In re: Tesla, Inc. Stockholder Litigation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-00317-MN
District Judge Maryellen Noreika, presiding

Tags
Last Updated January 27, 2019 at 11:59 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Aaron Rocke, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Grant & Eisenhofer, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jay W. Eisenhofer +1 646 722 8512 +1 646 722 8501 jeisenhofer@gelaw.com
No Logo Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Grant & Eisenhofer, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jay W. Eisenhofer +1 646 722 8512 +1 646 722 8501 jeisenhofer@gelaw.com
Space Michael T. Manuel +1 302 622 7097 +1 302 622 7100 mmanuel@gelaw.com
No Logo Boston Retirement System, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Grant & Eisenhofer, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jay W. Eisenhofer +1 646 722 8512 +1 646 722 8501 jeisenhofer@gelaw.com
Space Michael T. Manuel +1 302 622 7097 +1 302 622 7100 mmanuel@gelaw.com
No Logo Erste-Sparinvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft m.b.H., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Grant & Eisenhofer, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jay W. Eisenhofer +1 646 722 8512 +1 646 722 8501 jeisenhofer@gelaw.com
Space Michael T. Manuel +1 302 622 7097 +1 302 622 7100 mmanuel@gelaw.com
No Logo Francis B. Freeman, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooch and Taylor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Blake A. Bennett +1 302 984 3889 bbennett@coochtaylor.com
No Logo KBC Asset Management NV, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Grant & Eisenhofer, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jay W. Eisenhofer +1 646 722 8512 +1 646 722 8501 jeisenhofer@gelaw.com
Space Michael T. Manuel +1 302 622 7097 +1 302 622 7100 mmanuel@gelaw.com
No Logo Marnie Walksi McMahon, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooch and Taylor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Blake A. Bennett +1 302 984 3889 bbennett@coochtaylor.com
No Logo Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Grant & Eisenhofer, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jay W. Eisenhofer +1 646 722 8512 +1 646 722 8501 jeisenhofer@gelaw.com
Space Michael T. Manuel +1 302 622 7097 +1 302 622 7100 mmanuel@gelaw.com
No Logo Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Grant & Eisenhofer, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jay W. Eisenhofer +1 646 722 8512 +1 646 722 8501 jeisenhofer@gelaw.com
Space Michael T. Manuel +1 302 622 7097 +1 302 622 7100 mmanuel@gelaw.com
No Logo Stichting Blue Sky Active Large Cap Equity Fund USA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Grant & Eisenhofer, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jay W. Eisenhofer +1 646 722 8512 +1 646 722 8501 jeisenhofer@gelaw.com
Space Michael T. Manuel +1 302 622 7097 +1 302 622 7100 mmanuel@gelaw.com
v.
No Logo Gracias, Antonio J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Antonio J. Gracias"
Tesla, Inc. Director, Tesla, Inc.
SolarCity Corporation Unknown Role, SolarCity Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by Ross Aronstam & Moritz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Garrett Barak Moritz +1 302 576 1600 gmoritz@seitzross.com
No Logo Buss, Brad W, Defendant
Officially listed as "Brad W. Buss"
Tesla, Inc. Director, Tesla, Inc.
Unknown Role, Cafepress.com, Inc.
SolarCity Corporation Unknown Role, SolarCity Corporation
Unknown Role, Cavium Networks
Unknown Role, Aecom Technology Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Ross Aronstam & Moritz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Garrett Barak Moritz +1 302 576 1600 gmoritz@seitzross.com
Musk, Elon Reeve Musk, Elon Reeve, Defendant
Officially listed as "Elon Musk"
Tesla, Inc. CEO, Tesla, Inc., October 15, 2008 - Present
Beneficial Owner, Excession LLC
SolarCity Corporation Chairman of the Board, SolarCity Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by Ross Aronstam & Moritz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Garrett Barak Moritz +1 302 576 1600 gmoritz@seitzross.com
Ehrenpreis, Ira Ehrenpreis, Ira, Defendant
Officially listed as "Ira Ehrenpreis"

Toggle Switch Represented by Ross Aronstam & Moritz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Garrett Barak Moritz +1 302 576 1600 gmoritz@seitzross.com
Musk, Kimbal J. Musk, Kimbal J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Kimbal Musk"
Unknown Role, Big Green
Tesla, Inc. Unknown Role, Tesla, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Ross Aronstam & Moritz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Garrett Barak Moritz +1 302 576 1600 gmoritz@seitzross.com
Denholm, Robyn M. Denholm, Robyn M., Defendant
Officially listed as "Robyn M. Denholm"
Tesla, Inc. Director, Tesla, Inc.
