Burch v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:14-cv-01642
District Judge Ann D. Montgomery, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 29, 2017 at 8:08 PM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Marvin Burch, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Charles H Johnson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles H. Johnson +1 651 633 5685 +1 651 633 4442 bdehkes@charleshjohnsonlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan R Mencel +1 651 633 5685 +1 651 633 4442 jmencel@charleshjohnsonlaw.com
v.
No Logo Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Defendant
No Logo Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332-pip-Diversity-Personal
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-64), transferring case to the Southern District of Illinois per MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge David R. Herndon. (AKL) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Summons Issued as to Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (AKL) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Ann D. Montgomery per Master List and referred to Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham. Please use case number 14cv1642 ADM/JJG. (AKL) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0864-3989469.) Filed by Marvin Burch. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Johnson, Charles) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 18 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?