United States v. Schafrath
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 5:17-cv-00696

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 31, 2019 at 1:43 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mary A. Stallings +1 202 616 2604 +1 202 514 5238 mary.a.stallings@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States of America

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space United States of America
v.
No Logo Belden Park Condominium Association, Defendant
No Logo Bernell G Green, Defendant
No Logo Debra S Schafrath, Defendant
No Logo Stark County Ohio, Defendant
No Logo State of Ohio Department of Taxation, Defendant
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7401
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: None Default Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Default Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: None Order and Notice of Party Dismissal
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Case Management Conference Plan/Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Leave
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Case Management Conference Scheduling Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Belden Park Condominium Association, Bernell G. Green, Debra S. Schafrath, Stark County, Ohio, and the State of Ohio, Department of Taxation. (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Consent Form) (T,Je) (Entered: 04/03/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: 4/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                Complaint against All Defendants. Filing fee exempt. Filed by the United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for Debra S. Schafrath, # 3 Summons for Belden Park Condominium Association, # 4 Summons for Bernell G. Green, # 5 Summons for State of Ohio, Department of Taxation, # 6 Summons for Stark County) (Stallings, Mary) Modified text to remove duplicate wording on 4/4/2017 (T,Je).
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 19 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?