Jahanforuz, et al v. Detection Systems, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Western District Court, Case No. 6:98-cv-06068
District Judge Charles J. Siragusa, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 31, 2017 at 9:36 AM EDT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Behzad Jahanforuz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sanford R. Shapiro +1 585 238 9066 getshapiro@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Berger & Montague PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd Stowe Collins , +1 215 875 3000 +1 215 875 5715 tcollins@bm.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Levy & Levy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Morris J. Levy +1 516 829 4500

Toggle Switch Represented by The Olsen Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kurt Olsen +1 202 663 9331
No Logo Tom Yuan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sugarman Law Firm, Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy Perry +1 315 474 2943 +1 315 474 0235 tperry@sugarmanlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Jaffe +1 212 545 4606 +1 212 545 4653 jaffe@whafh.com
v.
No Logo David B. Lederer, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brobeck, Phleger & Harrison LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Francis S. Chlapowski +1 212 237 2592 +5867 586 586 7878
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence Elliott Fenster +1 212 581 1600

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carolyn G. Nussbaum +1 585 263 1558 cnussbaum@nixonpeabody.com
No Logo Detection Systems, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brobeck, Phleger & Harrison LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Francis S. Chlapowski +1 212 237 2592 +5867 586 586 7878
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence Elliott Fenster +1 212 581 1600

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carolyn G. Nussbaum +1 585 263 1558 cnussbaum@nixonpeabody.com
No Logo Frank J. Ryan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brobeck, Phleger & Harrison LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Francis S. Chlapowski +1 212 237 2592 +5867 586 586 7878
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence Elliott Fenster +1 212 581 1600

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carolyn G. Nussbaum +1 585 263 1558 cnussbaum@nixonpeabody.com
No Logo Karl H. Kostusiak, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brobeck, Phleger & Harrison LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Francis S. Chlapowski +1 212 237 2592 +5867 586 586 7878
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence Elliott Fenster +1 212 581 1600

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carolyn G. Nussbaum +1 585 263 1558 cnussbaum@nixonpeabody.com
No Logo Lawrence R. Tracy, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brobeck, Phleger & Harrison LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Francis S. Chlapowski +1 212 237 2592 +5867 586 586 7878
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence Elliott Fenster +1 212 581 1600

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carolyn G. Nussbaum +1 585 263 1558 cnussbaum@nixonpeabody.com
No Logo Agostino Bellocco, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Trevett, Cristo, Salzer & Andolina PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew J. Fusco +1 585 454 2181 mfusco@trevettlaw.com
No Logo Alfred C. Keller, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dynamotion Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Murray +1 212 682 1818

Toggle Switch Represented by Leo W Desmond

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leo W Desmond

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven H Schulman +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229

Toggle Switch Represented by Rabin & Peckel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph V. McBride
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED I. Stephen Rabin +1 212 682 1818

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo Esq. Sandy Shapiro, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sanford R. Shapiro +1 585 238 9066 getshapiro@aol.com
No Logo Merrill Miller, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dynamotion Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Murray +1 212 682 1818

Toggle Switch Represented by Leo W Desmond

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leo W Desmond

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven H Schulman +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229

Toggle Switch Represented by Rabin & Peckel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph V. McBride
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED I. Stephen Rabin +1 212 682 1818

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo Perry Ecksel, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sanford R. Shapiro +1 585 238 9066 getshapiro@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew L. Barroway +1 610 667 7056 + 610 667 7056
No Logo Robert M. Segil, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1500

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven E. Cole +1 585 327 4100 +1 585 327 4200 scole@leclairkorona.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Wolford Law Firm LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael R. Wolford +1 585 325 8008 +1 585 325 8009 mwolford@wolfordfirm.com
No Logo Tom Yuan, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sugarman Law Firm, Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy Perry +1 315 474 2943 +1 315 474 0235 tperry@sugarmanlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Jaffe +1 212 545 4606 +1 212 545 4653 jaffe@whafh.com
Raymond James & Associates Inc. Raymond James & Associates Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Conrad Kenneth Harper +1 212 455 2760

