Time's Up, Inc. et al v. The City of New York et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-01081
District Judge George B. Daniels, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 25, 2017 at 11:41 PM DT (4.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Barbara Ross, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Stecklow Cohen & Thompson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel Benjamin Cohen +1 212 566 8000 +1 212 202 4952 sam@samcohenlaw.com
No Logo Time's Up, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Stecklow Cohen & Thompson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel Benjamin Cohen +1 212 566 8000 +1 212 202 4952 sam@samcohenlaw.com
v.
No Logo John Doe, Defendant
No Logo John Doherty, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Office of Corporation Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheryl Rebecca Neufeld +1 212 788 1035 +1 212 791 9714 sneufeld@law.nyc.gov
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael Bloomberg"

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Office of Corporation Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheryl Rebecca Neufeld +1 212 788 1035 +1 212 791 9714 sneufeld@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Raymond Kelly, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Office of Corporation Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheryl Rebecca Neufeld +1 212 788 1035 +1 212 791 9714 sneufeld@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Richard Roe, Defendant
City of New York City of New York, Defendant
Officially listed as "The City of New York"

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Office of Corporation Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheryl Rebecca Neufeld +1 212 788 1035 +1 212 791 9714 sneufeld@law.nyc.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE AND SETTLEMENT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned, as attorneys of record for the respective parties, as follows: The City of New York ("the City"), on behalf of all defendants, shall pay Eight Thousand Five Hundred Dollars ($8,500)("the settlement amount") in full settlement of all claims for damages, costs, disbursements and attorney's fees alleged in the Complaint and in the Notice of Claim. Plaintiffs and their attorney hereby waive any right to apply for, and shall not apply for, any order authorizing the taxation of costs or disbursements. Plaintiffs and their attorney also hereby waive any right to apply for, and shall not apply for, any order pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1988 authorizing the taxation of attorney's fees and costs; as further set forth herein. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 4/9/2013) (mro) . (Main Document 9 replaced on 4/12/2013) (tro). (Entered: 04/09/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Wylie M. Stecklow dated 4/4/2013 re: We respectfully suggest that the April 10, 2013 conference be canceled. ENDORSEMENT: So ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 4/9/2013) (rdz) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: A settlement conference in the above referenced matter has been scheduled for April 8, 2013, at 3:00 p.m., before Magistrate Judge Frank Maas, in Courtroom 9A, 500 Pearl Street, New York 10007. Judge Maas' settlement procedures are attached. Requests for adjournment must be made to the Court, in writing, at least 48 hours prior to the conference. Settlement Conference set for 4/8/2013 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Frank Maas. By: Richalyn Chambers, Courtroom Deputy, Dated: March 7, 2013.(djc) Modified on 3/8/2013 (djc). (Entered: 03/08/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 3/6/2013) (ja) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels, from Sheryl R. Neufeld, dated 3/5/2013, re: request that your Honor adjourn the date for the defendants to answer the complaint in this matter from March 7, 2013 to April 8, 2013. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Michael Bloomberg answer due 4/8/2013; John Doe answer due 4/8/2013; John Doherty answer due 4/8/2013; Raymond Kelly answer due 4/8/2013; Richard Roe answer due 4/8/2013; The City of New York answer due 4/8/2013. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 3/6/2013) (ja) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER: An initial conference is scheduled in this matter on April 10, 2013 at 9:30 a.m. ( Initial Conference set for 4/10/2013 at 09:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/28/2013) (ja) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (pgu) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sheryl Rebecca Neufeld on behalf of Michael Bloomberg, John Doherty, Raymond Kelly, The City of New York (Neufeld, Sheryl) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 1 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  COMPLAINT against Michael Bloomberg, John Doe, John Doherty, Raymond Kelly, Richard Roe, The City of New York. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401060224)Document filed by Time's Up, Inc., Barbara Ross.(jom) (Entered: 02/19/2013)
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 9 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?