Sun Microsystems, Inc. Unknown Role, Sun Microsystems, Inc.
Unknown Role, Echelon Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Ross Aronstam & Moritz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Garrett Barak Moritz +1 302 576 1600 gmoritz@seitzross.com
Jurvetson, Stephen T. Jurvetson, Stephen T., Defendant
Officially listed as "Stephen T. Jurvetson"
Unknown Role, Athenahealth, Inc.
Unknown Role, Draper Associates, LP
Unknown Role, Draper Timothy C
Unknown Role, Fisher John H N
Unknown Role, Enernoc, Inc.
Tesla, Inc. Unknown Role, Tesla, Inc.
Unknown Role, Neophotonics Corp
SolarCity Corporation Unknown Role, SolarCity Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by Ross Aronstam & Moritz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Garrett Barak Moritz +1 302 576 1600 gmoritz@seitzross.com
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ross Aronstam & Moritz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Nominal Garrett Barak Moritz +1 302 576 1600 gmoritz@seitzross.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Office Wilmington
Filed 3/24/2017
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
117-cv-00317-MN
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags STAYED,LEAD
  Entries (57) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 41 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: 11/2/2018 letter
Letter to Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Garrett B. Moritz and Michael T. Manuel regarding Status of litigation in the Court of Chancery - re Oral Order,,. (Manuel, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/2/2018: # (1) Exhibit) (nmg).
LREF
Blank 40 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: 9/7/2018 Oral OrderCourt Filing
ORAL ORDER - The referral of this action to the Magistrate Judge is hereby WITHDRAWN. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/7/2018. (dlw)
    LREF
    Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
    Case Reassigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00317-MN-CJB, 1:17-cv-00461-MN-CJB (rjb)
      LREF
      Blank  Oral Order
      ORAL ORDER: The Court, having reviewed the parties' joint status report, (D.I. 39), HEREBY ORDERS: (1) That the consented-to stay ordered by the Court on 3/6/18 "shall continue sine die subject to further agreement of the parties and order of the Court[,]" (D.I. 37 at 2); and (2) The parties shall, no later than 180 days from today's date, provide the Court with a joint status report letter of no more than two (2) single-spaced pages regarding the status of the litigation in the Chancery Court. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 5/7/2018. (dlb)
        LREF
        Legal Document 39 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: 5/4/2018 Status report
        Joint STATUS REPORT by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Boston Retirement System, Erste-Sparinvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft m.b.H., KBC Asset Management NV, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund, Stichting Blue Sky Active Large Cap Equity Fund USA. (Manuel, Michael)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: 4/4/2018 OrderCourt Filing
          ERRATA ORDER re [34] Memorandum Opinion,. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 4/4/2018. (dlb)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank  SO ORDERED
            SO ORDERED D.I. [37] Consent MOTION to Stay filed by Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund, Boston Retirement System, Stichting Blue Sky Active Large Cap Equity Fund USA, KBC Asset Management NV, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Erste-Sparinvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft m.b.H. The parties shall, no later than 60 days from today's date, provide the Court with a joint status report letter of no more than two (2) single-spaced pages regarding (1) the status of the pending motion to dismiss in the Chancery Court action and (2) its effect on the stay in the instant case. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 3/6/2018. (dlb)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: 3/5/2018, Terminated: 3/6/2018 Motion To Stay
              Consent MOTION to Stay - filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Boston Retirement System, Erste-Sparinvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft m.b.H., KBC Asset Management NV, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund, Stichting Blue Sky Active Large Cap Equity Fund USA. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Manuel, Michael)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: 2/20/2018 letter
                Letter to the Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Michael T. Manuel regarding no redactions to Memorandum Opinion (dated February 15, 2018) are necessary - re [34] Memorandum Opinion,. (Manuel, Michael)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank  Document Unsealed
                  Document Unsealed D.I. [34] Memorandum Opinion (dlb)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/15/2018, Entered: 2/15/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER re Memorandum Opinion GRANTING consolidation of CA No. 17-461-VAC-CJB into Lead Case 17-317-VAC-CJB. (31 in 1:17-cv-00461-VAC-CJB, 34 in 1:17-cv-00317-VAC-CJB) Co-Lead Counsel appointed. Every subsequent pleading filed in this Consolidated Action, or in any separate action included herein shall bear the caption for CA 17-317: IN RE TESLA, INC. STOCKHOLDER LITIGATION.. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 2/15/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00317-VAC-CJB, 1:17-cv-00461-VAC-CJB(mlc)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/15/2018, Entered: 2/15/2018 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
                      MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding consolidation and appointment of lead plaintiffs. An appropriate Order will follow. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 2/15/2018.This order has been emailed to local counsel. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00317-VAC-CJB, 1:17-cv-00461-VAC-CJB(mlc) Modified on 2/15/2018 (mlc). Unsealed on 2/20/2018 (dlb).
