
                                                                    Subpoena Schedule A from HECTOR L HUERTAS. (tf, )
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 3/30/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: 9/16/2019 letter
                                                                        Clarification of Plaintiff's Answer from HECTOR L HUERTAS re Original Jurisdiction (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(tf, )
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/9/2019, Entered: 9/16/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                          Transcript of Proceedings held on 7/2/2019, before Judge ANN MARIE DONIO. Court Reporter/Transcriber DIANA DOMAN TRANSCRIBING, LLC ((856) 435-7172). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter/Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 9/30/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/10/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/9/2019. (tf, )
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 3/23/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/9/2019, Entered: 9/9/2019 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion
                                                                              REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by HECTOR L HUERTAS re [89] APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by HECTOR L HUERTAS re [87] Order on Motion to Strike (tf, )
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 3/20/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: 8/30/2019 Brief
                                                                                  BRIEF in Opposition to Plaintiff's Appeal of Order on Motion to Strike Defendants' Defenses (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/16/2019, Entered: 8/16/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER Granting Defendant Capital One's application for a brief extension of time to respond to discovery; ORDERED that Capital One shall respond to Plaintiff's interrogatories and requests for production of documents by no later than August 30, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 8/16/2019. (dmr)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/15/2019, Entered: 8/15/2019 Response (NOT Motion)Court Filing
                                                                                          Objection to Capital One's [91] Letter Requesting Ex Par Te Relief From the Magistrate Judge and for Sanctions, filed by HECTOR L HUERTAS. (dmr)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: None Brief in Support of Motion
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/14/2019, Entered: 8/14/2019 letter
                                                                                              Letter from Philip A. Goldstein. (GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: 8/13/2019 Notice to Withdraw from NEF as to Case
                                                                                                  Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney LAURA D. RUCCOLO terminated. (RUCCOLO, LAURA)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines as to [89] APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by HECTOR L HUERTAS re [87] Order on Motion to Strike,. Motion set for 9/16/2019 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 2/14/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/12/2019, Entered: 8/13/2019 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court
                                                                                                          APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by HECTOR L HUERTAS re [87] Order on Motion to Strike, (dmr)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 1/13/2020, Entered: None Order on Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 8/8/2019, Entered: 8/9/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                              Request for the Clerk of the Court to Issue Subpoena Doces Tecum to Be Served Upon Google, Inc. by HECTOR L HUERTAS (dmr)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/1/2019, Entered: 8/1/2019 order on motion to strikeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part Plaintiff's [80] Motion to Strike, etc; Dismissing as moot Plaintiff's [79] Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 8/1/2019. (dmr)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: 7/31/2019 letter
                                                                                                                  Letter requesting transcripts of the record for purposes other than appeal from Hector Huertas. (Attachments: # (1) Envelope)(rtm, )(nm)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/3/2019, Entered: 7/3/2019 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 11/7/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 2/28/2020, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 7/3/2019. (rtm, )
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/2/2019, Entered: 7/3/2019 scheduling conferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 7/2/2019. (Court Reporter/Recorder Electronic.) (rtm, )
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/28/2019, Entered: 6/28/2019 Joint Discovery Plan
                                                                                                                        Joint Discovery Plan by CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORP., CAPITAL ONE, N.A..(GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                          NOTICE: Joint Discovery Plan due to Judge Donio's Chambers for 7/2/19 Scheduling Conference. See Order dated 5/16/19. (n.m.) (sb)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: 6/24/2019 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                            REPLY BRIEF in Support of Motion filed by HECTOR L HUERTAS re [80] MOTION to Strike (dmr)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/17/2019, Entered: 6/17/2019 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion
                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORP., CAPITAL ONE, N.A. re [80] MOTION to Strike (Attachments: # (1) Compendium of Unreported Cases, # (2) Certificate of Service)(GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/11/2019, Entered: 6/11/2019, Terminated: 8/1/2019 Motion to strike
                                                                                                                                MOTION to Strike Defendants' Defenses by HECTOR L HUERTAS. (dmr)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines as to [80] MOTION to Strike Defendants' Defenses. Motion set for 7/15/2019 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines as to [79] MOTION to Strike Defendants; Defenses. Motion set for 7/1/2019 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/5/2019, Entered: 6/7/2019 Motion to strike
