ZAIDAN v. TRUMP
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-00581

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 30, 2021 at 1:40 PM DT (2.5 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo AHMAD MUAFFAQ ZAIDAN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LEWIS BAACH PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tara Jordan Plochocki +1 202 833 8900 tara.plochocki@lewisbaach.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey D. Robinson +1 202 833 8900 jeffrey.robinson@lewisbaach.com
No Logo BILAL ABDUL KAREEM, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LEWIS BAACH PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tara Jordan Plochocki +1 202 833 8900 tara.plochocki@lewisbaach.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey D. Robinson +1 202 833 8900 jeffrey.robinson@lewisbaach.com
v.
United States Central Intelligence Agency United States Central Intelligence Agency, Defendant
Officially listed as "CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY"
No Logo DAN COATS, Defendant
United States Department of Defense United States Department of Defense, Defendant
Officially listed as "DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE"
United States Department of Homeland Security United States Department of Homeland Security, Defendant
Officially listed as "DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY"
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant
Officially listed as "DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE"
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Defendant
Officially listed as "DONALD J. TRUMP"
Unknown Role, Riviera Holdings Corp
No Logo HERBERT RAYMOND MCMASTER, Defendant
No Logo JAMES MATTIS, Defendant
Sessions, Jefferson Beauregard, III Sessions, Jefferson Beauregard, III, Defendant
Officially listed as "JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III"
United States Department of Justice Attorney General, United States Department of Justice, February 9, 2017 - November 7, 2018
United States of America Attorney General, United States of America, February 9, 2017 - November 7, 2018
No Logo JOHN F. KELLY, Defendant
Pompeo, Michael Richard Pompeo, Michael Richard, Defendant
Officially listed as "MICHAEL RICHARD POMPEO"
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 551
Nature of Suit 899 - Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
  Entries (53) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: None USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: None Transcript
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: None Proposed Briefing Schedule
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/30/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/30/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: 1/2/2019 Unknown Document Type
                        Unopposed MOTION to Stay Defendants' January 9, 2019 Filing Deadline In Light of Lapse of Appropriations by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DAN COATS, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, JOHN F. KELLY, JAMES MATTIS, HERBERT RAYMOND MCMASTER, MICHAEL RICHARD POMPEO, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Kathryn)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: 12/18/2018 Unknown Document Type
                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with the Court's September 18, 2018 Minute Order by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DAN COATS, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, JOHN F. KELLY, JAMES MATTIS, HERBERT RAYMOND MCMASTER, MICHAEL RICHARD POMPEO, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Kathryn)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: 11/14/2018 Unknown Document Type
                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with the Court's September 18, 2018 Minute Order by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DAN COATS, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, JOHN F. KELLY, JAMES MATTIS, HERBERT RAYMOND MCMASTER, MICHAEL RICHARD POMPEO, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Kathryn)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: 10/22/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer held on 09/18/18; Page Numbers: 1-23. Date of Issuance:10/22/18. Court Reporter/Transcriber Crystal M. Pilgrim, Telephone number 202.354.3127, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 11/12/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/22/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/20/2019.(Pilgrim, Crystal)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: 8/29/2018 Notice of change of address
                                NOTICE of Change of Address by Tara Jordan Plochocki (Plochocki, Tara)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: 8/17/2018 Continue
                                  Joint MOTION to Continue August 28, 2018 Status Conference by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DAN COATS, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, JOHN F. KELLY, JAMES MATTIS, HERBERT RAYMOND MCMASTER, MICHAEL RICHARD POMPEO, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Davis, Kathryn)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: 8/17/2018 Notice of appearance
                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Celia Davis on behalf of All Defendants (Davis, Kathryn)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: 7/11/2018 Answer
                                      ANSWER to Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, JAMES MATTIS, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Elliott, Stephen)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: 6/20/2018 Extension of Time to File Answer
                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DAN COATS, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, JAMES MATTIS, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Elliott, Stephen)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: 6/13/2018 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting in part and denying in part 8 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. All Counts as to Mr. Zaidan are dismissed. Counts One, Two, and Three as to Mr. Kareem as dismissed. Donald J. Trump is dismissed as a Defendant. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 6/13/2018. (DAS)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: 6/13/2018 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                            MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 6/13/2018. (DAS)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: 5/14/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                              TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer held on May 1, 2018; Page Numbers: 1-53. Date of Issuance: May 4, 2018. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 6/4/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/14/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/12/2018.