Michael v. Charter Communications, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Missouri Eastern District Court, Case No. 4:17-cv-01242

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 27, 2019 at 2:40 PM DT (2.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo A. Michael, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by SWMK LAW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan P. Horace +1 614 480 5180 ryan@swmklaw.com
v.
No Logo Charter Communications, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson Coburn LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew D. Guletz +1 314 552 6311 +1 314 552 7311 mguletz@thompsoncoburn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roman P. Wuller +1 314 552 6000 +1 314 552 7121 rwuller@thompsoncoburn.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (63) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/27/2019, Entered: None Memorandum & Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None Sealed Document (no service occurs via CM/ECF)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None For Leave to File Sealed Document
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None Produce
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None Reply (to termed motion)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Memorandum (NON-MOTION EVENT)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None File in Excess of Page Limitation
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Memorandum (NON-MOTION EVENT)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None Memorandum & ORDERCourt Filing
                            MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court will unseal Documents #36 and all attachments; #37 and attachment 1; #44 and attachments 2 and 3; #52 and attachments 1 and 3 through 8; and #56 and attachment 1.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall strike Document #51 and all attachments. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 7/11/18. (KEK)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Response to Order to Show Cause (42:2255 and 2254 cases only)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Memorandum (NON-MOTION EVENT)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None File in Excess of Page Limitation
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None Response to Order to Show Cause (42:2255 and 2254 cases only)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Response to Order to Show Cause (42:2255 and 2254 cases only)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: None Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None Hearing
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: None Sealed Document (no service occurs via CM/ECF)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Motion
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Sealed Document (no service occurs via CM/ECF)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Sealed Motion (no service occurs via CM/ECF)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None For Leave to File Sealed Motion
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: None Leave to
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Joint Scheduling Plan
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Out of Time 18 is GRANTED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and for More Definite Statement 8 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, in that Plaintiff is ordered to file an amended complaint including his full name in the caption within 14 days or face dismissal pursuant to Rule 12(e) (Amended Pleadings due by 7/14/2017); and IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Moti on for Protective Order and for Leave to Proceed Anonymously 14 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, in that the parties shall redact Plaintiff's address from any filings with the Court until the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is held. All requests in these motions not specifically granted herein shall be deemed denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 6/30/17. (CAR)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Leave to
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: 6/16/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 14 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff A. Michael. (Horace, Ryan)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: 6/16/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff A. Michael. (Horace, Ryan)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: 6/16/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 8 MOTION to Dismiss Case And For More Definite Statement filed by Plaintiff A. Michael. (Horace, Ryan)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: 6/8/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        ENTRY of Appearance by Roman P. Wuller for Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Wuller, Roman)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: 6/8/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: PTRACK 2 - STANDARD Joint Scheduling Plan due by 7/6/2017. Rule 16 Conference set for 7/13/2017 10:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen.. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 6/8/17. (LGK)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: Yes,. (Guletz, Matthew)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 8 MOTION to Dismiss Case And For More Definite Statement filed by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Guletz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Case And For More Definite Statement by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Guletz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: 6/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc., Plaintiff A. Michael. (CAR)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    Docket Text ORDER: Re: 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, (Until June 2, 2017) by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc. (Guletz, Matthew) filed by Charter Communications, Inc. ; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. 5) is GRANTED. Defendant shall file its responsive pleading(s) on or before June 2, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 5/5/17. (BPS) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: 5/4/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, (Until June 2, 2017) by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Guletz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: 5/4/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew D. Guletz for Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Guletz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401. (CSAW) (Entered: 04/04/2017)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: 4/4/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff A. Michael Process Server: Midwest Process Service (MFG)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: 4/4/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against defendant Charter Communications, Inc. with receipt number 0865-5892525, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by A. Michael. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons, # 6 Notice of Intent to Use Process Server)(Horace, Ryan)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 57 times.

                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?