Craftwood II, Inc. v. Wurth Louis and Company

Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 8:17-cv-00606
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 7, 2018 at 2:36 PM EST (6.5 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Craftwood II, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Marko & Magolnick, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
California corporation
TERMINATED: 10/19/2017 Joel Steven Magolnick +1 305 285 2000 +1 305 285 5555 magolnick@mm-pa.com

Represented by Payne & Fears LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew K. Brown +1 949 797 1279 mkb@paynefears.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Darryl Cordero +1 213 439 9911 +1 213 439 9922 cdc@paynefears.com
California corporation
TERMINATED: 10/19/2017 Leilani Elizabeth Livingston +1 949 851 1100 +1 949 851 1212 llj@paynefears.com
California corporation
TERMINATED: 10/19/2017 Scott O Luskin +1 213 439 9911 +1 213 439 9922 sol@paynefears.com
v.
No Logo Does, Defendant
No Logo Wurth Louis and Company, Defendant

Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Loura L Alaverdi +1 310 820 8800 +1 310 820 8859 lalaverdi@bakerlaw.com
a California corporation
TERMINATED: 10/19/2017 Erica Barrow +1 212 589 4200 +1 212 589 4201 ebarrow@bakerlaw.com
a California corporation
TERMINATED: 10/19/2017 Deborah Hilarie Renner +1 212 589 4200 +1 212 589 4201 drenner@bakerlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew A Wood +1 714 754 6600 awood@bakerlaw.com

Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a California corporation
TERMINATED: 10/19/2017 Livia M Kiser +1 312 764 6911 +1 312 995 6330 lkiser@kslaw.com
a California corporation
TERMINATED: 10/19/2017 Michael Brian Shortnacy +1 213 443 4344 +1 213 443 4310 mshortnacy@kslaw.com

Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a California corporation
TERMINATED: 10/19/2017 Raechel Jean Bimmerle +1 312 853 7725 rbimmerle@sidley.com
a California corporation
TERMINATED: 10/19/2017 Courtney Ann Hoffmann +1 312 853 7669 +1 312 853 7036 choffmann@sidley.com
a California corporation
TERMINATED: 10/19/2017 Thomas Kayes +1 312 853 3293 tkayes@sidley.com
a California corporation
TERMINATED: 10/19/2017 Michael L Mallow +1 213 896 6000 +1 213 896 6600 mmallow@sidley.com
a California corporation
TERMINATED: 10/19/2017 Joe R Regalia +1 312 853 7468 +1 312 853 7460 jregalia@sidley.com
a California corporation
TERMINATED: 10/19/2017 Rachel Aleeza Straus +1 213 896 6000 +1 213 896 6600 rstraus@sidley.com
Other Parties
United States of America United States of America, Interested Party

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Matthew Jimenez Barragan +1 213 894 2444 +1 213 894 7819 matthew.barragan@usdoj.gov
Attributes
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Timeline
  Entries (174) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Affidavit
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Staying Case
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Reconsideration
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 10/27/2018, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Amended Document (Non-Motion)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Stay Case
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None ERRATA
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Stay Case
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Reconsideration
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: None Certify Class Action
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None ERRATA
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None ERRATA
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Errata
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/28/2018 Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of Livia Kiser in Support of Defendant's Amended Points and Authority in Opposition to Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class 115 filed by Defendant Wurth Louis and Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T Part 1, # 21 Exhibit T Part 2, # 22 Exhibit T Part 3, # 23 Exhibit U, # 24 Exhibit V, # 25 Exhibit W, # 26 Exhibit X, # 27 Exhibit Y, # 28 Exhibit Z)(Kiser, Livia)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/28/2018 Amendment (Motion related)
Amendment to Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class 115 Amended Points and Authority in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Defendant Wurth Louis and Company. (Kiser, Livia)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None response in opposition to motion
OPPOSITION to Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class 115 filed by Defendant Wurth Louis and Company. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Kiser, Livia) (Entered: 08/27/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Substitute AttorneyCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting 125 Request to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Michael L Mallow; Joe R Regalia; Rachel Aleeza Straus; Rachel J Bimmerle and Courtney A Hoffmann terminated. (twdb) (Entered: 08/15/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: 8/13/2018 Substitute Attorney (G-01)
REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Michael B. Shortnacy, KING & SPALDING LLP in place of attorney Michael L. Mallow, SIDLEY AUSTIN LLP filed by Defendant Wurth Louis and Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Michael Brian Shortnacy added to party Wurth Louis and Company(pty:cc), Attorney Michael Brian Shortnacy added to party Wurth Louis and Company(pty:dft)) (Shortnacy, Michael)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Change of firm name and address by Livia M Kiser attorney for Counter Claimant Wurth Louis and Company, Defendant Wurth Louis and Company. Changing firm name to King & Spalding LLP and address to 444 W. Lake Street, Suite 1650, Chicago, IL 60606. Filed by Counter Claimant Wurth Louis and Company, Defendant Wurth Louis and Company. (Kiser, Livia) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: 8/8/2018 notice of motion