                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Strike Defendants' Defenses by HECTOR L HUERTAS. (dmr)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/30/2019, Entered: 5/30/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/13/19, before Judge Bumb. Court Reporter Ted Formaroli (609-575-3864). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter due, but not filed, by 6/20/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/1/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/28/2019. (dd, )
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/30/2019, Entered: 5/30/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/15/17, before Judge Bumb. Court Reporter Ted Formaroli (609-575-3864). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter due, but not filed, by 6/20/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/1/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/28/2019. (dd, )
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/16/2019, Entered: 5/16/2019 Order Initial Scheduling Conference (Camden)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            Order Initial Conference set for 7/2/2019 12:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 5/16/2019. (tf, )
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/15/2019, Entered: 5/15/2019 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Amended Complaint by CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORP., CAPITAL ONE, N.A..(GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: 5/10/2019 Appeal Transcript RequestCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by HECTOR L. HUERTAS for proceedings held on 3/13/2019 & 12/15/2017 before Judge Bumb. (js)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Notice (NEF) to Court of Appeals
                                                                                                                                                  Notice to Court of Appeals, Re: [74] Appeal Transcript Request (js)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: 5/6/2019 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORP., CAPITAL ONE, N.A. re [72] Order on Motion to Stay (GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: 5/6/2019 Order on Motion to stayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [70] Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 5/6/2019. (tf, )
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED Set/Reset Deadlines as to [70] MOTION to Stay Claims Against Capital One. Motion set for 5/6/2019 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: 5/3/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                          Letter from Philip A. Goldstein. (GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE: Defendants Capital One, N.A. and Capital One Financial Corp. shall provide a courtesy copy of the motion to stay [D.I. 70] to Judge Donio's Chambers. (slc)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines as to [70] MOTION to Stay Claims Against Capital One. Motion set for 5/6/2019 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: 4/9/2019, Terminated: 5/6/2019 Motion To Stay
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Stay Claims Against Capital One by CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORP., CAPITAL ONE, N.A.. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum of Law, # (2) Declaration of Philip A. Goldstein, # (3) Exhibit A - Complaint, # (4) Exhibit B - Amended Complaint, # (5) Exhibit C - Unreported Cases Cited in Memorandum of Law, # (6) Proposed Order, # (7) Certificate of Service)(GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: 4/9/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by PHILIP ANDREW GOLDSTEIN on behalf of CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORP., CAPITAL ONE, N.A. (GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: 3/25/2019 Certification
                                                                                                                                                                    Certification on behalf of HECTOR L HUERTAS. (tf, )
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/21/2019, Entered: 3/21/2019 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      Letter from HECTOR L HUERTAS addressed to Judge Donio; re: Discovery Guidance. (tf, )
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/13/2019, Entered: 3/13/2019 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying without prejudice [52] Capital One's Motion to Dismiss; denying as premature [53] Huertas' Motion to Vacate or Modify the Arbitrator's Award; denying [56] Motion for Sanctions; denying [57] Amended Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 3/13/2019. (tf, )
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/13/2019, Entered: 3/13/2019 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Renee Marie Bumb: Hearing on [52] Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration by defendant Capital One Financial Corp. Ordered motion denied without prejudice. Hearing on [53] Motion to Vacate by plaintiff Hector L. Huertas. Ordered motion denied as moot. Hearing on [56] Motion for Sanctions by plaintiff Hector L. Huertas. Hearing on [57] Amended Motion for Sanctions by plaintiff Hector L. Huertas. Ordered motions denied as moot. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter Ted Formaroli) (ar1, )
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 64 Filed: 2/28/2019, Entered: 2/28/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            TEXT ORDER Oral argument on all outstanding motions shall be held in Courtroom 3D on March 13, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. Counsel and Mr. Huertas are hereby requested to kindly mark their calendars. So Ordered by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 02/28/2019. (Costigan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: 1/18/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                              Letter from HECTOR L HUERTAS re Request for Oral Argument [53] MOTION to Vacate or Modify the Arbitrator's Award. (tf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: 12/12/2018 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [61] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney GRAHAM HOWARD CLAYBROOK terminated. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 12/12/2018. (tf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/5/2018, Entered: 12/5/2018, Terminated: 12/12/2018 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Graham H. Claybrook by CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORP., CAPITAL ONE, N.A.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(CLAYBROOK, GRAHAM)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: 9/13/2018 Brief in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                    BRIEF in Opposition filed by CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORP., CAPITAL ONE, N.A. re [57] MOTION for Sanctions (RUCCOLO, LAURA)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: 9/11/2018 Amended document
