United States v. Veytia

Criminal Case New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cr-00115
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 31, 2021 at 1:26 PM EDT (4.1 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Ryan C Harris +1 718 254 6489 +1 718 254 6076 ryan.harris2@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig R. Heeren +1 718 254 6467 +1 718 254 6076 craig.heeren@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Amanda Nunn Liskamm +1 202 616 1576 +1 202 514 0483 amanda.liskamm@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael P. Robotti +1 718 254 7576 +1 718 254 6076 michael.robotti@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jason James Ruiz +1 202 514 0420 +1 202 514 0483 Jason.Ruiz@usdoj.gov
Other Parties
No Logo Edgar Veytia, Defendant (1)

Represented by Law Offices of Jeffrey Lichtman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
also known as
Diablo
also known as
Eepp
also known as
Lic Veytia Jeffrey Benson Einhorn +1 212 581 1001 einhorn@jeffreylichtman.com
also known as
Diablo
also known as
Eepp
also known as
Lic Veytia Jeffrey Harris Lichtman +1 212 581 1001 +1 212 581 4999 jhl@jeffreylichtman.com

Represented by Law Offices of Ronis & Ronis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
also known as
Diablo
also known as
Eepp
also known as
Lic Veytia Jan Edward Ronis +1 619 236 8344 +1 619 236 8820 jan@ronisandronis.com
also known as
Diablo
also known as
Eepp
also known as
Lic Veytia Gretchen Christina VonHelms +1 619 239 1199 +1 619 236 8820 gvh@ronisandronis.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (65) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 8/17/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: None Seal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/11/2019, Entered: None Continue Sentencing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Edgar Veytia Time excluded from 12/20/19 until 1/4/19. Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 12/20/2018. (Fernandez, Erica) (Entered: 12/26/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Carol Bagley Amon: Status Conference as to Edgar Veytia held on 12/20/2018. Counsel for parties present. Guilty plea set for 1/4/2019 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 10D South before Judge Carol Bagley Amon. OED cont'd (complex case; ongoing plea discussions) (Court Reporter Lisa Schmid.) (Fernandez, Erica) (Entered: 12/26/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Edgar Veytia Time excluded from 11/27/18 until 1/7/19. Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 11/27/2018. (Fernandez, Erica) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Carol Bagley Amon as to Edgar Veytia (1) . Status Conference as to Edgar Veytia held on 11/27/2018. Atty DiBlasio's application to withdraw as counsel denied. Request to modify motion schedule granted as follows: Dft's motion due 1/7/19; govt's response due 1/21/19. Status Conference set for 1/31/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10D South before Judge Carol Bagley Amon. OED cont'd (ongoing plea discussions; complex case). Status conference set for 12/21/18 at 10:00 AM. (Court Reporter Anthony Mancuso.) (Fernandez, Erica) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Edgar Veytia. (Lichtman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/27/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None notice of attorney appearance - defendant
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jeffrey Benson Einhorn appearing for Edgar Veytia (Einhorn, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/27/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None notice of attorney appearance - defendant
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jeffrey H. Lichtman appearing for Edgar Veytia (Lichtman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/27/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None notice of attorney appearance - USA
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Alicia Nicole Washington appearing for USA. (Washington, Alicia) (Entered: 11/26/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Letter
Letter regarding upcoming status conference as to Edgar Veytia (DeBlasio, Alessandra) (Entered: 11/20/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Edgar Veytia Time excluded from 10/26/18 until 11/27/18. Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 10/26/2018. (Fernandez, Erica) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Carol Bagley Amon: Status Conference as to Edgar Veytia held on 10/26/2018. Dft confirms that he has retained a new lawyer. Jeffrey Lichtman & Jeffrey Einhom relieved by the Court.Atty DeBlasio advised of the 3/18/18 trial date previously set by the Court.Motion schedule set as follows: Dft's motion due 12/7/18; Govt's response due 12/21/18. Status Conference set for 11/27/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10D South before Judge Carol Bagley Amon. OED cont'd (ongoing plea discussions; complex case) (Court Reporter Holly Driscoll.) (Fernandez, Erica) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Alessandra DeBlasio appearing for Edgar Veytia (DeBlasio, Alessandra) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Edgar Veytia Time excluded from 9/26/18 until 10/26/18. Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 9/26/2018. (Fernandez, Erica) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Carol Bagley Amon: Status Conference as to Edgar Veytia held on 9/26/2018. Counsel for parties present. Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 3/18/2019. Further Conference set for 10/26/2018 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 10D South before Judge Carol Bagley Amon. OED cont'd (ongoing plea discussions) (Court Reporter Sophie Nolan.) (Fernandez, Erica) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Edgar Veytia Time excluded from 8/10/18 until 9/26/18. Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 8/10/2018. (Fernandez, Erica) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Carol Bagley Amon: Status Conference as to Edgar Veytia held on 8/10/2018. Counsel for parties present. Further Conference set for 9/26/2018 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 10D South before Judge Carol Bagley Amon. OED cont'd (plea discussions) (Court Reporter Denise Parisi.) (Fernandez, Erica) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Edgar Veytia (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 01/02/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Edgar Veytia Time excluded from 12/11/17 until 1/12/18. Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 12/11/2017. (Fernandez, Erica) (Entered: 12/14/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Carol Bagley Amon: Status Conference as to Edgar Veytia held on 12/11/2017. Counsel for parties present. Court directs govt to provide additional information regarding the timing if the DOJ matters. Further Conference set for 1/12/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10D South before Judge Carol Bagley Amon. OED cont'd (ongoing plea discussions; complex case) (Court Reporter Michele Lucchese.) (Fernandez, Erica) (Entered: 12/14/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Edgar Veytia Time excluded from 9/28/17 until 11/9/17. Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 9/28/17. (Fernandez, Erica) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Carol Bagley Amon: Status Conference as to Edgar Veytia held on 9/28/2017. Counsel for parties present. Further Conference set for 11/9/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10D South before Judge Carol Bagley Amon. OED cont'd (complex case; ongoing plea discussions) (Court Reporter Anthony Frisolone.) (Fernandez, Erica) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Edgar Veytia Time excluded from 8/22/17 until 9/28/17. Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 8/22/2017. (Fernandez, Erica) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Carol Bagley Amon: Status Conference as to Edgar Veytia held on 8/22/2017. Counsel for parties present. Tentative trial date set for 12/11/2017. OED cont'd (ongoing plea discussions/complex case). Further Conference set for 9/28/2017 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10D South before Judge Carol Bagley Amon. (Court Reporter Michele Nardone.) (Fernandez, Erica) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Edgar Veytia held on 4/10/17, before Judge Amon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Angela Grant. Email address: Angela.grant207@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 8/28/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/7/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/6/2017. (Grant, Angela) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None Order to Continue - Ends of Justice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Edgar Veytia Time excluded from 7/27/17 until 8/22/17. Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 7/27/17. (Fernandez, Erica) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None Status Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Carol Bagley Amon: Status Conference as to Edgar Veytia held on 7/27/2017. Counsel for parties present. by next Status Conference set for 8/2/2017 12:00 PM in Courtroom 10D South before Judge Carol Bagley Amon, the parties should update the Court whether deft wants to enter into a disposition or proceed to trial. For the reasons that additional time needed due to ongoing plea negotiations and still designated as complex, time is excluded until the next conference. (Court Reporter Lisa Schmid.) (Fernandez, Erica) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: 7/21/2017 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Ryan C Harris appearing for USA. (Harris, Ryan)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: 7/5/2017 Unknown Document Type
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Request to Adjourn Status Conference by Edgar Veytia. (Lichtman, Jeffrey)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: 6/6/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER of Excludable Delay- Ends of Justice as to Edgar Veytia. Time excluded from 6/5/2017 until 7/6/2017. So Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 6/5/2017. (Almonte, Giselle)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: 6/6/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 20 Motion to Substitute Attorney as to Edgar Veytia (1). IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED, CONSENTED AND AGREED by the undersigned thatJEFFREY LICHTMAN, ESQ., and JEFFREY EINHORN. ESQ., Law Offices of Jeffrey Lichtman, 11 East 44th Street, Suite 501, New York. New York 10017, are substituted as attorneys for defendant EDGAR VEYTIA in place and instead of GRETCHEN VON HELMS. ESQ., Law Offices of Gretchen Von Helms, 105 West F. Street, 3rd Floor, San Diego, California 92101 and JAN RONIS, ESQ., Ronis & Ronis, 105 West F. Street, 3rd Floor. San Diego, California 92101. So Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 6/5/2017. (Almonte, Giselle)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Status Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Carol Bagley Amon: Status Conference as to Edgar Veytia held on 6/5/2017. Counsel to all parties present. Stipulation of substitution of counsel approved in open court. Conference held. Govt Ordered to produce discovery. OED cont'd (new counsel; awaiting discovery; complex; plea discussions). Further Conference set for 7/6/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10D South before Judge Carol Bagley Amon. (Court Reporter Georgette Betts.) (Almonte, Giselle) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: 5/16/2017 Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Edgar Veytia. (Lichtman, Jeffrey)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: 5/16/2017 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jeffrey H. Lichtman appearing for Edgar Veytia (Lichtman, Jeffrey)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: 5/16/2017 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jeffrey Benson Einhorn appearing for Edgar Veytia (Einhorn, Jeffrey)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: 4/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-9447659. by Edgar Veytia. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Motion, # 2 Affidavit) (Ronis, Jan)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/10/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Edgar Veytia Time excluded from 4/10/17 until 6/5/17. Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 4/10/2017. (Fernandez, Erica)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/10/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Carol Bagley Amon:granting 14 Motion for Leave to Appear The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at the NYEDs homepage. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office as to Edgar Veytia (1); Status Conference as to Edgar Veytia held on 4/10/2017; Counsel for parties present. Further Conference set for 6/5/2017 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10D South before Judge Carol Bagley Amon. (Court Reporter Angela Grant.) (Fernandez, Erica)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/10/2017 Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-9436007. by Edgar Veytia. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Motion, # 2 Affidavit) (von Helms, Gretchen)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Medical Evaluation Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Medical Evaluation Order as to Edgar Veytia. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 4//2017. (McMorrow, Karen) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Order to Continue - Ends of Justice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Edgar Veytia Time excluded from 4/8/2017 until 4/12/2017.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 4/08/2017. (McMorrow, Karen) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Order of Detention
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Edgar Veytia. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 4/08/2017. (McMorrow, Karen) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Telephone Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown by Telephone Conference :Arraignment, Initial Appearance and Detention Hearing as to Edgar Veytia held on 4/8/2017. Defendant present in custody with retained counsel Gretchen Von Helms and AUSA Craig Heeren and Michael Robotti, Spanish Interpreter Jordan Fox present on standby. Not Guilty Plea entered by Edgar Veytia (1) Count 1,2,3. Order of detention entered. Order of Excludable delay entered. Defendant remains in custody. (Tape #10:28-10:39.) (McMorrow, Karen) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: 3/31/2017 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Michael P. Robotti appearing for USA. (Robotti, Michael)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: 3/31/2017 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Michael P. Robotti appearing for USA. (Robotti, Michael)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: 3/30/2017 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Craig R. Heeren appearing for USA. (Heeren, Craig)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: 3/30/2017 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Michael P. Robotti appearing for USA. (Robotti, Michael)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: 3/28/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Order that the above matter, and associated indictment, be unsealed as to Edgar Veytia.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 3/28/2017. (Piper, Francine)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED INDICTMENT as to Edgar Veytia (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3. (Attachments: # 1 Criminal Information Sheet, # 2 Sealing Cover Sheet) (Piper, Francine) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER as to Edgar Veytia re 64 Letter: This case shall remain on the calendar for conference on 11/27/18 at 10:00 as previously scheduled. So Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 11/26/2018. (Holley, Vanessa)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Attorney update in case as to Edgar Veytia. Attorney Jeffrey Benson Einhorn and Jeffrey H. Lichtman terminated. (Fernandez, Erica)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF TIME CHANGE as to Edgar Veytia: Please be advised that the time of the Status Conference set for 8/22/2017 has changed to 11:00 AM in Courtroom 10D South before Judge Carol Bagley Amon. (Holley, Vanessa)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER GRANTING 25 Motion for Extension of Time to File as to Edgar Veytia: Status Conference adjourned to 7/27/17 at 11:00. Speedy Trial time excluded on consent of defendant until above conference, based on ongoing plea negotiations & complexity of case. So Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 7/5/2017. (Holley, Vanessa)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Arrest of Edgar Veytia (McMorrow, Karen)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE as to Edgar Veytia. Reassigned to Judge Carol Bagley Amon. Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 3/29/2017. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 28 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?