Gaston v. Valley National Bancorp
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-01886

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 10, 2019 at 6:19 PM DT (2.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Maritza Gaston, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Outten & Golden LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated Michael Joseph Scimone +1 212 245 1000 +1 646 509 2055 mscimone@outtengolden.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin Mitchell Swartz +1 212 245 1000 +1 212 977 4005 jms@outtengolden.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shavitz Law Group, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated Paolo Chagas Meireles +1 561 447 8888 +1 561 447 8831 pmeireles@shavitzlaw.com
on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated Gregg I. Shavitz +1 561 447 8888 +1 561 447 8831 gshavitz@shavitzlaw.com
v.
No Logo Valley National Bancorp, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James M. Lemonedes +1 212 788 0881 +1 212 788 0940 jlemonedes@foxrothschild.com
Space Keith Andrew Reinfeld +1 973 994 7547 +1 973 992 9125 kreinfeld@foxrothschild.com
No Logo Valley National Bank,, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James M. Lemonedes +1 212 788 0881 +1 212 788 0940 jlemonedes@foxrothschild.com
Space Keith Andrew Reinfeld +1 973 994 7547 +1 973 992 9125 kreinfeld@foxrothschild.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 201
Nature of Suit Labor: Fair Standards
  Entries (99) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: None Letter
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/28/2019, Entered: None Letter
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: None Transcript
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Telephone Conference
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Adjourn Conference
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Order
            DECLARATION re 64 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Approval of Settlement, Service Awards, and Attorneys Fees and Costs By Gregg I. Shavitz by George Gallart, Maritza Gaston (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Costs Summary) (Swartz, Justin) (Entered: 12/14/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Order
              DECLARATION re 64 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Approval of Settlement, Service Awards, and Attorneys Fees and Costs By Justin M. Swartz by George Gallart, Maritza Gaston (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement, # 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Reminder Postcard, # 3 Exhibit C - Fee Summary, # 4 Exhibit D - Costs Summary) (Swartz, Justin) (Entered: 12/14/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Settlement
                MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Approval of Settlement, Service Awards, and Attorneys Fees and Costs by George Gallart, Maritza Gaston. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Memorandum of Law in Support, # 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order) (Swartz, Justin) (Entered: 12/14/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold for all further proceedings. Judge Frederic Block no longer assigned to case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (So Ordered by U.S. District Judge, Frederic Block on 11/30/2018) (Layne, Monique) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by George Gallart, Maritza Gaston. (Swartz, Justin) (Entered: 11/29/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File /submit a proposed motion seeking Court approval of the settlement agreement by Valley National Bancorp, Valley National Bank. (Lemonedes, James) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        MOTION for Settlement Proposed Briefing Schedule by George Gallart, Maritza Gaston. (Swartz, Justin) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File proposed motion schedule, Consent MOTION to Adjourn Conference /teleconference currently scheduled for October 16, 2018 at 5p.m. by Valley National Bancorp, Valley National Bank. (Grindlinger, Glenn) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None ~Util - Set HearingsCourt Filing
                            Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held on 9/28/2018 before Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Swartz for plaintiffs, Lemonedes and Grinlinger for defendants. The parties will file a letter proposing a schedule for submitting their anticipated motion by October 12, 2018. If they are unable to agree upon final terms or a schedule by that date, THE COURT WILL HOLD A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE AT 5:00 PM ON OCTOBER 16, 2018. Counsel for plaintiff shall arrange the conference call. (Gillespie, Saudia) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference by George Gallart, Maritza Gaston. (Scimone, Michael) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: 9/7/2018 ~Util - Set HearingsCourt Filing
                                Minute Entry: Status Conference held on 9/7/2018 before Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Swartz for plaintiffs, Lemonodes for defendants. THE COURT WILL HOLD A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AT 12 NOON ON SEPTEMBER 24, 2018. Principals with full authority to resolve any outstanding issues must be present or available by telephone throughout the conference. (Gillespie, Saudia)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  Letter to Magistrate Judge Gold confirming availability for conference on September 7, 2018 at 12:30 p.m. by George Gallart, Maritza Gaston (Scimone, Michael) (Entered: 08/31/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                    MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: After reviewing the record and the parties submissions, the Court overrules VNBs 44 objections. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 8/30/2018. (Innelli, Michael) Modified on 8/31/2018 (Innelli, Michael).