                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED DOCUMENT by HECTOR L HUERTAS. Amendment to [58-1] Exhibit A. (tf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: 9/10/2018 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by HECTOR L HUERTAS re [53] MOTION to Vacate or Modify (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(tf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: 9/7/2018, Terminated: 3/13/2019 Motion for sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED MOTION for Sanctions by HECTOR L HUERTAS. (tf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines as to [57] AMENDED MOTION for Sanctions. Motion set for 10/1/2018 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: 8/31/2018, Terminated: 3/13/2019 Motion for sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Sanctions by HECTOR L HUERTAS. (rtm, )(nm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: 8/31/2018 Brief in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                BRIEF in Opposition filed by FOULKE MANAGMENT, CORP. re [53] MOTION to Vacate (RUCCOLO, LAURA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set Deadlines as to [56] MOTION for Sanctions. Motion set for 10/1/2018 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: 8/22/2018 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT against CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORP., CAPITAL ONE, N.A., CHERRY HILL MITSUBISHI, CHERRY HILL TRIPLEX, DAVID MICHAEL SCIOLLA INSURANCE, FOULKE MANAGMENT, CORP., ANTHONY TRAPANI, filed by HECTOR L HUERTAS.(rtm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines as to [53] Motion to Vacate or Modify the Arbitrator's Award. Motion set for 9/17/2018 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines as to [52] MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Compel Arbitration. Motion set for 9/17/2018 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: 8/20/2018 Motion to vacate
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Vacate or Modify the Arbitrator's Award by HECTOR L HUERTAS. (tf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: 8/17/2018, Terminated: 3/13/2019 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Compel Arbitration by CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORP.. Responses due by 9/4/2018 (Attachments: # (1) Brief in Support of Motion, # (2) Certification of William Kopp, # (3) Exhibit A, # (4) Exhibit B, # (5) Text of Proposed Order, # (6) Certificate of Service)(RUCCOLO, LAURA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: 8/13/2018 Order on motion to amend/correctCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER that the [38] Motion to Amend is GRANTED as to the TILA interest rate claim and attendant fraud claim and denied in all other respects. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 8/13/2018. (tf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: 8/13/2018 OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                OPINION. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 8/13/2018. (tf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: 8/7/2018 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion filed by HECTOR L HUERTAS re [38] MOTION to Amend Complaint (tf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: 7/27/2018 Brief in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BRIEF in Opposition filed by CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORP., CAPITAL ONE, N.A. re [38] MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint, (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Certificate of Service)(RUCCOLO, LAURA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: 7/19/2018 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER with Documents produced by American Arbitration Association by HECTOR L HUERTAS. (tf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 46 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: 7/13/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TEXT ORDER Defendant Capital One shall file its opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint [Dkt No. 38] within 14 days. Capital One's Motion for Extension of Time until Febraury 5, 2018 to file opposition [Dkt No. 41] is hereby DISMISSED AS MOOT. So Ordered by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 07/13/2018. (Costigan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: 7/6/2018 Order to Refund Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order to Refund Fees (Finance notified). Signed by Chief Deputy Theresa L Burnett on 6/27/18. (rm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filing Fee Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number CAM009763 (dd, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018 Plaintiffs Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiff's Appeal of Arbitrators's Award (Attachments: # (1)Exhibits A-G)Clerk's Note: Exhibit E Disc received and filed in Clerk's Office) (tf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: 5/10/2018 Brief in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BRIEF in Support filed by HECTOR L HUERTAS re [38] MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint, (tf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: 2/9/2018 statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiff's Objection to Defendant Capital One's Dilatory Delays by HECTOR L HUERTAS. (tf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: 1/17/2018, Terminated: 7/13/2018 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [38] MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint, by CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORP., CAPITAL ONE, N.A.