Toggle Switch Represented by Woods Oviatt Gilman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony R. Palermo +1 585 987 2800 +1 585 454 3968 arp@woodsoviatt.com
Citation Section 12 U.S.C. § 22
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER APPROVING DONATION OF REMAINING FUNDS IN SETTLEMENT FUND granting 36 Motion that the $2,857.21 remaining the Settlement Fund shall be donated to the United Way of Greater Rochester, located at 75 College Avenue, Rochester, New YOrk 14607. . Signed by Judge Charles J. Siragusa on 2/26/07. (KAR, ) (Entered: 02/26/2007)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    MOTION Motion for Approval to Donate Remaining Funds in Settlement Fund by Sandy Shapiro. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit # 2 Proposed Order# 3 Certificate of Service)(Shapiro, Sanford) (Entered: 06/29/2006)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/4/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      ORDER, for Distribution of Class Funds ( signed by USDJ Charles J. Siragusa ) Notice and copy of order sent to Anthony R. Palermo, Conrad K. Harper, Samuel H. Rudman, Steven G. Schulman, Leo W. Desmond, I. Stephen Rabin, Joseph V. McBride, Brian Murray, Matthew J. Fusco, Michael Wolford, Steven E. Cole, Timothy J. Perry, Michael Jaffe, Andrew L. Barroway, Sanford R. Shapiro, Francis S. Chlapowski, Lawrence Elliott Fenster, Carolyn G. Nussbaum, Morris J. Levy, Kurt Olsen, Todd S. Collins (BJB) (Entered: 10/10/2001)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/1/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        AFFIDAVIT by Shandarese Garr on behalf of Behzad Jahanforuz Re: [32-1] motion for distribution of Class Funds by Behzad Jahanforuz (BJB) (Entered: 08/02/2001)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/1/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          AFFIDAVIT by Karin E. Fisch on behalf of Behzad Jahanforuz in support of [32-1] motion for distribution of Class Funds by Behzad Jahanforuz (BJB) (Entered: 08/02/2001)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/1/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            MOTION by Behzad Jahanforuz for distribution of Class Funds Court to set return date (BJB) (Entered: 08/02/2001)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/28/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              ORDER AND JUDGMENT of Settlement ( signed by USDJ Charles J. Siragusa ). Notice and copy of judgment sent to Anthony R. Palermo, Conrad K. Harper, Samuel H. Rudman, Steven G. Schulman, Leo W. Desmond, I. Stephen Rabin, Joseph V. McBride, Brian Murray, Matthew J. Fusco, Michael Wolford, Steven E. Cole, Timothy J. Perry, Michael Jaffe, Andrew L. Barroway, Sanford R. Shapiro, Francis S. Chlapowski, Lawrence Elliott Fenster, Carolyn G. Nussbaum, Morris J. Levy, Kurt Olsen, Todd S. Collins (BJB) Modified on 11/29/2000 (Entered: 11/29/2000)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/28/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ORDER, approving Certification of Class , and approving the settlement of the action ( signed by USDJ Charles J. Siragusa ) Notice and copy of order sent to Anthony R. Palermo, Conrad K. Harper, Samuel H. Rudman, Steven G. Schulman, Leo W. Desmond, I. Stephen Rabin, Joseph V. McBride, Brian Murray, Matthew J. Fusco, Michael Wolford, Steven E. Cole, Timothy J. Perry, Michael Jaffe, Andrew L. Barroway, Sanford R. Shapiro, Francis S. Chlapowski, Lawrence Elliott Fenster, Carolyn G. Nussbaum, Morris J. Levy, Kurt Olsen, Todd S. Collins (BJB) (Entered: 11/29/2000)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/2/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  STIPULATION AND SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT (BJB) (Entered: 11/02/2000)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/31/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    ORDER, granting plaintiffs request to file a memeorandum in excess of