NOTICE OF MOTION re Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class 115 [ Plaintiffs Amended Notice of Amended Motion and Motion For Class Certification ] filed by Plaintiff Craftwood II, Inc., Counter Defendant Craftwood II, Inc.. (Luskin, Scott)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: 8/8/2018 Errata
NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Craftwood II, Inc., Counter Defendant Craftwood II, Inc.. correcting Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class 115 (Luskin, Scott)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of Scott O. Luskin in support of Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class 115 filed by Plaintiff Craftwood II, Inc.. (Luskin, Scott) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of Robert Biggerstaff in support of Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class 115 filed by Plaintiff Craftwood II, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A" - Pages 3-107)(Luskin, Scott) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of Joel S. Magolnick in support of Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class 115 filed by Plaintiff Craftwood II, Inc.. (Luskin, Scott) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of Leilani E. Livingston in support of Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class 115 filed by Plaintiff Craftwood II, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A" - Pages 7-24, # 2 Exhibit "B" - Pages 25-34, # 3 Exhibit "C" - Pages 35-50, # 4 Exhibit "D" - Pages 51-67, # 5 Exhibit "E" - Pages 68-82, # 6 Exhibit "F" - Pages 83-86, # 7 Exhibit "G" - Pages 87-106, # 8 Exhibit "H" - Pages 107-118, # 9 Exhibit "I" - Pages 119-131, # 10 Exhibit "J" - Pages 132-143, # 11 Exhibit "K" - Pages 144-149, # 12 Exhibit "L" - Pages 150-161, # 13 Exhibit "M" - Pages 162-165, # 14 Exhibit "N" - Pages 166-170, # 15 Exhibit "O" - Pages 171-190, # 16 Exhibit "P" - Pages 191-205, # 17 Exhibit "Q" - Pages 206-225, # 18 Exhibit "R" - Pages 226-231, # 19 Exhibit "S" - Pages 232-238, # 20 Exhibit "T" - Pages 239-244, # 21 Exhibit "U" - Pages 245-249, # 22 Exhibit "V" - Pages 250-258)(Luskin, Scott) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of C. Darryl Cordero in support of Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class 115 filed by Plaintiff Craftwood II, Inc.. (Luskin, Scott) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of Diana B. Newton in support of Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class 115 filed by Plaintiff Craftwood II, Inc.. (Luskin, Scott) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: 8/6/2018 Certify Class ActionCourt Filing
Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class filed by plaintiff Craftwood II, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 10/1/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Amended Motion for Class Certification, # 2 Proposed Order) (Luskin, Scott)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: 8/6/2018 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Motion to Extend Opening and Opposing Memoranda of Points and Authorities for Amended Motion for Class Certification by Five Pages 113 . (twdb)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Joint STIPULATION for Joinder in Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06), 111 filed by Craftwood II Craftwood II, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Luskin, Scott) (Entered: 08/03/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Charles Darryl Cordero counsel for Plaintiff Craftwood II, Inc.. Changing PAYNE & FEARS LLP to 400 Continental Blvd., Suite 600, El Segundo, CA 90245. Filed by Craftwood II, Inc. Craftwood II, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Cordero, Charles) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Scott O Luskin counsel for Plaintiff Craftwood II, Inc.. Changing PAYNE & FEARS LLP to 400 Continental Blvd., Suite 600, El Segundo, CA 90245. Filed by CRAFTWOOD, II, et al. CRAFTWOOD, II, et al.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Luskin, Scott) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: 5/30/2018 Refund of Fees (G-124) - Issued
REFUND OF $325.00 made payable on 05/30/2018 to Scott Luskin for payment made on 04/23/2018 Re: APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid 105 . (rdj)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Thomas R Kayes counsel for Defendant Wurth Louis and Company. Tom Kayes is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Wurth Louis and Company. (Kayes, Thomas) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance 107 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Joe R Regalia on behalf of Defendant Wurth Louis and Company (Attorney Joe R Regalia added to party Wurth Louis and Company(pty:dft))(Regalia, Joe) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: 4/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT by affiant: Hon. James L. Smith (Ret.) filed by Plaintiff Craftwood II, Inc. (Luskin, Scott)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: 4/27/2018 Unknown Document Type
APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid Craftwood II, Inc.. (Luskin, Scott)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: 4/26/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid 100 by Judge David O. Carter. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by. Please refer to the error(s) found in the Notice of Deficiency (dkt. #102) and refile. (mt)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: 4/26/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting 99 Non-Resident Attorney Joel S Magolnick APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Craftwood II, Inc., designating Scott O Luskin as local counsel. (mt)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid 100 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Rachel Aleeza Straus counsel for Defendant Wurth Louis and Company. Adding Rachel A. Straus as counsel of record for Wurth Louis and Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Wurth Louis and Company. (Attorney Rachel Aleeza Straus added to party Wurth Louis and Company(pty:dft))(Straus, Rachel) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: 4/24/2018 Unknown Document Type
**DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER ON 4/26/2018, SEE DOCKET NO. 104** APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid Craftwood II, Inc.. (Luskin, Scott) Modified on 4/26/2018 (mt).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: 4/23/2018 Unknown Document Type
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joel S. Magolnick to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Craftwood II, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21633026) Craftwood II, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Sta nding, # 2 Proposed Order) (Luskin, Scott)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER Appointing Special Master Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.53 by Judge David O. Carter. See document for further information. (twdb) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter: The Motion Hearing previously scheduled for 4/24/2018 @ 10:00 AM has been CANCELLED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 04/18/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Compel Answers to Interrogatories
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
[Document is a REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL filed as] NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Wurth Louis and Company Craftwood II, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 4/24/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Declaration)(Luskin, Scott) Modified on 4/18/2018 (dgo). (Entered: 04/17/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: 4/16/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott: Cancelling Hearing on 62 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. (jdo)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 4/9/2018 Hearing re Transcript 93 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Gale, Debbie) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 04/12/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 4/9/2018 Hearing. ****Court Reporter: DEBBIE GALE. Contact via: WEBSITE: www.debbiegale.com or EMAIL:DebbieGaleCSR@gmail.com, 714-558-8141 (all requests must be in writing/no phone orders). ****Transcript may onlybe viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter DEBBIE GALE before the deadline for Release of Transcript restriction. After transcript release date, it may be still be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. (ASCII, Condensed, and Word Indexing/Concordance are also available for purchase at any timethrough the Court Reporter.) Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date.**** Redaction Request due 5/3/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/14/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/11/2018. (Gale, Debbie) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: 4/12/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER REQUIRING FILING OF PROPOSED ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL MASTER. The parties shall submit a separate proposed order appointing the Special Master pursuant to Rule 53(b) on or before April 16, 2018. (twdb)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: 4/11/2018 Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Edwin D. McGraw re Response in Opposition to Motion, 90 filed by Defendant Wurth Louis and Company. (Kiser, Livia)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
OPPOSITION to MOTION to Compel Supplemental Responses to Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Supplemental Documents; Request for Sanctions in the Amount of $14,845 62 (Amended) (Exhibits Attached) filed by Defendant Wurth Louis and Company. (Kiser, Livia) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
OPPOSITION to MOTION to Compel Supplemental Responses to Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Supplemental Documents; Request for Sanctions in the Amount of $14,845 62 filed by Defendant Wurth Louis and Company. (Kiser, Livia) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to defendant Wurth Louis and Company for Court Reporter. Court will contact Joseph Regalia at jregalia@sidley.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Kiser, Livia) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
TRANSCRIPT ORDER Craftwood II, Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Debbie Gale at srichards@paynefears.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Luskin, Scott) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: 4/9/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTES RE: Motion for Order to Disqualify or, in the Alternative, Deny Class Certification 68 held before Judge David O. Carter: Hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, the Motion for Order to Disqualify or, in the Alternative, Deny Class Certification 68 is DENIED. Counsel are to notify the Court of their selection of a Special Master (either Robert OBrien or Judge James (ret.) Smith), by noon on April 11, 2018. Court Reporter: Debbie Gale. (lwag)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Leilani Elizabeth Livingston on behalf of Plaintiff Craftwood II, Inc. (Attorney Leilani Elizabeth Livingston added to party Craftwood II, Inc.(pty:pla))(Livingston, Leilani) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: 4/2/2018 Unknown Document Type
