J&J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Jaso
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 6:17-cv-00019

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 22, 2019 at 3:07 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: None Judgment - Default
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: None Memorandum and Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment is GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Hayden Head) Parties notified.(arodriguez, 2)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Mail Returned Undeliverable
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Mail Returned Undeliverable
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: None Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: None Notice of Reassignment (FORM, noticing) - Civil
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Order for Initial Conference - FORM
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Return of Service Executed
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Return of Service Executed
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: None Summons - Request for Issuance
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Parties
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 5 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?