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank  SO ORDERED
                        SO ORDERED, re [12] MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Francis A. Bottini Jr. filed by Marnie Walksi McMahon, Francis B. Freeman, Jr., [13] MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Albert Y. Chang filed by Marnie Walksi McMahon, Francis B. Freeman, Jr.. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 9/14/2017. (dlb)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: 7/14/2017 Reply Brief
                          REPLY BRIEF re [19] MOTION to Appoint Counsel Bottini & Bottini as Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases Related Derivative Actions filed by Francis B. Freeman, Jr., Marnie Walksi McMahon. (Bennett, Blake)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 Redacted Document
                            REDACTED VERSION of (21 in 1:17-cv-00461-VAC-CJB) Brief (Combined Answering and Reply),, (24 in 1:17-cv-00317-VAC-CJB) Brief (Combined Answering and Reply),, by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Boston Retirement System, Erste-Sparinvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft m.b.H., KBC Asset Management NV, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Aaron Rocke, Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund, Stichting Blue Sky Active Large Cap Equity Fund USA, Aaron Rocke. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Eisenhofer, Jay)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: 6/23/2017 Declaration
                              DECLARATION re (21 in 1:17-cv-00461-VAC-CJB) Brief (Combined Answering and Reply),, (24 in 1:17-cv-00317-VAC-CJB) Brief (Combined Answering and Reply),, Pepijn Paanen on behalf of Stichting Blue Sky Active Large Cap Equity Fund USA by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Boston Retirement System, Erste-Sparinvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft m.b.H., KBC Asset Management NV, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Aaron Rocke, Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund, Stichting Blue Sky Active Large Cap Equity Fund USA, Aaron Rocke. (Eisenhofer, Jay)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: 6/23/2017 Declaration
                                DECLARATION re (21 in 1:17-cv-00461-VAC-CJB) Brief (Combined Answering and Reply),, (24 in 1:17-cv-00317-VAC-CJB) Brief (Combined Answering and Reply),, Roger LaDuke on behalf of Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Boston Retirement System, Erste-Sparinvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft m.b.H., KBC Asset Management NV, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Aaron Rocke, Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund, Stichting Blue Sky Active Large Cap Equity Fund USA, Aaron Rocke. (Eisenhofer, Jay)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: 6/23/2017 Declaration
                                  DECLARATION re (21 in 1:17-cv-00461-VAC-CJB) Brief (Combined Answering and Reply),, (24 in 1:17-cv-00317-VAC-CJB) Brief (Combined Answering and Reply),, Robert Jones on behalf of Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Boston Retirement System, Erste-Sparinvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft m.b.H., KBC Asset Management NV, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Aaron Rocke, Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund, Stichting Blue Sky Active Large Cap Equity Fund USA, Aaron Rocke. (Eisenhofer, Jay)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: 6/23/2017 Declaration
                                    DECLARATION re (21 in 1:17-cv-00461-VAC-CJB) Brief (Combined Answering and Reply),, (24 in 1:17-cv-00317-VAC-CJB) Brief (Combined Answering and Reply),, Linda Demunter and Gert Rammeloo on behalf of KBC Asset Management NV by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Boston Retirement System, Erste-Sparinvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft m.b.H., KBC Asset Management NV, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Aaron Rocke, Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund, Stichting Blue Sky Active Large Cap Equity Fund USA, Aaron Rocke. (Eisenhofer, Jay)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: 6/23/2017 Declaration
                                      DECLARATION re (21 in 1:17-cv-00461-VAC-CJB) Brief (Combined Answering and Reply),, (24 in 1:17-cv-00317-VAC-CJB) Brief (Combined Answering and Reply),, Magdalena Reischl and Gerold Permoser on behalf of Erste-Sparinvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft m.b.H. by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Boston Retirement System, Erste-Sparinvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft m.b.H., KBC Asset Management NV, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Aaron Rocke, Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund, Stichting Blue Sky Active Large Cap Equity Fund USA, Aaron Rocke. (Eisenhofer, Jay)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: 6/23/2017 Declaration
                                        DECLARATION re (21 in 1:17-cv-00461-VAC-CJB) Brief (Combined Answering and Reply),, (24 in 1:17-cv-00317-VAC-CJB) Brief (Combined Answering and Reply),, Timothy J. Smyth on behalf of Boston Retirement System by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Boston Retirement System, Erste-Sparinvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft m.b.H., KBC Asset Management NV, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Aaron Rocke, Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund, Stichting Blue Sky Active Large Cap Equity Fund USA, Aaron Rocke. (Eisenhofer, Jay)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: 6/23/2017 Declaration
