Moon v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:14-cv-03370
District Judge Michael J. Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 28, 2017 at 11:05 PM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Sherry Moon, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McCauley Westberg & Ramirez PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert M McCauley +1 214 506 6001 +1 972 924 9924 mccauley@mwrlawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael John Ramirez +1 214 506 6001 ramirez@mwrlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Passman & Jones, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Warren Randall Westberg +1 214 506 6001 +1 972 924 9924 westberg@mwrlawfirm.com
v.
No Logo Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Nilan Johnson Lewis PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott A Smith +1 612 305 7500 +1 612 305 7501
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tracy J Van Steenburgh +1 612 305 7500 +1 612 305 7501 tvan@nilanjohnson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason C. Rose +1 410 244 7553 +1 410 244 7742 jcrose@venable.com
Pfizer, Inc. Pfizer, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Arqule, Inc.
Unknown Role, Icagen, Inc.
Unknown Role, Zoetis Inc.
Unknown Role, Celladon Corp
Unknown Role, Pfizer Production LLC
Unknown Role, Icu Medical Inc/de
Unknown Role, Upjohn Inc
Unknown Role, Insite Vision, Inc.
Unknown Role, pSivida LTD
Unknown Role, Cortexyme, Inc.
Unknown Role, Imara Inc.
Unknown Role, Bioatla, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Michael Price +1 612 766 7000 +1 612 766 1600 Jprice@faegre.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Knight LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Janelle L. Davis +1 214 969 1700 +1 214 969 1751 janelle.davis@tklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Knight LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John H. Martin +1 214 969 1229 +1 214 969 1751 john.martin@tklaw.com
No Logo Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Michael Price +1 612 766 7000 +1 612 766 1600 Jprice@faegre.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Knight LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Janelle L. Davis +1 214 969 1700 +1 214 969 1751 janelle.davis@tklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Knight LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John H. Martin +1 214 969 1229 +1 214 969 1751 john.martin@tklaw.com
Pharmacia Corporation Pharmacia Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Michael Price +1 612 766 7000 +1 612 766 1600 Jprice@faegre.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Knight LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Janelle L. Davis +1 214 969 1700 +1 214 969 1751 janelle.davis@tklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Knight LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John H. Martin +1 214 969 1229 +1 214 969 1751 john.martin@tklaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332-pip-Diversity-Personal
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 8/12/15. (KMW) (Entered: 08/12/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph M Price on behalf of Pfizer Inc., Pharmacia & Upjohn Company, LLC, Pharmacia Corporation. (Price, Joseph) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Pfizer Inc., Pharmacia & Upjohn Company, LLC, Pharmacia Corporation re 23 Stipulation of Dismissal, (Smith, Scott) (Entered: 08/05/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a) by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Pfizer Inc., Pharmacia & Upjohn Company, LLC, Pharmacia Corporation. Jointly Signed by Sherry Moon. (Smith, Scott) (Entered: 08/05/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE to Attorney: The due-date of the letter that the parties are ordered to submit to Magistrate Judge Noel is extended to December 19, 2015. [Reference docket entry #21] (TMA) (Entered: 12/15/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel: Telephone Conference held on 11/20/2014. (lmb) (Entered: 11/20/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              STIPULATION regarding voluntary settlement negotiations by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Sherry Moon, Pfizer Inc., Pharmacia Corporation, and Pharmacia & Upjohn LLC. (Smith, Scott) (Entered: 10/15/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel: Teleconference held on 10/8/2014. The parties all agreed to file a stipulation outlining the procedural posture of the case. A follow-up teleconference is scheduled for November 20, 2014 at 2:00 p.m. Central Time. (lmb) Modified text on 10/9/2014 (MMP). (Entered: 10/08/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-REFILED. Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel: Teleconference held on 10/8/2014. The parties all agreed to file a stipulation outlining the procedural posture of the case. A follow-up teleconference isscheduled for November 20, 2014 at 2:00 p.m. Central Time. (lmb) Modified text on 10/8/2014 (lmb). (Entered: 10/08/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    ANSWER to Complaint by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Smith, Scott) (Entered: 09/25/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      PRETRIAL ORDER No. 3. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 9/5/07. (kt) (Entered: 09/08/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        PRETRIAL ORDER No. 2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 9/5/07. (kt) (Entered: 09/08/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          PRETRIAL ORDER No. 1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 8/23/07. (kt) (Entered: 09/08/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 6:14-cv-00345. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Chief Judge Michael J. Davis and referred to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel per MDL List. (Entered: 09/05/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-22). Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel. (mc5) Modified on 9/5/2014 (mc5). [Transferred from Texas Western on 9/5/2014.] (Entered: 09/05/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                ORDER GRANTING 10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Warren R. Westberg. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (mc5) [Transferred from Texas Western on 9/5/2014.] (Entered: 08/29/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Warren Randall Westberg ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 600014937) by on behalf of Sherry Moon. (tb) [Transferred from Texas Western on 9/5/2014.] (Entered: 08/21/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    ANSWER to Complaint by Pfizer Inc., Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC, Pharmacia Corporation.(Martin, John) [Transferred from Texas Western on 9/5/2014.] (Entered: 08/20/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      Order Concerning Courtroom Decorum and Trial Procedures. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (mc5) [Transferred from Texas Western on 9/5/2014.] (Entered: 08/14/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Selection set for 5/11/2015 09:00AM before Judge Walter S. Smith, Jury Trial set for 5/11/2015 09:00 AM before Judge Walter S. Smith, ADR Report Deadline due by 10/14/2014, Amended Pleadings due by 1/13/2015, Discovery due by 2/13/2015, Joinder of Parties due by 12/12/2014, Motions due by 2/13/2015. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (mc5) [Transferred from Texas Western on 9/5/2014.] (Entered: 08/14/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Letter/Correspondence advising Arthur J. Liederman of admission status and pro hac vice procedures. (tb) [Transferred from Texas Western on 9/5/2014.] (Entered: 08/14/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Letter/Correspondence advising Warren Randal Westberg of admission status and pro hac vice procedures. (tb) [Transferred from Texas Western on 9/5/2014.] (Entered: 08/14/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Letter/Correspondence advising R. Michael McCauley of admission status and pro hac vice procedures. (tb) [Transferred from Texas Western on 9/5/2014.] (Entered: 08/14/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Pfizer Inc., Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC, Pharmacia Corporation. (Martin, John) [Transferred from Texas Western on 9/5/2014.] (Entered: 08/13/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  SUPPLEMENT to 1 Notice of Removal, Supplement to JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet (Cases Removed from State District Court) by Pfizer Inc., Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC, Pharmacia Corporation. (Martin, John) [Transferred from Texas Western on 9/5/2014.] (Entered: 08/13/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC, Pharmacia Corporation, Pfizer Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-6736824), filed by Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC, Pharmacia Corporation, Pfizer Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Original Petition, # 2 Exhibit B - Consent, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martin, John) [Transferred from Texas Western on 9/5/2014.] (Entered: 08/13/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 28 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?