REPLY opposition NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for to Disqualify or, in the Alternative, Deny Class Certification 68 filed by Defendant Wurth Louis and Company. (Kiser, Livia)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott re Plaintiff's Motion to Compel 62 . The due date for Defendant's opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel is now April 10, 2018, and the due date for Plaintiff's reply is now April 17, 2018. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jdo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 04/02/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: 3/29/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott: granting 81 REQUEST to Continue. The hearing on Plaintiff's motion to compel 62 is now set for April 24, 2018, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom 6D. (jdo)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: 3/28/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Joint REQUEST to Continue Plaintiff's Motion to Compel from April 17, 2018 to April 24, 2018 Re: MOTION to Compel Supplemental Responses to Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Supplemental Documents; Request for Sanctions in the Amount of $14,845 62 filed by Plaintiff Craftwood II, Inc.. Request set for hearing on 4/24/2018 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order on Joint Request for Continuance of MTC) (Luskin, Scott)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Motion Related Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION OF DEBORAH McCOMB REGARDING SETTLEMENT ADMINISTRATION OF CRAFTWOOD LUMBER COMPANY v. SENCO BRANDS, INC. re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for to Disqualify or, in the Alternative, Deny Class Certification 68 filed by Plaintiff Craftwood II, Inc.. (Cordero, Charles) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Diana Newton in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for to Disqualify or, in the Alternative, Deny Class Certification 68 filed by Plaintiff Craftwood II, Inc.. (Cordero, Charles) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Elsa M. Robinson in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for to Disqualify or, in the Alternative, Deny Class Certification 68 filed by Plaintiff Craftwood II, Inc.. (Cordero, Charles) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Leilani E. Livingston in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for to Disqualify or, in the Alternative, Deny Class Certification 68 filed by Plaintiff Craftwood II, Inc.. (Cordero, Charles) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Scott O. Luskin in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for to Disqualify or, in the Alternative, Deny Class Certification 68 filed by Plaintiff Craftwood II, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Cordero, Charles) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of C. Darryl Cordero in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for to Disqualify or, in the Alternative, Deny Class Certification 68 filed by Plaintiff Craftwood II, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Cordero, Charles) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Livia M. Kiser re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for to Disqualify or, in the Alternative, Deny Class Certification 68 filed by Plaintiff Craftwood II, Inc.. (Cordero, Charles) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for to Disqualify or, in the Alternative, Deny Class Certification 68 filed by Plaintiff Craftwood II, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Cordero, Charles) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: 3/14/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. Defendant's Cross-Motion to Stay Plaintiff's Motion to Compel 69 is DENIED. Due to a scheduling conflict, the hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel 62 is rescheduled for Tuesday, April 17, 2018 at 2:30 p.m. Defendant's opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel is now due on or before April 3, 2018, and Plaintiff's reply is due on or before April 10, 2018. (see order) (jdo)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for to Disqualify or, in the Alternative, Deny Class Certification 68 : The Motion Hearing previously scheduled for 4/16/2018 @ 8:30 AM has been rescheduled. Motion Hearing set for 4/9/2018 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. **The Opposition remains due on March 26, 2018 and the Reply remains due on April 2, 2018**THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 03/14/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Cross NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay pending Defendant's Motion to Disqualify 69 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (es) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: 3/13/2018 Unknown Document Type
