iFinex Inc. v. Wells Fargo & Company
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:17-cv-01882

Tags
Last Updated January 15, 2019 at 6:05 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BFXNA Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Steptoe & Johnson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Jeremy Baratz +1 202 429 6468 +1 202 429 3902 mbaratz@steptoe.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura J Edelstein +1 650 687 9570 +1 650 687 9499 ledelstein@steptoe.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth Reed Sias +1 650 687 9516 ssias@steptoe.com
No Logo BFXWW Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Steptoe & Johnson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Jeremy Baratz +1 202 429 6468 +1 202 429 3902 mbaratz@steptoe.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura J Edelstein +1 650 687 9570 +1 650 687 9499 ledelstein@steptoe.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth Reed Sias +1 650 687 9516 ssias@steptoe.com
No Logo iFinex Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Steptoe & Johnson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Jeremy Baratz +1 202 429 6468 +1 202 429 3902 mbaratz@steptoe.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura J Edelstein +1 650 687 9570 +1 650 687 9499 ledelstein@steptoe.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth Reed Sias +1 650 687 9516 ssias@steptoe.com
No Logo Tether Limited, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Steptoe & Johnson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Jeremy Baratz +1 202 429 6468 +1 202 429 3902 mbaratz@steptoe.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura J Edelstein +1 650 687 9570 +1 650 687 9499 ledelstein@steptoe.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth Reed Sias +1 650 687 9516 ssias@steptoe.com
v.
Wells Fargo Bank, NA Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Defendant
Unknown Role, NORWEST CORP
Unknown Role, Day Runner, Inc.
Unknown Role, Yucca Uranium Inc
Unknown Role, Munienhanced Fund Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuireWoods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carolee Anne Hoover +1 415 844 9944 +1 415 844 9911 choover@mcguirewoods.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Carlyle Powell +1 415 844 1970 +1 415 844 9922 dpowell@mcguirewoods.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jamie Danielle Wells +1 415 844 9944 +1 415 844 9922 jwells@mcguirewoods.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carolee Anne Hoover +1 415 844 9944 +1 415 844 9911 choover@mcguirewoods.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Carlyle Powell +1 415 844 1970 +1 415 844 9922 dpowell@mcguirewoods.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jamie Danielle Wells +1 415 844 9944 +1 415 844 9922 jwells@mcguirewoods.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: 5/5/2017 Clerks Notice
CLERK'S NOTICE: Granting 31 Application for Refund. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: 4/28/2017 Application for Refund
    Application for Refund, Receipt Number 261MQ73D by BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., Tether Limited, iFinex Inc.. (Sias, Seth) (Filed on 4/28/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: 4/14/2017 Clerks Notice
      CLERK'S NOTICE: Denying 29 Application for Refund. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: 4/13/2017 Application for Refund
        Application for Refund, Receipt Number 0971-11290918 by BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., Tether Limited, iFinex Inc.. (Sias, Seth) (Filed on 4/13/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: 4/11/2017 Notice of voluntary dismissal
          NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., Tether Limited, iFinex Inc. (Edelstein, Laurie) (Filed on 4/11/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: 4/11/2017 Case Management Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
            CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/7/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 6/30/2017.. Signed by Judge Maxine M.Chesney on 4/11/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order of Judge Maxine M. Chesney, # 2 Standing Order of All Judges)(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              CLERK'S NOTICE ON REASSIGNMENT. You are noticed that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Maxine M. Chesney upon reassignment. Please see docket # 27 . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2017) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/10/2017 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Conference
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 4/7/2017. Opening brief due by 4/12/2017. Opposition due by 2:00 PM on 4/20/2017. Motion Hearing set for 4/25/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney.Total Time in Court 25 minutes. Court Reporter Name Lydia Zinn. Plaintiff Attorney Michael Baratz, Seth Sias, Laurie Edelstein. Defendant Attorney Carolee Hoover, David Powell. Attachment Civil Minutes.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/7/2017) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/9/2017, Entered: 4/9/2017 Summons issued
                      Summons Issued as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/9/2017, Entered: 4/9/2017 Summons issued
                        Summons Issued as to Wells Fargo & Company. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: 4/6/2017 Notice of appearance
                          NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie Danielle Wells (Wells, Jamie) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: 4/6/2017 Declaration in Opposition
                            DECLARATION of Carolee A. Hoover in Opposition to 6 Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should not Issue filed byWells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Related document(s) 6 ) (Hoover, Carolee) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: 4/6/2017 Notice of appearance
                              NOTICE of Appearance by David Carlyle Powell NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Powell, David) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: 4/6/2017 Notice of appearance
                                NOTICE of Appearance by Carolee Anne Hoover (Hoover, Carolee) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CONFERENCE CALL WITH THE COURT: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 4/7/2017 10:00 AM before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Counsel for plaintiff to set-up conference call and provide the Court and opposing counsel with dial-in number and access code.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.). (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2017) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: 4/6/2017 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                    ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Executive Committee on 4/6/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: 4/6/2017 Notice of appearance
                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Seth Reed Sias (Sias, Seth) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2017) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: 4/6/2017 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                          CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A... (Hoover, Carolee) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: 4/6/2017 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                            ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Michael Baratz. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: 4/5/2017 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                              MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11291972.) filed by BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., Tether Limited, iFinex Inc.. (Baratz, Michael) (Filed on 4/5/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: 4/5/2017 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., Tether Limited, iFinex Inc... (Edelstein, Laurie) (Filed on 4/5/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: 4/5/2017 Declaration in Support
                                                  Declaration of J.L. van der Velde in Support of 6 Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should not Issue filed byBFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., Tether Limited, iFinex Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 6 ) (Edelstein, Laurie) (Filed on 4/5/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: 4/5/2017 Declaration in Support
                                                    Declaration of Michael Baratz in Support of 6 Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should not Issue filed byBFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., Tether Limited, iFinex Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17)(Related document(s) 6 ) (Edelstein, Laurie) (Filed on 4/5/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/19/2017. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2017) (Entered: 04/05/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: 4/5/2017 Ex-Parte Application
                                                        Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should not Issue filed by BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., Tether Limited, iFinex Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Edelstein, Laurie) (Filed on 4/5/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: 4/5/2017 Notice - other
                                                          Statement of Corporate Disclosure Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 by BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., Tether Limited, iFinex Inc. (Edelstein, Laurie) (Filed on 4/5/2017) Modified on 4/9/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: 4/5/2017 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                            Certificate of Interested Entities by BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., Tether Limited, iFinex Inc. (Edelstein, Laurie) (Filed on 4/5/2017)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: 4/5/2017 Proposed Summons
                                                              Proposed Summons. (Edelstein, Laurie) (Filed on 4/5/2017)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: 4/5/2017 Proposed Summons
                                                                Proposed Summons. (Edelstein, Laurie) (Filed on 4/5/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: 4/5/2017 Complaint
                                                                  COMPLAINT for Intentional Interference with Contractual Relations and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-11291585.). Filed by iFinex Inc., Tether Limited, BFXWW Inc., BFXNA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Edelstein, Laurie) (Filed on 4/5/2017) Modified on 4/9/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 42 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?