the 25 page limit of the Local Rules ( signed by USDJ Charles J. Siragusa ) Notice and copy of order sent to Anthony R. Palermo, Conrad K. Harper, Samuel H. Rudman, Steven G. Schulman, Leo W. Desmond, I. Stephen Rabin, Joseph V. McBride, Brian Murray, Matthew J. Fusco, Michael Wolford, Steven E. Cole, Timothy J. Perry, Michael Jaffe, Andrew L. Barroway, Sanford R. Shapiro, Francis S. Chlapowski, Lawrence Elliott Fenster, Carolyn G. Nussbaum, Morris J. Levy, Kurt Olsen, Todd S. Collins (BJB) (Entered: 10/31/2000)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/31/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      COMPENDIUM OF AFFIDAVITS by Behzad Jahanforuz, Tom Yuan, Perry Ecksel, Tom Yuan, Robert M. Segil, Agostino Bellocco, Alfred C. Keller, Merrill Miller in support of [26-1] support memorandum by consolidated plai, consolidated plai, plaintiff, consolidated plai, plaintiff, plaintiff (BJB) (Entered: 10/31/2000)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/31/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        MEMORANDUM by Behzad Jahanforuz, Tom Yuan, Perry Ecksel, Tom Yuan, Robert M. Segil, Agostino Bellocco, Alfred C. Keller, Merrill Miller, Raymond James in support of Final Approval of the Proposed Settlement, Plan of Allocation and Joint Application for award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses (BJB) (Entered: 10/31/2000)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/23/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          ORDER, to Certify Class , and for Settlement ( signed by USDJ Charles J. Siragusa ) Notice and copy of order sent to Conrad K. Harper, Samuel H. Rudman, Steven G. Schulman, Leo W. Desmond, I. Stephen Rabin, Joseph V. McBride, Brian Murray, Matthew J. Fusco, Michael Wolford, Steven E. Cole, Timothy J. Perry, Michael Jaffe, Andrew L. Barroway Esq., Sanford R. Shapiro, Francis S. Chlapowski, Lawrence Elliott Fenster, Carolyn G. Nussbaum, Morris J. Levy, Kurt Olsen, Todd S. Collins (BJB) (Entered: 08/24/2000)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/9/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            STIPULATION and ORDER, set stipulation of Settlement for 8/11/00 signed by USDJ Charles J. Siragusa Notice and copy of order sent to Conrad K. Harper, Samuel H. Rudman, Steven G. Schulman, Leo W. Desmond, I. Stephen Rabin, Joseph V. McBride, Brian Murray, Matthew J. Fusco, Michael Wolford, Steven E. Cole, Timothy J. Perry, Michael Jaffe, Andrew L. Barroway Esq., Sanford R. Shapiro, Francis S. Chlapowski, Lawrence Elliott Fenster, Carolyn G. Nussbaum, Morris J. Levy, Kurt Olsen, Todd S. Collins . (TO) (Entered: 08/10/2000)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/2/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              ORDER, Response due 7/28/00 RE: Stipulation of Settlement ( signed by USDJ Charles J. Siragusa ) Notice and copy of order sent to Conrad K. Harper, Samuel H. Rudman, Steven G. Schulman, Leo W. Desmond, I. Stephen Rabin, Joseph V. McBride, Brian Murray, Matthew J. Fusco, Michael Wolford, Steven E. Cole, Timothy J. Perry, Michael Jaffe, Andrew L. Barroway Esq., Sanford Shapiro, Francis S. Chlapowski, Lawrence Elliott Fenster, Carolyn G. Nussbaum, Morris J. Levy, Kurt Olsen, Todd S. Collins (BJB) (Entered: 08/03/2000)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/7/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                ORDER, directing that motions filed (documents #9,11) in 98-cv-6068, a motion filed in 98-cv-6087 (document #3), a motion filed in 98-cv-6090 (document #6), a motion filed in 98-cv-6099 (document #3), a motion filed in 98-cv-6185 (document #2), and the above actions having been consolidated with 98-cv-6068 being the lead action, and the parties having agreed to resolve these motions, the above motions are hereby denied as moot , and the Clerk of Court is directed to update the above cases by terminating those motions so that there are no pending motions in any of the