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Continue Stay of Action and Toll of Statute of Limitations by George Gallart, Maritza Gaston (Meireles, Paolo) (Entered: 08/15/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        Letter in furtherance of Defendants' Rule 72 Objections to Mag. Judge Gold's December 6, 2017 decision to grant FLSA conditional certification by Valley National Bancorp, Valley National Bank (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Lemonedes, James) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Continue Stay of Action and Toll of Statute of Limitations. by George Gallart, Maritza Gaston (Swartz, Justin) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Proposed Scheduling Order by George Gallart, Maritza Gaston (Swartz, Justin) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Letter re Status Report by Valley National Bancorp, Valley National Bank (Lemonedes, James) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                REPLY in Support re 44 Reply in Opposition,, Defendants' Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of its Objections to Magistrate Judge Gold's Decision and Order Dated December 6, 2017 filed by Valley National Bancorp, Valley National Bank. (Lemonedes, James) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  DECLARATION re 46 Memorandum in Opposition by George Gallart, Maritza Gaston (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Swartz, Justin) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 44 Reply in Opposition,, filed by George Gallart, Maritza Gaston. (Swartz, Justin) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Proposed Scheduling Order by George Gallart, Maritza Gaston (Swartz, Justin) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        REPLY in Opposition re 41 Motion Hearing,,, Defendants' Objections to Magistrate Judge Gold's Decision and Order Dated December 6, 2017 filed by Valley National Bancorp, Valley National Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of James M. Lemonedes, Esq. in Support of Defendants' Objections to Magistrate Judge Gold's Decision and Order Dated December 6, 2017, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10) (Lemonedes, James) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Proposed Scheduling Order by George Gallart, Maritza Gaston (Swartz, Justin) (Entered: 12/15/2017)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            MOTION to Stay re 41 Motion Hearing,,, by Valley National Bancorp, Valley National Bank. (Lemonedes, James) (Entered: 12/13/2017)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 12/6/2017 before Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Abrahamson for plaintiffs, Lemonedes for defendants. Plaintiffs' motion for leave to proceed as a collective action pursuant to Section 216(b) is argued, and granted for reasons stated on the record. The parties will discuss defendants' objections to plaintiffs' proposed notice. If the objections are resolved, counsel shall so advise the Court by letter dated December 13, 2017, and propose a case management schedule in their letter. If the parties are unable to resolve their differences, defendants may submit a letter brief by December 13 in support of their objections, and plaintiffs may submit a responsive brief by December 20, 2017. (FTR Log #2:38-3:32.) (Gillespie, Saudia) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                REPLY in Support re 32 MOTION to Certify FLSA Collective Action filed by George Gallart, Maritza Gaston. (Swartz, Justin) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Sally J. Abrahamson on behalf of George Gallart, Maritza Gaston (aty to be noticed) (Abrahamson, Sally) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 32 MOTION to Certify FLSA Collective Action filed by Valley National Bancorp, Valley National Bank. (Lemonedes, James) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re 32 MOTION to Certify FLSA Collective Action filed by Valley National Bancorp, Valley National Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10) (Lemonedes, James) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Blank 36 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re 34 MOTION to Compel filed by All Defendants. (Lemonedes, James) (Entered: 10/05/2017)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 34 MOTION to Compel filed by George Gallart, Maritza Gaston. (Scimone, Michael) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            MOTION to Compel by Valley National Bancorp, Valley National Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C) (Lemonedes, James) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              DECLARATION re 32 MOTION to Certify FLSA Collective Action by George Gallart, Maritza Gaston (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I) (Swartz, Justin) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                MOTION to Certify FLSA Collective Action by George Gallart, Maritza Gaston. Responses due by 10/20/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support) (Swartz, Justin) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn Sklaire Grindlinger on behalf of Valley National Bancorp, Valley National Bank (aty to be noticed) (Grindlinger, Glenn) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Letter Enclosing Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification and Court-Authorized Notice Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. § 216(b) by George Gallart, Maritza Gaston (Scimone, Michael) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                      Minute Entry: Status Conference held on 8/21/2017 before Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Scimone for plaintiff, Lemonedes for defendants. The parties will agree on a schedule for fully briefing plaintiffs' anticipated Section 216(b) motion by October 30 and completing party depositions by the same date. THE COURT WILL HEAR ARGUMENT ON PLAINTIFFS' ANTICIPATED MOTION AT 11:00 AM ON NOVEMBER 17, 2017. Counsel shall be prepared to schedule all remaining anticipated discovery and motion practice. Counsel shall also be prepared to report on the progress of any ongoing settlement discussions, and to state whether the parties believe it might be productive to schedule a settlement conference. (Gillespie, Saudia) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: 7/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        STIPULATION Tolling Statute of Limitations by George Gallart, Maritza Gaston (Swartz, Justin)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: 6/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          AMENDED ANSWER to 26 Amended Complaint by All Defendants. (Reinfeld, Keith)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: 5/30/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT against Valley National Bancorp, Valley National Bank, filed by Maritza Gaston, George Gallart. (Swartz, Justin)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: 5/26/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              CONSENT to become party in a collective action. by Maritza Gaston (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Scimone, Michael)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Initial Conference Hearing