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(CLAYBROOK, GRAHAM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: 1/17/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by GRAHAM HOWARD CLAYBROOK on behalf of CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORP., CAPITAL ONE, N.A. (CLAYBROOK, GRAHAM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines as to [41] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [38] MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint, . Motion set for 2/20/2018 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: 1/12/2018 Certification in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION in Support filed by HECTOR L HUERTAS re [38] MOTION to Amend Complaint (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits)(tf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: 1/9/2018 motion to amend/correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Amend Complaint, by HECTOR L HUERTAS. (Attachments: # (1) Brief in Support, # (2) Proposed Amended Complaint)(tf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines as to [38] MOTION to Amend Complaint. Motion set for 2/5/2018 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: 12/18/2017 order on motion to strikeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER that Foulke Management's Motion to Compel Arbitration [5] is GRANTED; Plaintiff's claims against Foulke Management are STAYED pending the arbitrator's decision concerning arbitrability; Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Sur- reply [11] is DENIED; Defendant Capital One's Motion to Compel Arbitration [17] is ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATED; Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint [21] is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE with leave to file a renewed motion; Plaintiff's Motions to Strike [Dkt No. 25, 29] are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 12/18/2017. (tf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: 12/18/2017 OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OPINION. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 12/18/2017. (tf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: 12/15/2017 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Renee Marie Bumb: Motion Hearing held on 12/15/2017. Hearing on all motions [21] MOTION for Leave to File filed by HECTOR L HUERTAS, [11] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [5] MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Compel Arbitration filed by HECTOR L HUERTAS, [17] MOTION to Dismiss & Compel Arbitration filed by CAPITAL ONE, N.A., [25] MOTION to Strike [24] Brief in Opposition to Motion filed by HECTOR L HUERTAS, [5] MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Compel Arbitration filed by ANTHONY TRAPANI, FOULKE MANAGMENT, CORP., CHERRY HILL TRIPLEX, CHERRY HILL MITSUBISHI and [29] MOTION to Strike [27] Brief in Opposition to Motion filed by HECTOR L HUERTAS. Decision Reserved. (Court Reporter Ted Formaroli) (ar1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: 12/1/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER ORDER an oral argument on all outstanding motions will be held on December 15, 2017 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 3D.. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 12/1/2017. (rtm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: 11/28/2017 Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Support filed by HECTOR L HUERTAS re [29] MOTION to Strike [27] Brief in Opposition to Motion (tf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: 11/16/2017 Brief in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BRIEF in Opposition filed by CHERRY HILL MITSUBISHI, CHERRY HILL TRIPLEX, FOULKE MANAGMENT, CORP. re [29] MOTION to Strike [27] Brief in Opposition to Motion to Strike Alleged Sur-Reply in Document No. 27 (RUCCOLO, LAURA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: 11/3/2017 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Duplicate document to [29] Motion to Strike with different signature dates, by HECTOR L HUERTAS. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Motion, # (2) Envelope)(rtm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: 11/2/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter from HECTOR L HUERTAS re [29] MOTION to Strike [27] Brief in Opposition to Motion. (tf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED Set/Reset Deadlines as to [29] MOTION to Strike [27] Brief in Opposition to Motion. Motion set for 12/4/2017 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines as to [29] MOTION to Strike [27] Brief in Opposition to Motion. Motion set for 12/4/2017 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: 10/31/2017, Terminated: 12/18/2017 Motion to strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Strike [27] Brief in Opposition to Motion by HECTOR L HUERTAS. (Attachments: # (1) Motion to Strike, # (2) Brief, # (3) Reply)(tf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: 10/23/2017 Brief in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED BRIEF in Support filed by HECTOR L HUERTAS re [25] MOTION to Strike [24] Brief in Opposition to Motion (tf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: 10/20/2017 Brief in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BRIEF in Opposition filed by FOULKE MANAGMENT, CORP. re [25] MOTION to Strike [24] Brief in Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(RUCCOLO, LAURA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion filed by HECTOR L HUERTAS re [21] MOTION for Leave to File, [25] MOTION to Strike [24] Brief in Opposition to Motion (tf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Reset Deadlines as to [25] MOTION to Strike [24] Brief in Opposition to Motion. Motion set for 11/6/2017 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: 10/5/2017, Terminated: 12/18/2017 Motion to strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Strike [24] Brief in Opposition to Motion by HECTOR L HUERTAS. (rtm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set Deadlines as to [25] MOTION to Strike [24] Brief in Opposition to Motion. Motion set for 11/6/2017 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: 10/3/2017 Brief in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BRIEF in Opposition filed by FOULKE MANAGMENT, CORP. re [21] MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(RUCCOLO, LAURA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: 9/29/2017 Letter Rule 7.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re [21] MOTION for Leave to File . (RUCCOLO, LAURA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  QC - Improper Default Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that the Letter Rule 7.1 submitted by Laura Ruccolo on 9/29/2017 cannot be granted as requested because the Motion to file an Amended Complaint is not a dispositve motion. In addition, the document did not contain a proper electronic signature (s/). This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This message is for informational purposes only. (tf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: 9/21/2017 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Exhibit to [20] Response in Opposition to Motion by HECTOR L HUERTAS. (rtm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set Deadlines as to [21] MOTION for Leave to File. Motion set for 10/16/2017 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: 9/19/2017 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint in opposition to capital one motion to dismiss and compel arbitration. by HECTOR L HUERTAS. (rtm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/16/2017, Entered: 9/19/2017 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE/Proposed Amended Complaint in Opposition filed by HECTOR L HUERTAS re [17] MOTION to Dismiss & Compel Arbitration (rtm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: 8/29/2017 Letter Rule 7.