                                          DECLARATION re (21 in 1:17-cv-00461-VAC-CJB) Brief (Combined Answering and Reply),, (24 in 1:17-cv-00317-VAC-CJB) Brief (Combined Answering and Reply),, George Hopkins on behalf of Arkansas Teacher Retirement System by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Boston Retirement System, Erste-Sparinvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft m.b.H., KBC Asset Management NV, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Aaron Rocke, Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund, Stichting Blue Sky Active Large Cap Equity Fund USA, Aaron Rocke. (Eisenhofer, Jay)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: 6/23/2017 Brief (Combined Answering and Reply)
                                            [SEALED] BRIEF (Combined Answering and Reply) re[19] MOTION to Appoint Counsel Bottini & Bottini as Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases Related Derivative Actions, [14] MOTION to Consolidate Cases and to Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Counsel filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Boston Retirement System, Erste-Sparinvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft m.b.H., KBC Asset Management NV, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Aaron Rocke, Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund, Stichting Blue Sky Active Large Cap Equity Fund USA.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/30/2017. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Eisenhofer, Jay)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: 6/23/2017, Terminated: 6/23/2017 Motion to seal
                                              MOTION to Seal Institutional Plaintiffs' Brief in Opposition to the Individual Plaintiffs' Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiffs and Lead Counsel, and Reply Brief in Further Support of the Institutional Plaintiffs' Motion for Consolidation and to Appoint Lead Plaintiffs and Lead Counsel - filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Boston Retirement System, Erste-Sparinvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft m.b.H., KBC Asset Management NV, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Aaron Rocke, Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund, Stichting Blue Sky Active Large Cap Equity Fund USA, Aaron Rocke. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Eisenhofer, Jay)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank  SO ORDERED
                                                SO ORDERED D.I. (23 in 1:17-cv-00317-VAC-CJB, 20 in 1:17-cv-00461-VAC-CJB) MOTION to Seal Institutional Plaintiffs' Brief in Opposition to the Individual Plaintiffs' Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiffs and Lead Counsel, and Reply Brief in Further Support of the Institutional Plaintiffs' Motion for Consolidati filed by Aaron Rocke, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Boston Retirement System, Stichting Blue Sky Active Large Cap Equity Fund USA, KBC Asset Management NV, Erste-Sparinvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft m.b.H., Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 6/23/2017. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00317-VAC-CJB, 1:17-cv-00461-VAC-CJB(mlc)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017 Declaration
                                                  DECLARATION re [19] MOTION to Appoint Counsel Bottini & Bottini as Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases Related Derivative Actions by Francis B. Freeman, Jr.. (Bennett, Blake)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017 Declaration
                                                    DECLARATION re [19] MOTION to Appoint Counsel Bottini & Bottini as Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases Related Derivative Actions by Francis B. Freeman, Jr.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Bennett, Blake)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017 Answering Brief in Opposition
                                                      ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re [19] MOTION to Appoint Counsel Bottini & Bottini as Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases Related Derivative Actions filed by Francis B. Freeman, Jr..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/9/2017. (Bennett, Blake)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017, Terminated: 2/15/2018 Motion to Appoint Counsel
                                                        MOTION to Appoint Counsel Bottini & Bottini as Lead Counsel, MOTION to Consolidate Cases Related Derivative Actions - filed by Francis B. Freeman, Jr.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Bennett, Blake)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank  Remark
                                                          Remark: If the parties jointly consent to have a Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, then when Judge Burke enters a case schedule he will enter the respective pre-trial conference and trial dates onto his calendar and will honor them. Otherwise, in accordance with the District Court's procedures for "Assignment of Cases to Visiting Judges" (issued on May 26, 2017 and available on the District Court's website), then upon the filing of a case-dispositive motion (e.g., a motion to dismiss, a motion for judgment on the pleadings, a motion for summary judgment, or initiation of the claim construction process in a patent case), VAC cases will be considered ready for reassignment to a visiting District Judge. Whether the pre-trial conference and trial dates will stand after reassignment will depend on the availability of those dates on the visiting District Judge's calendar. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00317-VAC-CJB, 1:17-cv-00461-VAC-CJB(dlb)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank  Remark re Newer Attorneys
                                                            REMARK: The parties should be aware that the Court encourages the participation of newer attorneys in courtroom proceedings and at oral argument. Please see the Court's Standing Order Regarding Courtroom Opportunities for Newer Attorneys, a link to which is provided here for the parties' convenience:http://www.ded.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/forms/StandingOrder2017.pdf Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00461-VAC-CJB, 1:17-cv-00317-VAC-CJB(dlb)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank  SO ORDERED
