Misakyants v. Letarte Retail LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-02326

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 11:13 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Michelle Misakyants, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Serrins Fisher

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Taubenfeld +1 212 571 0700 +1 212 505 2001 michael@fishertaubenfeld.com
v.
No Logo ADP Totalsource I, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Daniel Bryan +1 914 482 3544 john.bryan@jacksonlewis.com
Space Joseph Michael Martin +1 914 514 6116 +1 914 328 1882 martinj@jacksonlewis.com
No Logo ADP Total Source, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Daniel Bryan +1 914 482 3544 john.bryan@jacksonlewis.com
Space Joseph Michael Martin +1 914 514 6116 +1 914 328 1882 martinj@jacksonlewis.com
No Logo Letarte Retail LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Littler Mendelson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Theo E.M. Gould +1 212 583 9600 +1 212 832 2719 tgould@littler.com
Space Ivie A. Guobadia +1 212 980 9600 +1 212 980 9291 IGuobadia@littler.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 201
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court having been notified that this action has settled, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed with prejudice and without costs; provided, however, that within 30 days of the date of this Order any party may reinstate this action in writing if the settlement has not been effectuated by then. The conference scheduled for December 20, 2017, is cancelled. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 11/8/2017) (js) (Entered: 11/08/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: A settlement conference is scheduled before Magistrate Judge Barbara Moses on November 7, 2017, at 2:15 p.m., in Courtroom 9A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. (As further set forth in this Order.) Neither the scheduling of a settlement conference nor any adjournment affects the parties' other litigation deadlines or obligations. (Settlement Conference set for 11/7/2017 at 02:15 PM in Courtroom 9A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 10/19/2017) (cf) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 10/12/2017) (rjm) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER granting 25 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Michael Taubenfeld dated October 11, 2017. Document filed by Michelle Misakyants. Last date for discovery extended to December 11, 2017. Order of reference to Judge Moses for settlement to be entered. Pretrial conference adjourned from 10/27 until December 20, 2017 at 2p.m. No further extensions. So ordered. (Discovery due by 12/11/2017). (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 10/12/2017) (rjm) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Michael Taubenfeld dated October 11, 2017. Document filed by Michelle Misakyants.(Taubenfeld, Michael) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY, PROTECTIVE AND FRE 502(D) AND (E) CLAWBACK ORDER:...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...This Order may be amended for good cause shown. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 9/18/2017) (ap) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ORDER: A pretrial conference having been held today, with counsel for all parties present, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The last day for completion of discovery is extended to October 27, 2017; 2. There will be a pretrial conference on October 27, 2017, at 2:30 p.m.; and 3. There will be no further extensions of the discovery deadline. SO ORDERED., ( Discovery due by 10/27/2017., Pretrial Conference set for 10/27/2017 at 02:30 PM before Judge Sidney H. Stein.) (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 7/27/2017) (ama) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Joseph M. Martin dated 07/26/2017. Document filed by ADP Totalsource I, Inc., ADP Totalsource, Inc..(Martin, Joseph) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Ivie A. Guobadia on behalf of Letarte Retail LLC. New Address: Littler Mendelson, P.C., 900 Third Avenue, New York, New York, United States of America 10022, 212-583-9600. (Guobadia, Ivie) (Entered: 06/08/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ORDER FOR MEDIATION: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is referred for mediation to the Court-annexed Mediation Program. The parties are notified that Local Rule 83.9 shall govern the mediation and are directed to participate in the mediation in good faith. The mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling Order issued by this Court. SO ORDERED. ALL ISSUES ARE ELIGIBLE. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 6/9/2017. Mediator Expertise Request due by 6/5/2017. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 5/30/2017) (ama) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ORDER: A pretrial conference having been held today, with counsel for all parties present, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Initial disclosures pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P 26(a) are due on or before June 9, 2017; Discovery due by 9/29/2017., Status Conference set for 7/27/2017 at 02:00 PM before Judge Sidney H. Stein., This action is being referred to the Court-annexed Mediation Program. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 5/30/2017) (ama) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        ANSWER to 1 Complaint. Document filed by Letarte Retail LLC.(Gould, Theo) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Letarte Retail LLC.(Gould, Theo) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            ANSWER to 1 Complaint. Document filed by ADP Totalsource I, Inc., ADP Totalsource, Inc..(Martin, Joseph) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Automatic Data Processing, Inc. for ADP Totalsource I, Inc.. Document filed by ADP Totalsource I, Inc..(Martin, Joseph) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Automatic Data Processing, Inc. for ADP Totalsource, Inc.. Document filed by ADP Totalsource, Inc..(Martin, Joseph) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  ORDER: granting 9 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The conference is adjourned to May 30, 2017, at 2:15 p.m. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 5/30/2017 at 02:15 PM before Judge Sidney H. Stein. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 5/04/2017) (ama) (Entered: 05/04/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Daniel Bryan on behalf of ADP Totalsource I, Inc., ADP Totalsource, Inc.. (Bryan, John) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Michael Martin on behalf of ADP Totalsource I, Inc., ADP Totalsource, Inc.. (Martin, Joseph) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for May 10, 2017 to a date after May 26, 2017 addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Ivie A. Guobadia dated May 1, 2017. Document filed by Letarte Retail LLC.(Guobadia, Ivie) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ivie A. Guobadia on behalf of Letarte Retail LLC. (Guobadia, Ivie) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Theo E. M. Gould on behalf of Letarte Retail LLC. (Gould, Theo) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER: Defendants' ADP TotalSource, Inc. and ADP TotalSource I, Inc. time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint in the above-captioned action shall be and hereby is extended from April 27, 2017 to and including May 26, 2017. Conference remain at May 10, 2017 at 3 pm. SO ORDERED., ADP Totalsource I, Inc. answer due 5/26/2017; ADP Totalsource, Inc. answer due 5/26/2017. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 4/28/2017) (ama) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Counsel are directed to appear in Courtroom 23A on May 10, 2017, at 3:00 p.m. for an initial pretrial conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16. At that time, counsel for all parties must appear prepared to discuss the progress of the case and the scheduling of discovery proceedings, any dispositive motions, the feasibility of settlement or alternative dispute resolution, the dates for future conferences, and the submission of a joint pretrial order. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 5/10/2017 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 23A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Sidney H. Stein. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 4/06/2017) (ama) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to ADP Totalsource I, Inc., ADP Totalsource, Inc., Letarte Retail LLC. (jvs) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Taubenfeld, Michael) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Letarte Retail LLC, ADP Totalsource, Inc., and ADP TotalSource I, Inc., re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Michelle Misakyants. (Taubenfeld, Michael) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        COMPLAINT against ADP Totalsource I, Inc., ADP Totalsource, Inc., Letarte Retail LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-13487202)Document filed by Michelle Misakyants.(Taubenfeld, Michael) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara Moses: Settlement Conference held on 11/7/2017. (Snell, Kevin)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Set/Reset Hearings: Pretrial Conference set for 12/20/2017 at 02:00 PM before Judge Sidney H. Stein. (rjm)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sidney H. Stein: Status Conference held on 7/27/2017. Counsel for all parties were present. (lab)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 194 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?