above actions ( signed by USDJ Charles J. Siragusa ) Notice and copy of order sent to Matthew J. Fusco, Michael Wolford, Steven E. Cole, Timothy J. Perry, Michael Jaffe, Andrew L. Barroway Esq., Sanford R. Shapiro, Francis S. Chlapowski, Lawrence Elliott Fenster, Carolyn G. Nussbaum, Morris J. Levy, Kurt Olsen, Todd S. Collins (BJB) (Entered: 04/07/2000)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/10/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  STIPULATION and ORDER, Response due 6/5/00 RE: Stipulation of Settlement and related exhibits deadline signed by USDJ Charles J. Siragusa . Notice and copy of order sent to Andrew L. Barroway Esq., Sanford R. Shapiro, Michael Jaffe, Timothy J. Perry, Steven E. Cole, Michael Wolford, Francis S. Chlapowski, Lawrence Elliott Fenster, Carolyn G. Nussbaum, Morris J. Levy, Kurt Olsen, Todd S. Collins . (BJB) (Entered: 03/13/2000)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/1/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    STIPULATION and ORDER, Memorandum of Understanding deadline set to 3/8/00 signed by USDJ Charles J. Siragusa . Notice and copy of order sent to Andrew L. Barroway Esq., Sanford R. Shapiro, Michael Jaffe, Timothy J. Perry, Steven E. Cole, Michael Wolford, Francis S. Chlapowski, Lawrence Elliott Fenster, Carolyn G. Nussbaum, Morris J. Levy, Kurt Olsen, Todd S. Collins . (BJB) (Entered: 03/02/2000)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/29/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      STIPULATION and ORDER, Response due 2/25/00 RE: Memorandum of Understanding signed by USDJ Charles J. Siragusa . Notice and copy of order sent to Andrew L. Barroway Esq., Sanford R. Shapiro, Michael Jaffe, Timothy J. Perry, Steven E. Cole, Michael Wolford, Francis S. Chlapowski, Lawrence Elliott Fenster, Carolyn G. Nussbaum, Morris J. Levy, Kurt Olsen, Todd S. Collins . (BJB) (Entered: 02/29/2000)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/16/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        ORDER, RE: Settlement ( signed by USDJ Charles J. Siragusa ) Notice and copy of order sent to Andrew L. Barroway Esq., Sanford R. Shapiro, Michael Jaffe, Timothy J. Perry, Steven E. Cole, Michael Wolford, Francis S. Chlapowski, Lawrence Elliott Fenster, Carolyn G. Nussbaum, Morris J. Levy, Kurt Olsen, Todd S. Collins (BJB) (Entered: 02/16/2000)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/17/1999, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          ORDER, Response due 1/21/00 RE: Consolidated Complaint ( signed by USDJ Charles J. Siragusa ) Notice and copy of order sent to Andrew L. Barroway Esq., Sanford R. Shapiro, Michael Jaffe, Timothy J. Perry, Steven E. Cole, Michael Wolford, Francis S. Chlapowski, Lawrence Elliott Fenster, Carolyn G. Nussbaum, Morris J. Levy, Kurt Olsen, Todd S. Collins (BJB) (Entered: 12/20/1999)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/17/1999, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            NOTICE of Firm name change by Schiffrin & Craig, Ltd. New firm name is Schifrin & Barroway, LLP (BJB) Modified on 12/02/1999 (Entered: 12/02/1999)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/22/1999, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              STIPULATION and ORDER, to Consolidate Cases: Lead = 98-CV-6068, Memebers = 98-CV-6087, 98-CV-6090, 98-CV-6099, 98-CV-6185 signed by USDJ Charles J. Siragusa . Notice and copy of order sent to Steven E. Cole, Michael Wolford, Francis S. Chlapowski, Lawrence Elliott Fenster, Carolyn G. Nussbaum, Morris J. Levy, Kurt Olsen, Todd S. Collins, Sanford R. Shapiro . (BJB) Modified on 04/07/2000 (Entered: 10/25/1999)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/1/1998, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                NOTICE of attorney appearance for Detection Systems, Karl H. Kostusiak, David B. Lederer, Lawrence R. Tracy, Frank J. Ryan by Carolyn G. Nussbaum (BJB) (Entered: 