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by HECTOR L HUERTAS re [17] MOTION to Dismiss & Compel Arbitration (rtm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Reset Deadlines as to [17] MOTION to Dismiss & Compel Arbitration. Motion set for 10/2/2017 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: 8/17/2017 Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Corporate Disclosure Statement by CAPITAL ONE, N.A. identifying Capital One Financial Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (RUCCOLO, LAURA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines as to [17] MOTION to Dismiss & Compel Arbitration. Motion set for 9/18/2017 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/16/2017, Entered: 8/16/2017, Terminated: 12/18/2017 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss & Compel Arbitration by CAPITAL ONE, N.A.. Responses due by 9/25/2017 (Attachments: # (1) Brief Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, # (2) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # (3) Certificate of Service COS)(RUCCOLO, LAURA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/16/2017, Entered: 8/16/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by LAURA D. RUCCOLO on behalf of CAPITAL ONE, N.A. (RUCCOLO, LAURA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: 8/3/2017 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by HECTOR L HUERTAS. CAPITAL ONE, N.A. served on 7/26/2017, answer due 8/16/2017. (rtm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: 6/27/2017 Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Support filed by HECTOR L HUERTAS re [11] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Sur-Reply as to [5] MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Compel Arbitration (tf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: 6/19/2017 Brief in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BRIEF in Support filed by HECTOR L HUERTAS re [11] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Sur-Reply as to 5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Compel Arbitration (tf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: 6/16/2017 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by CHERRY HILL MITSUBISHI, CHERRY HILL TRIPLEX, FOULKE MANAGMENT, CORP., ANTHONY TRAPANI re [11] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [5] MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Compel Arbitration (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(RUCCOLO, LAURA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: 6/6/2017 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Sur-Reply as to [5] MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Compel Arbitration by HECTOR L HUERTAS. (jbk, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set Deadlines as to [11] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Sur-Reply as to [5] MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Compel Arbitration. Motion set for 7/3/2017 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jbk, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: 5/31/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter Re: Typo within the national consumer law on [7] from HECTOR L. HUERTAS. (jbk, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: 5/22/2017 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by CHERRY HILL MITSUBISHI, CHERRY HILL TRIPLEX, FOULKE MANAGMENT, CORP., ANTHONY TRAPANI re [5] MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Compel Arbitration (Attachments: # (1) Certification of Counsel, # (2) Certificate of Service)(RUCCOLO, LAURA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: 5/22/2017 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Cover Letter for Exhibit A to [7] Response to Motion by HECTOR L HUERTAS. (Clerk's Note: Exhibit A was not included with documents) (tf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: 5/16/2017 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Motion filed by HECTOR L HUERTAS re [5] MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Compel Arbitration (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit B)(tf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: 4/17/2017 Letter Rule 7.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re [5] MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Compel Arbitration by HECTOR L HUERTAS. (tf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED Set/Reset Deadlines as to [5] MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Compel Arbitration. Motion set for 6/5/2017 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines as to [5] MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Compel Arbitration. Motion set for 5/15/2017 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: 4/12/2017, Terminated: 12/18/2017 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Compel Arbitration by CHERRY HILL MITSUBISHI, CHERRY HILL TRIPLEX, FOULKE MANAGMENT, CORP., ANTHONY TRAPANI. Responses due by 4/26/2017 (Attachments: # (1) Brief, # (2) Certification of Counsel, # (3) Certification of William Kopp, # (4) Certificate of Service, # (5) Text of Proposed Order)(RUCCOLO, LAURA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: 3/27/2017 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS ISSUED as to CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORP., CAPITAL ONE, N.A., CHERRY HILL MITSUBISHI, CHERRY HILL TRIPLEX, DAVID MICHAEL SCIOLLA INSURANCE, FOULKE MANAGMENT, CORP., ANTHONY TRAPANI with answer to complaint due within 21 days. (jbk, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: 3/27/2017 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Exhibit to Complaint, by HECTOR L HUERTAS. (jbk, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORP., CAPITAL ONE, N.A., CHERRY HILL MITSUBISHI, CHERRY HILL TRIPLEX, DAVID MICHAEL SCIOLLA INSURANCE, FOULKE MANAGMENT, CORP., ANTHONY TRAPANI ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number CAM008587) with JURY DEMAND, filed by HECTOR L HUERTAS. (see [1] Complaint).(TH, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filing Fee Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number CAM008587 (TH, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: 3/23/2017 Letter: Filing Fee or IFP due
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Clerk's Letter: Complaint not accompanied by the filing fee or application to proceed in forma pauperis. (jbk, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: 3/23/2017 Complaint Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Complaint Received. NO IFP/FF (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) consent to receive nef)(jbk, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 9 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?