Gonzalez-Camacho v. Banco Popular de Puerto Rico
Federal Civil Lawsuit Puerto Rico District Court, Case No. 3:17-cv-01448

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 17, 2020 at 8:35 AM ST (4.7 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1640
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (108) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: None USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 8/12/2020, Entered: None USCA Mandate
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 7/22/2020, Entered: None USCA Judgment
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 8/2/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None Appeal Record Sent to USCA
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Notice of appeal
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Withdraw Attorney
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Appeal Record Sent to USCA
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Amended Notice of Appeal
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Bill of Costs
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None judgment
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Alter Judgment
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Docket Annotation
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Docket Annotation
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None Requesting Order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 4/28/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Joinder
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Objection to
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Appear
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Alter Judgment
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        OPINION AND ORDER. Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Amended Complaint, Docket No. 5, and Motion to Joinder, Docket entries No. 96, 99, 103, 104, 107, 108, 110, 113, 114, 115, 119, 131, 132 are GRANTED. Judgment of dismissal with prejudice is to be entered as to all named Defendants. See Opinion and Order for further details. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 3/28/2018.(JAM)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Consolidate Cases
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None Withdraw Attorney
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Appear
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: None Sur Reply to Reply to Opposition
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Withdraw
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Withdraw Attorney
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: None Appeal Record Sent to USCA
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Clarify
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Submitting
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/16/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Requesting Order
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: None Requesting Order
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: None Requesting Order
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Appear
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: None Service by Publication
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None Temporary Restraining Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: None Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 6 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?