05/04/1998)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/27/1998, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  AFFIDAVIT by Steven E. Cole on behalf of Robert M. Segil in support of [11-1] motion for appointment as lead plaintiff and for approval of selection of lead counsel by Robert M. Segil (Robert Segil associated with 98-CV-6185) (BJB) (Entered: 04/29/1998)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/27/1998, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    MEMORANDUM by Robert M. Segil in support of [11-1] motion for appointment as lead plaintiff and for approval of selection of lead counsel by Robert M. Segil (Robert Segil associated with 98-CV-6068) (BJB) (Entered: 04/29/1998)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/27/1998, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      MOTION by Robert M. Segil for appointment as lead plaintiff and for approval of selection of lead counsel Court to set return date. (Robert Segil associated with 98-CV-6185) (BJB) (Entered: 04/29/1998)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/27/1998, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        MEMORANDUM by Behzad Jahanforuz in support of [9-1] motion to Consolidate Cases by Behzad Jahanforuz, [9-2] motion to be appointed lead plaintiffs by Behzad Jahanforuz, [9-3] motion for approval of the proposed lead plaintiffs' selection of co-lead counsel, executive committee, and co-liaison counsel by Behzad Jahanforuz (BJB) (Entered: 04/28/1998)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/27/1998, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          MOTION by Behzad Jahanforuz to Consolidate Cases , and to be appointed lead plaintiffs , and for approval of the proposed lead plaintiffs' selection of co-lead counsel, executive committee, and co-liaison counsel Court to set return date (BJB) (Entered: 04/28/1998)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/6/1998, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Lawrence R. Tracy . Request mailed on 3/21/98 . Answer due on 5/20/98 for Lawrence R. Tracy (BJB) (Entered: 04/06/1998)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/16/1998, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              EX PARTE ORDER granting [6-1] motion for Todd S. Collins and Kurt Olsen to Appear Pro Hac Vice upon payment of the requisite fee ( signed by USDJ Charles J. Siragusa ) Notice and copy of order sent to Morris J. Levy, Kurt Olsen, Todd S. Collins, Sanford R. Shapiro (BJB) (Entered: 03/18/1998)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/16/1998, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                MOTION by Behzad Jahanforuz for Todd S. Collins and Kurt Olsen to Appear Pro Hac Vice (BJB) (Entered: 03/18/1998)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/4/1998, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Frank J. Ryan 2/27/98 Answer due on 3/19/98 for Frank J. Ryan [0-0] summons, [1-1] complaint (BJB) (Entered: 03/17/1998)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/4/1998, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Karl H. Kostusiak 2/27/98 Answer due on 3/19/98 for Karl H. Kostusiak [0-0] summons, [1-1] complaint (BJB) (Entered: 03/17/1998)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/4/1998, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Frank J. Ryan 2/27/98 Answer due on 3/19/98 for Frank J. Ryan [0-0] summons, [1-1] complaint (BJB) Modified on 03/17/1998 (Entered: 03/17/1998)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/4/1998, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to David B. Lederer 2/27/98 Answer due on 3/19/98 for David B. Lederer [0-0] summons, [1-1] complaint (BJB) (Entered: 03/17/1998)
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/26/1998, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 57528 (BJB) (Entered: 02/27/1998)
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 16 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?