Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Kings Point Restaurant, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-01870

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 22, 2019 at 2:42 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. For the reasons discussed in the attached memorandum and order, the Court adopts Judge Pollak's report and recommendation in its entirety pursuant to 28 U.S.C. ยง 636(b)(1). The Court grants Plaintif f's motion for default judgment jointly and severally against Defendants Kings Point Restaurant, Inc., doing business as Good Company Tavern, and Jeff V. Seidman, also known as Jeff Vonseidman. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment i n the amount of $4555 in favor of Plaintiff jointly and severally against Kings Point Restaurant, Inc., doing business as Good Company Tavern, and Jeff V. Seidman, also known as Jeff Vonseidman. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 12/27/2017. (Stanford, Nia)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: None Default Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Status Report
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None Request for Certificate of Default
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Request for Certificate of Default
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: None Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: None Clerks Notice of Rule 73
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: None Summons Issued
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 4 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?