Loeffler v. Nicholas, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:02-cv-00399
District Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 6, 2017 at 11:55 PM EDT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Antoinette Loeffler, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Gregory M. Egelston +1 212 779 1414
LEAD ATTORNEY Jeffrey Michael Haber +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 haber@bernlieb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Menachem E. Lifshitz +1 212 779 1414 lifshitz@bernlieb.com
v.
No Logo Ernest Mario, Defendant
No Logo James R. Tobin, Defendant
No Logo Joel L. Fleishman, Defendant
No Logo John E. Abele, Defendant
No Logo Joseph A. Ciffolillo, Defendant
No Logo Lawrence L. Horsch, Defendant
No Logo Marye Ann Fox, Defendant
No Logo N. J. Nicholas, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Pete M. Nicholas, Defendant
No Logo Ray J. Groves, Defendant
No Logo Warren B. Rudman, Defendant
Boston Scientific Corporation Boston Scientific Corporation, Nominal Defendant
Officially listed as "Boston Scientific Corp."
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332ss
Nature of Suit 160 - Contract: Stockholders' Suits
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Further Supportof re: MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Lawrence C. Best, N.J. Nicholas, Jr, Boston Scientific Corp. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00247-AKH, 1:02-cv-00399-AKH(jar) (Entered: 05/29/2007)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/21/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall appear for a joint case management conference on 10/3/02 at 4:00 p.m. in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street. ( signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein ); Copies mailed. (dle) (Entered: 08/22/2002)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/18/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      Notice of Case Reassignment to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein . Copy of notice and judge's rules mailed to Attorney(s) of record: Gregory M. Egelston, Jeffrey M. Haber, Mel E. Lifshitz . (dle) (Entered: 03/20/2002)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/28/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Allen G. Schwartz . Copy of notice and judge's rules mailed to Attorney(s) of record: Gregory M. Egelston, Jeffrey M. Haber, Mel E. Lifshitz . (jol) (Entered: 01/30/2002)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/15/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 427540. (jol) (Entered: 01/18/2002)
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 15 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?