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  Minute Entry: Initial Conference Hearing held on 5/19/2017 before Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Scimone for plaintiffs, Lemonedes and Reinfeld for defendants. The parties will conduct discovery between now and the next conference that is focused on plaintiff's anticipated motion for Section 216(b) certification. Absent further application to the Court, this discovery will NOT include disclosure of the identities of all branch managers or information specific to particular branch managers other than plaintiffs. Rather, the parties anticipate discovery, through production of documents and a Rule 30(b)(6) deposition, concerning defendants' general practices. However, to the extent defendants anticipate submitting evidence in opposition to plaintiffs' anticipated 216(b) motion, the parties are encouraged to agree that plaintiffs may conduct discovery relevant to defendants' anticipated showing. NEXT CONFERENCE: 3:00 PM ON AUGUST 21, 2017. Counsel shall be prepared to report on their progress moving forward with discovery and to schedule any anticipated motions and further discovery. Counsel shall also be prepared to schedule a settlement conference or court-annexed mediation if they believe it might be productive to do so. (Gillespie, Saudia) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: 5/18/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    Letter Enclosing Defendants' Amended Initial Conference Questionnaire by Valley National Bancorp, Valley National Bank (Reinfeld, Keith)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: 5/17/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      Proposed Scheduling Order by Valley National Bancorp, Valley National Bank (Reinfeld, Keith)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: 5/17/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Strike Affirmative Defense under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) by Maritza Gaston. (Scimone, Michael)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: 5/17/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          Letter Enclosing Plaintiffs Initial Conference Questionnaire by Maritza Gaston (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Scimone, Michael)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: 5/11/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Gregg I. Shavitz on behalf of Maritza Gaston (aty to be noticed) (Shavitz, Gregg)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: 5/11/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Paolo C. Meireles on behalf of Maritza Gaston (aty to be noticed) (Meireles, Paolo)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: 5/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Firm Address by James Lemonedes (Lemonedes, James)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: 4/28/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 10:00 a.m. on May 19, 2017 before the undersigned in Courtroom 13-D South. Counsel for all parties must attend. Counsel for plaintiff is directed to immediately confirm this conference date and time with defendant's counsel. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 4/28/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Chambers Individual Rules) (Gillespie, Saudia)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: 4/27/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by James Lemonedes on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Lemonedes, James)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      Corporate Disclosure Statement by Valley National Bancorp, Valley National Bank (Reinfeld, Keith) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: 4/26/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by All Defendants. (Reinfeld, Keith)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: 4/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maritza Gaston. Valley National Bank served on 4/6/2017, answer due 4/27/2017. (Scimone, Michael)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: 4/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maritza Gaston. Valley National Bancorp served on 4/6/2017, answer due 4/27/2017. (Scimone, Michael)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: 4/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              Letter Re: Corrected Pro Hac Vice motion by Maritza Gaston (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Scimone, Michael)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: 4/11/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Paolo C. Meireles Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-9440086. by Maritza Gaston. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in Support, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Swartz, Justin)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/10/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  CONSENT to become party in a collective action. by Maritza Gaston (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Swartz, Justin)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/10/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gregg I. Shavitz Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-9438336. by Maritza Gaston. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in Support, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Swartz, Justin)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: 4/5/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Joseph Scimone on behalf of Maritza Gaston (aty to be noticed) (Scimone, Michael)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: 4/5/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        Summons Issued as to Valley National Bancorp, Valley National Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Summons) (Davis, Kimberly)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: 4/5/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: 4/5/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: 4/4/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              EXHIBIT Consent to Join to be Attached to Previous Entry by Maritza Gaston. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by Maritza Gaston. (Swartz, Justin)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: 4/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against Valley National Bancorp, Valley National Bank filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9419383 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Maritza Gaston. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons, # 3 Proposed Summons) (Swartz, Justin)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. (Layne, Monique)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: Granting 61 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Counsel shall file a motion for settlement approval pursuant to Cheeks v. Freeport Pancake House, Inc., 796 F.3d 199 (2d Cir. 2015), or joint status report letter by December 14, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 11/29/2018. (Gillespie, Saudia)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: The telephone conference previously scheduled for October 30, 2018 is hereby canceled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 10/25/2018. (Gillespie, Saudia)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC ORDER REFERRING: The parties motion 60 for settlement and proposed briefing schedule to MJ GOLD to hold a Cheeks hearing and then issue a report and recommendation as to their settlement motion. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 10/22/2018. Motions referred to Steven M. Gold. (Innelli, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: The proposed schedule 60 is So Ordered. Plaintiffs shall file the motion for settlement approval by November 30, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 10/22/2018. (Farmer, John)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: Granting 59 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Granting 59 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The parties will file a letter proposing a schedule for submitting their anticipated motion by October 19, 2018. The telephone conference previously scheduled for October 16, 2018 is adjourned to October 30, 2018 at 11:00 a.m. before the undersigned. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 10/12/2018. (Gillespie, Saudia)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: DUE TO A SCHEDULING CONFLICT, THE TIME OF THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR SEPTEMBER 28, 2018 HAS CHANGED FROM 12:00 PM TO 11:00 AM in Courtroom 13D South before the undersigned. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 9/26/2018. (Gillespie, Saudia)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: Granting 57 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The settlement conference previously scheduled for September 26, 2018 is adjourned to September 28, 2018 at 12:00 p.m. in Courtroom 13D South before the undersigned. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 9/25/2018. (Gillespie, Saudia)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict, the settlement conference previously scheduled for September 24, 2018 is adjourned to September 26, 2018 at 3:30 p.m. in Courtroom 13D South before the undersigned. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 9/17/2018. (Gillespie, Saudia)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person status conference will be held at 12:30 p.m. on September 7, 2018 before the undersigned in Courtroom 13-D South. Counsel for all parties must attend. Counsel for plaintiffs are directed to immediately confirm this conference date and time with defendants' counsel. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 8/31/2018. (Gillespie, Saudia)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: Application 53 is hereby approved and entered as a Order of the Court. Counsel shall file an updated status report letter by October 5, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 8/18/2018. (Gillespie, Saudia)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: Application 51 is hereby approved and entered as a Order of the Court. Counsel shall file an updated status report letter by August 15, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 6/13/2018. (Gillespie, Saudia)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: the Proposed Scheduling Order filed as Docket Entry 50 is hereby approved and entered as an Order of the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 4/9/2018. (Metzger, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT ORDER: Counsel shall file a letter reporting on the status on the case by May 9, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 3/5/2018. (Gillespie, Saudia)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: The 45 Proposed Scheduling Order is hereby approved and entered as an Order of the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 1/17/2018. (Gillespie, Saudia)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: The Proposed Scheduling Order filed as docket entry 43, is hereby approved and entered as an Order of the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 12/18/2017. (Gillespie, Saudia)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: Granting 42 Motion to Stay. Counsel shall file a joint status report letter by March 1, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 12/14/2017. (Gillespie, Saudia)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 32 Motion to Certify FLSA Collective Action for reasons stated on the record during the oral argument held today. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 12/6/2017. (Gold, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: Application 36, revised discovery and briefing schedule is hereby approved and entered as an Order of the Court. 34 Motion to Compel is terminated as moot in light of Docket Entry 36 . The telephone conference previously scheduled for October 11, 2017 is cancelled. The motion hearing previously scheduled for November 17, 2017 is adjourned to December 6, 2017 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 13D South before the undersigned. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 10/6/2017. (Gillespie, Saudia)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephone conference will be held at 2:00 p.m. on October 11, 2017 before the undersigned. Counsel for all parties must participate. Counsel for defense is directed to arrange the call with all parties as well as immediately confirm this conference date and time with plaintiff's counsel. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 10/2/2017. (Gillespie, Saudia)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: Application 28 tolling the statue of limitations is hereby granted and entered as an Order of the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 7/6/2017. (Gillespie, Saudia)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 21 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 5/18/2017. (Gold, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice is hereby GRANTED. Attorney Gregg I. Shavitz shall register for ECF, registration is available online at the NYEDs homepage. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 4/28/2017. (Gillespie, Saudia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice is hereby GRANTED. Attorney Paolo C. Meireles shall register for ECF, registration is available online at the NYEDs homepage. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 4/28/2017. (Gillespie, Saudia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Case Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 114 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?