(Dickman, Janice)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: 7/25/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                REPLY to opposition to motion re 8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DAN COATS, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, JOHN F. KELLY, JAMES MATTIS, HERBERT RAYMOND MCMASTER, MICHAEL RICHARD POMPEO, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Elliott, Stephen)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: 7/11/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                  Memorandum in opposition to re 8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by BILAL ABDUL KAREEM, AHMAD MUAFFAQ ZAIDAN. (Robinson, Jeffrey)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: 6/12/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                    Joint MOTION to Modify the Briefing Schedule by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DAN COATS, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, JOHN F. KELLY, JAMES MATTIS, HERBERT RAYMOND MCMASTER, MICHAEL RICHARD POMPEO, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Elliott, Stephen)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: 6/5/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                      MOTION to Dismiss by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DAN COATS, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, JOHN F. KELLY, JAMES MATTIS, HERBERT RAYMOND MCMASTER, MICHAEL RICHARD POMPEO, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Elliott, Stephen)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: 4/7/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                      NOTICE of Name Change from Lewis Baach PLLC to Lewis Baach Kaufmann Middlemiss PLLC by BILAL ABDUL KAREEM, AHMAD MUAFFAQ ZAIDAN (Robinson, Jeffrey)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: 4/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/5/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/4/2017. (Robinson, Jeffrey)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: 4/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/5/2017. (Robinson, Jeffrey)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: 4/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY served on 4/5/2017; DAN COATS served on 4/5/2017; DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 4/4/2017; DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 4/4/2017; DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 4/4/2017; JOHN F. KELLY served on 4/4/2017; JAMES MATTIS served on 4/4/2017; HERBERT RAYMOND MCMASTER served on 4/5/2017; MICHAEL RICHARD POMPEO served on 4/5/2017; JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III served on 4/5/2017; DONALD J. TRUMP served on 4/5/2017 (Robinson, Jeffrey)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: 3/31/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                              SUMMONS (12) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. (Attachment: # 1 Consent Forms)(jd)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: 3/30/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Tara Jordan Plochocki on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Plochocki, Tara)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: 3/30/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                  COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4895259) filed by BILAL ABDUL KAREEM, AHMAD MUAFFAQ ZAIDAN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons DONALD J. TRUMP, # 3 Summons MICHAEL RICHARD POMPEO,, # 4 Summons JAMES MATTIS, # 5 Summons JOHN F. KELLY, # 6 Summons JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, # 7 Summons DAN COATS, # 8 Summons HERBERT RAYMOND (H.R.) MCMASTER, # 9 Summons UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, # 10 Summons UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, # 11 Summons UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, # 12 Summons CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, # 13 Summons UNITED STATES OF AMERICA)(Robinson, Jeffrey)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  MINUTE ORDER denying 23 Motion to Stay and instead granting a three-week extension of the deadline for Defendants' motion to dismiss or notice of intent not to file such motion. The motion or notice shall be filed no later than January 24, 2019. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 1/3/2019. (lcrmc1)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  MINUTE ORDER granting 22 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall file the proposed Motion to Dismiss, or a notice of intent not to file a motion to dismiss, no later than January 9, 2019. The parties shall submit a joint proposed briefing schedule for the opposition and reply no later than January 18, 2019. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 12/18/2018. (DAS)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendants' proposed Motion to Dismiss or a notice of intent due by 1/9/2019. Joint proposed briefing schedule due by 1/18/2019. (zcdw)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      MINUTE ORDER granting 21 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall file the proposed Motion to Dismiss, or a notice of intent not to file a motion to dismiss, no later than December 19, 2018. The parties shall submit a joint proposed briefing schedule for the opposition and reply no later than December 28, 2018. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 11/14/2018. (DAS)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        MINUTE ORDER requiring Defendants to file the proposed Motion to Dismiss, or a notice of intent not to file a motion to dismiss, no later than November 19, 2018. The parties shall submit a joint proposed briefing schedule for the opposition and reply no later than November 28, 2018. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 9/18/2018. (DAS)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer: Status Conference held on 9/18/2018. (Court Reporter: Crystal Pilgrim) (zcdw)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or notice of intent due by 11/19/2018. Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 11/28/2018. (zcdw)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              MINUTE ORDER granting 18 Motion to Continue Status Conference. The August 28th status conference in this case is reset for September 18, 2018 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 8/17/2018. (DAS)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference reset for 9/18/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (zcdw)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer: Status Conference held on 7/18/2018. A further Status Conference set for 8/28/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 8 before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (Court Reporter: Crystal Pilgrim) (zcdw)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. All Defendants shall answer no later than July 11, 2018. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 6/20/2018. (DAS)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Answer due by 7/11/2018. (zcdw)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 6/18/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (DAS)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference reset for 7/18/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (DAS)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer: Motion Hearing held on 5/1/2018 re 8 Motion to Dismiss. Motion heard and taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: Janice Dickman) (zcdw)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 5/1/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (DAS)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Motion to Modify Briefing Schedule. Plaintiffs shall file their opposition to Defendants' motion to dismiss no later than July 11, 2017. Defendants shall file their reply no later than July 25, 2017. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 6/13/2017. (DAS)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Dismiss due by 7/11/2017. Defendants Reply due by 7/25/2017. (mac)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    Case Assigned to Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (jd)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 88 times.

                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                       
                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                      Need Password Help?