Cross NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay pending Defendant's Motion to Disqualify filed by defendant Wurth Louis and Company. (Kiser, Livia)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: 3/13/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for to Disqualify or, in the Alternative, Deny Class Certification filed by Defendant Wurth Louis and Company. Motion set for hearing on 4/16/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Livia M. Kiser, # 2 Declaration of Edwin D. McGraw, # 3 Declaration of Tom Kayes, # 4 Exhibit A to Kayes Declaration, # 5 Exhibit B to Kayes Declaration, # 6 Exhibit C to Kayes Declaration, # 7 Exhibit D to Kayes Declaration, # 8 Exhibit E to Kayes Declaration, # 9 Exhibit F to Kayes Declaration, # 10 Exhibit G to Kayes Declaration, # 11 Exhibit H to Kayes Declaration, # 12 Exhibit I to Kayes Declaration, # 13 Exhibit J to Kayes Declaration, # 14 Exhibit K to Kayes Declaration, # 15 Exhibit L to Kayes Declaration, # 16 Exhibit M to Kayes Declaration, # 17 Exhibit N to Kayes Declaration, # 18 Exhibit O to Kayes Declaration, # 19 Exhibit P to Kayes Declaration, # 20 Exhibit Q to Kayes Declaration, # 21 Exhibit R to Kayes Declaration, # 22 Exhibit S to Kayes Declaration, # 23 Exhibit T to Kayes Declaration, # 24 Exhibit U to Kayes Declaration, # 25 Exhibit V to Kayes Declaration, # 26 Exhibit W to Kayes Declaration, # 27 Exhibit X to Kayes Declaration, # 28 Exhibit Y to Kayes Declaration, # 29 Exhibit Z to Kayes Declaration, # 30 Exhibit AA to Kayes Declaration, # 31 Exhibit BB to Kayes Declaration, # 32 Exhibit CC to Kayes Declaration, # 33 Exhibit DD to Kayes Declaration) (Kiser, Livia)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: 3/13/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott re Plaintiff's Motion to Compel 62 . Defendant shall file a response to the motion to compel on or before March 20, 2018. If Plaintiff chooses to file a reply to Defendant's response, Plaintiff shall do so on or before March 27, 2018. (see order) (jdo)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: 3/9/2018 Unknown Document Type
[PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES, REQUETS FOR PRODUCTION AND SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENTS re MOTION to Compel Supplemental Responses to Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Supplemental Documents; Request for Sanctions in the Amount of $14,845 62 filed by Plaintiff Craftwood II, Inc.. (Luskin, Scott)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: 3/9/2018 Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of LEILANI E. LIVINGSTON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION to Compel Supplemental Responses to Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Supplemental Documents; Request for Sanctions in the Amount of $14,845 62 filed by Plaintiff Craftwood II, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to L Livingston Decl, # 2 Exhibit 2 to L Livingston Decl)(Luskin, Scott)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: 3/9/2018 Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of SCOTT O. LUSKIN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION to Compel Supplemental Responses to Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Supplemental Documents; Request for Sanctions in the Amount of $14,845 62 filed by Plaintiff Craftwood II, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Decl of S Luskin, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Decl of S Luskin, # 3 Exhibit 3 to Decl of S Luskin, # 4 Exhibit 4 to Decl of S Luskin, # 5 Exhibit 5 to Decl of S Luskin, # 6 Exhibit 6 to Decl of S Luskin, # 7 Exhibit 7 to Decl of S Luskin, # 8 Exhibit 8 to Decl of S Luskin, # 9 Exhibit 9 to Decl of S Luskin, # 10 Exhibit 10 to Decl of S Luskin, # 11 Exhibit 11 to Decl of S Luskin, # 12 Exhibit 12 to Decl of S Luskin, # 13 Exhibit 13 to Decl of S Luskin, # 14 Exhibit 14 to Decl of S Luskin, # 15 Exhibit 15 to Decl of S Luskin, # 16 Exhibit 16 to Decl of S Luskin, # 17 Exhibit 17 to Decl of S Luskin, # 18 Exhibit 18 to Decl of S Luskin, # 19 Exhibit 19 to Decl of S Luskin, # 20 Exhibit 20 to Decl of S Luskin)(Luskin, Scott)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: 3/9/2018 Unknown Document Type
JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION to Compel Supplemental Responses to Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Supplemental Documents; Request for Sanctions in the Amount of $14,845 62 filed by Plaintiff Craftwood II, Inc.. (Luskin, Scott)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: 3/9/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Supplemental Responses to Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Supplemental Documents; Request for Sanctions in the Amount of $14,845 filed by Plaintiff Craftwood II, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 4/10/2018 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (Luskin, Scott)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Craftwood II, Inc.. Notice of ADR Selection (Luskin, Scott) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Matthew Jimenez Barragan counsel for Interested Party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,. Adding Matthew J. Barragan as counsel of record for United States of America for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Interested Party United States of America. (Attorney Matthew Jimenez Barragan added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,(pty:ip))(Barragan, Matthew) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by United States of America of Acknowledgment of Constitutional Challenge UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,. (Barragan, Matthew) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: 11/28/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER & ORDER RE: PRETRIAL AND TRIAL PROCEDURES by Judge David O. Carter: Discovery cut-off 6/4/2018, Motion cut-off 10/1/2018 @ 8:30 AM, Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/13/2018 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter, Jury Trial set for 12/4/2018 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. *See order for additional information* (dgo)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: 11/28/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge David O. Carter. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 10/14/2018 or within fourteen (14) days of the Court's ruling on class certification, whichever is later). (dgo)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter: The Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for 11/27/2017 @ 8:30 AM has been CANCELLED. *Scheduling Order to be issued* THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 11/17/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: 11/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Plaintiff Craftwood II, Inc... (Luskin, Scott)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: 10/20/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER to Extend time to Respond to Counterclaim 52 by Judge David O. Carter: Pursuant to concurrently-submitted Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time toRespond to Counterclaim between all parties through their counsel of record, andfor good cause shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the due date for Craftwood to file its response to WLC's counterclaim shall be continued from October 25 to October 30, 2017. (lwag)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Counter-Plaintiff Wurth Louis and Company. Dismissal is Without. (Kiser, Livia) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Answer to Complaint (Discovery), Counterclaim 50 filed by Plaintiff Craftwood II, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order to Extend Time to Respond to Counterclaim)(Luskin, Scott) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: 10/5/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 11/27/2017 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Craftwood II, Inc. filed by Defendant Wurth Louis and Company. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consitutional Question)(Kiser, Livia) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: DENYING 19 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, Strike, and for Partial Summary Judgment.(see document for details) (mba) (Entered: 09/20/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTES OF Motion Hearing re 19 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case, Strike, and or For Partial Summary Judgment held before Judge David O. Carter: Hearing held. Court to issue a final order. Court Reporter: Debbie Gale; Courtroom Deputy: Deborah Goltz; Plaintiff Attorney: Charles Darryl Cordero, Defendant Attorney: Livia M. Kiser, Michael L. Mallow, Thomas R. Kayes; Time in Court: 1:12. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (dgo) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE filed by Defendant Wurth Louis and Companyto Motion Related Document, 46 Response to Craftwood II's Notice of Additional Authority In Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, Strike and for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kiser, Livia) (Entered: 09/05/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CRAFTWOOD II's NOTICE OF ADDITIONAL AUTHORITY IN OPPOSITION TO WURTH'S MOTIONS TO DISMISS, STRIKE AND FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case, Strike, and or For Partial Summary Judgment 19 filed by Plaintiff Craftwood II, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Craftwood II's Notice of Additional Authority)(Luskin, Scott) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CRAFTWOOD II'S CLARIFICATION OF DEFENDANT'S SECOND NOTICE OF ADDITIONAL AUTHORITY re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case, Strike, and or For Partial Summary Judgment 19 filed by Plaintiff Craftwood II, Inc.. (Luskin, Scott) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Scott O Luskin counsel for Plaintiff Craftwood II, Inc.. Adding Scott O. Luskin as counsel of record for Craftwood II, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Craftwood II, Inc. dba Bay Hardware. (Attorney Scott O Luskin added to party Craftwood II, Inc.(pty:pla))(Luskin, Scott) (Entered: 08/21/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING Ex Parte Application for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, Strike and For Summary Judgment 37 by Judge David O. Carter: FOR GOOD CAUSE SHOWN, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Craftwood's Sur-Reply, attached as Exhibit "A" to its ex parte Application is deemed filed and served as of the date of this order. (es) (Entered: 08/16/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case, Strike, and or For Partial Summary Judgment 19 : The Motion Hearing previously scheduled for 8/21/2017 @ 8:30 AM has been rescheduled. Motion Hearing set for 9/18/2017 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 08/16/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Additional Authority filed by Defendant Wurth Louis and Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh. A)(Kiser, Livia) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION to to File a Sur-Reply in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, Strike and for Summary Judgment 37 filed by Defendant Wurth Louis and Company. (Kiser, Livia) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Matthew K. Brown re EX PARTE APPLICATION to to File a Sur-Reply in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, Strike and for Summary Judgment 37 filed by Plaintiff Craftwood II, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Brown, Matthew) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Plaintiff Craftwood II, Inc.. Re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to to File a Sur-Reply in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, Strike and for Summary Judgment 37 (Brown, Matthew) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
EX PARTE APPLICATION to to File a Sur-Reply in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, Strike and for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Craftwood II, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order) (Brown, Matthew) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE Notice of Additional Authority filed by Defendant Wurth Louis and Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Opinion)(Kayes, Thomas) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: 7/31/2017 Unknown Document Type