                                                              SO ORDERED, re (15 in 1:17-cv-00461-VAC-CJB, 18 in 1:17-cv-00317-VAC-CJB) Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME and Set Briefing Schedule on Lead Counsel and Lead Plaintiff to June 2, 2017, June 23, 2017, and July 14, 2017 (see Stipulation for details) filed by Antonio J. Gracias, Tesla Inc., Elon Musk, Kimbal Musk, Stephen T. Jurvetson, Brad W. Buss, Robyn M. Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 5/23/2017. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00317-VAC-CJB, 1:17-cv-00461-VAC-CJB(dlb)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: 5/19/2017, Terminated: 5/23/2017 Stipulation to EXTEND Time
                                                                Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME and Set Briefing Schedule on Lead Counsel and Lead Plaintiff to June 2, 2017, June 23, 2017, and July 14, 2017 (see Stipulation for details) - filed by Brad W. Buss, Robyn M. Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, Stephen T. Jurvetson, Elon Musk, Kimbal Musk, Tesla Inc.. (Moritz, Garrett)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: 5/11/2017 Redacted Document
                                                                  REDACTED VERSION of (12 in 1:17-cv-00461-VAC-CJB) Opening Brief in Support,, (16 in 1:17-cv-00317-VAC-CJB) Opening Brief in Support,, of Motion for Consolidation and to Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Counsel by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Boston Retirement System, Erste-Sparinvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft m.b.H., KBC Asset Management NV, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Aaron Rocke, Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund, Stichting Blue Sky Active Large Cap Equity Fund USA, Aaron Rocke. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Eisenhofer, Jay)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank  SO ORDERED
                                                                    SO ORDERED D.I. (11 in 1:17-cv-00461-VAC-CJB, 15 in 1:17-cv-00317-VAC-CJB) MOTION to Seal Institutional Plaintiffs' Brief in Support of Motion for Consolidation and to Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Counsel filed by Aaron Rocke, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Boston Retirement System, Stichting Blue Sky Active Large Cap Equity Fund USA, KBC Asset Management NV, Erste-Sparinvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft m.b.H., Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 5/5/2017. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00461-VAC-CJB, 1:17-cv-00317-VAC-CJB(mlc)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: 5/4/2017 Opening Brief in Support
                                                                      [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re [14] MOTION to Consolidate Cases and to Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Counsel filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Boston Retirement System, Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, KBC Asset Management NV, Erste-Sparinvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft m.b.H., Stichting Blue Sky Active Large Cap Equity Fund USA, Aaron Rocke.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/18/2017. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Eisenhofer, Jay)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: 5/4/2017, Terminated: 5/5/2017 Motion to seal
                                                                        MOTION to Seal Institutional Plaintiffs' Brief in Support of Motion for Consolidation and to Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Counsel - filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Boston Retirement System, Erste-Sparinvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft m.b.H., KBC Asset Management NV, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Aaron Rocke, Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund, Stichting Blue Sky Active Large Cap Equity Fund USA. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Eisenhofer, Jay)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: 5/4/2017, Terminated: 2/15/2018 Motion to consolidate cases
                                                                          MOTION to Consolidate Cases and to Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Counsel - filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Boston Retirement System, Erste-Sparinvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft m.b.H., KBC Asset Management NV, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Aaron Rocke, Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund, Stichting Blue Sky Active Large Cap Equity Fund USA. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Eisenhofer, Jay)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: 5/2/2017, Terminated: 9/14/2017 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                            MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Albert Y. Chang - filed by Francis B. Freeman, Jr., Marnie Walksi McMahon. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Bennett, Blake)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: 5/2/2017, Terminated: 9/14/2017 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                              MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Francis A. Bottini Jr. - filed by Francis B. Freeman, Jr., Marnie Walksi McMahon. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Bennett, Blake)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Blank  SO ORDERED
                                                                                SO ORDERED D.I. [11] Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for all Defendants to move, answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint to May 26, 2017 filed by Antonio J. Gracias, Tesla Inc., Elon Musk, Kimbal Musk, Stephen T. Jurvetson, Brad W. Buss, Robyn M. Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 4/17/2017. (dlk)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: 4/14/2017, Terminated: 4/17/2017 Stipulation to EXTEND Time
                                                                                  Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for all Defendants to move, answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint to May 26, 2017 - filed by Brad W. Buss, Robyn M. Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, Stephen T. Jurvetson, Elon Musk, Kimbal Musk, Tesla Inc.. (Moritz, Garrett)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: 3/30/2017 summons returned executed
                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marnie Walksi McMahon, Francis B. Freeman, Jr.. Brad W. Buss served on 3/29/2017, answer due 4/19/2017. (Bennett, Blake)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: 3/30/2017 summons returned executed
                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marnie Walksi McMahon, Francis B. Freeman, Jr.. Kimbal Musk served on 3/29/2017, answer due 4/19/2017. (Bennett, Blake)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: 3/30/2017 summons returned executed
                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marnie Walksi McMahon, Francis B. Freeman, Jr.. Elon Musk served on 3/29/2017, answer due 4/19/2017. (Bennett, Blake)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: 3/30/2017 summons returned executed
                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marnie Walksi McMahon, Francis B. Freeman, Jr.. Robyn M. Denholm served on 3/29/2017, answer due 4/19/2017. (Bennett, Blake)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: 3/30/2017 summons returned executed
                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marnie Walksi McMahon, Francis B. Freeman, Jr.. Antonio J. Gracias served on 3/29/2017, answer due 4/19/2017. (Bennett, Blake)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: 3/30/2017 summons returned executed
                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marnie Walksi McMahon, Francis B. Freeman, Jr.. Stephen T. Jurvetson served on 3/29/2017, answer due 4/19/2017. (Bennett, Blake)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: 3/30/2017 summons returned executed
                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marnie Walksi McMahon, Francis B. Freeman, Jr.. Ira Ehrenpreis served on 3/29/2017, answer due 4/19/2017. (Bennett, Blake)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Blank  case referred to magistrate judge
                                                                                                  CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke. (This matter has been assigned to the Vacant Judgeship and referred to a Magistrate Judge for handling through case-dispositive motions. The Magistrate Judge has full authority permitted by law to manage this matter, including entering schedules through trial, deciding non-dispositive matters and making recommendations as to the resolution of dispositive matters. Litigants and counsel are reminded that they have the option of consenting to the Magistrate Judge to handle the case in full, including trial, or consenting to having a particular motion resolved by the Magistrate Judge.) (rjb)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                    Case Assigned to Vacant Judgeship (2017). Please include initials of VAC after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: 3/28/2017 summons returned executed
                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marnie Walksi McMahon, Francis B. Freeman, Jr.. Tesla Inc. served on 3/27/2017, answer due 4/17/2017. (Bennett, Blake)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Blank  Summons Reissued
                                                                                                        Summons Reissued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Brad W. Buss, Robyn M. Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, Stephen T. Jurvetson, Elon Musk, Kimbal Musk. (sar)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank  Summons Reissued
                                                                                                          Summons Reissued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Tesla Inc. (nmg)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: 3/24/2017 Magistrate Consent FormsCourt Filing
                                                                                                            Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (jcs)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: 3/24/2017 Complaint
                                                                                                              COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Brad W. Buss, Robyn M. Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Stephen T. Jurvetson, Elon Musk, Kimbal Musk, Antonio J. Gracias Tesla Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2109132.) - filed by Marnie Walksi McMahon, Francis B. Freeman, Jr.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Civil Cover Sheet)(jcs)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                ORAL ORDER: The Court, having reviewed the parties' joint status report, (D.I. 39), HEREBY ORDERS: (1) That the consented-to stay ordered by the Court on 3/6/18 "shall continue sine die subject to further agreement of the parties and order of the Court[,]" (D.I. 37 at 2); and (2) The parties shall, no later than 180 days from today's date, provide the Court with a joint status report letter of no more than two (2) single-spaced pages regarding the status of the litigation in the Chancery Court. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 5/7/2018. (dlb)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 126 times.

                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?