REPLY support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case, Strike, and or For Partial Summary Judgment 19 filed by Defendant Wurth Louis and Company. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Edwin D. McGraw, # 2 Declaration of Livia M. Kiser, # 3 Statement of Facts)(Kiser, Livia)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: 7/27/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting 30 Non-Resident Attorney Courtney A. Hoffmann APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Wurth Louis and Company, designating Livia M. Kiser as local counsel. (lwag)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: 7/27/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting 29 Non-Resident Attorney Thomas Kayes APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Wurth Louis and Company, designating Livia M. Kiser as local counsel. (lwag)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: 7/27/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting 28 Non-Resident Attorney Raechel J. Bimmerle APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Wurth Louis and Company, designating Livia M. Kiser as local counsel. (lwag)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Thomas Kayes to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Wurth Louis and Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325.00 Previously Paid on 7/25/2017, Receipt No. 0973-20237159) 29, APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Raechel J. Bimmerle to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Wurth Louis and Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20237023) 28, APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Courtney A. Hoffmann to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Wurth Louis and Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325.00 Previously Paid on 7/25/2017, Receipt No. 0973-20237299) 30 . The following error(s) was/were found: Superseded version of Form G-64 used. Local counsel lists 2 address, one in CA the other in IL. CSB has attorney in IL. (lt) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: 7/25/2017 Unknown Document Type
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Courtney A. Hoffmann to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Wurth Louis and Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325.00 Previously Paid on 7/25/2017, Receipt No. 0973-20237299) filed by Defendant Wurth Louis and Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Kiser, Livia)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: 7/25/2017 Unknown Document Type
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Thomas Kayes to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Wurth Louis and Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325.00 Previously Paid on 7/25/2017, Receipt No. 0973-20237159) filed by Defendant Wurth Louis and Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Kiser, Livia)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: 7/25/2017 Unknown Document Type
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Raechel J. Bimmerle to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Wurth Louis and Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20237023) filed by Defendant Wurth Louis and Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Kiser, Livia)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: 7/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
STATEMENT of Statement of Genuine Dispute of Material Facts in Support of Plaintiffs Opposition to Wurth Louis And Companys Motion For Partial Summary Judgment NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case, Strike, and or For Partial Summary Judgment 19 filed by Plaintiff Craftwood II, Inc.. (Cordero, Charles)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: 7/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
Objections to Evidence Offered in Support of WLCs Motion to Dismiss, Strike, and/or for Partial Summary Judgment [Declaration of Livia M. Kiser] re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case, Strike, and or For Partial Summary Judgment 19 filed by Plaintiff Craftwood II, Inc.. (Cordero, Charles)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: 7/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
Plaintiff Craftwood IIs Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss, Strike and/or For Partial Summary Judgment re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case, Strike, and or For Partial Summary Judgment 19 filed by Plaintiff Craftwood II, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Newton, # 2 Exhibit A to Newton Decl, # 3 Exhibit B to Newton Decl, # 4 Declaration Cordero, # 5 Exhibit A to Cordero Decl, # 6 Exhibit B to Cordero Decl, # 7 Exhibit C to Cordero Decl, # 8 Exhibit D to Cordero Decl, # 9 Declaration Lem)(Cordero, Charles)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: 6/29/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER on Joint Stipulation to Continue Hearing on Defendant' Motion to Dismiss, Strike and/or for Partial Summary Judgment by Judge David O. Carter. The hearing on Defendant Wurth Louis & Company ("Wurth")'s Motion to Dismiss, Strike and/or for Partial Summary Judgment which is currently scheduled for July 24, 2017, is continued to August 21, 2017, at 8:30 AM. Plaintiff shall file its opposition to the Motion by July 24, 2017, and Wurth shall file its Reply by July 31, 2017. (dv)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Motion to Dismiss from July 24, 2017 to August 21, 2017 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case, Strike, and or For Partial Summary Judgment 19 filed by Plaintiff Craftwood II, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cordero, Charles) (Entered: 06/28/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Craftwood II, Inc., identifying David Brunjes and Cynthia Brunjes. (Cordero, Charles) (Entered: 06/28/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael L Mallow counsel for Defendant Wurth Louis and Company. Adding Michael L. Mallow as counsel of record for Wurth Louis And Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Wurth Louis And Company. (Attorney Michael L Mallow added to party Wurth Louis and Company(pty:dft))(Mallow, Michael) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance 16 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (ak) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/24/2017, Entered: None Dismiss Case
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case, Strike, and or For Partial Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Wurth Louis and Company. Motion set for hearing on 7/24/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of L. Kiser, # 3 Exh. A, # 4 Exh. B, # 5 Exh. C, # 6 Exh. D, # 7 Exh. E, # 8 Exh. F, # 9 Exh. G, # 10 Exh. H, # 11 Exh. I, # 12 Exh. J, # 13 Exh. K, # 14 Exh. L, # 15 Exh. M, # 16 LR 56-1 Statement) (Kiser, Livia) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AMENDED AND CORRECTED Corporate Disclosure Statement and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Wurth Louis and Company, identifying Wurth Wood Holding LLC. (Kiser, Livia) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Local Rule 7.1-1 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Wurth Louis and Company, identifying Wurth Wood Holding LLC. (Kiser, Livia) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Livia M Kiser on behalf of Defendant Wurth Louis and Company (Kiser, Livia) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: 6/22/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting 14 Request to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Deborah H Renner; Andrew A Wood; Loura L Alaverdi and Erica Barrow terminated (twdb)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: 6/21/2017 Unknown Document Type
REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Livia M. Kiser in place of attorney Andrew A. Wood and others filed by defendant Wurth Louis and Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Livia M Kiser added to party Wurth Louis and Company(pty:dft)) (Kiser, Livia)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: 5/12/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting 11 Non-Resident Attorney Deborah H. Renner APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendant, Wurth Louis and Company, designating Andrew A. Wood as local counsel. (dro)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: 5/12/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting 10 Non-Resident Attorney Erica Barrow APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendant, Wurth Louis and Company, designating Andrew A. Wood as local counsel. (dro)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: 5/11/2017 Unknown Document Type
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Deborah H. Renner to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Wurth Louis and Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-19835029) filed by Defendant Wurth Louis and Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Wood, Andrew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: 5/11/2017 Unknown Document Type
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Erica Barrow to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Wurth Louis and Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-19834892) filed by Defendant Wurth Louis and Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Wood, Andrew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: 4/28/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Regarding Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint to Allow Mediation to be Completed. 8 The deadline for Defendant to respond to the Complaint is hereby extended from May 5, 2017 up to and including June 23, 2017, to allow the parties to complete private mediation. (es)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 06/23/2017 re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Wurth Louis and Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Alaverdi, Loura) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Wurth Louis and Company answer now due 5/5/2017, filed by Defendant Wurth Louis and Company.(Alaverdi, Loura) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: 4/6/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER, by Judge David O. Carter. (dro)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: 4/5/2017 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (car) (Entered: 04/05/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: 4/4/2017 Unknown Document Type
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Wurth Louis and Company. (Alaverdi, Loura)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Wurth Louis and Company, identifying Wurth Group of North America, Inc.; Wurth International AG; Reinhold Wurth. (Alaverdi, Loura) (Entered: 04/04/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California, County of Orange, Central Justice Center, case number 30-2017-00907307 Receipt No: 0973-19631004 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Wurth Louis and Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Summons & Complaint, etc.)) (Attorney Loura L Alaverdi added to party Wurth Louis and Company(pty:dft))(Alaverdi, Loura) (Entered: 04/04/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 61 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?